Sabal Trail Transmission, LLC v. .26 Acres of Land in Lake County Florida
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Middle District Court, Case No. 5:16-cv-00193

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2019 at 3:03 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 0717
Nature of Suit Condemnation
  Entries (18) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Release of Bond Obligation
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/27/2016, Entered: None Release of Bond Obligation
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 11/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER granting 25 Motion for Final Summary Default Judgment; Adopting Report and Recommendations - re 26 Report and Recommendations. On or before December 13, 2016, Plaintiff shall tender a check in the amount of $300.00 to the office of the Clerk of Court for the Middle District of Florida. The Clerk is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Carlos E. Mendoza on 11/29/2016. (DJD)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 25 Plaintiff's MOTION for default judgment against Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of Fannie Mae Jones, Unknown Heirs and Beneficiaries of Lillie Edwards, Unknown Owners. Signed by Magistrate Judge Philip R. Lammens on 9/27/2016. (AR)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Default Judgment
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER granting 9 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting 10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (See Order for details.) Signed by Judge James S. Moody, Jr. on 5/24/2016. (LN)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Preliminary Injunction
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Partial Summary Judgment
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Certificate of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Notice of pendency of related cases
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Interested persons order
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Related case order and track 2 notice
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                      Statistics

                                      This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                      Space
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                       
                                      PlainSite
                                      Sign Up
                                      Need Password Help?