Mahala Church v. AH
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit, Case No. 15-15708

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 9, 2017 at 2:20 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Sealed Legal Document 01108809212 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
Appendix filed [Vols 1 & 2 are combined electronically. Vol. #2 begins at doc # 118) (SEALED doc under separate cover) by Appellant Mahala A. Church.--[Edited 03/01/2016 by MM]--[Edited 03/01/2016 by MM] (ECF: Earl Underwood)
    LREF
    Blank 01108809203 Filed: 2/16/2016, Entered: None
    Appellant's brief filed by Mahala A. Church. (ECF: Earl Underwood)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108790199 Filed: 2/2/2016, Entered: None
      APPEARANCE of Counsel Form filed by Attorney Andrew Brian Clubok for Appellee AH in 15-15708.
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108778564 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None
        Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Attorney Sandy G. Robinson for Appellee AH. On the same day the CIP is served, the party filing it must also complete the court's web-based stock ticker symbol certificate at the link here http://www.ca11.uscourts.gov/web-based-cip or on the court's website. See 11th Cir. R. 26.1-2(b). (ECF: Sandy Robinson)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01108763100 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
          Appearance of counsel form has not been processed. According to our records, Andrew Brian Clubok for AH is not a member of the Eleventh Circuit bar. The appearance of counsel form has not been processed allowing fourteen days to complete and return the required application for admission.--[Edited 01/13/2016 by JSC]
            Request RequestSpace LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 76 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?