Neece, et al v. IRS, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oklahoma Northern District Court, Case No. 4:88-cv-01320
District Judge James O. Ellison, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2017 at 7:34 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Buel H Neece, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Barrow & Grimm PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William Robert Grimm +1 918 584 1600 +1 918 585 2444 grimm@barrowgrimm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Eagleton Eagleton & Harrison (Tulsa)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward John Eagleton +1 918 584 0462 +5843 584 584 3724
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James R Eagleton +1 918 584 0462 +5843 584 584 3724

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert G. Turner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles David Harrison +1 918 584 0462 +1 918 584 3724 eaglelaw@swbell.net
No Logo Peggy J Neece, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Eagleton Eagleton & Harrison (Tulsa)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward John Eagleton +1 918 584 0462 +5843 584 584 3724

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Robert G. Turner

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charles David Harrison +1 918 584 0462 +1 918 584 3724 eaglelaw@swbell.net
v.
No Logo First National Bank, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Franden Farris Quillin Goodnight & Roberts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R Farris +1 918 583 7129 +1 918 584 3814 jfarris@tulsalawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jerry C Reed

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerry C Reed +1 918 749 7011
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J McCarthy +1 202 307 6398
TERMINATED: 02/21/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Phil E Pinnell +1 918 382 2716 +1 918 560 7948 phil.pinnell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Scott Woodward +1 918 382 2700 +1 918 560 7943 scott.woodward@usdoj.gov
United States of America United States of America, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nanci Scobloinko Bramson +1 202 616 8344 +5146 514 514 6770
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Dennis M. Duffy +1 919 856 4530 +8564 856 856 4487 dennis.duffy@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John J McCarthy +1 202 307 6398
TERMINATED: 01/14/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY Phil E Pinnell +1 918 382 2716 +1 918 560 7948 phil.pinnell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Scott Woodward +1 918 382 2700 +1 918 560 7943 scott.woodward@usdoj.gov
No Logo First National Bank, Cross Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Franden Farris Quillin Goodnight & Roberts

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph R Farris +1 918 583 7129 +1 918 584 3814 jfarris@tulsalawyer.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Jerry C Reed

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jerry C Reed +1 918 749 7011
United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service United States Department of the Treasury, Internal Revenue Service, Cross Defendant
Officially listed as "Internal Revenue Service"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/21/2014 Phil E Pinnell +1 918 382 2716 +1 918 560 7948 phil.pinnell@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Scott Woodward +1 918 382 2700 +1 918 560 7943 scott.woodward@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 12 U.S.C. § 3410
Nature of Suit 875 - Taxes: Customer Challenge
  Entries (123) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None
MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk pursuant to General Order 14-1, adding attorney Thomas Scott Woodward for Internal Revenue Service,Thomas Scott Woodward for Internal Revenue Service terminating attorney Phil E Pinnell (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (a-hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/21/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 1/14/2014, Entered: None
    MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk pursuant to General Order 14-1, adding attorney Thomas Scott Woodward for United States of America terminating attorney Phil E Pinnell (This entry is the Official Order of the Court. No document is attached.) (hc-ad, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/14/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 4/7/1998, Entered: None
      RELEASE And SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re [298-1], re [287-1], re [254-1], re [249-1], re [236-2] as to defendant First National Bank (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/08/1998)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 4/1/1998, Entered: None
        SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re [298-1], re [287-1], re [271-1], re [254-1], re [249-1], re [236-2], re [30-2] as to defendant USA, defendant IRS (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/02/1998)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 2/18/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
          JUDGMENT: by Senior Judge James O. Ellison for pltfs agnst govt $142,069.62, plus interest and the 1st Natl Bank of Turley for $84,413.83, interest (cc: all counsel) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/20/1998)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 2/4/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER by Senior Judge James O. Ellison granting motion to correct clerical errors in jgm [291-1], correct amount shd be $105,026.68, granting motion to alter or amend judgment [287-1] re: atty fees [288-1] motion filing ddl set for 2/19/98; repsonses 3/5/98 IN-COURT HRG set for 10:30 3/18/98 on atty fees ; amended, corrected jgm w/b entered when pending atty fee issue is decided (cc: all counsel) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/05/1998)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 1/13/1998, Entered: None
              ...MOTION by defendant USA to expedite decision (mail, c/ret) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/13/1998)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 1/6/1998, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Senior Judge James O. Ellison granting motion to change time/resp to pltfs' suppl to mo/amd jgm [294-1] to: 1/13/98 (cc: mvt counsel) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/07/1998)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 12/23/1997, Entered: None
                  MOTION by defendant USA to change time/resp to pltfs' suppl to mo/amd jgm (mail, c/ret) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/24/1997)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 12/16/1997, Entered: None
                    ...MOTION by plaintiff Buel H Neece to expedite decision (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/17/1997)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 12/16/1997, Entered: None
                      ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for plaintiff Buel H Neece by William R Grimm (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/17/1997)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 10/2/1997, Entered: None
                        MOTION by defendant USA to correct clerical errors in jgm (mail, c/ret) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/03/1997)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 9/8/1997, Entered: None
                          RESPONSE by defendant USA to motion to alter or amend judgment [287-1] re: atty fees [288-1] (mail, c/ret) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/08/1997)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 8/29/1997, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE by defendant First National Bank to motion to alter or amend judgment [287-1] re: atty fees [288-1] (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/02/1997)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 8/20/1997, Entered: None
                              MOTION by plaintiff Buel H Neece, plaintiff Peggy J Neece to alter or amend judgment [287-1] re: atty fees (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/21/1997)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                JUDGMENT by Senior Judge James O. Ellison in favor of pltfs and agnst IRS and 1st Nat'l Bank of Turley for $105,026.68; the damage amt shall be apportioned between the dfts, with bank paying 1/4 and IRS paying 3/4 (cc: all counsel) (lmc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/18/1997)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 8/15/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  ORDER by Senior Judge James O. Ellison that pltf is entitled to jgmt re atty fee damages, jeopardy assessment abatement action for $73,877.80; atty fees, successful portion 10th Circuit appeal for $28,753.88; liability shall be apportioned 1/4 to the Bank and 3/4/ to the IRS [281-1] [280-1] (cc: all counsel) (lmc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/18/1997)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 7/2/1997, Entered: None
                                    OBJECTIONS by plaintiff Buel H Neece, plaintiff Peggy J Neece to exhibits of defts at the 6/17 evid hrg (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/03/1997)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE by defendant First National Bank to motion to enhance attorney fees [281-1], to motion for attorney fees [280-1] (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/11/1997)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: None
                                        BRIEF FILED by defendant USA, defendant IRS re: 10th circuit's September 96 remand (mail, c/j, c/ret) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/11/1997)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: None
                                          BRIEF by plaintiff Buel H Neece, plaintiff Peggy J Neece in support of motion to enhance attorney fees [281-1] (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/20/1997)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 5/19/1997, Entered: None
                                            MOTION by plaintiff Buel H Neece, plaintiff Peggy J Neece to enhance attorney fees (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/20/1997)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 5/15/1997, Entered: None
                                              MOTION by plaintiff Buel H Neece, plaintiff Peggy J Neece for attorney fees (bjm, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/15/1997)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 5/5/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                ORDER by Senior Judge James O. Ellison granting deft's motion for leave to attend status conf by phone [277-1] (cc: all counsel) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/06/1997)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant USA by Dennis M Duffy, Nanci S Bramson (Mail-copy ret'd) (lmc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/02/1997)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 5/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION by defendant USA for leave to attend status conf by phone (O/J) (Mail-copy ret'd) (lmc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/02/1997)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/15/1997, Entered: None
                                                      MOTION by plaintiffs Buel H Neece, Peggy J Neece for hearing/status conf (C/J) (lmc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/15/1997)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 11/8/1996, Entered: None
                                                        CERTIFIED COPY of Judgment from USCA affirming in part and reversing in part; remanding the matter back to District Court re atty's fees [Appeal [241-1] (cc: JOE-J) (lmc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/12/1996)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 10/24/1996, Entered: None
                                                          CERTIFIED COPY of Order from USCA remanding the matter back to District Court re amt of atty's fees pltfs incurred re their appeal and amt each dft is liable [Appeal [272-1] (cc: JOE-J) (lmc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 10/25/1996)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 8/21/1995, Entered: None
                                                            TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for dates: already on file re transcript [0-0], re transcript [0-0], re transcript [0-0], re transcript [0-0] (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/22/1995)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 8/16/1995, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece from Dist. Court decision [271-1], [270-1]; fees paid; forms given (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/17/1995)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                JUDGMENT: by Senior Judge James O. Ellison entered in favor of the defts, Internal Revenue Svc of The USA and The First National Bank of Turley, and against the pltfs, Peggy J. Neece and Buel H. Neece. Pltf shall take noting of its claim for atty fees from the bankruptcy, jeopardy assessment, and tax court proceedings. (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/10/1995)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 8/9/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER by Senior Judge James O. Ellison entering the findings of fact and conclusions of law. (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 08/10/1995)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 7/17/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                    ORDER by Senior Judge James O. Ellison granting motion to extend time to file findings of fact and conclusions of law. [267-1] USA has an addit 2 days, or until 7/14/95, within which to file its findings of fact and conclusions of law. (cc: mvt counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/18/1995)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 7/13/1995, Entered: None
                                                                      FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law (by parties) proposed by defendant IRS, defendant USA (C2J). (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/14/1995)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 7/12/1995, Entered: None
                                                                        MOTION by defendant IRS, defendant USA to extend time to file findings of fact (O2J) and conclusions of law. (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/13/1995)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 266 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                          FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law (by parties) by defendant First National Bank (C2J). (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/11/1995)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 265 Filed: 7/10/1995, Entered: None
                                                                            FINDINGS (PROPOSED) of fact and conclusions of law (by parties) by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece (bjm, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/10/1995)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 264 Filed: 6/14/1995, Entered: None
                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney's Lien of Paul F. McTighe, Jr. (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/15/1995)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 4/25/1995, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                ORDER by Senior Judge James O. Ellison EVIDENTIARY HRG set for 9:30am on 6/29/95 re: atty fees (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/26/1995)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 4/5/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                  BRIEF FILED by defendant First National Bank re: Issues to be addressed on remand (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/06/1995)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 4/4/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                    BRIEF FILED by defendant USA re: Issues on Remand From Court of Appeals (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 04/05/1995)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 3/17/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                      RESPONSE by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece to minute order [0-0] (C2J) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/20/1995)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 1/9/1995, Entered: None
                                                                                        CERTIFIED COPY of JUDGMENT from USCA; part of the dist ct's ord & jgm disallowing pltfs claim for atty fees incurred in connection w/their successful court challenge to the jeopardy assessment on the ground of res judicata is reversed & remanded for further consideration; otherwise the ord & jgm is affirmed [255-1] (cc:JOE) (agc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/13/1995)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 7/7/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                          NOTICE by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece of change of address of counsel. (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/08/1994)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 3/15/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                            CLERK'S Record on Appeal to the Circuit re: [255-1] (agc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/15/1994)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 3/10/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                              TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM for dates: transcript already on file. (agc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/15/1994)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 3/10/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece from Dist. Court decision [254-1], [249-1], [248-1].(Fee PD) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/11/1994)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 3/9/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  MANEDED JUDGMENT: by Chief Judge James O. Ellison granting in part & denying in part motion to amend judgment [250-1]. The order of 11/30/94 will be amended to reflect an award of $24,126.23 in costs as well as the $68,883.75 in attorney fees. (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/10/1994)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/25/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                    RESPONSE by defendant First National Bank to motion to amend judgment [250-1]. (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/25/1994)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/25/1994, Entered: None
                                                                                                      RESPONSE by defendant USA to motion to amend judgment [250-1]. (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/25/1994)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/10/1994, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER by Chief Judge James O. Ellison; setting motion to amend judgment, [250-1] response to motion ddl to: 1/25/94 (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/11/1994)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 250 Filed: 12/28/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece to amend judgment j2j (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/29/1993)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 12/21/1993, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            JUDGMENT: By Chief Judge James O. Ellison. Pursuant to order of 11/30/93, judgment is entered in favor of pltf on mot/attys' fees against deft in the sum of $68,883.75. (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/21/1993)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 11/30/1993, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER by Chief Judge James O. Ellison; granting motion for attorney fees w/brief in support.[239-1] That pltfs' counsel are awarded a total fee in the amount of $68,883.75 for both phases of the proceedings.(See pldg) (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/01/1993)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 247 Filed: 9/7/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                BRIEF (MEMORANDUM OF AUTHORITIES) by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece in support of motion for attorney fees.[239-1] (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 09/07/1993)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 7/20/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  (TRIAL) BRIEF FILED by defendant IRS re: Hearing on mot/atty fees. (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/20/1993)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 7/9/1993, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                    ORDER by Chief Judge James O. Ellison (by Judge Thomas R. Brett) setting hearing on motion for attorney fees w/brief in support.[239-1] 11:00 9/17/93 (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 07/09/1993)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 6/18/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      RESPONSE (OBJECTION) by defendant IRS to motion for attorney fees w/brief in support.(Ofor hrng 2J) [239-1] (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/21/1993)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 6/18/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        RESPONSE (OBJECTION) by defendant First National Bank to motion for attorney fees w/brief in support. [239-1] (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/21/1993)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 6/15/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT Order Form: transcripts already on file for the appeal; ltr to 10th & ptys in re completed ROA (agc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/16/1993)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece from Dist. Court decision [236-1] (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/10/1993)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 6/7/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              OBJECTIONS by defendant First National Bank to [237-1] (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/08/1993)
                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 6/4/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece for attorney fees w/brief in support.(Ofor hrng 2J) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/07/1993)
                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 238 Filed: 6/4/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS by defendant IRS to [237-1] (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 06/07/1993)
                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 5/27/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    BILL OF COSTS by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece in the amount of $ 4,042.86 against defendant IRS, defendant USA, defendant First National Bank cost hearing before clerk set for 10:00 6/9/93 (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/27/1993)
                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 5/21/1993, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law by Chief Judge James O. Ellison (cc: all counsel) (fe, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 05/21/1993)
                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 3/18/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law (by parties) by defendant USA (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/19/1993)
                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 3/18/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law (by parties) by defendant First National Bank (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/19/1993)
                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 3/18/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            TRIAL briefs by defendant First National Bank (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/19/1993)
                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 3/17/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              PROPOSED FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law and orders by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece (behind file) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 03/18/1993)
                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 2/2/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                supplement to FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law (by parties) by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 2/2/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY APPEARANCE for defendant IRS, defendant USA by John J McCarthy (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/05/1993)
                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 2/1/1993, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    proposed FINDINGS of fact and conclusions of law (by parties) by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 02/02/1993)
                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 1/27/1993, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                      PRE-TRIAL ORDER approved by Chief Judge James O. Ellison : (cc: all counsel) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 01/27/1993)
                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 12/21/1992, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Chief Judge James O. Ellison denying motion to compel [207-1] (cc: all counsel) (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/23/1992)
                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 12/17/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          EXHIBIT list by defendant IRS (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/21/1992)
                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 12/16/1992, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Chief Judge James O. Ellison denying motion for partial summary judgment re: punitive damages [213-1] denying motion for partial summary judgment re: actual damages [214-1] striking motion for partial summary judgment re: punitive damages [221-1] granting motion to amend Ct's 12/9/92 order (cpy/J) [222-1] (cc: all counsel) (agc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/18/1992)
                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 224 Filed: 12/15/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece to motion for partial summary judgment re: actual damages [214-1] (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/16/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 223 Filed: 12/11/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM BRIEF by defendant IRS in support of motion to amend Ct's 12/9/92 order (cpy/J) [222-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/14/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 12/11/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  EMERGENCY MOTION by defendant IRS to amend Ct's 12/9/92 order (cpy/J) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/14/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 12/9/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NEW MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece for partial summary judgment re: punitive damages (behind file) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 12/9/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      AMENDMENT by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece to partial witness list [124-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 12/9/1992, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Chief Judge James O. Ellison pretrial conference reset for 9:30 12/18/92 no add'l pldgs 2B filed w/o lve/Ct; granting motion to change resp time re: deft IRS's mos/PSJ (O/cs) [216-1] setting motion for partial summary judgment re: actual damages [214-1] response to motion ddl to: 12/17/92 at 4:00pm; setting motion for partial summary judgment re: punitive damages [213-1] response to motion ddl to: 12/17/92 at 4:00pm; finding the objection [168-1] moot by #191; granting in-part and denying in-part motion to determine whether jt or separatee liability exists between defts under right to financial privacy act [170-1]; finding the objection [173-1] moot by #191; denying motion for sanctions agnst deft IRS [174-1], denying motion for partial summary judgment agnst deft IRS [174-2], denying motion for attorney fees agnst deft IRS [174-3]; finding the motion to strike #176 [179-1] moot because it relates to #176 which was resolved in #191; finding the motion to compel [182-1] denied as moot; granting motion for protective order [189-1] on grounds of relevancy; finding the motion for leave to admit [193-1] moot by #212; granting in-part and denying in-part motion to compel [194-1]; granting in-part and denying in-part motion for reconsideration of Ct's 10/7/92 Order (#191) [200-1]; Ct's 10/7/92 Order #191 is amended to reflect this ruling; denying motion in limine [202-1] except as to certain docs; denying motion to quash ntc/depo [204-1]; granting motion to compel [207-1], denying motion for sanctions [207-2], denying motion for attorney fees [207-3]; deft's mos/PSJ (#213 and #214) are not at issue; (cc: all counsel) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 11/30/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          ANSWER TO CROSSCLAIM [186-1] by cross-defendant IRS (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 11/25/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM BRIEF by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece in support of motion to change resp time re: deft IRS's mos/PSJ (O/cs) [216-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/27/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 11/25/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece to change resp time re: deft IRS's mos/PSJ (O/cs) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/27/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 11/23/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM BRIEF by defendant IRS in support of motion for partial summary judgment re: actual damages [214-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/24/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 11/23/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by defendant IRS for partial summary judgment re: actual damages (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/24/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 11/20/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant IRS for partial summary judgment re: punitive damages w/brf (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/20/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 11/17/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE by defendant IRS, defendant USA to motion for leave to admit [193-1] (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/18/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 10/27/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece to motion to quash ntc/depo [204-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 10/23/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by defendant IRS to quash ntc/depo (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 10/21/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece in limine (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 10/19/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant IRS for reconsideration of Ct's 10/7/92 Order (#191) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 10/14/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                RENEWED MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece to compel (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 10/14/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece for leave to admit (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/18/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 10/7/1992, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER by Chief Judge James O. Ellison,,, addressing pending discovery issues (cc: all counsel) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 10/2/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by defendant IRS for protective order (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 9/30/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        CROSSCLAIM by defendant First National Bank against defendant IRS (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 182 Filed: 9/28/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece to compel (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/18/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece to strike #176 w/memo of authorities (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 9/10/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM BRIEF by defendant IRS in support of objection [168-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 9/8/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece for sanctions agnst deft IRS , and for partial summary judgment agnst deft IRS , and for attorney fees agnst deft IRS (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 9/8/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  OBJECTIONS by defendant IRS to [166-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 9/2/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by defendant First National Bank to determine whether jt or separatee liability exists between defts under right to financial privacy act (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 8/28/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      OBJECTIONS by defendant IRS to [163-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 8/18/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece of taking deposition of officer/IRS on 9/22/92 at 10:00am (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/3/1992, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece of taking deposition of officer/IRS on 9/8/92 at 10:00am (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 9/12/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            PARTIAL WITNESS list by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 12/10/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/31/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ANSWER by defendant First National Bank to amended cmplt [79-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/24/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER by defendant IRS, defendant USA to amended cmplt [79-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/11/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece for damages under right to financial privacy act (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/14/1991, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CERTIFIED COPY of Judgment from USCA reversing and remanding the Decision of the District Court [Appeal [33-1] for further proceedings (cc: all counsel) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/17/1989, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece from Dist. Court order and jdgmt [30-2], [29-1] fees pd, no dkng stmt, processed and mld 7/18/89 (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/19/1989, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        JUDGMENT: by Chief Judge James O. Ellison,, that pltfs take nothing from defts IRS, USA and 1st Nat Bk Turley, action dism on merits and that defts recover of pltfs their costs; dismissing case (cc: all counsel) (EOD: 6/21/89) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/15/1989, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER by Chief Judge James O. Ellison granting motion for summary judgment [16-1], granting motion for summary judgment [13-2], denying motion for partial summary judgment [7-1] (cc: all counsel) (EOD: 6/19/89) (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/28/1989, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION by defendant First National Bank for summary judgment (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/27/1989, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION by defendant IRS, defendant USA to dismiss , or in the alternative for summary judgment (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/17/1989, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION by plaintiff Peggy J Neece, plaintiff Buel H Neece for partial summary judgment (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/28/1988, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ANSWER by defendant IRS, defendant USA to [1-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/2/1988, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ANSWER by defendant First National Bank to [1-1] (hc, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/30/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/28/1988, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT (Summons(es) issued); Consent form sent (pll, Dpty Clk) (Entered: 11/18/1992)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 132 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?