Jones v. Trump, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-06927
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 15, 2017 at 11:56 PM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES JONES +1 584 584 8484
v.
No Logo Albert Pirro, Defendant
No Logo CDL Hotels, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City of New York"
No Logo Del LaRocca, Defendant
No Logo Domenic Pezzo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com
No Logo Doreen Klein, Defendant
No Logo Executive Plaza Cond, Defendant
No Logo Frederick Cohn, Defendant
No Logo Janie Elder, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com
No Logo Jeanine Pirro, Defendant
No Logo John Baner, Defendant
No Logo Trump, Marla Maples, Defendant
Officially listed as "Marla Maples Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com
No Logo Matthew Calamari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com
No Logo Michael Berger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com
No Logo Richard Fields, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com
No Logo Robert Gianetta, Defendant
No Logo Robert Morgenthau, Defendant
No Logo The Plaza Hotel, Defendant
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump Organization"

Toggle Switch Represented by Belkin Burden Wenig & Goldman, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey L. Goldman +1 212 867 4466 +1 212 297 1859 jgoldman@bbwg.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332ct
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/27/1999, Entered: None
MANDATE OF USCA (certified copy) Re: Affirm [24-1] appeal by Charles Jones. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the judgment of the District Court be and it hereby is affirmed. (97-9017) Karen Greve Milton, Acting Clerk, U.S.C.A. (dt) (Entered: 09/30/1999)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/17/1998, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Change of Address by Charles Jones. (em) (Entered: 03/31/1998)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/19/1997, Entered: None
      Notice that the record on appeal has been certified and transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals: [24-1] appeal by Charles Jones on August 19, 1997. (dt) (Entered: 08/19/1997)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/4/1997, Entered: None
        NOTICE OF APPEAL by Charles Jones ; from [0-1] judgment order . Copies of notice of appeal mailed to Attorney(s) of Record: Jeffrey L. Goldman . *($105.00 APPEAL FILING FEE DUE)*. (dt) (Entered: 08/15/1997)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/18/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER, substituting the Law Offices of Belkin, Burden, Wenig & Goldman in place of Michael G. Berger as attorney for Marla Maples Trump, Donald J. Trump, the Trump Organization, Matthew Calamari, Domenic Pezzo, Janie Elder, Michael G. Berger and Richard Fields (signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed (pl) Modified on 07/24/1997 (Entered: 07/22/1997)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/2/1997, Entered: None
            AFFIDAVIT in support of Jeffrey L. Goldman by Marla Maples Trump, Donald J. Trump, Trump Organization, Matthew Calamari, Domenic Pezzo, Janie Elder, Michael Berger, and Richard Fields re: substitution of counsel (ls) (Entered: 07/03/1997)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: None
              AFFIDAVIT in opposition of Mary K. Hafter Re: [0-1] motion to vacate, [0-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal (pl) (Entered: 06/25/1997)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: None
                MEMORANDUM by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Janie Elder, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Domenic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organization, Michael Berger, Jay Goldgerg in opposition to [0-1] motion to vacate, [0-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal (ls) (Entered: 06/24/1997)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: None
                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Frederick Cohn in support of [18-1] motion pursuant to Rules 8, 12, and 21 of the FRCP to dismiss plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (ae) (Entered: 05/22/1997)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: None
                    AFFIDAVIT in support of Peter S. Liaskos by Frederick Cohn Re: [18-1] motion pursuant to Rules 8, 12, and 21 of the FRCP to dismiss plaintiff's complaint for failure to state a claim upon which relief may be granted. (ae) (Entered: 05/22/1997)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Executive Plaza Cond in support of [16-1] motion pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the FRCP to dismiss the action against Executive Plaza Condominium for failure to state a cause of action. (ae) (Entered: 05/22/1997)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/20/1997, Entered: None
                        AFFIRMATION in support of Frederick H. Cohn by Executive Plaza Cond Re: [16-1] motion pursuant to Rule 12(b)(6) of the FRCP to dismiss the action against Executive Plaza Condominium for failure to state a cause of action. (ae) Modified on 05/22/1997 (Entered: 05/22/1997)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
                          REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Jeanine Pirro in support of re: [13-1] motion pursuant to Rules 8, 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) of the FRCP, dismissing the amended complaint. (ae) (Entered: 04/08/1997)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Jeanine Pirro in support of [13-1] motion pursuant to Rules 8, 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) of the FRCP, dismissing the amended complaint. (ae) (Entered: 04/08/1997)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/4/1997, Entered: None
                              AFFIDAVIT of Mary K. Hafter by Jeanine Pirro, Albert Pirro in support of Re: [13-1] motion pursuant to Rules 8, 12(b)(2), 12(b)(5) and 12(b)(6) of the FRCP, dismissing the amended complaint. (ae) (Entered: 04/08/1997)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: None
                                MUICIPAL DEFENDANTS' REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW re: in Support of their Motion to Dismss the Complaints and for Partial Summary Judgment (djc) (Entered: 03/31/1997)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                  MEMORANDUM by Marla Maples Trump, Donald J. Trump, Trump Organization, Matthew Calamari, Domenic Pezzo, Janie Elder, Michael Berger, Richard Fields in support of [8-1] motion to dismiss the amended complaint (cd) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE OF MOTION by Marla Maples Trump, Donald J. Trump, Trump Organization, Matthew Calamari, Domenic Pezzo, Janie Elder, Michael Berger, Richard Fields to dismiss the amended complaint , Return date 3/28/97; attached are papers in support (cd) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: None
                                      MEMORANDUM by Albert Pirro in support of [5-1] motion to dismiss the complaint, [5-2] motion for attorney fees (cd) (Entered: 02/04/1997)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: None
                                        AFFIDAVIT in support of S. Salant by Albert Pirro Re: [5-1] motion to dismiss the complaint, [5-2] motion for attorney fees (cd) (Entered: 02/04/1997)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/31/1997, Entered: None
                                          AFFIDAVIT in support of M. Jensen by Albert Pirro Re: [5-1] motion to dismiss the complaint, [5-2] motion for attorney fees (cd) (Entered: 02/04/1997)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/7/1997, Entered: None
                                            Affidavit of service as to Robert Morgenthau by pesonal/mail on 12/3/96 Answer due on 12/23/96 for Robert Morgenthau (cd) (Entered: 01/09/1997)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/31/1996, Entered: None
                                              AMENDED COMPLAINT by Charles Jones , (Answer due 1/13/97 for City of New York, for John Baner, for Janie Elder, for Domenic Pezzo, for Matthew Calamari, for Albert Pirro, for Jeanine Pirro, for Trump Organization, for Doreen Klein, for Robert Morgenthau, for The Plaza Hotel, for Donald J. Trump, for Marla Maples Trump ) amending [1-1] complaint against Robert Gianetta, Del LaRocca, The CIty of New York, Frederick Cohn, Executive Plaza Cond, CDL Hotels, Michael Berger, Richard Fields; Summons issued. JURY TRIAL DEMANDED. (djc) (Entered: 01/02/1997)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/13/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                Filed Memo_Endorsement on letter from Brigitte Duffy dated 12/10/96, reset answer due for 1/7/97 for City of New York and and indiv. police officer ("municipal defts")...THE MUNICIPAL DEFTS. MAY HVE UNTIL 1/7/97 TO RESPOND TO THE COMPLT. ...SO ORDERED... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (ls) (Entered: 12/13/1996)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/12/1996, Entered: None
                                                  COMPLAINT filed; Summons issued and Notice pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c); FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 270458 (ricm) (Entered: 09/13/1996)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                    Space Space

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 301 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?