Comarco Wireless v. Xtend Micro Products, et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:02-cv-00640
District Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler
Last Updated January 29, 2017 at 9:01 AM EST (8.3 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Comarco Wireless Technologies, Inc., Plaintiff

Represented by Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Charanjit Brahma +1 213 488 7100
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Evan Finkel +1 213 488 7405 +1 213 226 4058 efinkel@pillsburywinthrop.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Jakopin +1 650 233 4790 +1 866 741 1874 david.jakopin@pillsburylaw.com
v.
No Logo Igo Corporation, Defendant

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert James Garrey +1 214 953 6000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Latham +1 214 953 6095 +1 214 661 6663 blatham@jw.com

Represented by Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rustin Kent Mangum +1 949 760 0404 +1 949 760 9502 litigation@kmob.com
No Logo Xtend Micro Products, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Jackson Walker LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert James Garrey +1 214 953 6000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert P. Latham +1 214 953 6095 +1 214 661 6663 blatham@jw.com

Represented by Knobbe Martens Olson & Bear LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rustin Kent Mangum +1 949 760 0404 +1 949 760 9502 litigation@kmob.com
Attributes
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 145
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
Timeline
  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/24/2002, Entered: None
EVIDENTIARY OBJECTIONS AND MOTION filed by plaintiff Comarco Wireless to strike: (1) the decl of Joseph S Cianfrani, and exhibit "A" thereto; and (2) dfts' rply memo to the extent based thereon (mt) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Robert P Latham by dfts Xtend Micro Products, Igo Corporation (mt) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Charles Mollo by dfts Xtend Micro Products, Igo Corporation (mt) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Joseph S Cianfrani by defendants Xtend Micro Products, Igo Corporation in suppt of dfts' motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28:1404(a) [19-1] (mt) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/21/2002, Entered: None
MEMO OF P&A IN REPLY by defendants Xtend Micro Products, Igo Corporation to plf's opp to dfts' motion to transfer venue [19-1] (mt) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/28/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER GRANTING DFT'S MOT TO TRANSFER VENUE PURSUANT TO 28 USC 1404(a) by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: dft's motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28:1404(a) to the USDC for District of Arizona [19-1] is GRANTED; SACV 02-640 is Ord transferred to USDC District of AZ; terminating case (MD JS-6) (see doc for specifics) (ln) (Entered: 10/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Anthony J Stanley by plaintiff Comarco Wireless in suppt of plf's opp to dfts' motion to transfer venue [19-1] (mt) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Thomas W Lanni by plaintiff Comarco Wireless in suppt of plf's opp to dfts' motion to transfer venue [19-1] (mt) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/11/2002, Entered: None
MEMO OF P&A IN OPPOSITION by plaintiff Comarco Wireless to dfts' motion to transfer venue [19-1] (mt) (Entered: 10/17/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/10/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (in chambers): Min Ord 09/16/02 amended: Crt approves sttlmnt procedure #2 & does not approve sttlmnt option #1; motion filing ddl is reset to 1/30/04 ; designation of expert's cut-off is reset to 01/19/04; by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler CR: Margaret Babykin (see doc for specifics) (ln) (Entered: 10/11/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES scheduling conference held by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: Crt approves sttlmt Procedure No 2, and does not approve sttlmt option No 1. Crt sets following case mgt dates: Discovery cut-off: 9/16/03; Plf's expert disclosure: 10/16/03; Dft's expert disclosure: 11/14/03; Plf's rebuttal reports: 12/19/03; Designation of experts' cut-off: 1/19/03; Summary Judgment cut-off: 1/30/03; Pretrial Conference: 3/29/04 at 2:00pm; Jury trial: 5/18/04 at 9:00am; Trial estimate: 7-10 days. Crt's ord for jury trial issued to respective cnsl appearing in crt, & attached hereto. CR: Margaret Babykin (mt) (Entered: 09/23/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Tim Jeffries by defendants Xtend Micro Products, Igo Corporation in suppt of dfts' motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28:1404(a) to the USDC for District of Arizona [19-1] (mt) (Entered: 09/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None
DECLARATION of Charles Mollo by defendants Xtend Micro Products, Igo Corporation in suppt of dfts' motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28:1404(a) to the USDC for District of Arizona [19-1] (mt) (Entered: 09/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None
MEMORANDUM OF P&A IN SUPPORT by dfts Xtend Micro Products, Igo Corporation of dfts' motion to transfer venue pursuant to 28:1404(a) to the USDC for District of Arizona [19-1] (mt) (Entered: 09/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/16/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION by dfts Xtend Micro Products, Igo Corporation to transfer venue pursuant to 28:1404(a) to the USDC for District of Arizona ; motion hearing set for 10:00 10/28/02 (mt) (Entered: 09/19/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/9/2002, Entered: None
JOINT REPORT FOLLOWING EARLY MEETING OF COUNSEL filed; est length of trial 7-10 days (mt) (Entered: 09/12/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/26/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of change of atty inform. re atty Joseph S. Cianfrani. (yc) (Entered: 08/30/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler mandatory status/scheduling conf set for 1:30 9/16/02 (see doc for directives) (ln) (Entered: 08/13/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None
Corrected Notice OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff (csb) (Entered: 08/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Xtend Micro Products, defendant Igo Corporation by Robert P Latham. Designating Joseph S Cianfrani as local counsel. Approved by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler. (Fee pd) (mt) (Entered: 08/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
APPLICATION AND ORDER of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case filed for defendant Xtend Micro Products, defendant Igo Corporation by Robert J Garrey. Designating Joseph S Cianfrani as local counsel. Approved by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler. (Fee pd) (mt) (Entered: 08/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/1/2002, Entered: None
CORRECTED COMPLAINT [1-1] by plaintiff Comarco Wireless; demand for jury trial (mt) (Entered: 08/08/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/22/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
MINUTES (in chambers): plf has failed to comply w/L.R. 11-3.1.1 concerning the typeface size; accordingly, the crt ord plf to file a corrected cmp & corrected ntc of interested ptys nlt 8/5/02; by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler CR: not present (rmi) (Entered: 07/29/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendants Xtend Micro Products, Igo Corporation (rrey) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/15/2002, Entered: None
RESPONSE by defendants to related case notice [4-1] (rrey) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/18/2002, Entered: None
ANSWER filed by defendants Xtend Micro Products, Igo Corporation to complaint [1-1]; jury demand (rrey) (Entered: 07/22/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
NOTICE RE INTRA-DISTRICT TRANSFER filed. Case reassigned to Southern Division by order filed 7/10/02. New case no. SACV 02-640 AHS (ANx) assigned to Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler for all further proceedings; all discovery matters are transferred to Discovery Arthur Nakazato . (Original file transferred.) (cc: all counsel) (rn) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/10/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 (Related Case) filed. [ Related Case no.: SACV 02-567 AHS (ANx)] transferring case to the Southern Division. Case reassigned from Judge George H. King to Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge [ SACV 02-640 AHS (ANx)] (cc: all counsel) (rn) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/9/2002, Entered: None
PROOF OF SERVICE executed upon defendant Xtend Micro Products Inc; Service by federal statute on 6/24/02 via personal svc by serving S/C to Jennifer Marson, person auth to rcv svc of proc (rrey) (Entered: 07/10/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE of pendency of other actions or proceedings by plaintiff Comarco Wireless of related case(s) SACV 02-567 AHS (ANx) (kc) Modified on 07/01/2002 (Entered: 07/01/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/26/2002, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER RE CASE MGT (Revised as of 10/1/01) by Judge George H. King (rrey) (Entered: 06/28/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by plaintiff Comarco Wireless (pc) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/21/2002, Entered: None
COMPLAINT filed Summons(es) Issued referred to Discovery Jeffrey W. Johnson; Jury Demand (pc) (Entered: 06/25/2002)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 28 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?