Zhang v. Homeland Security et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:07-cv-01007
District Judge Stefan R. Underhill, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 20, 2017 at 9:37 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jianhong Zhang, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jianhong Zhang

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jianhong Zhang
v.
United States Department of Homeland Security United States Department of Homeland Security, Defendant
Officially listed as "Department of Homeland Security"

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lynn McConaghy +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 michelle.mcconaghy@usdoj.gov
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant
Officially listed as "FBI"

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lynn McConaghy +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 michelle.mcconaghy@usdoj.gov
No Logo Uscis, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lynn McConaghy +1 203 821 3700 +1 203 773 5373 michelle.mcconaghy@usdoj.gov
Citation No cause code entered
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/17/2007, Entered: None
ORDER DISMISSING CASE re 7 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Clerk on 9/17/2007. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 09/17/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/14/2007, Entered: None
    STIPULATION of Dismissal of case by Jianhong Zhang, Dept of Homeland Security, USCIS, FBI. (Colson, Michelle) (Entered: 09/14/2007)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
      Memorandum in Support re 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Dept of Homeland Security, USCIS, FBI. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit A-1# 3 Exhibit A-2# 4 Exhibit B)(Colson, Michelle) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Dept of Homeland Security, USCIS, FBI.Responses due by 9/14/2007 (Colson, Michelle) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
          NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle Lynn Colson on behalf of Dept of Homeland Security, USCIS, FBI (Colson, Michelle) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/12/2007, Entered: None
            Docket Entry Correction re 2 Order to Show Cause. Modified to correct PDF. (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 07/13/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: Why relief prayed for in the Petition should not be granted. Respondent shall file response by August 24, 2007 and Petitioner's reply due by September 5, 2007. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 7/12/2007. (D'Andrea, S.) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/13/2007 (D'Andrea, S.). Modified on 7/13/2007 (D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/28/2007, Entered: None
                COMPLAINT against Dept of Homeland Security, USCIS, FBI ( Filing Fee $350, Receipt Number B014429), filed by Jianhong Zhang. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A to G)(D'Andrea, S.) (Entered: 06/29/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 114 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?