Brian Carlos v. Patenaude & Felix A.P.C
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 15-35986

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 26, 2017 at 10:14 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None
Filed order MEDIATION (RGA): The briefing schedule previously set by the court is amended as follows: appellee shall file an answering brief on or before October 14, 2016; appellant may file an optional reply brief within fourteen (14) days from the service date of the answering brief. [10074454] (IV) [Entered: 08/03/2016 02:03 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 8/3/2016, Entered: None
    MEDIATION CONFERENCE SCHEDULED - Assessment Conference, 09/01/2016, 2:00 p.m. PACIFIC Time. See order for instructions and details. [10074257] (VS) [Entered: 08/03/2016 12:04 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/25/2016, Entered: None
      Filed clerk order: The opening brief [21] submitted by Brian Carlos is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate CM/ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [22] submitted by Brian Carlos. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [10061177] (GV) [Entered: 07/25/2016 10:27 AM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
        Submitted (ECF) excerpts of record. Submitted by Appellant Brian Carlos. Date of service: 07/22/2016. [10060804] [15-35986] (Knewtson, Bret) [Entered: 07/22/2016 11:56 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 21 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None
          Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Brian Carlos. Date of service: 07/22/2016. [10060803] [15-35986] (Knewtson, Bret) [Entered: 07/22/2016 11:53 PM]
            LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Granting Motion [17] (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Brian Carlos Appellant Brian Carlos opening brief due 07/22/2016. Appellee Patenaude & Felix A.P.C answering brief due 08/22/2016. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [10024875] (LKK) [Entered: 06/22/2016 11:31 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellant Brian Carlos Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 07/22/2016. Date of service: 06/21/2016. [10023127] [15-35986] (Knewtson, Bret) [Entered: 06/21/2016 12:21 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Mark G. Passannante for Appellant Brian Carlos. Date of service: 06/21/2016. [10023108] [15-35986] (Knewtson, Bret) [Entered: 06/21/2016 12:15 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None
                  Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Brian Carlos; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Brian Carlos Appellant Brian Carlos opening brief due 07/05/2016. Appellee Patenaude & Felix A.P.C answering brief due 08/04/2016. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9994852] (LKK) [Entered: 05/27/2016 04:01 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Brian Carlos Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 07/05/2016. Date of service: 05/26/2016. [9993089] [15-35986] (Knewtson, Bret) [Entered: 05/26/2016 03:32 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: LKK): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Brian Carlos; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellant Brian Carlos Appellant Brian Carlos opening brief due 06/03/2016. Appellee Patenaude & Felix A.P.C answering brief due 07/05/2016. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9948951] (LKK) [Entered: 04/21/2016 03:41 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Brian Carlos Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 06/03/2016. Date of service: 04/20/2016. [9947734] [15-35986] (Knewtson, Bret) [Entered: 04/20/2016 06:14 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Brian Carlos Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 01/04/2016. [9814492] [15-35986] (Knewtson, Bret) [Entered: 01/04/2016 05:52 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Lindsey H. Hughes for Appellee Patenaude & Felix A.P.C. Date of service: 01/04/2016. [9814417] [15-35986] (Hughes, Lindsey) [Entered: 01/04/2016 05:00 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2015, Entered: None
                              DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 01/04/2016. Transcript ordered by 01/25/2016. Transcript due 02/22/2016. Appellant Brian Carlos opening brief due 04/04/2016. Appellee Patenaude & Felix A.P.C answering brief due 05/04/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9806059] (RT) [Entered: 12/28/2015 10:04 AM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 144 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?