Advanced Auctions LLC v. eBay Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:13-cv-01612
District Judge Roger T. Benitez, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 1:46 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Advanced Auctions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Engles, Deborah

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P Griffin +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 rgriffin@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 12/30/2014, PRO HAC VICE Christine Brow Lindsey +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 clindsey@nbclaw.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas N Millikan +1 858 720 5723 +1 858 720 5799 tmillikan@perkinscoie.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph P. Reid +1 858 720 5741 +1 858 720 5799 JReid@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
eBay, Inc. eBay, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Bamboo.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mercadolibre Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Open Gates Business Development Corporation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared Bobrow +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 Jared.Bobrow@Weil.com
v.
eBay, Inc. eBay, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, Bamboo.com, Inc.
Officer/Director, PayPal Holdings, Inc.
Officer/Director, Mercadolibre Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 05/30/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher S Geyer +1 571 275 0136 christopher.s.geyer@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jared Bobrow +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 Jared.Bobrow@Weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Louis Perito +1 650 802 3993 +1 650 802 3100 andrew.perito@weil.com
No Logo Advanced Auctions, LLC, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Engles, Deborah

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brent Nelson Bumgardner +1 817 377 3490 +1 817 377 3485 brent@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Christopher Cecil +1 817 806 3812 +1 817 377 3485 tcecil@nbclaw.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan P Griffin +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 rgriffin@nbclaw.net
TERMINATED: 12/30/2014, PRO HAC VICE Christine Brow Lindsey +1 817 377 9111 +1 817 377 3485 clindsey@nbclaw.net
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Nelson, III +1 817 377 9111 ed@nelbum.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas N Millikan +1 858 720 5723 +1 858 720 5799 tmillikan@perkinscoie.com
TERMINATED: 11/25/2013, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph P. Reid +1 858 720 5741 +1 858 720 5799 JReid@perkinscoie.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 07/22/2014, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Ward & Smith Law Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Claire Abernathy Henry +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 757 2323 claire@wsfirm.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas John Ward, Jr. +1 903 757 6400 +1 903 758 7397 jw@jwfirm.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 0271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings (Motion Hearing) held on 12/12/2014, before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Deborah M. O'Connell. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 7/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/6/2015. (akr) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
    Final Judgment granting 82 Motion for Judgment. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Claims 1, 2, 3, 4, 10, 11, 12, 13, 14, 17, 18, 19, 20, 23, and 24 of U.S. Patent No. 8,266,000 are invalid under 35 U.S.C. § 101. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Advanced Auctions LLC ("Plaintiff") shall take nothing from eBay Inc. ("Defendant"). It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that Plaintiff's claims are dismissed with prejudice based on Defendant's § 101 invalidity affirmative defense, and Defendant's counterclaims other than for invalidity under § 101 are hereby dismissed without prejudice as moot. It is further ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that each party shall bear its own costs and attorneys' fees incurred in connection with this civil action. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 4/30/2015. (kcm) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 4/28/2015, Entered: None
      REPORT of Patent and Trademark Closing, regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) 8,266,000, re 82 Joint MOTION for Judgment Stipulation and Motion for Entry of Judgment in a Separate Document. cc:USPTO (ag) (Entered: 04/28/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
        Joint MOTION for Judgment Stipulation and Motion for Entry of Judgment in a Separate Document by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Bumgardner, Brent) (QC mailer sent re: Proposed Order) (kcm). (Entered: 04/24/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/27/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER Granting 71 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 3/26/2015. (knb) (Entered: 03/27/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
            MINUTE ENTRY: regarding motion concerning the discovery. The moving party shall file and serve its motion on or before April 1, 2015 at 5:00 P.M. The opposing party shall file and serve its opposition on or before April 6, 2015 at 5:00 P.M. The moving party shall file and serve its reply to the opposition on or April 8, 2015 at 5:00 P.M.For purposes of complying with CivLR 5.1.j.4., a hearing date of April 14, 2015 at 11:00 A.M. is assigned. (knb). (Entered: 03/26/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
              NOTICE by eBay Inc. re 71 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (Unpatentable Subject Matter) Notice Of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bobrow, Jared) (aef). (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                NOTICE of Hearing: Claims Construction Hearing set for 4/9/2015 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr) (Entered: 02/06/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 12/30/2014, Entered: None
                  MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Advanced Auctions by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 12/30/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: None
                    Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: The Court hereby vacates the Claims Construction Hearing date of 12/11/2014 09:30AM.(no document attached) (gxr) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE by Advanced Auctions LLC re 72 Response in Opposition to Motion of Supplemental Authority (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A- 12/5/14 Decision in DDR Holdings, LLC v. Hotels.com)(Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        NOTICE of Change of Hearing on 71 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (Unpatentable Subject Matter) : Motion Hearing reset for 12/12/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. (no document attached) (gxr) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/4/2014, Entered: None
                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 71 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (Unpatentable Subject Matter) filed by eBay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit H)(Bobrow, Jared) (sjt). (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 71 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (Unpatentable Subject Matter) filed by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 11/26/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/11/2014, Entered: None
                              MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Based on 35 U.S.C. Section 101 (Unpatentable Subject Matter) by eBay Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G)(Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 11/11/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                Amended SCHEDULING ORDER: Claims Construction Hearing set for 12/11/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 7/20/2015 09:30 AM in chambers before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 11/16/2015. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/30/2015. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/7/2015 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/28/2014.(knb) (Entered: 10/28/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None
                                  Minute Entry: The telephonic Case Management Conference scheduled for October 28, 2014 (ECF No. 64), is hereby vacated. Order to follow.(knb) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                    RESPONSE TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by eBay Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit N)(Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/17/2014, Entered: None
                                      RESPONSE TO CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 10/17/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/9/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER Granting 65 Joint Motion to Continue. Claims Construction Hearing continued to 12/11/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 10/9/2014. (knb) (Entered: 10/09/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None
                                          Joint MOTION to Continue Claim Construction Hearing to December 11, 2014 by eBay Inc. (Perito, Andrew) (knb). (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER Scheduling Case Management Conference. Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2014 11:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 9/30/2014.(knb) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER denying as moot 55 Motion to Stay and Setting Claim Construction Hearing. Responsive Claim Construction briefs due 10/17/14. Claims Construction Hearing set for 11/13/2014 at 10:00AM in Courtroom 5A before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 9/29/14. (cge) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/26/2014, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE by Advanced Auctions LLC of Decision Regarding eBay's Inter Partes Review Petition (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Decision)(Bumgardner, Brent) (kas). (Entered: 09/26/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: None
                                                  NOTICE by Advanced Auctions LLC Of Filing Of Patent Owner's Preliminary Response Pursuant To 37 C.F.R. § 42.107 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 08/05/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                    Minute Order issued by the Honorable Roger T. Benitez: Submitting 55 MOTION to Continue The Stay Pending Inter Partes Review. Court to issue written Order. Motion Hearing date of 8/4/2014 10:30AM is hereby vacated. (no document attached) (gxr) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None
                                                      REPLY to Response to Motion re 55 MOTION to Continue The Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by eBay Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K)(Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER Granting 56 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Jaime K. Olin is terminated as counsel of record for Plaintiff Advanced Auctions LLC. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/21/2014. (knb) (Entered: 07/22/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 55 MOTION to Continue The Stay Pending Inter Partes Review filed by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix)(Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: None
                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Jaime K. Olin as Counsel for Advanced Auctions LLC by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 07/18/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                              MOTION to Continue The Stay Pending Inter Partes Review by eBay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Table of Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Exhibit N, # 17 Exhibit O)(Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE by eBay Inc. re 48 Order on Motion to Stay, Joint Notice of Decision Regarding eBay's Covered Business Method ("CBM") Review Petition (Perito, Andrew)(knb). (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER Granting 51 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Christopher S Geyer is withdrawn as counsel of record for eBay. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 5/29/2014. (knb) (Entered: 06/02/2014)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE by eBay Inc. of Filing of Petition for Inter Partes Review (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A)(Bobrow, Jared)(knb). (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                      MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Christopher S. Geyer as Counsel for eBay Inc. by eBay Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        TRANSFER ORDER. It is hereby ordered that this case be transferred from the calendar of the Honorable Karen S. Crawford, to the calendar of the Honorable Jill L. Burkhardt, for all further proceedings. All conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge Crawford, if any, are VACATED and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Burkhardt. Any dates set before any district judge remain unchanged. The new case number is 13cv1612 BEN (JLB). Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 03/28/14.(jcj) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                          Transfer Order. It is hereby ordered that the following listed cases are transferred from the calendar of the Honorable William McCurine, Jr. to the calendar of the Honorable Karen S. Crawford for all further proceedings. The new case number is 13cv1612-BEN(KSC). All future conference or hearing dates set before Magistrate Judge McCurine, if any, are vacated and will be rescheduled before Magistrate Judge Crawford. Counsel will contact the Chambers of Judge Crawford to reschedule any conferences or hearings within five days of the entry of this Order. Any dates set before the District Judge remain unchanged. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 1/31/2014.(aef) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER: (1) Granting Defendant's Ebay Inc.'s 42 Motion to Stay Pending Covered Business Method Review Under Section 18(B) of the Leahy-Smith America Invents Act; (2) Vacating February 10, 2014 Hearing; and (3) Vacating Pending Deadlines and Hearings in the Amended Scheduling Order. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 1/29/2014. (knb) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                              NON Opposition re 42 MOTION to Stay Pending Covered Business Method Review Under Section 18(B) Of The Leahy-Smith America Invents Act filed by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by eBay Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M)(Bobrow, Jared)(knb). (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  CLAIM CONSTRUCTION BRIEF by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration Ryan Griffin, # 2 Exhibit Index, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J)(Bumgardner, Brent) (knb). (Entered: 01/24/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Ryan P. Griffin appearing for Counter Defendant Advanced Auctions LLC, Plaintiff Advanced Auctions LLC, Receipt # 58420. (jao) (Entered: 01/10/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      Amended SCHEDULING ORDER: Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 11/10/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/24/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2014 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/6/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez.Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 1/7/2014.(knb) (jrl). (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/24/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                        MOTION to Stay Pending Covered Business Method Review Under Section 18(B) Of The Leahy-Smith America Invents Act by eBay Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memo of Points and Authorities, # 2 Table of Index of Exhibits, # 3 Exhibit A, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J, # 13 Exhibit K, # 14 Exhibit L, # 15 Exhibit M, # 16 Declaration of Christopher Geyer)(Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 12/24/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                          PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: T. John Ward, Jr appearing for Counter Defendant Advanced Auctions LLC, Plaintiff Advanced Auctions LLC, Receipt # 57896. (jao) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                            PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Claire A. Henry appearing for Counter Defendant Advanced Auctions LLC, Plaintiff Advanced Auctions LLC, Receipt # 57897. (jao) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                              PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Edward R. Nelson, III appearing for Counter Defendant Advanced Auctions LLC, Plaintiff Advanced Auctions LLC, Receipt # 57481. (jao) (Entered: 12/09/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION WORKSHEET by eBay Inc. (Perito, Andrew) (knb). (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                  JOINT CLAIM CONSTRUCTION CHART by eBay Inc. (Perito, Andrew) (knb). (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/6/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                    JOINT HEARING STATEMENT by eBay Inc. (Perito, Andrew)(knb). (Entered: 12/06/2013)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                      PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Brent Bumgardner appearing for Counter Defendant Advanced Auctions LLC, Plaintiff Advanced Auctions LLC, Receipt # 57386. (jao) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                        PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Christie B. Lindsey appearing for Counter Defendant Advanced Auctions LLC, Plaintiff Advanced Auctions LLC, Receipt # 57385. (jao) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                          PRO HAC VICE APPOINTED: Thomas C. Cecil appearing for Counter Defendant Advanced Auctions LLC, Plaintiff Advanced Auctions LLC, Receipt # 57384. (jao) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/25/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER granting 31 Motion to Substitute Attorney. The Court substitutes attorney Jaime K. Olin as attorney of record in place of Joseph P. Reid and Thomas N. Millikan. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 11/25/13. (kaj) (jrl). (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MOTION to Substitute Attorney by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Millikan, Thomas). (jah). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Jaime Olin on behalf of Advanced Auctions LLC (Olin, Jaime)Attorney Jaime Olin added to party Advanced Auctions LLC(pty:pla) (cxl). (Entered: 11/22/2013)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  NOTICE by eBay Inc. Notice of Service of Defendant eBay Inc.'s Responsive Disclosures Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4.1.C (Perito, Andrew) (knb). (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/15/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Advanced Auctions LLC Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Responsive Claim Constructions and Identification of Extrinsic Evidence Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4.1(c) and (d) (Millikan, Thomas) (knb). (Entered: 11/15/2013)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      NOTICE by eBay Inc. of Disclosures Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4.1 (Perito, Andrew) (knb). (Entered: 11/04/2013)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Advanced Auctions LLC of Disclosure of Advanced Auction's Preliminary Claim Constructions and Identification of Extrinsic Evidence Pursuant to Patent Local Rule 4.1 (Millikan, Thomas) (knb). (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/1/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct 18 Scheduling Order, by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Millikan, Thomas) (knb). (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/30/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr: Telephonic Discovery Conference held on 10/30/2013. (CD# 10/30/2013 n/a). (Plaintiff Attorney Thomas Millikan). (Defendant Attorney Jared Bobrow, Andrew perito). (no document attached) (rab) (Entered: 11/01/2013)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Telephonic Discovery Conference. The Court will conduct a telephonic discovery conference on October 30, 2013 at 3:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/29/2013.(knb) (Entered: 10/29/2013)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER Granting 20 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 10/21/2013. (knb) (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  NOTICE by eBay Inc. Notice of Service of Defendant Ebay's Invalidity Contentions and Accompanying Document Production Pursuant to Patent Local Rules 3.3 and 3.4 (Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 10/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/18/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery [Regarding eBay's Patent Local Rule 3.3 and 3.4 Disclosures] by eBay Inc. (Perito, Andrew)Attorney Andrew L. Perito added to party eBay Inc.(pty:dft) (knb). (Entered: 10/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/16/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr: Telephonic Case Management Conference held on 9/16/2013. Order issued.(CD# 9/16/2013 n/a). (Plaintiff Attorney Joseph P. Reid, Tom Millikan). (Defendant Attorney Jared Bobrow). (no document attached) (rab) (Entered: 10/01/2013)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Memorandum of Contentions of Fact and Law due by 11/10/2014. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 11/24/2014. Final Pretrial Conference set for 12/1/2014 10:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Claims Construction Hearing set for 3/6/2014 09:30 AM before Judge Roger T. Benitez. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 9/19/2013.(knb) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER Governing Discovery of Electronically Stored Information in Patent Case. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 9/18/2013.(knb) (Entered: 09/19/2013)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/23/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER Following Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. On August 7, 2013, the Court held an Early Neutral Evaluation. Telephonic Case Management Conference set for 9/16/2013 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William McCurine Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr on 8/23/2013.(knb) (Entered: 08/23/2013)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/22/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              NOTICE by Advanced Auctions LLC Notice of Service of Plaintiff's Disclosure of Asserted Claims and Preliminary Infringement Contentions Against Defendant (Millikan, Thomas) (knb). (Entered: 08/22/2013)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by eBay Inc. Notice of Service of Defendant Ebay Inc.'s Initial Disclosure (Geyer, Christopher)Attorney Christopher S Geyer added to party eBay Inc.(pty:dft) (knb). (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/14/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Pretrial Disclosures by Advanced Auctions LLC Notice of Service of Plaintiff's 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures (Millikan, Thomas) (knb). (Entered: 08/14/2013)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Plaintiff' Reply to Counterclaim; Demand for Jury Trial ANSWER to 10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Advanced Auctions LLC.(Millikan, Thomas) Contacted attorney re use of CM/ECF account on 8/12/2013 (knb). (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by eBay Inc. (Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/9/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Advanced Auctions LLC by eBay Inc.(Bobrow, Jared) (knb). (Entered: 08/09/2013)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                          ORDER Granting 8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. eBay Inc. answer due 8/9/2013. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 8/6/2013. (knb) (Entered: 08/06/2013)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by eBay Inc. (Bobrow, Jared)Attorney Jared Bobrow added to party eBay Inc.(pty:dft) (knb). (Entered: 08/02/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr for all further proceedings. Judge John A. Houston, Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:13-cv-00360-BEN-WMC. The new case number is 13CV1612-BEN(WMC).. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 7/18/13. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 07/15/13.(jpp) (jrl). (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas Nathan Millikan on behalf of Advanced Auctions LLC (Millikan, Thomas) (jpp). (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Advanced Auctions LLC (Reid, Joseph) (jpp). (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Advanced Auctions LLC of case(s) 13CV0360-BEN(WMC). Proposed Low Number Order prepared. (jpp) (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cxl) (cap). (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *8,266,000* cc:USPTO (cxl) (cap). (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against eBay Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-6085763.), filed by Advanced Auctions LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:13-cv-01612-JAH-WMC. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge William McCurine, Jr. are assigned to the case. (Reid, Joseph)(cxl) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/11/2013: # 2 Exhibit A) (regenerated NEF)(cxl). (cap). (Entered: 07/11/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Space Space

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 151 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?