One-E-Way Inc v. Harman International Industries Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00603
District Judge Manuel L. Real, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 19, 2017 at 11:28 PM ST (4.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo One-e-way, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Fernald Law Group Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brandon C Fernald +1 323 410 0320 +1 323 410 0330 brandon@fernaldlawgroup.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rachel D Stanger +1 323 410 0300 +1 323 310 0330 rachel.stanger@fernaldlawgroup.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Nelson Bumgardner Casto PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jaime Kate Olin +1 817 806 3816 +1 817 377 3485 jolin@nbclaw.net
v.
No Logo Harman International Industries, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/30/2012, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 Notice Dismissal) (pj) (Entered: 04/30/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None
    NOTICE Of Dismissal Of Action With Prejudice As To Defendant Harman International Industries, Inc. filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc. (Olin, Jaime) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/8/2012, Entered: None
      REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by One-E-Way Inc. (Fernald, Brandon) (Entered: 02/08/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COUNSEL by Judge Manuel L. Real. READ CAREFULLY: FAILURE TO COMPLY MAY LEAD TO SANCTIONS. (kti) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/29/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Percy Anderson, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. CV 11-06673 PA(FMOx) (rn) (Entered: 01/31/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
            PDF DOCUMENTS ATTACHED TO DOCKET RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were attached to the Court docket on 1/27/12: Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties. (mg) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/27/2012, Entered: None
              PDF DOCUMENTS RECEIVED RE LOCAL RULE 3-2. The following PDF Documents were received by the Court on 1/27/12: Complaint, Notice of Assignment, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Certification and Notice of Interested Parties. (mg) (Entered: 01/27/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/26/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                CLERKS E-MAIL RE LOCAL RULE 3-2 TO COUNSEL on 1/26/12 addressed to brandon.fernald@fernaldlawgroup.com. COURT REQUIRES YOUR IMMEDIATE RESPONSE. Pursuant to Local Rule 3-2, you are required to e-mail, within 24 hours of filing, a Filed stamped copy of your complaint and other civil case initiating documents, in PDF format to the Court. To date, we have not received the PDF images of your filing. Please do so within 24 hours or this matter will be referred to the Chief Judge for further proceedings. (mg) (Entered: 01/26/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/24/2012, Entered: None
                  NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) 6 , Notice To Counsel Re: Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) 5 . Document number 5 filed on 1/23/12 The Notice to Counsel Re: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 day and Document 6 filed 1/23/12 was docketed and attached in error using wrong case number CV 12-608-MMM-PJW. (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                    NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed.(ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                      NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: # 1 AO-120) (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                        NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Edward E Casto, Jr. for Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc. Your Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return you completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application; no filing fee is required. (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                          NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (Attachments: # 1 AO 120) (ghap) (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None
                            CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff One-E-Way Inc, identifying Other Affiliate C Earl Woolfork, Other Affiliate Cedric Woolfork, Other Affiliate Tina Woolfork for One-E-Way Inc. (ghap) (mg). (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2012, Entered: None Court Filing
                              COMPLAINT against Defendant Harman International Industries Inc. Case assigned to Judge Manuel L. Real for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Margaret A. Nagle.(Filing fee $ 350:PAID) Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff One-E-Way Inc.(ghap) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2012: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (mg). (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/27/2012: # 2 Ntc of Asgmt, # 3 Summons) (mg). (Entered: 01/24/2012)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?