Baker v. Microsoft Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Washington Western District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00396
District Judge Richard A Jones, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2019 at 12:17 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Richard J Baker, Plaintiff

Represented by Richard J Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Richard J Baker +6 175 526 5523 rb@personalised-video.com
Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, F5 Networks, Inc.
Officer/Director, East West Bancorp, Inc.
Officer/Director, Trex Co Inc
Officer/Director, Teledyne Technologies Inc.
Stamps.com, Inc. Officer/Director, Stamps.com, Inc.

Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N Mehta +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 smehta@durietangri.com

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Counter-Claimant
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.

Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N Mehta +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 smehta@durietangri.com

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
Nintendo of America, Inc. Nintendo of America, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Lee McFarland +1 206 359 3132 +1 206 359 4132 jmcfarland@perkinscoie.com
v.
Electronic Arts, Inc. Electronic Arts, Inc., Defendant
Officer/Director, F5 Networks, Inc.
Officer/Director, East West Bancorp, Inc.
Officer/Director, Trex Co Inc
Officer/Director, Teledyne Technologies Inc.
Stamps.com, Inc. Officer/Director, Stamps.com, Inc.

Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N Mehta +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 smehta@durietangri.com

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Finnegan, Henderson, Farabow, Garrett & Dunner, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patrick J. Coyne +1 202 408 4000 +1 202 408 4400 patrick.coyne@finnegan.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Linda Jean Thayer +1 650 849 6621 +1 650 849 6666 linda.thayer@finnegan.com

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2016 Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
No Logo Majesco Entertainment, Defendant

Represented by Kroub, Silbersher & Kolmykov PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary David Silbersher +1 917 609 2296 zsilbersher@kskiplaw.com

Represented by SPANGLER LAW PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 03/01/2016, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew Wesley Spangler +1 903 935 3443 +1 903 553 0403 spangler@spanglerlawpc.com
Microsoft Corporation Microsoft Corporation, Defendant
Officer/Director, Greenfield Online Inc.
Officer/Director, Crisp Acquisition Corp
Officer/Director, Devry Inc.
Facebook, Inc. Officer/Director, Facebook, Inc.
Officer/Director, Visiocorp
Officer/Director, Immersion Corp
Officer/Director, Avanade Inc.

Represented by Durie Tangri LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Sonal N Mehta +1 415 362 6666 +1 415 236 6300 smehta@durietangri.com

Represented by Wilson Robertson & Cornelius PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/26/2016 Jennifer Parker Ainsworth +1 903 509 5000 +1 903 509 5092 jainsworth@wilsonlawfirm.com
Nintendo of America, Inc. Nintendo of America, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Perkins Coie LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan Lee McFarland +1 206 359 3132 +1 206 359 4132 jmcfarland@perkinscoie.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Tyler C Peterson +1 206 359 8129 +1 206 359 9129 tylerpeterson@perkinscoie.com

Represented by Siebman, Burg, Phillips & Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Clyde Moody Siebman +1 903 870 0070 +1 903 870 0066 siebman@siebman.com
No Logo Respondesign, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Husch Blackwell LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY +1 314 345 6225 samuel.digirolamo@huschblackwell.com

Represented by Suite 1400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Albert A Carrion, Jr. +1 512 472 5456 +1 512 479 1101 Albert.Carrion@huschblackwell.com
No Logo T-hq, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Ubi Soft, Inc., Defendant

Represented by Erise IP, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric A Buresh +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 eric.buresh@eriseip.com

Represented by GILLAM AND SMITH, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Melissa Richards Smith +1 903 934 8450 +1 903 934 9257 melissa@gillamsmithlaw.com

Represented by Suite 300

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mark Christopher Lang +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 mark.lang@eriseip.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michelle Lyons Marriott +1 913 777 5600 +1 913 777 5601 michelle.marriott@eriseIP.com
No Logo Richard J Baker, Counter-Defendant
Citation Section 35 U.S.C. § 271
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (139) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 6/16/2018, Entered: None Mandate of USCA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    JUDGMENT is entered in favor of Defendants. This judgment disposes of all claims and counterclaims before the Court. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (PM)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER denying plaintiff's 150 Motion for an indicative ruling on his untimely motion for reconsideration by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER denying Plaintiff's 136 Motion for Leave to File outside of 14 days Motion for Reconsideration; terminating Plaintiff's 142 Second Motion for Reconsideration; terminating Plaintiff's 146 Motion for Leave to File Additional Evidence in Regards to Audio-Visual Transceivers. Signed by Judge Richard A Jones. (swt)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Leave to File outside of 14 days Motion for Reonsideration, filed by Plaintiff Richard J Baker. Noting Date 1/24/2017, (Baker, Richard) (Entered: 01/24/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER granting defendants' 130 Motion for Summary Judgment by Judge Richard A Jones.(RS) (Entered: 01/04/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              REPLY, filed by Defendants Electronic Arts Inc, Microsoft Corporation, Counter Claimants Electronic Arts Inc, Microsoft Corporation, TO RESPONSE to 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Richard J Baker, to 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Richard J Baker in Opposition of Defendants Motion for Summary Judgment Of Non-Infringement, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 EXHIBIT A, # 4 EXHIBIT B, # 5 EXHIBIT C, # 6 EXHIBIT D, # 7 EXHIBIT E, # 8 EXHIBIT F)(Baker, Richard) (Entered: 07/09/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  STATEMENT of Stipulated Facts Relevant to Summary Judgment of Non-infringement re 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement / Joint Statement of Stipulated Facts Relevant to Summary Judgment of Non-infringement by Defendants Electronic Arts Inc, Microsoft Corporation (Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    DECLARATION of Sonal N. Mehta filed by Defendants Electronic Arts Inc, Microsoft Corporation re 130 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Mehta, Sonal) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment of Non-Infringement by Defendants Electronic Arts Inc, Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) Noting Date 7/15/2016, (Maitra, Sonali) (Sonal N. Mehta) Modified on 6/17/2016 (PS). (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE Free Text - Supplementary Disclosure of Asserted Claims & Infringement Contentions ; filed by Plaintiff Richard J Baker. (Baker, Richard) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Richard A. Jones. SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS. (VE) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties estimated Trial Days: 7-10. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Peterson, Tyler) (Entered: 04/18/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              ORDER re 123 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Michelle L. Marriott for Ubisoft, Inc. by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                ORDER re 122 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Mark C. Lang for Ubisoft, Inc. by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ORDER re 121 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Eric A. Buresh for Ubisoft, Inc. by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Michelle L. Marriott FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Ubisoft, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4410370 (Walters, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Mark C. Lang FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Ubisoft, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4410369 (Walters, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Eric A. Buresh FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Ubisoft, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4410354 (Walters, Mark) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by Plaintiff Richard J Baker.(Baker, Richard) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark P Walters on behalf of Defendants Electronic Arts Inc, Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Majesco Entertainment, Microsoft Corporation, Ubisoft, Inc.. (Walters, Mark) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE REGARDING LACK OF PROPER SIGNATURE. The 109 Notice of Appearance filed on 4/5/2016 was improperly signed by Lawrence D. Graham. As such, one or more attorneys were not added to the case and will not receive future notices until corrected. Pursuant to FRCP Rule 11 and LCR 83.2(a), signatures must comply with Section III(L) of the Electronic Filing Procedures, which states, "An electronically filed pleading or other document which requires an attorney's signature must have the signors' names printed or typed on the line and under all signature lines." (RS) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ORDER re 113 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Sonal N. Mehta for Defendants Electronic Arts Inc., and for Microsoft Corporation by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ORDER re 112 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Linda J. Thayer for Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    ORDER re 111 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Patrick J. Coyne for Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ORDER re 110 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Zachary Davis Silbersher for Majesco Entertainment Company by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Sonal N. Mehta FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendants Electronic Arts Inc, Microsoft Corporation (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4402284 (Walters, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Linda J. Thayer FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4402261 (Walters, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Patrick J. Coyne FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4402233 (Walters, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Zachary David Silbersher FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Majesco Entertainment (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-4402196 (Walters, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Mark P Walters on behalf of Defendant Microsoft Corporation. (Walters, Mark) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  STANDING ORDER FOR PATENT CASES by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES AND JOINT STATUS REPORT. FRCP 26f Conference Deadline is 4/4/2016, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 4/11/2016, Joint Status Report due by 4/18/2016, by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE: Plaintiff Richard J Baker has registered to electronically file and receive electronic service in this case. (JKMK) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        LETTER from Clerk to counsel re: receipt of case from District of Eastern Texas (Tyler) and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (DJ) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          Case transferred in from District of Texas Eastern, Case Number 6:15-cv-00146;. (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            RESPONSE to 98 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Plaintiffs Response to the Order of Transfer to the Western District of Washigton State asking Tranfereor Court Choice of Law to Apply plus consideration of a procedural matter filed by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 03/07/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                              ORDER granting 101 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Andrew W. Spangler terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/1/2016. (gsg) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and Termination of Electronic Notices by Majesco Entertainment. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Spangler, Andrew) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 2/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                  ORDER granting 99 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Jennifer Parker Ainsworth terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/26/16. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 02/26/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Electronic Arts, Inc., Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 02/25/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                      ORDER granting 91 Motion to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington; denying as moot 52 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 02/18/16. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        NOTICE by Electronic Arts, Inc., Majesco Entertainment, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc. Notice of Pendency of Motion to Transfer Venue Pursuant to In Re Apple Inc. (Mehta, Sonal) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                          ORDER setting Scheduling Conference for 2/22/2016 01:30 PM in Marshall Courthouse before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 01/26/16. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 01/27/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                            ORDER denying as moot 57 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 10/05/15. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 10/05/2015)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                              SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 91 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington filed by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit H, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 09/11/2015)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 9/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 91 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington filed by Electronic Arts, Inc., Majesco Entertainment, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc.. (McFarland, Jonathan) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 09/08/2015)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion re 91 MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington filed by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 08/26/2015)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                    MOTION to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington by Electronic Arts, Inc., Majesco Entertainment, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo of America, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Kristopher Kiel, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jesse Sutton, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Loic Amans, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Tommer Leyvand, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of Alban Wood, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Jonathan McFarland, # 7 Text of Proposed Order, # 8 Exhibit A, # 9 Exhibit B, # 10 Exhibit C, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J, # 18 Exhibit K, # 19 Exhibit L, # 20 Exhibit M, # 21 Exhibit N, # 22 Exhibit O, # 23 Exhibit P, # 24 Exhibit Q, # 25 Exhibit R, # 26 Exhibit S)(McFarland, Jonathan) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 08/11/2015)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address by Sonal N Mehta (Mehta, Sonal) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/24/2015)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                        RESPONSE to 82 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Richard J Baker. (Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/16/2015)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                          ORDER granting 84 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/13/15. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                            NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark Christopher Lang on behalf of Ubisoft, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5291245. (Lang, Mark) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Eric A Buresh on behalf of Ubisoft, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5291180. (Buresh, Eric) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                RESPONSE to 81 Answer to Complaint filed by Richard J Baker. (Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 7/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION to Continue by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement - Airplane Flight Booking, # 3 Affidavit)(Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/13/2015)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Tyler C Peterson on behalf of Nintendo of America, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5290128. (Peterson, Tyler) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 7/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      ANSWER to 44 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Richard J Baker by Nintendo of America, Inc..(McFarland, Jonathan) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/10/2015)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        ANSWER to Complaint [DEFENDANT UBISOFT, INC.'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED GENERAL COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT & UNJUST ENRICHMENT] by Ubisoft, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Ubisoft, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ubisoft Entertainment S.A. for Ubisoft, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Ubisoft, Inc.. (Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR, PER ATTY, PLEASE IGNORE*** ANSWER to 44 Amended Complaint by Ubisoft, Inc..(Smith, Melissa) Modified on 7/8/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 7/7/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/7/2015. (gsg) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  SUR-REPLY to Reply to Response to Motion re 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attack Marketing, Xbox 360 Kinect & Games with specific affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Microsoft Banks on the Kinect with specific affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Microsofts $500 million marketing campaign Xbox 360, Kinect with games with specific affidavit)(Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE by Respondesign, Inc / Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance and Request for Removal from ECF Service (Carrion, Albert) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE to 69 Reply to Response to Motion filed by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attack Marketing, Xbox 360 Kinect & Games with specific affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Microsoft Banks on the Kinect with specific affidavit, # 3 Exhibit Microsofts $500 million marketing campaign Xbox 360, Kinect with games with specific affidavit)(Baker, Richard) Modified on 7/1/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 07/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Zachary David Silbersher on behalf of Majesco Entertainment. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5271773. (Silbersher, Zachary) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 71 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 6/29/2015. (gsg) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            First MOTION for Leave to File MOTION ASKING FOR LEAVE OF COURT TIME TO FILE SUR-REPLY by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/23/2015)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              AFFIDAVIT in Support re 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction - Supplemental Declaration of P. Christopher Rigopulos in Support of Harmonix's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.. (Coyne, Patrick) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to Motion re 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.. (Coyne, Patrick) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/22/2015)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to 62 Response to Non-Motion filed by Richard J Baker. (Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting 61 Stipulation of Dismissal. All claims by Plaintiff against Defendant Respondesign Inc are dismissed without prejudice. Parties shall bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 06/17/15. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to 49 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Richard J Baker. (Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nintendo of America, Inc..( Siebman, Clyde) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/16/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE to 47 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim filed by Richard J Baker. (Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/16/2015)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Majesco Entertainment (Spangler, Andrew) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE to 44 Amended Complaint AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND COUNTERCLAIMS AGAINST RICHARD J. BAKER filed by Majesco Entertainment. (Spangler, Andrew) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                STIPULATION of Dismissal by Richard J Baker. (Baker, Richard) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/15/2015: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                  Response to 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A; From Internet Harmonix Dance Central with Xbox360 Kinect at Texas State Fair, # 2 Exhibit B; From Internet Harmonix Dance Central Truth Tour into Texas with Microsoft Xbox & Kinect, # 3 Exhibit C; From Internet, Harmonix Dance Central products on sale Walmart Tyler, this week, # 4 Exhibit D; From Internet, Harmonix Dance Central Sales & Program Covers, # 5 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baker, Richard) Modified on 6/11/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                    ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***RESPONSE in Opposition re 52 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction filed by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(Baker, Richard) Modified on 6/10/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***NOTICE by Respondesign, Inc re 57 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Venue Proposed Order (Annis, Michael) Modified on 6/2/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Venue by Respondesign, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Declaration of Ted Spooner)(Annis, Michael) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/2/2015: # 2 Text of Proposed Order) (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                          Return of Service Executed as to Electronic Arts, Inc. on 3/19/2015; Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. on 3/23/2015; Majesco Entertainment on 4/10/2015; Nintendo of America, Inc. on 5/5/2015; Respondesign, Inc on 3/25/2015; Ubisoft, Inc. on 3/23/2015. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Majesco Entertainment.( Spangler, Andrew) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 5/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                              ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Majesco Entertainment.( Spangler, Andrew) Modified on 5/29/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/29/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Harmonix Music Systems, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent None for Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.. (Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction by Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Christopher Rigopulos), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 5/28/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Patrick J Coyne on behalf of Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5218699. (Coyne, Patrick) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                      CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent No Corporate Parent for Electronic Arts, Inc.. (Mehta, Sonal) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                        ANSWER to 44 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Richard J Baker by Electronic Arts, Inc..(Mehta, Sonal) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Microsoft Corporation identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corporation for Microsoft Corporation. (Mehta, Sonal) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 44 Amended Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Richard J Baker by Microsoft Corporation.(Mehta, Sonal) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Linda Jean Thayer on behalf of Harmonix Music Systems, Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5217060. (Thayer, Linda) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Sonal N Mehta on behalf of Electronic Arts, Inc., Microsoft Corporation (Mehta, Sonal) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                  AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Richard J Baker.(Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                    CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Nintendo of America, Inc. (Siebman, Clyde) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 31 Motion to Amend/Correct. ORDERED that Plaintiff has 10 days from the entry of this Order to file his Amended Complaint as a separate, stand-alone filing. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 5/12/2015. (gsg) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Return of Service Executed as to Microsoft Corporation on 3/19/2015, by personal service. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Nintendo of America, Inc..( Siebman, Clyde) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Respondesign, Inc.( Carrion, Albert) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubisoft, Inc.( Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew W. Spangler on behalf of Majesco Entertainment (Spangler, Andrew) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/07/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubisoft, Inc.( Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Harmonix Music Systems, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Electronic Arts, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Defendant's Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microsoft Corporation.(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Melissa Richards Smith on behalf of Ubisoft, Inc. (Smith, Melissa) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, as matter of course by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order, # 2 Exhibit Amended Complaint)(Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Nintendo of America, Inc., Ubisoft, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting 28 Motion to Substitute Party. The Amended Complaint filed as an attachment to Plaintiff's motion (doc. No. 28-2) is STRICKEN as improperly filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 04/23/15. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/28/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION to Substitute Party 6:15cv146 by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Supplement/Amended Complaint (STRICKEN))(Baker, Richard) Modified on 4/28/2015 (mll, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Michael R Annis on behalf of Respondesign, Inc. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-5151671. (Annis, Michael) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, 6:15-cv-00146 by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed order)(Baker, Richard) Modified on 4/15/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***FILED IN ERROR, PLEASE IGNORE***First MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, 6:15-cv-00146 by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit RBaker Affidavit, # 2 Appendix Seattle Legal Messengers, # 3 Appendix Business Search, # 4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Baker, Richard) Modified on 4/15/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Respondesign, Inc (Carrion, Albert) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Respondesign, Inc.( Carrion, Albert) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Ubisoft Holdings, Inc..( Marriott, Michelle) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/10/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Harmonix Music Systems, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Electronic Arts, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microsoft Corporation.(Ainsworth, Jennifer) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Harmonix Music Systems, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer) Modified on 4/2/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Electronic Arts, Inc..(Ainsworth, Jennifer) Modified on 4/2/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ***DEFICIENT DOCUMENT, PLEASE IGNORE***Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Microsoft Corporation.(Ainsworth, Jennifer) Modified on 4/2/2015 (sm, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/2/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS REISSUED as to Majesco Entertainment. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 04/02/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER striking 13 Second Motion to Amend Complaint. ORDERED that the Second Motion to File an Amended Complaint (doc. no. 13) is STRICKEN for improper format. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/31/2015. (gsg) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Second MOTION to Amend/Correct 1 Complaint, General Complaint by Richard J Baker. (Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant THQ Inc. by Richard J Baker. (mjc, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER striking for improper format 10 Motion to Amend Complaint. In accordance with FED. R. CIV. P. 15(a)(1), Plaintiff may file one amended complaint without leave of court prior to the filing of an answer or motion to dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/26/2015. (gsg) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 03/26/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      First MOTION to Amend/Correct General Complaint by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Summons(es) Notice to amend)(Baker, Richard) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 03/25/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Issued as to Electronic Arts, Inc., Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Majesco Entertainment, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo Co., Ltd., Respondesign, Inc, Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., and emailed to pltf for service. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding A Patent or Trademark. (Copy forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office.). (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/11/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting 3 Motion for Leave to File Electronically. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/11/2015. (gsg) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 03/12/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Leave to File Electronically through CM/ECF and for Electronic Access by Richard J Baker. (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Request to Pay Filing Fee via Credit Card by Richard J Baker (mll, ) [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/26/2015, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT AND UNJUST ENRICHMENT against Electronic Arts, Inc., Harmonix Music Systems, Inc., Majesco Entertainment, Microsoft Corporation, Nintendo Co., Ltd., Respondesign, Inc, THQ, Inc., Ubisoft Holdings, Inc., filed by Richard J Baker. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons(es))(mll, ). [Transferred from txed on 3/17/2016.] (Entered: 02/27/2015)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 134 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?