ALLARD v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:14-vv-00442

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 8, 2020 at 6:17 PM EDT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ANGELA ALLARD, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Mark T. Sadaka, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Debra A. Filteau Begley +1 202 616 4181 +1 202 616 4310 debra.begley@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 300
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (53) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/8/2020, Entered: None Public Unreported Decision (Website)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Attorney Fees
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: None Joint Notice Not to Seek Review
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/5/2020, Entered: None DECISION of Special Master - Fees
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/3/2020, Entered: None Public Reported Decision (Westlaw)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Petitioners Election to File Civil Action
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: None Response to Motion for Attorney Fees
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Judgment
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Joint Notice Not to Seek Review
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None
                        NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by ANGELA ALLARD.Compact Disc due by 3/24/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                          MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #104.1, 104.2 and 104.3] filed by ANGELA ALLARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                            EXPERT REPORT of Dr. M. Eric Gershwin (Ex. no. 103) filed by ANGELA ALLARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/12/2016, Entered: None
                              NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by ANGELA ALLARD.Compact Disc due by 2/19/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/12/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                                NOTICE of Reassignment. Case reassigned to Special Master Mindy Michaels Roth for all further proceedings. Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman no longer assigned to the case. (tjk) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
                                  ORDER REASSIGNING CASE to Special Master Mindy Michaels Roth. Signed by Chief Special Master Nora Beth Dorsey. (tpj) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/13/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                    NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by ANGELA ALLARD.Compact Disc due by 1/14/2016. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
                                      SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file a supplemental expert report by 2/25/2016. Respondent shall file an expert report within 63 days thereafter. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/08/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None
                                        EXPERT REPORT of Dr. Merrill Eric Gershwin (Ex. no. 20, 21) filed by ANGELA ALLARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None
                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until December 4, 2015 to file Expert Report , filed by ANGELA ALLARD.Response due by 10/22/2015.(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                            STATEMENT of Completion by ANGELA ALLARD. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                              NOTICE OF FILING Affidavit of Angela Allard by ANGELA ALLARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 19)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by ANGELA ALLARD.Compact Disc due by 8/13/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until August 4, 2014 to file all outstanding medical records, an affidavit, and a statement of completion. , filed by ANGELA ALLARD.Response due by 7/17/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                    STATUS REPORT , filed by ANGELA ALLARD. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE OF FILING medical records by ANGELA ALLARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 15, # 2 Exhibit 16.1, # 3 Exhibit 16.2, # 4 Exhibit 17.1, # 5 Exhibit 17.2)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                        ORDER granting Petitioner's 25 Motion for Extension of Time: Petitioner shall file an affidavit, medical records, and an amended statement of completion by 6/30/2015. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                          MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/30/2015 to file medical records, affidavit, and statement of completion , filed by ANGELA ALLARD.Response due by 6/5/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                            STATUS REPORT , filed by ANGELA ALLARD. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                              NOTICE OF FILING Medical Records by ANGELA ALLARD. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 12, # 2 Exhibit 13, # 3 Exhibit 14)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 11.1, # 2 Exhibit 11.2)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                  MOTION to Strike 18 Medical Records , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 4/13/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/19/2015, Entered: None
                                                                    SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file medical records and an amended Statement of Completion by 5/19/2015. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 03/19/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                      STATEMENT of Completion by. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                        STRICKEN pursuant to Order filed 3/25/15 MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10)(Sadaka, Mark) Modified on 3/26/2015 (tjk). (Entered: 02/26/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None
                                                                          NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                            ORDER: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioner may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Medicaid Billing Records , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 2/2/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                STATUS REPORT , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 01/14/2015)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/12/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Billing Records and Statement of Completion, filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 12/1/2014. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 11/12/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                    STATUS REPORT , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                      MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 10)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/22/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/25/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                        SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioner shall file a status report by 10/22/14. Petitioner shall file medical records and a Statement of Completion by 11/12/2014. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 09/25/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/24/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                          MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 09/24/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                            Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 08/19/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING by. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6, # 2 Exhibit 7, # 3 Exhibit 8)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 07/02/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/17/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by Debra A. Filteau Begley for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES .. (Begley, Debra) (Entered: 06/17/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/30/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                  MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/30/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/27/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                    INITIAL ORDERRespondents Report due by 8/21/2014. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (dlb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/27/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (afn) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (afn) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None
                                                                                                          PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES ( Filing fee $400, Receipt number 076683) [Vaccination date: 6/2/11], filed by ANGELA ALLARD.Respondents Report due by 8/21/2014. (afn) (afn). (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 145 times.

                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                             
                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                            Need Password Help?