RAJA v. FEDERAL DEPOSIT INSURANCE CORPORATION
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00511

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 11, 2021 at 2:29 PM DT (17.8 hours ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1601
Nature of Suit Truth in Lending
  Entries (113) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 5/11/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 5/5/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Issue Summons
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 5/3/2021, Entered: None Take Judicial Notice
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Dismiss
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 4/15/2021, Entered: None Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 3/12/2021, Entered: None Briefing Schedule
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 3/4/2021, Entered: None Amended Complaint
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Order
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 2/11/2021, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/13/2021, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 12/30/2020, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 12/24/2020, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 12/17/2020, Entered: None Motion for Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 12/10/2020, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 10/14/2020, Entered: None Take Judicial Notice
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 8/31/2020, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 10/2/2019, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 9/17/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 9/9/2019, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: None Report and Recommendation
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Response to Order to Show Cause
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/28/2019, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 8/27/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Sur-Reply
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Notice of appearance
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Sur-Reply
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Sur-Reply
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Sur-Reply
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Response to motion
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 5/9/2018, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 5/8/2018, Entered: None Notice of change of address
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 5/7/2018, Entered: None MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Take Judicial Notice
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None LCvR 7.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Dismiss
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER partially adopting 44 Report & Recommendation regarding service. Plaintiffs shall effectuate service upon all Defendants by April 13, 2018. See attached document for details. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on February 12, 2018. (lckbj3) Modified on 2/13/2018 to change document type to Opinion (gdf).
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/13/2017, Entered: None Surreply
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/27/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/31/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/28/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/25/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/19/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Answer
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/6/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/15/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None ERRATA
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/26/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/10/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 1/27/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Reply to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Response to (non-motion) Document
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/30/2016, Entered: None Affidavit for Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Response to Order of the Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Notice of Related Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 38 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                     
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Need Password Help?