McRo Inc. v. Tecmo Koei Corporation, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:13-cv-01872
District Judge George H Wu, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 23, 2016 at 2:55 AM ST (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mcro, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Mishcon de Reya New York LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark S Raskin +1 212 612 3270 +1 212 612 3297 Mark.Raskin@mishcon.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Russ August & Kabat

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Marc Aaron Fenster +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 mfenster@raklaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Irene Y Lee +1 310 826 7474 +1 310 826 6991 ilee@raklaw.com
v.
No Logo Tecmo Koei America Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen J Covarrubias +1 213 239 5157 +1 213 239 2257 kcovarrubias@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nick Saros +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5185 nsaros@jenner.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miwa Shoda +1 213 239 5171 +1 213 239 5181 mshoda@jenner.com
No Logo Tecmo Koei Corporation, Defendant
No Logo Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goto, Kunitosi

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Miwa Shoda +1 213 239 5171 +1 213 239 5181 mshoda@jenner.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Jenner & Block, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kathleen J Covarrubias +1 213 239 5157 +1 213 239 2257 kcovarrubias@jenner.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Nick Saros +1 213 239 5100 +1 213 239 5185 nsaros@jenner.com
No Logo Tecmo Koei Holdings Co Ltd, Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1126
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (Attachments: # 1 COPY OF ORDER) (pj) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND JOINT MOTION TO DISMISS by Judge George H. Wu, re Notice (Other) 39 ,The Court, having considered the Parties Joint Motion to Dismiss, herebyORDERS as follows:(1) All claims at issue here between Planet Blue and Defendants,including all claims presented by Planet Blues Complaint, shall be dismissed withprejudice; and(2) Planet Blue and Defendants each shall bear their own costs andattorneys fees; and(3) Planet Blue and Defendants waive the right to make a claim against theother for such costs, attorney fees or any other expenses associated with thematters being settled here. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (pj) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF MOTION AND Joint MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
        MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu:, Markman hearing held in Track 1 Consolidated Cases (Lead Case McRO, Inc. v. Namco Bandai GamesAmerica, Inc., CV 12-10322-GW(FFMx)). For reasons stated on the record, the status conference is continued to June 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 04/29/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/26/2014, Entered: None
          TRANSCRIPT ORDER re: Telephone Conference, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, 36 , as to Defendants Tecmo Koei America Corporation, Tecmo Koei Holdings Co Ltd Court Reporter. Court will contact Hilda Vecino at hvecino@jenner.com with any questions regarding this order. Transcript portion requested: Voir Dire on Katie Thibodeaux. Other: February 24, 2014. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter/recorder. (Saros, Nick) (Entered: 02/26/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
            MINUTES OF Telephone Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re discovery issues. The Court, as indicated on the record, allows the Track Two cases to propound discovery within 45 days of receipt of discovery requests and interrogatories. Plaintiff Planet Blue will also provide Track Two cases with Track One discovery within two weeks from the date of this order. The status conference is continued to April 28, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Court Reporter: Katie Thibedeaux. (bp) (Entered: 02/25/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/20/2014, Entered: None
              STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/13/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                MINUTES OF Status Conference held before Judge George H. Wu: The Courts Tentative Position re Scheduling, Markman Hearing, and Discovery, is circulated. Partieswill confer and file a proposed schedule and objections to the consolidation of Track 2 Cases by noon on February 20, 2014. The status conference is continued to February 24, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically, provided that notice is given to the clerk at least two business days prior to the hearing. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (pj) (Entered: 02/20/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/19/2014, Entered: None
                  NOTICE TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT THE FEBRUARY 24, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/19/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE FOR MARK S. RASKIN AT THE FEBRUARY 13, 2014 HEARING filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None
                      STATUS REPORT JOINT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Raskin, Mark) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                        MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge George H. Wu: Court and counsel confer re newly transferred cases. Parties will meet and confer and within 10 days file a joint status report as to consolidation of remaining cases in Categories B and C. A Status Conference is set for February 13, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Parties may appear telephonically provided that notice is given to the clerk by February 11, 2014. Court Reporter: Katie Thibodeaux. (es) (Entered: 02/04/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                          Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Miwa Shoda counsel for Defendants Tecmo Koei America Corporation, Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd.. Adding Miwa Shoda as attorney as counsel of record for TECMO KOEI AMERICA CORPORATION and TECMO KOEI GAMES CO., LTD. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TECMO KOEI AMERICA CORPORATION and TECMO KOEI GAMES CO., LTD.. (Attorney Miwa Shoda added to party Tecmo Koei America Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Miwa Shoda added to party Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd.(pty:dft))(Shoda, Miwa) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/29/2014, Entered: None
                            Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kathleen J Covarrubias counsel for Defendants Tecmo Koei America Corporation, Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd.. Adding Kathleen J. Covarrubias as attorney as counsel of record for TECMO KOEI AMERICA CORPORATION and TECMO KOEI GAMES CO., LTD. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants TECMO KOEI AMERICA CORPORATION and TECMO KOEI GAMES CO., LTD.. (Attorney Kathleen J Covarrubias added to party Tecmo Koei America Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Kathleen J Covarrubias added to party Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd.(pty:dft))(Covarrubias, Kathleen) (Entered: 01/29/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Tecmo Koei America Corporation, Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd. identifying Tecmo Koei Holdings Co., Ltd as Corporate Parent. (Saros, Nick) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/27/2014, Entered: None
                                ANSWER to Amended Complaint, 15 JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendants Tecmo Koei America Corporation, Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd..(Attorney Nick G Saros added to party Tecmo Koei America Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Nick G Saros added to party Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd.(pty:dft))(Saros, Nick) (Entered: 01/27/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                  NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. correcting APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13186482 paid.) 20 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/7/2014, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13186482 paid.) 20 . The following error(s) was found: A Certification of Good Standing is not attached to Pro Hac Vice Application. Good Standing Certificates have been required since 09/08. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (lt) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      ORDER by Judge George H. Wu: granting 20 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Mark S. Raskin on behalf of Plaintiff, designating Irene Y. Lee as local counsel. (lt) (Entered: 01/07/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                        21 DAY Summons Issued re FIRST Amended Complaint, 15 as to Defendant Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd.. (pj) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                          21 DAY Summons Issued re FIRST Amended Complaint, 15 as to Defendant Tecmo Koei America Corporation. (pj) (Entered: 01/06/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/3/2014, Entered: None
                                            APPLICATION for attorney Mark S. Raskin to Appear Pro Hac Vice(PHV Fee of $325 receipt number 0973-13186482 paid.) filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/03/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/2/2014, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. Related Case(s): 13-cv-01870, 13-cv-01871, 13-cv-01873, 13-cv-01874; Lead Case 12-cv-10322, consolidated with 12-cv-10323, 12-cv-10326, 12-cv-10327, 12-cv-10329, 12-cv-10331, 12-cv-10333, 12-cv-10335, 12-cv-10336, 12-cv-10337, 12-cv-10338, 12-cv-10340, 12-cv-10341, 12-cv-10342, 12-cv-10344 and 12-cv-10345 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 01/02/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. re Amended Notice of Interested Parties (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                  Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint, 15 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                    Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint, 15 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/30/2013, Entered: None
                                                      FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Tecmo Koei America Corporation and Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd. Tecmo Koei America Corporation, Tecmo Koei Games Co., Ltd. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 , filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/30/2013)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None
                                                        PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff McRo Inc, upon Defendant Tecmo Koei Corporation served on 12/10/2013, answer due 12/31/2013. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Tadahito Saito, Authorized Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/19/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                          Standing Order Re Final Pre-Trial Conferences for Civil Jury Trials Before Judge George H. Wu. 1. You are instructed to read and to follow (unless otherwise superseded herein) the Central District of California Local Rules (henceforth Local Rules) 16-1 through 16-15 regarding pre-trial requirements. (See order for details.) (kti) (Entered: 12/19/2013)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/17/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE WU AND ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE by Judge George H Wu; This action has been reassigned to the Honorable George H. Wu, U.S. District Judge and the Honorable Fredrick F. Mumm, U.S. Magistrate Judge. The Court, on its own motion, sets a Status Conference for January 30, 2014 at 8:30 a.m. Plaintiffs counsel is directed to give notice of the status conference immediately to each party that makes an initial appearance in the action after this date.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (jag) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 12/17/2013)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                              ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 08-05 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: CV12-10322 GW (FFMx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Robert N. Block and Judge David O. Carter to Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Frederick F. Mumm for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV13-01872 GW (FFMx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (dro) (Entered: 12/16/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                NOTICE OF FILING FEE DUE on Pro Hac Vice Application mailed to Mark S. Raskin for Plaintiff McRo Inc. Pro Hac Vice application has not been received by the court. Please return your completed Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case, form G-64, or a copy of the Notice of Electronic Filing of your application and the $325.00 fee and this notice immediately. Out-of-state federal government attorneys who are not employed by the U.S. Department of Justice are required to file a Pro Hac Vice application;no filing fee is required. You have been removed as counsel of record from this case for failure to submit this filing fee. (lwag) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/5/2013, Entered: None
                                                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendants Tecmo Koei Corporation and Tecmo Koei Holdings Co Ltd. (lwag) (Entered: 12/05/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/2/2013, Entered: None
                                                                    AMENDED DOCUMENT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. Amendment to Corporate Disclosure Statement 5 (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 12/02/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                      Certificate and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue, (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                        REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                            Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                              Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/27/2013, Entered: None
                                                                                  COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-13048204 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Attorney Irene Y Lee added to party McRo Inc. dba Planet Blue(pty:pla))(Lee, Irene) (Entered: 11/27/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                    Space Space

                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                    This case has been viewed 46 times.

                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                    Space
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                     
                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                    Need Password Help?