Xtreme Metal Fab Inc v. Elegant USA et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Central District Court, Case No. 8:04-cv-01407
District Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 14, 2017 at 7:36 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Xtreme Metal Fab., Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by STETINA BRUNDA GARRED & BRUCKER

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Crystal A. Zarpas +1 949 855 1246 kstetina@stetinalaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder wbrucker@stetinalaw.com
v.
No Logo Does 1 through 10, inclusive, Defendant
No Logo Elegant USA, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ladas & Parry LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED TTAB Attorney Placeholder mcornman@ladas.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Thomas E Kent

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E Kent +1 213 380 2828 +1 213 380 2826 tkent@leekent.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Schweitzer Cornmann Gross & Bondell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jay A Bondell +1 646 424 0770 +1 646 424 0880 jbondell@scgb-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by WEINGRAM & ASSOCIATES

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward R. Weingram +1 201 843 6300

Toggle Switch Represented by WONG FLEMING PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/02/2005, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Geronimo Perez +1 310 943 4755 gperez@dfis-law.com
No Logo Maxx Tubular Truck Accessories, Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 183
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Closing) (vh) (Entered: 01/31/2008)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/21/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
    STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: plaintiff and defendant have completed and executed settlement agreement; STIPULATED AND AGREED between parties that any and all claims raised in this action are dismissed in their entirety with prejudice; each party to bear its own costs and attorneys fees; IT IS SO ORDERED;(ln, ) (Entered: 02/22/2006)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
      JOINT STIPULATION Extending Rule 26 Initial Disclosure Deadline AND ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: NOTE CHANGES MADE BY THE COURT; see separate Order 19 issued;(ln, ) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/12/2006, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: Court vacates all pending matters, without prejudice; Court Orders all proceedings stayed pending final settlement; action is removed from Courts active caseload, subject to right upon good cause shown within 60 days to reopen action if settlement is not consummated; Court retains full jurisdiction; (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.)(ln, ) (Entered: 01/13/2006)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
          ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler for Jury Trial Setting Dates for: Discovery Cutoff 05/31/06; Final Pretrial Conference 01/08/07 at 2:00pm; Trial 02/20/07 at 9:00am; II Order for Preparation for Jury Trial and Jury Instructions and Setting Exhibit Conference Friday before Trial; III Order Governing Attorney and Party Conduct at Trial(see document for details); a special conference regarding trial exhibits and other trial matters, which requires the attendance of trial counsel, will be held on the FRIDAY BEFORE THE SCHEDULED TRIAL DATE AT 3:00PM IN COURTROOM 10A, UNLESS THE COURT OTHERWISE ORDERS; Clerk is Ordered to serve copy of this Order on counsel/parties(ln, ) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/9/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
            MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: Court schedules case management dates as set forth below: Discovery cut-off 5/31/2006. Expert Disclosures 07/05/06; Rebuttal Disclosures 08/01/06; Expert Discovery Cutoff 09/01/06; Motions due by 10/2/2006. Final Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2007 02:00 PM; Jury Trial set for 2/20/2007 09:00 AM; trial time estimate (by parties) 10-12 days(see document for details); Court approves parties selected settlement procedure, Settlement Procedure No 2, which is before an attorney settlement officer;Court Reporter: not present. (ln, ) (Entered: 12/12/2005)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/28/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
              MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: Court finds Scheduling Conference appropriate for submission on papers; matter is removed from Courts 10/03/05 calendar; Court Reporter: not present. (ln, ) (Entered: 09/28/2005)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/26/2005, Entered: None
                JOINT Rule 26(f) Report filed; estimated length of trial 10-12 days. (ln, ) (Entered: 09/26/2005)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/2/2005, Entered: None
                  NOTICE of Change of Attorney Information: Geronimo Perez is no longer attorney of record in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice.Geronimo Perez, Jr is no longer attorney of record in this case for the reason indicated in the G-06 Notice. Filed by defendant Elegant USA (dmjr, ) (Entered: 09/06/2005)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler Setting Scheduling Conference for 10/3/2005 01:30 PM; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that case be placed on calendar for scheduling conference; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all counsel and parties appearing pro se must be familiar with FRCP and Local Rules; Counsel shall include in the FRCP 26 report a detailed factual summary or analysis of case; all motion dates must be approved by the Courtroom Deputy; IT IS SO ORDERED (see document for details) (ln, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                      ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) 1 with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Elegant USA.(ln, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None
                        CERTIFICATION of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Elegant USA. (ln, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/29/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                          MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: Court now Orders Order to show cause re In Chambers Order 8 issued 06/30/05 discharged;Court Reporter: not present. (ln, ) (Entered: 08/01/2005)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/21/2005, Entered: None
                            RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Metal Fab Inc Order to Show Cause re In Chambers Order 8 (ln, ) (Entered: 07/22/2005)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/30/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                              MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: Counsel are hereby Ordered to Show Cause in writing no later than 7/29/2005 why this case should not be dismissed pursuant to FRCP Rule 41 for lack of prosecution(see Order);Court Reporter: not present. (ln, ) (Entered: 07/05/2005)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/26/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: proof of service having been filed, Court now Orders Order to show Cause re In Chambers Order 5 discharged;Court Reporter: not present. (ln, ) (Entered: 05/27/2005)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None
                                  PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Xtreme Metal Fab Inc, upon Elegant USA LLC, a New Jersey Limited Liability Company, served on 4/1/2005, answer due 4/21/2005. The Summons and Complaint were served by Personal service, by Federal statute, upon Maria Carruba, Person Authorized to Accept. Due Dilligence declaration not attached. Original Summons not returned. (ln, ) (Entered: 04/20/2005)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/15/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                    MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: Court on its own motion hereby Orders plaintiff to Show Cause in writing no later than 5/13/2005 why action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution as to remaining defendant Elegant USA(see document for details)Court Reporter: not present. (ln, ) (Entered: 04/18/2005)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/6/2005, Entered: None Court Filing
                                      VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL and ORDER by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler: Plaintiff hereby dismisses action without prejudice against Maxx Tubular Truck Accessories pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1); IT IS SO ORDERED(ln, ) (Entered: 04/07/2005)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/28/2004, Entered: None Court Filing
                                        ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 224 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: SACV04-1251AHS(SSx). Case transfered from Judge Cormac J. Carney and Arthur Nakazato to Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler and Suzanne H. Segal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge SACV04-1407AHS(SSx).Signed by Judge Alicemarie H. Stotler (csb, ) (Entered: 12/29/2004)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None
                                          CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Xtreme Metal Fab Inc. (twdb, ) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/7/2004, Entered: None
                                            COMPLAINT against defendants Elegant USA, Maxx Tubular Truck Accessories, Does 1 through 10, inclusive.(Filing fee $ 150 paid.) , filed by plaintiff Xtreme Metal Fab Inc.(twdb, ) (Entered: 12/13/2004)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?