Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC v. Z-Com, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:13-cv-08550
District Judge Cormac J. Carney, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 12, 2019 at 3:36 PM DT (1.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Farney Daniels PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Baker jbaker@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael D Saunders +1 424 268 5200 +1 424 268 5219 msaunders@farneydaniels.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Gurtej Singh tsingh@farneydaniels.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The Tariq Law Firm, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hemant Hari Kewalramani +1 714 335 4590 +1 714 602 9290 shashi@shklegal.com
v.
No Logo Z-com, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Zcomax Technologies, Inc, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (32) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/12/2019, Entered: None Report of Determination of Patent/Trademark Action (CLOSE) (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None
    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending Settlement filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Singh, Gurtej) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Stipulation Granting Defendant ZComax Technologies, Inc. Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 28 . (mba) (Entered: 04/23/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/18/2014, Entered: None
          Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Zcomax Technologies, Inc answer now due 4/25/2014, re Amended Complaint, 13 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/18/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney, granting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) 26 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the deadline for Defendant Zcomax Technologies, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLCs Amended Complaint is hereby extended from the current deadline of March 27, 2014 to April 10, 2014. (twdb) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/10/2014, Entered: None
              Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Zcomax Technologies, Inc answer now due 4/20/2014, re Amended Complaint, 13 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 04/10/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None
                Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Zcomax Technologies, Inc answer now due 4/10/2014, re Amended Complaint, 13 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/20/2014, Entered: None
                  STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Zcomax Technologies, Inc answer now due 3/27/2014, re Amended Complaint, 13 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 03/20/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/21/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Cormac J. Carney: Ganting Stipulation Extending Time for Defendant Zcomax Techologies, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC's Amended Complaint to 3/20/2014 21 . (mt) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. correcting Stipulation Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less), 21 Docket 21 applies to Defendant Zcomax only (Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None
                        STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Z-Com, Inc. answer now due 3/20/2014; Zcomax Technologies, Inc answer now due 3/20/2014, re Amended Complaint, 13 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/13/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, upon Defendant Zcomax Technologies, Inc served on 1/28/2014, answer due 2/18/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "Jane Doe" (Refused Name) - Person in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/12/2014, Entered: None
                            PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, upon Defendant Z-Com, Inc. served on 1/28/2014, answer due 2/18/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon "Jane Doe" (Refused Name) - Person in Charge in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons returned. (Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 02/12/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael D Saunders on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Michael D Saunders added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Saunders, Michael) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gurtej Singh on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Gurtej Singh added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Singh, Gurtej) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint, 13 as to Defendants Z-Com, Inc., Zcomax Technologies, Inc. (nbo) (Entered: 01/21/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                    CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC, (Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/16/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint, 13 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/15/2014, Entered: None
                                        First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Z-Com, Inc. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 01/15/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/31/2013, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jonathan D Baker on behalf of Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC (Attorney Jonathan D Baker added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Baker, Jonathan) (Entered: 12/31/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/11/2013, Entered: None
                                            NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. Related Case(s): 8:13-CV-1812; 8:13-CV-1814; 8:13-CV-1815; 8:13-CV-1816; 5:13-CV-2119; 2:13-CV-8548; 2:13-CV-8545 (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 12/11/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/26/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV 13-01812 CJC(ANx). Case transferred from Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Arthur Nakazato for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 13-08550 CJC(ANx). Signed by Judge Cormac J. Carney (rn) (Entered: 11/26/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (et) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Z-Com, Inc. (et) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                    NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification)(AO 120) 4 , Corporate Disclosure Statement 3 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), 1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) 2 filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                          REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC identifying None as Corporate Parent. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                              CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                                COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13004550 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Hemant Hari Kewalramani added to party Innovative Wireless Solutions, LLC(pty:pla))(Kewalramani, Hemant) (Entered: 11/19/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                  Statistics

                                                                  This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                  Space
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                   
                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                  Need Password Help?