Jaycee Dugard v. USA
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 13-17596

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 3, 2017 at 2:46 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2360 - Personal Injury: Other Personal
  Entries (27) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
FILED MEMORANDUM DISPOSITION (RICHARD R. CLIFTON, JOHN B. OWENS and WILLIAM E. SMITH) AFFIRMED. FILED AND ENTERED JUDGMENT. [9901658] (PH) [Entered: 03/15/2016 08:16 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Jonathan Steinsapir, Esquire for Appellant Jaycee Dugard. [9787946] [13-17596] (Steinsapir, Jonathan) [Entered: 12/10/2015 02:33 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Acknowledgment of hearing notice. Location: Pasadena. Filed by Attorney Mr. Patrick G. Nemeroff for Appellee USA. [9787722] [13-17596] (Nemeroff, Patrick) [Entered: 12/10/2015 01:36 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None
        Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Oral argument will be held at 1:00 p.m., on Tuesday, January 12, 2016, in Courtroom 1 of the Richard H. Chambers Court of Appeals Building, located at 125 South Grand Avenue in Pasadena, California 91105. http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/information/locations.php [9786094] (OC) [Entered: 12/09/2015 02:14 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/16/2015, Entered: None
          Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: OC): Appellant’s motion to reschedule oral argument is granted. This case is removed from the December 9, 2015 calendar in San Francisco and will be take place during the week of January 11, 2016, in Pasadena, California. The date and time will be determined by separate order. [9721276] (OC) [Entered: 10/16/2015 01:26 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellant Jaycee Dugard Unopposed Motion to reschedule oral argument. Date of service: 10/01/2015. [9704131] [13-17596] (Steinsapir, Jonathan) [Entered: 10/01/2015 02:18 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/11/2015, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellant Jaycee Dugard citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/11/2015. [9570730] [13-17596] (Steinsapir, Jonathan) [Entered: 06/11/2015 11:20 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/3/2015, Entered: None
                Filed (ECF) Appellee USA citation of supplemental authorities. Date of service: 06/03/2015. [9559633] [13-17596] (Nemeroff, Patrick) [Entered: 06/03/2015 08:42 AM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/3/2014, Entered: None
                  Filed clerk order: The reply brief [27] submitted by Jaycee Dugard is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: gray. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9227021] (GV) [Entered: 09/03/2014 11:31 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None
                    Submitted (ECF) Reply Brief for review. Submitted by Appellant Jaycee Dugard. Date of service: 08/29/2014. [9224722] --[COURT UPDATE: Attached certificate of service. 09/03/2014 by TL] (Steinsapir, Jonathan) [Entered: 08/29/2014 04:34 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None
                    Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: amt): Granting unopposed (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file the reply brief. The reply brief is due August 29, 2014. [9187688] [13-17696] (AT) [Entered: 07/30/2014 02:03 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: None
                      Filed (ECF) Appellant Jaycee Dugard Motion to extend time to file Reply brief until 08/29/2014. Date of service: 07/29/2014. [9186595] (Steinsapir, Jonathan) [Entered: 07/29/2014 06:42 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                        Filed clerk order: The answering brief [22] submitted by USA is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: red. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. [9180604] (GV) [Entered: 07/24/2014 12:46 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 22 Filed: 7/24/2014, Entered: None
                          Submitted (ECF) Answering Brief for review. Submitted by Appellee USA. Date of service: 07/24/2014. [9180536] (Nemeroff, Patrick) [Entered: 07/24/2014 11:57 AM]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                            Received Appellans' notice of filing UNDER SEAL Excerpts of Record 1,4-11 pursuant to protective order; served on 5/9/14 [9093918] (GV) [Entered: 05/13/2014 03:26 PM]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                              Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellee USA; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion to extend time to file brief filed by Appellee USA Appellee United States of America answering brief due 07/24/2014. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9093852] (TH) [Entered: 05/13/2014 03:02 PM]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/13/2014, Entered: None
                                Filed (ECF) Appellee USA Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Answering brief until 07/24/2014 at 11:59 pm. Date of service: 05/13/2014. [9093415] (Nemeroff, Patrick) [Entered: 05/13/2014 12:59 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None
                                  Filed clerk order: The opening brief [14] submitted by Jaycee Dugard is filed. Within 7 days of the filing of this order, filer is ordered to file 7 copies of the brief in paper format, accompanied by certification, attached to the end of each copy of the brief, that the brief is identical to the version submitted electronically. Cover color: blue. The paper copies shall be printed from the PDF version of the brief created from the word processing application, not from PACER or Appellate ECF. The Court has reviewed the excerpts of record [14] submitted by Jaycee Dugard. Within 7 days of this order, filer is ordered to file 4 copies of the excerpts in paper format, with a white cover. The paper copies must be in the format described in 9th Circuit Rule 30-1.6. [9091292] (GV) [Entered: 05/12/2014 12:01 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                    Submitted (ECF) Opening Brief and excerpts of record for review. Submitted by Appellant Jaycee Dugard. Date of service: 05/09/2014. [9090572] (Steinsapir, Jonathan) [Entered: 05/09/2014 06:33 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/9/2014, Entered: None
                                    Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Jonathan P. Steinsapir for Appellant Jaycee Dugard. Date of service: 05/09/2014. [9090249] (Steinsapir, Jonathan) [Entered: 05/09/2014 03:15 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/15/2014, Entered: None
                                      Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: th): Granting Motion (ECF Filing) filed by Appellant Jaycee Dugard; Granting Motion (ECF Filing) motion for second ext. of time to file the opening brief filed by Appellant Jaycee Dugard. Appellant Jaycee Dugard opening brief due 05/09/2014. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 06/09/2014. The optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9057884] (TH) [Entered: 04/15/2014 08:32 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/14/2014, Entered: None
                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Jaycee Dugard Unopposed Motion to extend time to file Opening brief until 05/09/2014 at 05:00 pm. Date of service: 04/14/2014. [9057389] (Melius, Amber) [Entered: 04/14/2014 03:33 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/21/2014, Entered: None
                                          Filed order MEDIATION (AJ): The court has determined that this appeal will not be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [8945461] (SM) [Entered: 01/21/2014 01:28 PM]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/16/2014, Entered: None
                                            Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Patrick G. Nemeroff for Appellee USA. Date of service: 01/16/2014. [8941942] (Nemeroff, Patrick) [Entered: 01/16/2014 02:54 PM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/6/2014, Entered: None
                                              Filed order MEDIATION: This case is under consideration for inclusion in the Mediation Program. Within 14 days of the date of this order, csl for all parties intending to file brfs in this matter are requested to inform circuit mediator by email, of their clients' views on whether the issues on appeal or the underlying dispute might be amenable to settlement presently or in the foreseeable future. This communication should not be filed with the court. For more detailed info about the Mediation Program. and its procedures generally, please see the Mediation Program. web site: www.ca9.uscourts.gov/mediation. The existing brfng sch remains in effect pending the determination whether the case will be selected for inclusion in the Mediation Program. [8926356] (VS) [Entered: 01/06/2014 02:17 PM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/26/2013, Entered: None
                                                Filed (ECF) Appellant Jaycee Dugard Mediation Questionnaire. Date of service: 12/26/2013. [8916542] (Melius, Amber) [Entered: 12/26/2013 10:43 AM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/20/2013, Entered: None
                                                  DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL. SEND MQ: Yes. The schedule is set as follows: Mediation Questionnaire due on 12/27/2013. Transcript ordered by 01/13/2014. Transcript due 02/10/2014. Appellant Jaycee Dugard opening brief due 03/24/2014. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 04/23/2014. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [8911019] (RT) [Entered: 12/20/2013 11:54 AM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 129 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?