Lewmar, Inc v. Condatis LLC

Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-01181
District Judge Janet Bond Arterton, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Janet Bond Arterton
Last Updated January 18, 2017 at 4:13 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Lewmar, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by St. Onge Steward Johnston & Reens LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Todd M Oberdick +1 203 324 6155 +1 203 327 1096 toberdick@ssjr.com
v.
No Logo Condatis LLC, Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 2201
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/28/2011, Entered: None
AO 120 Report on the Determination of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed. Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Filed. (Attachments: # 1 complaint, part 1, # 2 complaint, part 2) (Kelsey, N.) (Entered: 01/28/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/27/2011, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Lewmar, Inc (Oberdick, Todd) (Entered: 01/27/2011)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
AO 120 Report on the Filing of an Action re: Patent or Trademark Form Completed (Attachments: # 1 Complaint, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C) (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lewmar, Inc identifying Corporate Parent Lewmar Marine Ltd. for Lewmar, Inc. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/28/2010. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/28/2010. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None Court Filing
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 10/28/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 9/26/2010. Discovery due by 1/27/2011. Dispositive Motions due by 2/26/2011. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 7/28/2010. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/28/2010, Entered: None
COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against Condatis LLC, filed by Lewmar, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 86 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?