McRO Inc v. Visceral Games
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-10344
District Judge George H Wu, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 5, 2017 at 2:23 AM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric P Berger +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Eric.Berger@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James Joseph McGuire +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 james.mcguire@mishcon.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
v.
No Logo Visceral Games, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Weil Gotshal & Manges LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan N. Budaj +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 evan.budaj@weil.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Justin Morteza Lee +1 650 802 3000 +1 650 802 3100 jlee@jonesday.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N. Mehta sonal.mehta@weil.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Robert Reines +1 650 802 3022 +1 650 802 3100 edward.reines@weil.com
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (46) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/21/2013, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 copy of order) (pj) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER by Judge George H. Wu,, Case number 2:12-cv-10344 shall be dismissed with prejudice. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (pj) (Entered: 06/21/2013)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/1/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
      MINUTES OF SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu. The Court consolidates the above-entitled action with McRO, Inc. v. Namco Banda Games America, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx) for pretrial purposes. All subsequent documents will now be filed in CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx). The Scheduling Conference is continued to April 18, 2013 at 8:30 a.m. Joint Status Report will be filed by noon on April 15, 2013. Court Reporter: Anne Kielwasser. (lom) (Entered: 04/03/2013)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
        NOTICE Relating to April 1, 2013 Scheduling Conference filed by Defendant Visceral Games. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None
          NOTICE filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. for Telephone Appearance re 4/1/13 Scheduling Conference (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/29/2013)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/29/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
            TEXT ONLY NOTICE - A Scheduling Conference for related case, CV12-10331, is set for April 1, 2013, at 8:30 a.m. The schedule issued on said date shall also be the schedule for all related "McRO" cases. Parties may appear telephonically at the conference provided that notice is given to Judge Wu's Clerk. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY.(kbr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 03/29/2013)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/18/2013, Entered: None
              FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Visceral Games amending Complaint - (Discovery), 1 ,filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc (Attachments: # 1 21 day summons issued)(pj) (Entered: 03/20/2013)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 35 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Eric P. Berger on behalf of Plainiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/6/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 34 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney James J. McGuire on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 03/08/2013)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/4/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                    MINUTES OF DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT (filed 02/05/13) Motion Hearing held before Judge George H. Wu: The Tentative circulated and attached hereto, is adopted as the Court's final ruling. Defendants' motion is GRANTED WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. Plaintiffs will have until March 18, 2013 to manually file the First Amended Complaint. Additionally, the Clerk's Office's Notice of Discrepancies regarding Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, issued on February 28, 2013, is deemed MOOT.Court Reporter: Mary Rickey. (bp) (Entered: 03/05/2013)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                      NOTICE filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. re First Amended Complaint for Patent Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                        APPLICATION for attorney Eric P. Berger to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11744247 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/1/2013, Entered: None
                          APPLICATION for attorney James J. McGuire to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11743560 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 03/01/2013)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/15/2013, Entered: None
                            REPLY in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 21 filed by Defendant Visceral Games. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 02/15/2013)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/14/2013, Entered: None
                              NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. correcting MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion 31 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Substitute Memorandum)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/14/2013)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None
                                MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Dismiss Case 21 filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/11/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                  Order Granting Relief from Local Rule 7-3 by Judge George H. Wu: Defendant Visceral Gamess Motion for Relief from Local Rule 7-3 is hereby GRANTED. 23 (pj) (Entered: 02/11/2013)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: Defendants are hereby GRANTED leave to file their Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Relief, and Supporting Documents on February 5, 2013. 25 . (pj) (Entered: 02/08/2013)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 2/7/2013, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE of Change of Lead Counsel changing lead counsel from Sonal Naresh Mehta to Edward R. Reines. filed by Defendant Visceral Games, (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 02/07/2013)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edward R Reines on behalf of Defendant Visceral Games (Reines, Edward) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                          DECLARATION of Evan N. Budaj re APPLICATION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Relief, and Supporting Documents 25 filed by Defendant Visceral Games. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                            APPLICATION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss, Motion for Relief, and Supporting Documents filed by Defendant Visceral Games. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                              DECLARATION of Sonal N. Mehta in Support of MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 7-3 re MOTION to Dismiss Case 21 23 filed by Defendant Visceral Games. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Relief from Local Rule 7-3 re MOTION to Dismiss Case 21 filed by Defendant Visceral Games. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                  DECLARATION of Sonal N. Mehta in Support of MOTION to Dismiss Case 21 filed by Defendant Visceral Games. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/5/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Visceral Games. Motion set for hearing on 3/4/2013 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 02/05/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Visceral Games identifying Electronic Arts Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Sonal Naresh Mehta on behalf of Defendant Visceral Games (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Evan N Budaj on behalf of Defendant Visceral Games (Budaj, Evan) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/4/2013, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Justin Morteza Lee on behalf of Defendant Visceral Games (Lee, Justin) (Entered: 02/04/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/31/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER granting Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days), Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) 14 , Defendant Visceral Games answer due 2/4/2013 by Judge George H. Wu (pj) (Entered: 01/31/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 13 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark Raskin on behalf of plaintiff, designating Irene Lee as local counsel. (ak) (Entered: 01/30/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/28/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to February 4, 2013 re Complaint - (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery) 1 filed by Defendant Visceral Games. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Sonal N. Mehta in Support of Stipulation, # 2 Proposed Order)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 01/28/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/25/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-11571953 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/25/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/7/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                      Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See Order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/3/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                        ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV 12-10322 GW(FFMx). Case transferred from Judge Margaret M. Morrow and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner to Judge George H Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge CV 12-10344 GW(FFMx).Signed by Judge George H Wu (rn) (Entered: 01/07/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/27/2012, Entered: None
                                                                          STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Visceral Games answer now due 1/28/2013, filed by defendant Visceral Games.(Reines, Edward) (Entered: 12/27/2012)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/21/2012, Entered: None
                                                                            NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. Related Case(s): 15 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/21/2012)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2012, Entered: None
                                                                              PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff McRO Inc, upon Defendant Visceral Games served on 12/10/2012, answer due 12/31/2012. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Betsy Contro, Legal Counsel Authorized to Accept Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/12/2012)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Vincent Filardo, Jr. for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/7/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Mark S. Raskin for Plaintiff McRO Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                      REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by McRO Inc. (et) (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                        DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None
                                                                                          CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc. (et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/4/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            COMPLAINT against Defendant Visceral Games. Case assigned to Judge Margaret M. Morrow for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Michael R Wilner. (Filing fee $ 350 PAID.) Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff McRO Inc.(et) (mg). (Entered: 12/07/2012)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                              This case has been viewed 61 times.

                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                              Space
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                               
                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                              Need Password Help?