FFI Fund, Ltd. v. Republic of Argentina
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Second Circuit, Case No. 15-3640

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 11:46 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 4140 - Contract: Negotiable Instruments
  Entries (34) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER, dated 02/24/2016, disposing of the appeal to SDNY, ISSUED.[Mandate][1712478] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 05:02 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
    APPEAL, pursuant to court order, dated 02/24/2016, DISMISSED.[1712477] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 04:59 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
      MOTION ORDER, granting motion for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand [33] filed by Appellant Republic of Argentina; denying as moot motion to extend time [34] filed by Appellant Republic of Argentina; denying as moot motion to refer the motion to remand to panel hearing [35] filed by Appellee NML Capital, Ltd., by JMW, RR, PWH, C.JJ., FILED. [1712473][61] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 04:57 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
        NEW CASE MANAGER, Atasha Joseph, ASSIGNED.[1712452] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/24/2016 04:40 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
          OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand [33], on behalf of Appellee Graziano Adami, Gianfranco Agostini, Allan Applestein TTEE FBO DCA Grantor Trust, Milena Ampalla, Arag-A Limited, Arag-O Limited, Arag-T Limited, Arag-V Limited, Augusto Arcangeli De Felicis, Attestor Master Value Fund LP, Antonella Bacchiocchi, Alberto Baciucco, Otello Baciucco, Filippo Bagolin, Sara Bartolozzi, Anneliese Gunda Becker, Serenella Belleggia, Roberto Berardocco, Studio Legale Bennati, Giorgio Bennati, Graziella Berchi, Adriano Bettinelli, Massimo Bettoni, Giorgio Bistagnino, Stefano Bistagnino, Graziella Bonadiman, Andrea Bonazzi, Stefania Bonpensiere, Rachele Bontempi, Sergio Borgra, Renata Boscariol, Emanuele Botti, Carlo Bretti, Susanna Bretti, Antonietta Guiseppina Brioschi, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Marcello Calanca, Bruno Calmasini, Italia Camato, Giuseppina Capezzera, Laura Anna Capurro, Vincenzo Carbone, Carifin S.A., Giovanni Carlotta, Elettra Casalini, Diego Castagna, Marco Cavalli, Carmelina Censi, Gian Francesco Cercato, Alberto Compare, Giovanna Connena, Cesarino Consolini, Claridae Ltd, Maria Luigia Conti, Giancarlo Bartolomei Corsi, Agostino Consolini, Francesco Corso, Giuseppina Corso, Laura Cosci, Angelo Cottoni, Monica Crozzoletto, Graziella DaCroce, Tarcisia Dalbosco, Aldo David, Maria Del Pilar De We Ferrer, Carlo Farioli, Giovanna Ferro, Francesco Foggiato, Donatella Zanotti Fragonara, Rinaldo Frisinghelli, Angiolino Fusato, Anna Ferri, Adriana Dell'Era, Gabriele Fusato, Felicina Gaioli, Maddalena Gaioli, Francesco Mauro Ghezzi, Mario Giacometti, Giovanni Giardina, Celestino Goglia, Giulia Greggio, Verna Gualandi, Luisella Guardincerri, Gianfranco Guarini, Honero Fund I, LLC, Raimondo Iallonardo, Innovamedica S.P.A., Antonella De Rosa Kunderfranco, Manuela De Rosa Kunderfranco, Maritza Lenti, Angelo Leoni, Paolo Lisi, Ugo Lorenzi, Sergio Lovati, Fernanda Angela Lovero, Carmelo Maio, Claudio Mangano, Elide Margnelli, Romano Marton, Mirco Masina, Guglielmina Massara, Bruna Mattioli, MCHA Holdings, LLC, Salvatore Melchionda, Masina Mirco Mirco, Simonetta Montanari, Giampaolo Montino, Alessandro Morata, Carla Morata, Maria Rita Moretto, Amato Mori, Bruno Pappacoda, Sabrina Parodi, Alfredo Pelli, Franco Pezze, Valerio Piacenza, Peri Luigi Lucibello Piani, Procella Holdings, L.P., Raffaele Rossini, Ruggero Rossini, Ines Rota, Hilda Rupprecht, Vincenza Sabatelli, Laura Rossini, Adriano Rosato, Trinity Investments Limited, Martino Verna, Mario Vicini, Luca Vitali, VR Global Partners, L.P., White Hawthorne, LLC, Matteo Zanichelli, Giovanni Zanichelli, Vito Zancaner, Simona Staccioli, Maurizio Sergi, Marinella Scalvi, Licia Stampfli-Rosa, Tiziano Sasselli, Angelina Salmistraro, Giuseppe Silvio Rossini, Paola Rosa, Maria Robbiati, Barbara Ricchi, Aleessandra Regoli and Eugenia Re in 15-3675, Appellee VR Global Partners, L.P. in 15-3608, Appellee Graziano Adami, Gianfranco Agostini, Allan Applestein TTEE FBO DCA Grantor Trust, Milena Ampalla, Augusto Arcangeli De Felicis, Antonella Bacchiocchi, Alberto Baciucco, Otello Baciucco, Filippo Bagolin, Sara Bartolozzi, Anneliese Gunda Becker, Serenella Belleggia, Roberto Berardocco, Studio Legale Bennati, Giorgio Bennati, Graziella Berchi, Adriano Bettinelli, Massimo Bettoni, Giorgio Bistagnino, Stefano Bistagnino, Graziella Bonadiman, Andrea Bonazzi, Stefania Bonpensiere, Rachele Bontempi, Sergio Borgra, Renata Boscariol, Emanuele Botti, Carlo Bretti, Susanna Bretti, Antonietta Guiseppina Brioschi, Marcello Calanca, Bruno Calmasini, Italia Camato, Giuseppina Capezzera, Laura Anna Capurro, Vincenzo Carbone, Carifin S.A., Giovanni Carlotta, Elettra Casalini, Diego Castagna, Marco Cavalli, Carmelina Censi, Gian Francesco Cercato, Alberto Compare, Giovanna Connena, Cesarino Consolini, Maria Luigia Conti, Giancarlo Bartolomei Corsi, Agostino Consolini, Francesco Corso, Giuseppina Corso, Laura Cosci, Angelo Cottoni, Monica Crozzoletto, Graziella DaCroce, Tarcisia Dalbosco, Aldo David, Carlo Farioli, Giovanna Ferro, Francesco Foggiato, Donatella Zanotti Fragonara, Rinaldo Frisinghelli, Angiolino Fusato, Anna Ferri, Adriana Dell'Era, Gabriele Fusato, Felicina Gaioli, Maddalena Gaioli, Francesco Mauro Ghezzi, Mario Giacometti, Giovanni Giardina, Celestino Goglia, Giulia Greggio, Verna Gualandi, Luisella Guardincerri, Gianfranco Guarini, Raimondo Iallonardo, Innovamedica S.P.A., Antonella De Rosa Kunderfranco, Manuela De Rosa Kunderfranco, Maritza Lenti, Angelo Leoni, Paolo Lisi, Ugo Lorenzi, Sergio Lovati, Fernanda Angela Lovero, Carmelo Maio, Claudio Mangano, Elide Margnelli, Romano Marton, Mirco Masina, Guglielmina Massara, Bruna Mattioli, Salvatore Melchionda, Masina Mirco Mirco, Simonetta Montanari, Giampaolo Montino, Alessandro Morata, Carla Morata, Maria Rita Moretto, Amato Mori, Bruno Pappacoda, Sabrina Parodi, Alfredo Pelli, Franco Pezze, Valerio Piacenza, Peri Luigi Lucibello Piani, Raffaele Rossini, Ruggero Rossini, Ines Rota, Hilda Rupprecht, Vincenza Sabatelli, Laura Rossini, Adriano Rosato, Martino Verna, Mario Vicini, Luca Vitali, Matteo Zanichelli, Giovanni Zanichelli, Vito Zancaner, Simona Staccioli, Maurizio Sergi, Marinella Scalvi, Licia Stampfli-Rosa, Tiziano Sasselli, Angelina Salmistraro, Giuseppe Silvio Rossini, Paola Rosa, Maria Robbiati, Barbara Ricchi, Aleessandra Regoli and Eugenia Re in 15-3612, Appellee Arag-A Limited, Arag-O Limited, Arag-T Limited and Arag-V Limited in 15-3614, Appellee Attestor Master Value Fund LP in 15-3628, Appellee MCHA Holdings, LLC in 15-3629, Appellee Trinity Investments Limited in 15-3632, Appellee Procella Holdings, L.P. in 15-3633, 15-3641, 15-3642, Appellee White Hawthorne, LLC in 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3652, Appellee Claridae Ltd and Maria Del Pilar De We Ferrer in 15-3659, Appellee Honero Fund I, LLC in 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3666, Appellee Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP and Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP in 15-3672, Appellee Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP in 15-3678, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711609] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 07:17 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
            NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cordoba Capital, Los Angeles Capital, Montreux Partners, L.P. and Wilton Capital in 15-3675, Appellee Montreux Partners, L.P. in 15-3616, Appellee Wilton Capital in 15-3653, Appellee Los Angeles Capital in 15-3657, Appellee Cordoba Capital in 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711443] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 04:15 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
              NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cordoba Capital, Los Angeles Capital, Montreux Partners, L.P. and Wilton Capital in 15-3675, Appellee Montreux Partners, L.P. in 15-3616, Appellee Wilton Capital in 15-3653, Appellee Los Angeles Capital in 15-3657, Appellee Cordoba Capital in 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711428] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 04:11 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand [33], on behalf of Appellee Graziano Adami, Gianfranco Agostini, Allan Applestein TTEE FBO DCA Grantor Trust, Milena Ampalla, Arag-O Limited, Arag-T Limited, Arag-V Limited, Augusto Arcangeli De Felicis, Attestor Master Value Fund LP, Antonella Bacchiocchi, Alberto Baciucco, Otello Baciucco, Filippo Bagolin, Sara Bartolozzi, Anneliese Gunda Becker, Serenella Belleggia, Giorgio Bennati, Roberto Berardocco, Graziella Berchi, Orsolina Berra, Massimo Bettoni, Giorgio Bistagnino, Stefano Bistagnino, Graziella Bonadiman, Andrea Bonazzi, Stefania Bonpensiere, Marco Borgra, Sergio Borgra, Renata Boscariol, Emanuele Botti, Carlo Bretti, Susanna Bretti, Antonietta Guiseppina Brioschi, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master, Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP, Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP, Marcello Calanca, Bruno Calmasini, Italia Camato, Giuseppina Capezzera, Laura Anna Capurro, Vincenzo Carbone, Carifin S.A., Giovanni Carlotta, Diego Castagna, Marco Cavalli, Carmelina Censi, Gian Francesco Cercato, Claridae Ltd, Alberto Compare, Agostino Consolini, Giancarlo Bartolomei Corsi, Silvana Corato, Maria Luigia Conti, Francesco Corso, Giuseppina Corso, Laura Cosci, Angelo Cottoni, Monica Crozzoletto, Graziella DaCroce, Tarcisia Dalbosco, Aldo David, Carla Marini De Felicis Arcangli, Antonio De Francesco, Adriana Dell'Era, Carlo Farioli, Anna Ferri, Giovanna Ferro, Maria Del Pilar De We Ferrer, Francesco Foggiato, Donatella Zanotti Fragonara, Rinaldo Frisinghelli, Angiolino Fusato, Gabriele Fusato, Felicina Gaioli, Maddalena Gaioli, Gian Carlo Ganapini, Francesco Mauro Ghezzi, Mario Giacometti, Giovanni Giardina, Celestino Goglia, Giulia Greggio, Verna Gualandi, Luisella Guardincerri, Honero Fund I, LLC, Gianfranco Guarini, Raimondo Iallonardo, Innovamedica S.P.A., Antonella De Rosa Kunderfranco, Manuela De Rosa Kunderfranco, Angelo Leoni, Maritza Lenti, Paolo Lisi, Ugo Lorenzi, Sergio Lovati, Fernanda Angela Lovero, Carmelo Maio, Claudio Mangano, Elide Margnelli, Romano Marton, Mirco Masina, Guglielmina Massara, Bruna Mattioli, MCHA Holdings, LLC, Salvatore Melchionda, Masina Mirco Mirco, Simonetta Montanari, Alessandro Morata, Carla Morata, Maria Rita Moretto, Amato Mori, Bruno Pappacoda, Sabrina Parodi, Alfredo Pelli, Franco Pezze, Valerio Piacenza, Peri Luigi Lucibello Piani, Procella Holdings, L.P., Eugenia Re, Aleessandra Regoli, Barbara Ricchi, Maria Robbiati, Paola Rosa, Adriano Rosato, Giuseppe Silvio Rossini, Laura Rossini, Raffaele Rossini, Ruggero Rossini, Ines Rota, Hilda Rupprecht, Vincenza Sabatelli, Angelina Salmistraro, Tiziano Sasselli, Marinella Scalvi, Maurizio Sergi, Simona Staccioli, Licia Stampfli-Rosa, Stonehill Institutional Partners, LP, Eufrosina De Stefano, Sante Stefani, Stonehill Master Fund Ltd., Anna Storchi, Renate Tielman, Manuelito Toso, Valeria Toso, Stefania Trentin, Trinity Investments Limited, Martino Verna, Mario Vicini, Luca Vitali, VR Global Partners, L.P., White Hawthorne, LLC, Vito Zancaner, Giovanni Zanichelli and Matteo Zanichelli in 15-3675, Appellee VR Global Partners, L.P. in 15-3608, Appellee Graziano Adami, Gianfranco Agostini, Allan Applestein TTEE FBO DCA Grantor Trust, Milena Ampalla, Augusto Arcangeli De Felicis, Antonella Bacchiocchi, Alberto Baciucco, Otello Baciucco, Filippo Bagolin, Sara Bartolozzi, Anneliese Gunda Becker, Serenella Belleggia, Giorgio Bennati, Roberto Berardocco, Graziella Berchi, Orsolina Berra, Massimo Bettoni, Giorgio Bistagnino, Stefano Bistagnino, Graziella Bonadiman, Andrea Bonazzi, Stefania Bonpensiere, Marco Borgra, Sergio Borgra, Renata Boscariol, Emanuele Botti, Carlo Bretti, Susanna Bretti, Antonietta Guiseppina Brioschi, Marcello Calanca, Bruno Calmasini, Italia Camato, Giuseppina Capezzera, Laura Anna Capurro, Vincenzo Carbone, Carifin S.A., Giovanni Carlotta, Diego Castagna, Marco Cavalli, Carmelina Censi, Gian Francesco Cercato, Alberto Compare, Agostino Consolini, Giancarlo Bartolomei Corsi, Silvana Corato, Maria Luigia Conti, Francesco Corso, Giuseppina Corso, Laura Cosci, Angelo Cottoni, Monica Crozzoletto, Graziella DaCroce, Tarcisia Dalbosco, Aldo David, Carla Marini De Felicis Arcangli, Antonio De Francesco, Adriana Dell'Era, Carlo Farioli, Anna Ferri, Giovanna Ferro, Francesco Foggiato, Donatella Zanotti Fragonara, Rinaldo Frisinghelli, Angiolino Fusato, Gabriele Fusato, Felicina Gaioli, Maddalena Gaioli, Gian Carlo Ganapini, Francesco Mauro Ghezzi, Mario Giacometti, Giovanni Giardina, Celestino Goglia, Giulia Greggio, Verna Gualandi, Luisella Guardincerri, Gianfranco Guarini, Raimondo Iallonardo, Innovamedica S.P.A., Antonella De Rosa Kunderfranco, Manuela De Rosa Kunderfranco, Angelo Leoni, Maritza Lenti, Paolo Lisi, Ugo Lorenzi, Sergio Lovati, Fernanda Angela Lovero, Carmelo Maio, Claudio Mangano, Elide Margnelli, Romano Marton, Mirco Masina, Guglielmina Massara, Bruna Mattioli, Salvatore Melchionda, Masina Mirco Mirco, Simonetta Montanari, Alessandro Morata, Carla Morata, Maria Rita Moretto, Amato Mori, Bruno Pappacoda, Sabrina Parodi, Alfredo Pelli, Franco Pezze, Valerio Piacenza, Peri Luigi Lucibello Piani, Eugenia Re, Aleessandra Regoli, Barbara Ricchi, Maria Robbiati, Paola Rosa, Adriano Rosato, Giuseppe Silvio Rossini, Laura Rossini, Raffaele Rossini, Ruggero Rossini, Ines Rota, Hilda Rupprecht, Vincenza Sabatelli, Angelina Salmistraro, Tiziano Sasselli, Marinella Scalvi, Maurizio Sergi, Simona Staccioli, Licia Stampfli-Rosa, Eufrosina De Stefano, Sante Stefani, Anna Storchi, Renate Tielman, Manuelito Toso, Valeria Toso, Stefania Trentin, Martino Verna, Mario Vicini, Luca Vitali, Vito Zancaner, Giovanni Zanichelli and Matteo Zanichelli in 15-3612, Appellee Arag-O Limited, Arag-T Limited and Arag-V Limited in 15-3614, Appellee Attestor Master Value Fund LP in 15-3628, Appellee MCHA Holdings, LLC in 15-3629, Appellee Trinity Investments Limited in 15-3632, Appellee Procella Holdings, L.P. in 15-3633, Appellee Stonehill Institutional Partners, LP and Stonehill Master Fund Ltd. in 15-3634, 15-3641, 15-3642, Appellee White Hawthorne, LLC in 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3652, Appellee Claridae Ltd and Maria Del Pilar De We Ferrer in 15-3659, Appellee Honero Fund I, LLC in 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3666, Appellee Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master Fund LP and Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP in 15-3672, Appellee Bybrook Capital Hazelton Master and Bybrook Capital Master Fund LP in 15-3678, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711379] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 03:55 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                  SUPPLEMENTARY PAPERS TO MOTION [33], on behalf of Appellee EM Ltd. in 15-3675, 15-3625, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF.[1711258][49] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 03:14 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee Cordoba Capital, Los Angeles Capital, Montreux Partners, L.P. and Wilton Capital in 15-3675, Appellee Montreux Partners, L.P. in 15-3616, Appellee Wilton Capital in 15-3653, Appellee Los Angeles Capital in 15-3657, Appellee Cordoba Capital in 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1711221] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 02:53 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                      REPLY TO OPPOSITION [38], on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina in 15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF.[1710958][43] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 12:51 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                        REPLY TO OPPOSITION [37], on behalf of Appellee NML Capital, Ltd. in 15-3675, 15-3668, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF.[1710954][42] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 12:48 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina in 15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/23/2016 by CM/ECF. [1710912] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/23/2016 12:30 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                            OPPOSITION TO MOTION, for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand [33], on behalf of Appellee NML Capital, Ltd. in 15-3675, 15-3668, FILED. Service date 02/22/2016 by CM/ECF. [1710345] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/22/2016 11:02 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                              OPPOSITION TO MOTION, to refer the motion to remand to panel hearing 15-1060 [35], on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina in 15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/22/2016 by CM/ECF. [1710343] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/22/2016 10:28 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                MOTION, to refer the motion to remand to panel hearing 15-1060, on behalf of Appellee NML Capital, Ltd. in 15-3675, 15-3668, FILED. Service date 02/22/2016 by CM/ECF. [1710135] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/22/2016 04:15 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                  MOTION, to extend time, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina in 15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/22/2016 by CM/ECF. [1709554] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/22/2016 11:20 AM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                    MOTION, for FRAP 12.1 (b) remand, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina in 15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/22/2016 by CM/ECF. [1709456] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/22/2016 10:35 AM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 2/21/2016, Entered: None
                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina in 15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1709153] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/21/2016 04:14 PM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 2/21/2016, Entered: None
                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina in 15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715, FILED. Service date 02/21/2016 by CM/ECF. [1709152] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 02/21/2016 03:41 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 1/7/2016, Entered: None
                                          ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Armando Ruben Fazzolari and Julio Roberto Perez in 15-3675, 15-3623, FILED. Service date 01/07/2016 by CM/ECF.[1678435] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 01/07/2016 11:09 AM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 1/5/2016, Entered: None
                                            ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee Graziano Adami, Graziella Berchi, Massimo Bettoni, Giorgio Bistagnino, Stefano Bistagnino, Graziella Bonadiman, Andrea Bonazzi, Stefania Bonpensiere, Rachele Bontempi, Marco Borgra, Susanna Bretti, Antonietta Guiseppina Brioschi, Marcello Calanca, Bruno Calmasini, Italia Camato, Giuseppina Capezzera, Vincenzo Carbone, Carifin S.A., Giovanni Carlotta, Elettra Casalini, Diego Castagna, Marco Cavalli, Carmelina Censi, Gian Francesco Cercato, Alberto Compare, Giovanna Connena, Agostino Consolini, Cesarino Consolini, Maria Luigia Conti, Giancarlo Bartolomei Corsi, Laura Cosci, Angelo Cottoni, Monica Crozzoletto, Graziella DaCroce, Giuseppina Corso, Tarcisia Dalbosco, Carla Marini De Felicis Arcangli, Antonio De Francesco, Adriana Dell'Era, Carlo Farioli, Anna Ferri, Giovanna Ferro, Francesco Foggiato, Donatella Zanotti Fragonara, Rinaldo Frisinghelli, Angiolino Fusato, Gabriele Fusato, Felicina Gaioli, Maddalena Gaioli, Gian Carlo Ganapini, Francesco Mauro Ghezzi, Mario Giacometti, Giovanni Giardina, Celestino Goglia, Giulia Greggio, Verna Gualandi, Innovamedica S.P.A., Manuela De Rosa Kunderfranco, Maritza Lenti, Angelo Leoni, Paolo Lisi, Ugo Lorenzi, Sergio Lovati, Fernanda Angela Lovero, Carmelo Maio, Claudio Mangano, Romano Marton, Salvatore Melchionda, Masina Mirco Mirco, Simonetta Montanari, Giampaolo Montino, Alessandro Morata, Carla Morata, Maria Rita Moretto, Amato Mori, Bruno Pappacoda, Sabrina Parodi, Alfredo Pelli, Franco Pezze, Valerio Piacenza, Peri Luigi Lucibello Piani, Eugenia Re, Aleessandra Regoli, Barbara Ricchi, Maria Robbiati, Paola Rosa, Adriano Rosato, Giuseppe Silvio Rossini, Laura Rossini, Raffaele Rossini, Ruggero Rossini, Ines Rota, Vincenza Sabatelli, Angelina Salmistraro, Hilda Rupprecht, Tiziano Sasselli, Marinella Scalvi, Maurizio Sergi, Simona Staccioli, Licia Stampfli-Rosa, Sante Stefani, Eufrosina De Stefano, Renate Tielman, Manuelito Toso, Valeria Toso, Franco Trentin, Stefania Trentin, Martino Verna, Mario Vicini, Luca Vitali, Vito Zancaner, Giovanni Zanichelli and Matteo Zanichelli in 15-3612, FILED. Service date 01/05/2015 by CM/ECF.[1676862] [15-3612, 15-3608, 15-3614, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3675, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715, 15-3616, 15-3609] [Entered: 01/05/2016 05:55 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: None
                                              MOTION ORDER, granting motion to consolidate appeals and designate docket number 15-3675 as the lead appeal [1653013-2],[1652805-2],[1652810-2],[1652815-2],[1652817-2],[1652821-2],[1652828-2],[1652831-2],[1652839-2],[1652842-2],[1652834-2],[1652861-2],[1652869-2],[1652874-2],[1652877-2],[1652886-2],[1652894-2],[1652896-2],[1652902-2],[1652905-2],[1652907-2],[20],[1652918-2],[1652925-2],[1652926-2],[1652915-2],[1652933-2],[1652936-2],[1652939-2],[1652937-2],[1652942-2],[1652950-2],[1652954-2],[1652961-2],[1652967-2],[1652975-2],[1652982-2],[1652986-2],[1652988-2],[1652992-2],[1652997-2],[1653004-2],[1653006-2],[1653010-2],[1653021-2],[1653028-2],[1653018-2],[1653031-2],[1653034-2], filed by Appellant Republic of Argentina, by SLC, FILED. [1661721][23] [15-3675, 15-3608, 15-3609, 15-3612, 15-3614, 15-3616, 15-3617, 15-3618, 15-3621, 15-3622, 15-3623, 15-3624, 15-3625, 15-3626, 15-3628, 15-3629, 15-3630, 15-3632, 15-3633, 15-3634, 15-3638, 15-3640, 15-3641, 15-3642, 15-3643, 15-3645, 15-3646, 15-3647, 15-3648, 15-3649, 15-3651, 15-3652, 15-3653, 15-3656, 15-3657, 15-3659, 15-3660, 15-3661, 15-3663, 15-3664, 15-3666, 15-3668, 15-3670, 15-3672, 15-3678, 15-3679, 15-3682, 15-3713, 15-3715] [Entered: 12/11/2015 10:11 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                LR 31.2 SCHEDULING NOTIFICATION, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, informing Court of proposed due date 02/23/2016, RECEIVED. Service date 12/08/2015 by CM/ECF.[1659269] [15-3640] [Entered: 12/08/2015 06:02 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION, to consolidate appeals, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/30/2015 by CM/ECF. [1652911] [15-3640] [Entered: 11/30/2015 03:43 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                    ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellee FFI Fund, Ltd. and FYI Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/25/2015 by CM/ECF.[1651576] [15-3640] [Entered: 11/25/2015 12:43 PM]
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS ADDITIONAL COUNSEL, on behalf of Appellee FFI Fund, Ltd. and FYI Ltd., FILED. Service date 11/25/2015 by CM/ECF. [1651451] [15-3640] [Entered: 11/25/2015 11:58 AM]
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                        NEW CASE MANAGER, Dana Ellwood, ASSIGNED.[1650461] [15-3640] [Entered: 11/24/2015 03:15 PM]
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                          FORM D, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF.[1649869] [15-3640] [Entered: 11/24/2015 11:48 AM]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                            FORM C, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/24/2015 by CM/ECF.[1649849] [15-3640] [Entered: 11/24/2015 11:45 AM]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT AND NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. Service date 11/19/2015 by CM/ECF.[1646830] [15-3640] [Entered: 11/19/2015 05:35 PM]
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/12/2015, Entered: None
                                                                ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[1641176] [15-3640] [Entered: 11/13/2015 09:49 AM]
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  DISTRICT COURT OPINION AND ORDER, dated 10/30/2015, RECEIVED.[1641172] [15-3640] [Entered: 11/13/2015 09:48 AM]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Republic of Argentina, FILED. [1641153] [15-3640] [Entered: 11/13/2015 09:45 AM]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                      Statistics

                                                                      This case has been viewed 162 times.

                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                      Space
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                       
                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                      Need Password Help?