McClellan v.City Of New York

Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-06759
District Judge Thomas P. Griesa, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Thomas P. Griesa
Last Updated November 14, 2018 at 11:42 PM EST (6.4 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Hakeem McClellan, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James C. Neville +1 516 883 5905 +1 516 883 4954 jcneville@optonline.net

Represented by Lumer & Neville

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Benjamin Lumer +1 212 566 5060 +1 212 406 6890 mlumer@lumerlaw.com
v.
No Logo Bryan Mallow, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-3, Defendant
No Logo John Does 1-7, Defendant
No Logo Jorge Chavez, Defendant
No Logo Police Officer Michael Nestler, Defendant
No Logo Robert Durst, Defendant
No Logo Suraju Murtala, Defendant

Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elissa Paulette Fudim +1 212 356 2425 +1 212 356 1148 efudim@law.nyc.gov
City of New York City of New York, Defendant
Officially listed as "The City Of New York ,"

Represented by Office of the Corporation Counsel

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elissa Paulette Fudim +1 212 356 2425 +1 212 356 1148 efudim@law.nyc.gov
Attributes
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
Timeline
  Entries (68) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 68 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion: Request Granted. Plaintiff is directed to file the motion by November 21, 2017. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 11/15/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion to vacate/reduce the costs awarded against plaintiff, addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael Lumer dated 11/14/17. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan.(Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 11/14/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TAXATION OF COSTS as to 66 Bill of Costs Notice of Taxation,. Costs are taxed on 9/21/2017 in favor of The City of New York et al. against Hakeem McClellan in the amount of $782.96.(ad) (Entered: 11/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/23/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
BILL OF COSTS NOTICE OF TAXATION to recover costs against All Plaintiffs. Document filed by John Does 1-3, Suraju Murtala, Bryan Mallow, The City Of New York,, Jorge Chavez, Michael Nestler, Robert Durst. The Clerk may tax costs 14 days after this filing. Objections to Bill of Costs due by 11/6/2017 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit in Support, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E)(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 10/23/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CLERK'S JUDGMENT: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion dated September 20, 2017, sufficient probable cause existed for both arrests, and thus Defendants' motion for summary judgment is granted. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 9/21/2017) (Attachments: # 1 Right to appeal 1, # 2 Right to appeal 2)(tro) (Entered: 09/21/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 64 Filed: 9/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
OPINION re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jorge Chavez, The City Of New York, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, Robert Durst: On August 27, 2015, Plaintiff Hakeem McClellan filed claims of false arrest and imprisonment under both 42 U.S.C. § 1983 (2012) and New York state law against the City of New York, Police Officers Murtala Suraju, Jorge Chavez, and Bryan Mallow, Detective Michael Nestler, and Sergeant Robert Durst. Defendants now move for summary judgment on all claims. For the reasons given above, sufficient probable cause existed for both arrests, and thus the court grants defendants' motion for summary judgment. This Opinion resolves Docket Number 50. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/20/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 09/20/2017)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Michael Benjamin Lumer on behalf of Hakeem McClellan. New Address: Lumer Law Group, 225 Broadway, Suite 2700, New York, New York, United States 10007, 2125665060. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 59 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply: Application granted. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 4/24/2017) (jwh) Modified on 5/9/2017 (jwh). (Entered: 04/25/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE in Support of Motion re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . (Reply Statement of Material Facts addressing plaintiff's counterstatement of material facts). Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,. (Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,. (Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 03/29/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 3/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply such that plaintiff's LR 56.1 Statement and Memorandum of Law filed today be deemed timely filed addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael Lumer dated March 18, 2017. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan.(Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COUNTER STATEMENT TO 51 Rule 56.1 Statement. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 03/18/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Michael Lumer in Opposition re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Attachments: # 1 Exh 1: Chavez deposition excerpts, # 2 Exh 2: Rose deposition excerpts, # 3 Exh 3: Durst deposition excerpts, # 4 Exh 4: McClellan deposition excerpts, # 5 Exh 5: Nestler deposition excerpts, # 6 Exh 6: OLPA sheet, # 7 Exh 7: DD5 No. 31, # 8 Exh 8: DD5 No. 32, # 9 Exh 9: Google street map, # 10 Exh 10: Bx DA Deferral/Declination Affidavit)(Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 54 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment : Approved. (Responses due by 3/17/2017 Replies due by 3/29/2017) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/28/2017) (jwh) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael Lumer dated 2/27/2017. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan.(Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DECLARATION of Elissa Fudim in Support re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment .. Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 (Part 1), # 2 Exhibit 1 (Part 2), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Part 1), # 4 Exhibit 2 (Part 2), # 5 Exhibit 3 (Part 1), # 6 Exhibit 3 (Part 2), # 7 Exhibit 3 (Part 3), # 8 Exhibit 4 (Part 1), # 9 Exhibit 4 (Part 2), # 10 Exhibit 4 (Part 3), # 11 Exhibit 5 (Part 1), # 12 Exhibit 5 (Part 2), # 13 Exhibit 6, # 14 Exhibit 7, # 15 Exhibit 8, # 16 Exhibit 9, # 17 Exhibit 10, # 18 Exhibit 11, # 19 Exhibit 12 (Part 1), # 20 Exhibit 12 (Part 2), # 21 Exhibit 13, # 22 Exhibit 14, # 23 Exhibit 15, # 24 Exhibit 16, # 25 Exhibit 17, # 26 Exhibit 18, # 27 Exhibit 19)(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment . . Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,. (Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RULE 56.1 STATEMENT. Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,. (Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment . Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,.(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 48 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for summary judgment addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from E. Fudim dated 1/6/2016. Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York. Defendants' request for an extension of time to file their motion for summary judgment is granted. Defendants shall file their motions for summary judgment, if at all, by February 10, 2017. Plaintiffs shall file his opposition, if any, by March 10, 2017, and defendants will file their replies, if any, by March 22, 2017. So ordered. (Motions due by 2/10/2017). (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/10/2017) (rjm) (Entered: 01/10/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file motion for summary judgment addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from E. Fudim dated 1/6/2016. Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,.(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 01/06/2017)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from E. Fudim dated 11/14/2016 re: Briefing schedule. Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,.(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 11/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 45 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery. The deadline for completion of all discovery is enlarged to October 28, 2016. The court conference scheduled for Sept. 30, 2016 is adjourned to November 14, 2016 at 3:00 pm. So Ordered. Discovery due by 10/28/2016. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/26/2016) (kl) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery from Sept. 30 to Oct. 28, 2016, addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael Lumer dated September 22, 2016. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan.(Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Elissa Fudim dated July 14, 2016 re: Discovery on Schedule. Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,.(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 33 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,.(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Michael Nestler served on 4/18/2016, answer due 5/9/2016. Service was accepted by ARJONA BEAL. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Bryan Mallow served on 4/18/2016, answer due 5/9/2016. Service was accepted by ARJONA BEAL. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Robert Durst served on 4/18/2016, answer due 5/9/2016. Service was accepted by ARJONA BEAL. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Jorge Chavez served on 4/18/2016, answer due 5/9/2016. Service was accepted by ARJONA BEAL. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jorge Chavez. (pc) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jorge Chavez, re: 33 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bryan Mallow. (pc) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Robert Durst. (pc) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Nestler. (pc) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 7 Complaint against Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, John Does 1-3, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. Related document: 7 Complaint filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Attachments: # 1 Exh 1: defendants' written consent to the filing of the amended complaint)(Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - CONSENT AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 31 Amended Complaint, against Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, John Does 1-3, John Does 1-7, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. Related document: 31 Amended Complaint, filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Attachments: # 1 Consent to Amend)(Lumer, Michael) Modified on 3/18/2016 (moh). (Entered: 03/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/16/2016, Entered: None
AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 7 Complaint against Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York,, John Does 1-3 with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. Related document: 7 Complaint filed by Hakeem McClellan.(Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 03/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 7 Complaint against Jorge Chavez, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Suraju Murtala, Michael Nestler, The City Of New York, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. Related document: 7 Complaint filed by Hakeem McClellan.(Lumer, Michael) Modified on 3/16/2016 (pc). (Entered: 03/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Nestler, re: 25 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bryan Mallow, re: 25 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Robert Durst, re: 25 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jorge Chavez, re: 25 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR - CONSENT AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 7 Complaint against Suraju Murtala, The City Of New York,, Robert Durst, Bryan Mallow, Jorge Chavez, Michael Nestler with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. Related document: 7 Complaint filed by Hakeem McClellan.(Lumer, Michael) Modified on 3/15/2016 (moh). (Entered: 03/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER re: 22 Letter Motion for Conference and to cancel mediation. Approved. An initial pretrial conference is scheduled for 2/10/2016 at 2:30 pm. (Initial Conference set for 2/10/2016 at 02:30 PM before Judge Thomas P. Griesa.) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 2/2/2016) (kl) (Entered: 02/02/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
JOINT LETTER MOTION for Conference and to cancel mediation addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Elissa Fudim dated February 1, 2016. Document filed by Suraju Murtala, The City Of New York,.(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 02/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
OPINION #106125: After examination of the interests at stake, it appears that the balance ofthe parties' divergent interests weighs in favor of McLellan. Accordingly, the City's motion for a stay is denied. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 1/8/2016) (kl) Modified on 1/11/2016 (ca). (Entered: 01/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT. (Joint) Document filed by Hakeem McClellan, Suraju Murtala, The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Status Report)(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 12/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Elissa Fudim dated December 4, 2015 re: 17 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Elissa Fudim dated December 3, 2015. . Document filed by Suraju Murtala, The City Of New York,. (Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Michael Lumer dated 12/3/2015 re: 17 LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Elissa Fudim dated December 3, 2015. . Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
LETTER MOTION to Stay addressed to Judge Thomas P. Griesa from Elissa Fudim dated December 3, 2015. Document filed by Suraju Murtala, The City Of New York,. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF SELECTION FOR MEDIATION: This case has been selected for participation in the Southern District of New York's mediation program.(rpr) (Entered: 11/17/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
ANSWER to 7 Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Suraju Murtala, The City Of New York,.(Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 11/16/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Suraju Murtala served on 9/14/2015, answer due 10/5/2015. Service was accepted by P.O. John Davis. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elissa Paulette Fudim on behalf of The City Of New York,. (Fudim, Elissa) (Entered: 09/11/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/2/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER REGARDING CASE PROGRESS UNDER THE SDNY LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10: Notice of participation in the SDNY Local Civil Rule 83.10 (formerly the Section 1983 Plan) has been filed in this case. The parties shall file by ECF, and deliver a courtesy copy to chambers, a notice of case progress no later than 120 days after the filing of the complaint by utilizing the form attached to this order. (Signed by Judge Thomas P. Griesa on 9/2/2015) (kl) (Entered: 09/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. The City Of New York, served on 8/28/2015, answer due 9/18/2015. Service was accepted by M. Santana. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Suraju Murtala. (dgo) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The City Of New York,. (dgo) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document 7 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against John Does 1-7, Suraju Murtala, The City Of New York,. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan.(Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/27/2015, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint, against John Does 1-7, Suraju Murtala, The City Of New York, with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. Related document: 1 Complaint, filed by Hakeem McClellan.(Neville, James) Modified on 8/27/2015 (dgo). (Entered: 08/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
NOTICE OF PARTICIPATION IN LOCAL CIVIL RULE 83.10 (FORMERLY THE SECTION 1983 PLAN): Unless otherwise ordered, this case shall participate in the Southern District of New York's Local Civil Rule 83.10. Please reference the Court's website, www.nysd.uscourts.gov, to review Local Civil Rule 83.10, updated 4/1/2015, for important information.(rpr) (Entered: 08/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Suraju Murtala, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The City of New York, re: 1 Complaint. Document filed by Hakeem McClellan. (Lumer, Michael) (Entered: 08/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SIGNATURE ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lumer, Michael) Modified on 8/27/2015 (dgo). (Entered: 08/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING -PDF ERROR COMPLAINT against John Does 1-7, Suraju Murtala, The City Of New York,. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number 0208-11319837)Document filed by Hakeem McClellan.(Lumer, Michael) Modified on 8/27/2015 (dgo). (Entered: 08/26/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 116 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?