LEOPOLD v. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00534

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 3, 2018 at 12:56 PM EST (3.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Leopold, Jason, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "JASON LEOPOLD"

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Collins, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Timothy J. Pezzoli +1 202 223 5318 +1 202 223 5316 timpezzoli@gmail.com
v.
Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence Office Of The Director Of National Intelligence, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Attorney's Office For The District Of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joshua M. Kolsky +1 202 252 2541 +1 202 514 8780 joshua.kolsky@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Julie Straus Harris +1 202 353 7633 +1 202 616 8460 julie.strausharris@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit 895 - Freedom of Information Act
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Status Report
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Status Report
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: None Status Report
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Status Report
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER directing the parties to MEET AND CONFER and file a Joint Status Report proposing a schedule for proceeding in this matter by no later than JUNE 6, 2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on May 5, 2016. (NS) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
              ANSWER to Complaint by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE.(Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
                NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL by Julie Straus Harris on behalf of OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE Substituting for attorney Joshua M. Kolsky (Straus Harris, Julie) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                  ORDER granting 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE answer due 5/5/2016. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/15/16. (dot) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                    Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re 1 Complaint, by OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua M. Kolsky on behalf of OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE (Kolsky, Joshua) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                        RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 03/22/2016. (Pezzoli, Timothy)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: 3/29/2016 Unknown Document Type
                          RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 3/22/2016. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/21/2016. (Pezzoli, Timothy)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on March 22, 2016. (NS)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Unknown Document Type
                              SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: # 1 Consent Forms)(jd)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document 1 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                COMPLAINT against OFFICE OF THE DIRECTOR OF NATIONAL INTELLIGENCE ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-4453288) filed by JASON LEOPOLD. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons Summons DOJ, # 3 Summons Summons ODNI, # 4 Summons Summons USAO)(Pezzoli, Timothy)
                                LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 113 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?