Abella Owners Association v. MI Windows & Doors, Inc.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1146

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 15, 2017 at 5:24 AM DT (3.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4385 - Property Damage-Product Liability
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00406107901 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
(ENTRY RESTRICTRED) BRIEF by Appellee MI Windows & Doors, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/13/2016. [999887395] [16-1146]--[Edited 07/27/2016 by JR] (JR)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Abella Owners Association. Counsel arguing: George A. Somerville Opening argument time: 15 Rebuttal argument time: 5 [1000063702] [16-1146] George Somerville
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by George A. Somerville for Abella Owners Association.[1000063610] [16-1146] George Somerville
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee MI Windows & Doors, Inc.. Counsel arguing: Patrick J. Perrone Opening argument time: 20 [1000063116] [16-1146] Patrick Perrone
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Abella Owners Association. Counsel arguing: Scott Williams [1000041120] [16-1146] Scott Williams
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellee MI Windows & Doors, Inc.. [1000041115] [16-1146] Richard Farrier
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ORAL ARGUMENT ACKNOWLEDGMENT by Appellant Abella Owners Association. Counsel arguing: Scott Williams [1000041093] [16-1146] Scott Williams
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CASE CALENDARED for oral argument. Date: 05/09/2017. Registration Time: 8:45 - 9:00. Daily Arguments Begin: 9:30. Oral argument acknowledgment form due within 5 days. [16-1146] (JLC)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  COPY FOLLOW-UP NOTICE issued to MI Windows & Doors, Inc. requesting three additional copies of SUPPLEMENTAL APPENDIX. Additional copies due 03/06/2017 [16-1146] (AC)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 59/17 - 5/11/17 argument session. Additional copies due: 02/15/2017. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 02/20/2017. [16-1146] (JLC)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      CASE CONTINUED FROM TENTATIVE CALENDAR TO AWAITING CALENDAR. [999958814] [16-1146] (JLC)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE RE: CONFLICT WITH PROPOSED ARGUMENT DATES by Appellant Abella Owners Association. Argument Session: 01/2017 Days you are available: May 9-12, 2017 [16-1146] Scott Williams
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CASE TENTATIVELY CALENDARED for oral argument during the 1/24/17 - 1/27/17 argument session. Additional copies due: 10/26/2016. Notify Clerk's Office of any scheduling conflict by: 10/31/2016. [16-1146] (JLC)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            ORDER filed [999918895] denying Motion to supplement the record [31]. Copies to all parties. [16-1146] (TW)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/11/2016, Entered: None
                              RESPONSE/ANSWER by MI Windows & Doors, Inc. to Motion to supplement [31], notice requesting response [32]. Nature of response: in opposition. [16-1146] Richard Farrier
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None
                                NOTICE ISSUED to Mr. Richard Ashby Farrier, Jr., Patrick J. Perrone and Loly G. Tor for MI Windows & Doors, Inc. requesting response to Motion to supplement [31]Response due: 08/11/2016.[999898834]. [16-1146] (JR)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None
                                  MOTION by Appellant Abella Owners Association to supplement record. Date and method of service: 07/27/2016 ecf. [999898759] [16-1146] Scott Williams
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 7/27/2016, Entered: None
                                    BRIEF by Appellant Abella Owners Association in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: REPLY. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/27/2016. [999898695] [16-1146] Scott Williams
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
                                      Corrected BRIEF by Appellee MI Windows & Doors, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/20/2016. [999891941] [16-1146] Richard Farrier
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None
                                        Docket correction requested from Mr. Richard Ashby Farrier, Jr., Patrick J. Perrone, and Loly G. Tor for MI Windows & Doors, Inc. [16-1146] (JR)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None
                                          BRIEF by Appellee MI Windows & Doors, Inc. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: mail. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 07/13/2016. [999887395] [16-1146] (JR)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
                                            Supplemental FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Abella Owners Association and Appellee MI Windows & Doors, Inc.. Method of Filing Paper Copies: not applicable. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/16/2016. [999856597] [16-1146] Richard Farrier
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
                                              ORDER filed [999841270] granting Motion to file supplemental appendix [21] Copies to all parties. [16-1146] (JR)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellant Abella Owners Association and Appellee MI Windows & Doors, Inc. file supplemental appendix. [16-1146] Richard Farrier
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                  FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Abella Owners Association. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. [999822739] [16-1146] Scott Williams
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None
                                                    BRIEF by Appellant Abella Owners Association in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. [999822644] [16-1146] Scott Williams
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                                                      ORDER filed [999809909] updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 05/13/2016. Response brief due 07/13/2016. Copies to all parties. [16-1146] (JR)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                                                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by T. Harold Pinkley for MI Windows & Doors, Inc..[999798379] [16-1146] Thomas Pinkley
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 00405843799 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                          (ENTRY RESTRICTED) APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Richard A. Farrier, Jr. for MI Windows & Doors, Inc..[999762454] [16-1146]--[Edited 02/25/2016 by JR] Richard Farrier
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 14 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                            ORDER filed [999772257] updating briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 05/06/2016. Response brief due 07/06/2016. Copies to all parties. [16-1146] (JR)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 13 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None
                                                              Initial mediation conference scheduled. [16-1146] (MRB)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 04/06/2016. Response Brief due 05/09/2016 [16-1146] (JR)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Abella Owners Association. [16-1146] Casper Marcinak
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Scott Williams for Abella Owners Association.[999762778] [16-1146] Scott Williams
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Richard A. Farrier, Jr. for MI Windows & Doors, Inc..[999762478] [16-1146] Richard Farrier
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Abella Owners Association. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999759106] [16-1146] Casper Marcinak
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee MI Windows & Doors, Inc.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999762417] [16-1146] Patrick Perrone
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by C. Fredric Marcinak, III for Abella Owners Association.[999756356] [16-1146] Casper Marcinak
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Patrick J. Perrone for MI Windows & Doors, Inc..[999762414] [16-1146] Patrick Perrone
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 2:12-mn-00001-DCN,MDL No. 2333. Mailed to: Carol C. Lumpkin, Lauren E. Tucker McCubbin, Kyle V. Miller, Lem E. Montgomery, and Thomas Harold Pinkley Jr. [16-1146] (JR)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Loly G. Tor for MI Windows & Doors, Inc..[999762410] [16-1146] Loly Tor
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    Case docketed. Originating case number: 2:12-mn-00001-DCN,MDL No. 2333. Case manager: JRice. [16-1146] (JR)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                      This case has been viewed 98 times.

                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                      Space
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                       
                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                      Need Password Help?