Jones v. Trump, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:96-cv-02995
District Judge Shira A. Scheindlin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 16, 2017 at 12:16 AM DT (4.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Charles Jones, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by CHARLES JONES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space CHARLES JONES +1 443 413 1397
v.
No Logo Albert Pirro, Jr., Defendant
No Logo Ann Ogletree, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
No Logo Brian Higgins, Defendant
No Logo CDL Hotels, Defendant
City of New York City of New York, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Law Department

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY John Hogrogian

Toggle Switch Represented by New York City Office of Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Brigitte Duffy
No Logo District Attorney Jeanine Pirro, Defendant
No Logo Dominic Pezzo, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
Trump, Donald J. Trump, Donald J., Defendant
Officially listed as "Donald J. Trump"
Officer/Director, Riviera Holdings Corp

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
No Logo Doreen Klein, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Public Advocate for the City of New York

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Morrie I. Kleinbart +1 212 335 9350 +1 212 335 9288 morrie.kleinbart@rcda.nyc.gov
No Logo Jane Elder, Defendant
No Logo Janie Elder Porco, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 12/03/1996, LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
No Logo Jay Goldberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
No Logo John Baner, Defendant
No Logo Trump, Marla Maples, Defendant
Officially listed as "Marla Maples Trump"

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
No Logo Matthew Calamari, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
No Logo Michael Berger, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
No Logo Plaza Hotel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
No Logo Richard Fields, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
No Logo Robert Gianetta, Defendant
No Logo Robert Morgenthau, Defendant
Trump Organization, Inc. Trump Organization, Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Trump Organization"

Toggle Switch Represented by Pepe & Hazard, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Harold James Pickerstein +1 203 319 4000 +1 203 259 0251 hpickerstein@pepehazard.com
No Logo William Lynch, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332oc
Nature of Suit 190 - Contract: Other Contract Actions
  Entries (62) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/26/1999, Entered: None Court Filing
STIPULATION AND ORDER of discontinuance; that this action, incl. all claims, counterclaims and prior orders issd. in this action are discontinued and dismissed w/ prejudice as and against deft Executive Plaza Condominium, only, and w/o costs to any party as against the other; ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (ls) (Entered: 04/27/1999)
    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 8/27/1997, Entered: None
    Notice that the record on appeal has been certified and transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals on August 27. 1997 by DT. (dt) (Entered: 08/27/1997)
      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 8/8/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
      ORDER, consolidating cases 96 civ. 6927 and 96 civ. 2995. All future filings in these matters shall bear the docket number 96 civ. 6927 ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed (kw) (Entered: 08/12/1997)
        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 7/14/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
        OPINION AND ORDER # 78907 partially granting [44-1] motion to vacate, partially granting [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment dismissal. Plaintiff's claims are therefore dismissed in their entirety with prejudice. ( Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (ae) (Entered: 07/15/1997)
          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 7/2/1997, Entered: None
          AFFIDAVIT in support of Jefferey L. Re: Attorneys' application to change attorneys (pl) (Entered: 07/03/1997)
            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None
            REPLY MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones re: [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal re: Pirro I, Pirro II, CDL Hotels, Plaza Hotel, Cohn and Executive Plaza. (kk) (Entered: 06/30/1997)
              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None
              REPLY MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones re: [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal re: Klein and Morgenthau (kk) (Entered: 06/30/1997)
                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None
                REPLY MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones re: [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal re: Municipal Defendants (kk) (Entered: 06/30/1997)
                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/27/1997, Entered: None
                  REPLY MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones re: [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal Re: Trump Defendants (kk) (Entered: 06/30/1997)
                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: None
                    MEMORANDUM by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Jane Elder, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organiz., Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg in opposition to [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal (ls) (Entered: 06/24/1997)
                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/20/1997, Entered: None
                      MEMORANDUM of LAW by Doreen Klein, Robert Morgenthau in opposition to [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal (djc) (Entered: 06/20/1997)
                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: None
                        AFFIDAVIT in opposition of Scott M. Salant Re: [44-1] motion to vacate; [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal (pl) (Entered: 06/20/1997)
                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/19/1997, Entered: None
                          MEMORANDUM by Plaza Hotel, CDL Hotels in opposition to [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal (ls) (Entered: 06/20/1997)
                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/18/1997, Entered: None
                            MEMORANDUM by City of New York, Robert Gianetta, Brian Higgins, John Baner, Rocca in opposition to [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal (ls) (Entered: 06/19/1997)
                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/11/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                              ORDER, Response to motion reset to 6/20/97 for [44-1] motion to vacate, reset to 6/20/97 for [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal , the municipal defts are to address plntf's arguments pertaining to his state law claims set forth in the amended complaint, 96cv6927 etc , Reply to Response to Motion reset to 6/27/97 for [44-1] motion to vacate, reset to 6/27/97 for [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed (cd) (Entered: 06/12/1997)
                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/10/1997, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in support of [44-1] motion to vacate, and [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal. (Also docketed in 96 civ. 6927) (kw) (Entered: 06/11/1997)
                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/6/1997, Entered: None
                                  REPLY AFFIRMATION of Frederick H. Cohn on behalf of Executive Plaza Condominimum in opposition to [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal (ls) (Entered: 06/09/1997)
                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: None
                                    MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones in support of [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal (pl) (Entered: 06/04/1997)
                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/29/1997, Entered: None
                                      AFFIDAVIT in support of Charles Jones Re: [44-1] motion to vacate, [44-2] motion to amend and/or alter the judgment of dismissal (pl) (Entered: 06/04/1997)
                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None
                                        JUDGMENT, ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion (78627) and Order, dated 5/22/97, plaintiff's motion for summary judgment is denied, municipal defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted, and defendants' motion to dismiss pursuant to Rule 8 & 12(b)(6), FRCP are also granted. JAMES M. PARKISON ; Mailed copies and notice of right to appeal. (ae) (Entered: 05/28/1997)
                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/27/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          OPINION AND ORDER # 78627, the municipal defts' motion for partial summary jdgmt. is ganted w/ regard to pltff's state law claims against them. Pltff's cross-motion for partial summary jdgmt. is denied. Defts' motions are granted purs. to Rule 12(b)(6) and 8 of the F.R.C.P. w/ regard to ea. of pltff's claims; that pltff's claims are dismissed in their entirety w/ prejuice; that the Clerk of the Court close this case. ( Signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed. (ls) (Entered: 05/27/1997)
                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: None
                                            AFFIDAVIT of Charles Jones in oppostion to Re: [13-1] motion to dismiss the complaint. (Also docketed in 96 civ. 6927) (kw) (Entered: 04/22/1997)
                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/16/1997, Entered: None
                                              REPLY MEMORANDUM by Charles Jones IN SUPPPORT OF [18-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment in favor of plaintiff as to Ninth Cause of Action in 96CV6927 against defendant JOHN BANER. and IN FURTHER OPPOSITION TO motion to dismiss (ls) (Entered: 04/21/1997)
                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                REPLY MEMORANDUM by Trump Parties in further support of re: [11-1] motion to dismiss the amended complaint. (Also docketed in 96 civ. 6927) (kw) Modified on 04/15/1997 (Entered: 04/15/1997)
                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/11/1997, Entered: None
                                                  Reply AFFIDAVIT of Michael Berger for Trump Parties in further support of Re: [11-1] motion to dismiss the amended complaint. (Also docketed in 96 civ. 6927) (kw) Modified on 04/15/1997 (Entered: 04/15/1997)
                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/8/1997, Entered: None
                                                    MEMORANDUM by Robert Morgenthau, Doreen Klein in support of [17-1] motion to dismiss the Compalint for failure to state a claim (ls) (Entered: 04/09/1997)
                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/8/1997, Entered: None
                                                      Rule 3(g) statement filed by John Baner (ls) (Entered: 04/09/1997)
                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/8/1997, Entered: None
                                                        MEMORANDUM OF LAW by John Baner in opposition to [20-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment in favor of plaintiff to the Seventh and Twelfth Cause of Action in 96CV2995 and Seventh, Eighth and Ninth Causes of Action in 96CV6927 against defendants DONALD J. TRUMP, MARLA MAPLES-TRUMP, ELDER and RICHARD FIELDS. (kg) (Entered: 04/09/1997)
                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                          Reply affidavit of Scott M. Salant by Albert Pirro Jr. in support of [32-1] motion for an Order purs. to FRCP to dismiss any and all claims against deft Albert J. Pirro, Jr. (kg) (Entered: 04/08/1997)
                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Albert Pirro Jr. in support of [32-1] motion for an Order purs. to FRCP to dismiss any and all claims against deft Albert J. Pirro, Jr. (kg) (Entered: 04/08/1997)
                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/7/1997, Entered: None
                                                              AFFIDAVIT in support of Albert J. Pirro, Jr. by Albert Pirro Jr. Re: [32-1] motion for an Order purs. to FRCP to dismiss any and all claims against deft Albert J. Pirro, Jr. (kg) (Entered: 04/08/1997)
                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                                AFFIDAVIT in opposition of Charles Jones by Charles Jones Re: [11-1] motion to dismiss the amended complaint (ae) (Entered: 04/02/1997)
                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in opposition of Charles Jones by Charles Jones Re: [17-1] motion to dismiss the Compalint for failure to state a claim (ae) (Entered: 04/02/1997)
                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                                    MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles Jones in opposition to [11-1] motion to dismiss the amended complaint (ae) (Entered: 04/02/1997)
                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/1/1997, Entered: None
                                                                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles Jones in opposition to [17-1] motion to dismiss the Compalint for failure to state a claim (ae) (Entered: 04/02/1997)
                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/31/1997, Entered: None
                                                                        REPLY MEMORANDUM by Plaza Hotel IN SUPPORT OF [7-1] motion for an order purs to FRCP 4(c)(2), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) all those portions of the complaints in the above captioned actions insofar as they pruport to allege causes of action against DDL, on the grounds that CDL has not been properly served, and therefore this Court lacks jurisdiction over DCL, and that plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted.. (ls) (Entered: 03/31/1997)
                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                          REPLY MEMORANDUM by CDL Hotels IN SUPPORT OF [7-1] motion for an order purs to FRCP 4(c)(2), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) all those portions of the complaints in the above captioned actions insofar as they pruport to allege causes of action against DDL, on the grounds that CDL has not been properly served, and therefore this Court lacks jurisdiction over DCL, and that plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted.. (ls) (Entered: 03/31/1997)
                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/28/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                            ORDER...I construe Pltff's letters of 3/24/97 and 3/25/97 as a motion for reconsideration of this Court's Order of 3/21/97 under Local Rule 3(j)... The March 21 Order is hereby amended to reinstate the Municipal Defts' motions for summary jdgmt., and Pltff's cross-motions against the Municipal Defts only. Pltff's motion is denied in all other respects. Pltff's. motiion for sanctions against the Municipal Deft. is also denied. ...SO ORDERED... ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ); Copies mailed (ls) (Entered: 03/31/1997)
                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/24/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER, to withdraw [13-2] motion for partial summary judgment , to withdraw [20-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment in favor of plaintiff as to the Seventh and Twelfth Cause of Action in 96CV2995 and Seventh, Eighth and Ninth Causes of Action in 96CV6927 against defendants DONALD J. TRUMP, MARLA MAPLES-TRUMP, JANE ELDER and RICHARD FIELDS., [19-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment in favor of plaintiff as to the Seventeenth Cause of Action in 96CV2995 against defendant DOREEN KLEIN., [18-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment in favor of plaintiff as to the Ninth Cause of Action in 96CV6927 against defendant JOHN BANER. Parties refrain from making any similar motion until such time as the Court deems appripriate and after a pre-motion conference to consider the matter , set plaintiffs' opposition to Defendants'motions, if any, filing deadline for set for 4/1/97 , set plaintiffs' opposition brief, Defendants' reply due for 4/8/97. Plaintiffs' request to submit a surreply is denied ....So Ordered.....( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (pl) (Entered: 03/25/1997)
                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Charles Jones in opposition to [7-1] motion for an order purs to FRCP 4(c)(2), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) dismissing all those portions of the complaints in the captioned actions insofar as they pruport to allege causes of action against DDL, on the grounds that CDL has not been properly served, and therefore this Court lacks over DCL, and that plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted.. (ae) (Entered: 03/18/1997)
                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT in opposition of Charles Jones by Charles Jones to Re: [7-1] motion for an order purs to FRCP 4(c)(2), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) dismissing all those portions of the in the above captioned actions insofar as they pruport to allege causes of action against DDL, on the grounds that CDL has not been properly served, and therefore this Court lacks jurisdiction over DCL, and that plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted.. (ae) (Entered: 03/18/1997)
                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in opposition of Charles Jones by Charles Jones to Defendants Pirro I & II's Motion to Dismiss. (ae) Modified on 03/18/1997 (Entered: 03/18/1997)
                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in support of Charles Jones by Charles Jones Re: [20-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment in favor of plaintiff as to the Seventh and Twelfth Cause of Action in 96CV2995 and Seventh, Eighth and Ninth Causes of Action in 96CV6927 against defendants DONALD J. TRUMP, MARLA MAPLES-TRUMP, JANE ELDER and RICHARD FIELDS. (ae) Modified on 03/18/1997 (Entered: 03/18/1997)
                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in support of Charles Jones by Charles Jones Re: [19-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment in favor of plaintiff as to the Seventeenth Cause of Action in 96CV2995 against defendant DOREEN KLEIN. (ae) Modified on 03/18/1997 (Entered: 03/18/1997)
                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/17/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                          AFFIDAVIT in support of Charles Jones by Charles Jones Re: [18-1] cross motion for partial summary judgment in favor of plaintiff as to the Ninth Cause of Action in 96CV6927 against defendant JOHN BANER. (ae) Modified on 03/18/1997 (Entered: 03/18/1997)
                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE OF MOTION by Doreen Klein, Robert Morgenthau to dismiss the Compalint for failure to state a claim , Return date 3/28/97 (pl) (Entered: 03/04/1997)
                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW in support of [15-1] motion for an order purs. to Rule 8, 12(b)(6), and FRCP to dismiss the complaints, [15-2] motion for partial summary judgment. (kg) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE OF MOTION by Joseph Della Rocca for an order purs. to Rule 8, 12(b)(6), and FRCP to dismiss the complaints , and for partial summary judgment. Return date 3/28/97 (kg) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Robert Morgenthau, Doreen Klein in support of Motion of Defendants Morgenthau and Klein to dismiss the Complaints. (ae) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Brigitte Duffy in support [13-1] motion to dismiss the complaint, [13-2] motion for partial summary judgment (kw) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                      MEMORANDUM by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organiz., Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg in support of [11-1] motion to dismiss the amended complaint (cd) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF MOTION by Donald J. Trump, Marla Maples Trump, Richard Fields, Ann Ogletree, Dominic Pezzo, Matthew Calamari, Trump Organiz., Michael Berger, Jay Goldberg to dismiss the amended complaint , Return date 3/28/97; attached are papers in support (cd) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                          NOTICE of MOTION by Plaza Hotel, CDL Hotels TO DISMISS (djc) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Plaza Hotel in support of [7-1] motion for an order purs to FRCP 4(c)(2), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) dismissing all those portions of the complaints in the above captioned actions insofar as they pruport to allege causes of action against DDL, on the grounds that CDL has not been properly served, and therefore this Court lacks jurisdiction over DCL, and that plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted.. (djc) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM OF LAW by CDL Hotels in support of [7-1] motion for an order purs to FRCP 4(c)(2), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) all those portions of the complaints in the above captioned actions insofar as they pruport to allege causes of action against DDL, on the grounds that CDL has not been properly served, and therefore this Court lacks jurisdiction over DCL, and that plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted.. (djc) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                                                                                                Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/28/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                AFFIDAVIT in support of Barbara Lebroff by Plaza Hotel, CDL Hotels Re: [7-1] motion for an order purs to FRCP 4(c)(2), 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) dismissing all those portions of the complaints in the above captioned actions insofar as they pruport to allege causes of action against DDL, on the grounds that CDL has not been properly served, and therefore this Court lacks jurisdiction over DCL, and that plaintiff has failed to state a claim upon which relief can be granted.. (djc) (Entered: 03/03/1997)
                                                                                                                  Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/11/1997, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Filed Memo_Endorsement on letter dated 2/6/97, for leave to file deft summary judgment motion ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (cd) (Entered: 02/11/1997)
                                                                                                                    Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/6/1997, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Before J Scheindlin; Transcript of record of proceedings filed for dates of 12/18/96 (cd) (Entered: 02/06/1997)
                                                                                                                      Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/3/1996, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Charles Jones , (Answer due 12/16/96 for William Lynch, for Brian Higgins, for Robert Gianetta, for Doreen Klein, for City of New York, for Jay Goldberg, for Michael Berger, for Trump Organiz., for Matthew Calamari, for Dominic Pezzo, for Ann Ogletree, for Richard Fields, for Plaza Hotel, for Marla Maples Trump, for Donald J. Trump ) amending against Jane Elder; John Baner; Jeanine Pirro; Albert Pirro, Jr.; Robert Morgenthau; CDL Hotels. Summons issued. (lam) Modified on 12/04/1996 (Entered: 12/04/1996)
                                                                                                                        Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 10/21/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                        Filed Memo_Endorsement on letter dated 8/29/96, This letter is rejected because this document is illegible ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (doc. returned to plaintiff by mail on 10/22/96) (pl) Modified on 10/22/1996 (Entered: 10/22/1996)
                                                                                                                          Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/16/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                          Filed Memo_Endorsement on letter from Morrie I. Kleinbart dated 05/14/96, pm reset pre-motion hearing for set for 4:30 6/4/96 ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (djc) (Entered: 05/17/1996)
                                                                                                                            Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/15/1996, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                            Filed Memo_Endorsement on letter dated 5/10/96, pretrial premotion conference for 4:30 5/23/96 ( signed by Judge Shira A. Scheindlin ) (cd) (Entered: 05/16/1996)
                                                                                                                              Request Request From Archives (Scanning Fees/Delay May Apply)Space LREF

                                                                                                                              Space Space

                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 174 times.

                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?