Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. et al v. Vertical Computer Systems, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Northern District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-00189
District Judge Richard Seeborg, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2017 at 6:55 AM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Samsung Electronics America, Inc. Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/15/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Michael Kalogeras +1 212 351 3834 +1 212 351 6334 skalogeras@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tensegrity Law Group, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven S. Cherensky steven.cherensky@tensegritylawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Powers matthew.powers@tensegritylawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Edward DeMasi +1 212 735 4566 +1 212 310 8007 tim.demasi@weil.com
Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd. Samsung Electronics Company, Ltd., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd."

Toggle Switch Represented by Gibson Dunn & Crutcher, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/15/2011, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven Michael Kalogeras +1 212 351 3834 +1 212 351 6334 skalogeras@gibsondunn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Julian Moore +1 212 596 9820 +1 212 728 2574 julian.moore@ropesgray.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Tensegrity Law Group, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven S. Cherensky steven.cherensky@tensegritylawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew D. Powers matthew.powers@tensegritylawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy Edward DeMasi +1 212 735 4566 +1 212 310 8007 tim.demasi@weil.com
v.
No Logo Vertical Computer Systems, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Vasilios D. Dossas +1 312 236 0733 dossas@nshn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by REHON & ROBERTS

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark V. Isola +1 408 494 0900 +1 408 949 0909 misola@rehonroberts.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/24/2011, Entered: None
ORDER of USCA for the Federal Court of Appeals denying petition for writ of mandamus (Miscellaneous Docket No. 985). (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2011) (Entered: 08/29/2011)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER RE: 16 DENYING VERTICAL'S RENEWED MOTION TO TRANSFER INTERWOVEN ACTION; GRANTING VERTICAL'S MOTION TO TRANSFER SAMSUNG ACTION TO EASTERN DISTRICT OF TEXAS. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 5/2/11. (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2011) (Entered: 05/02/2011)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
      STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO CONTINUE CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT. Case Management Conference set for 5/12/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 3/29/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/29/2011) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
        Declaration of Steven Cherensky in Support of 27 Stipulation Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Related document(s) 27 ) (Cherensky, Steven) (Filed on 3/29/2011) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/29/2011, Entered: None
          STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cherensky, Steven) (Filed on 3/29/2011) (Entered: 03/29/2011)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/17/2011, Entered: None
            CLERKS NOTICE MOTION SUBMITTED WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT, PER CIVIL LOCAL RULE 7-1(b) (rslc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011) (Entered: 03/17/2011)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/15/2011, Entered: None
              NOTICE by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. Notice of Withdrawal of Steven Kalogeras As Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cherensky, Steven) (Filed on 3/15/2011) (Entered: 03/15/2011)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/10/2011, Entered: None
                REPLY (re 16 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay Samsung's Lawsuit ) filed byVertical Computer Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit E, # 2 Exhibit F)(Isola, Mark) (Filed on 3/10/2011) (Entered: 03/10/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                  Declaration of STEVEN O'NEILL in Support of 21 Opposition/Response to Motion, [TO DISMISS, TRANSFER OR STAY] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Cherensky, Steven) (Filed on 3/3/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                    Declaration of Julain Moore in Support of 21 Opposition/Response to Motion, [TO DISMISS, TRANSFER OR STAY] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) 21 ) (Cherensky, Steven) (Filed on 3/3/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/3/2011, Entered: None
                      RESPONSE (re 16 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay Samsung's Lawsuit ) [SAMSUNG'S OPPOSITION TO VERTICAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS, TRANSFER OR STAY] filed bySamsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cherensky, Steven) (Filed on 3/3/2011) (Entered: 03/03/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/2/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                        ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY VASILIOS D. DOSSAS. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011) (Entered: 03/02/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/25/2011, Entered: None
                          MOTION of Vasilios D. Dossas for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611056810) filed by Vertical Computer Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(slh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011) (Entered: 03/01/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                            Declaration of Luiz Claudio Valdetaro in Support of 16 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay Samsung's Lawsuit filed byVertical Computer Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 16 ) (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 2/4/2011) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                              MEMORANDUM in Support re 16 MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay Samsung's Lawsuit filed by Vertical Computer Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 16 ) (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 2/4/2011) Modified on 2/7/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/4/2011, Entered: None
                                MOTION to Dismiss , Transfer or Stay Samsung's Lawsuit filed by Vertical Computer Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 3/24/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Richard Seeborg. (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 2/4/2011) (Entered: 02/04/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                  CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 4/14/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/3/2011, Entered: None
                                    Letter from Mark V. Isola, counsel for Defendant Vertical Computer Systems, Inc.. (Isola, Mark) (Filed on 2/3/2011) (Entered: 02/03/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/31/2011, Entered: None
                                      ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2011) (Entered: 01/31/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/26/2011, Entered: None
                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. Vertical Computer Systems, Inc. served on 1/17/2011, answer due 2/7/2011. (Cherensky, Steven) (Filed on 1/26/2011) Modified on 1/27/2011 (slh, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 01/26/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY TIMOTHY DEMASI PRO HAC VICE by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                            ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY STEVEN KALOGERAS PRO HAC VICE. by Judge Richard Seeborg (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/25/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY JULIAN MOORE PRO HAC VICE by Judge Richard Seeborg.(cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2011) (Entered: 01/25/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                MOTION for attorney Timothy DeMasi leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611055277.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION for attorney Steven Kalogeras leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 34611055279.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                    MOTION for attorney Julian Moore leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 275, receipt number 3461105528.) filed by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011) (Entered: 01/24/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None
                                                      CLERKS NOTICE SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/21/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER RELATING CASES C 10-04645 AND C 11-00189. Signed by Judge Richard Seeborg on 1/21/11. (cl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011) (Entered: 01/21/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 4/14/2011. Case Management Conference set for 4/21/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/12/11. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of Interested Entities by Samsung Electronics America, Inc., Samsung Electronics Co. Ltd. re 1 Complaint, (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/12/2011, Entered: None
                                                              COMPLAINT /issued summons against Vertical Computer Systems, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611054984.). Filed bySamsung Electronics Co. Ltd., Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011) (Entered: 01/13/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?