Gilly v. Ocwen
Federal Civil Lawsuit Connecticut District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00397
District Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 6, 2017 at 10:58 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Penny-Lee Gilly, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Ocwen, Defendant
Citation Registration of Foreign Judgment
Nature of Suit 990 - Other
  Entries (5) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer: Telephone Show Cause Hearing held on 3/3/2016. Total Time: 28 minutes(Court Reporter Diana Huntington.) (Gutierrez, Y.) Modified file date on 3/9/2016 (Pesta, J.). (Entered: 03/09/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/7/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    ORDER. The registration of judgment (Doc. # 1 ) shall be STRICKEN forthwith, and the Clerk of Court shall dismiss and close this matter. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/7/2016. (Adriance, S) (Entered: 03/07/2016)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. The Order to Show Cause hearing, as described in Doc. # 2 , will be reset to Thursday, March 3 at 4:00 pm. If plaintiff or her counsel wishes to participate by telephone, rather than in person, she may contact chambers beforehand at (203) 773-2105 to make arrangements. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey Alker Meyer on 2/25/16. (Adriance, S) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE STRICKEN. At least two cases have been filed before me that seek to register judgments of the "Federal Postal Court" under 28 U.S.C. § 1963. 3:16-mc-00021; 3:16-mc-00023. These purported default judgments are entered against what appear to be mortgage servicers for millions of dollars. It appears to the Court that that no valid basis exists to enforce these judgments, and that they do not comply with the requirements of 28 U.S.C. § 1963. Plaintiffs shall appear before the Court on Friday, February 26 at 2:30 pm to explain why the judgments should not be stricken pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(d). Show Cause Hearing set for 2/26/2016 02:30 PM in Courtroom Three, 141 Church St., New Haven, CT before Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 2/23/16.(Adriance, S) (Entered: 02/23/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Blank 1 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None
          Registration of Foreign Judgment from the District of Federal Postal Court in favor of Penny-Lee Gilly against Ocwen, filed by Penny-Lee Gilly. (Walker, A) (Entered: 02/11/2016)
            LREF

            Statistics

            This case has been viewed 146 times.

            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
            Space
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
             
            PlainSite
            Sign Up
            Need Password Help?