Coulas Viking Partners v. The Belt Railway Company of Chicago et al

Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-03583
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated July 26, 2017 at 10:03 AM EDT (7.7 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Coulas Viking Partners, Plaintiff

Represented by Baker & Hostetler, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katharine Elizabeth Heitman +1 312 416 6218 kheitman@bakerlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Conlaeth McIlwee +1 312 416 6248 +1 312 416 6201 jmcilwee@bakerlaw.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Michael Touhy +1 312 416 6227 +1 312 706 8690 jtouhy@bakerlaw.com

Represented by Niro, Scavone, Haller & Niro, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joseph Nevi Hosteny, III +1 312 236 0733 +1 312 236 3137 hosteny@nshn.com
v.
No Logo Ingredion Inc., Defendant
Officially listed as "Ingredion Incorporated"

Represented by Bryan Cave, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Donald Alexander Cole +1 312 602 5028 donald.cole@bryancave.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Meryl Macklin +1 415 675 3400 +1 415 675 3434 meryl.macklin@bryancave.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rodney Perry +1 312 602 5000 +6025 602 602 5050 rrperry@bryancave.com
No Logo The Belt Railway Company of Chicago, Defendant

Represented by Benesch Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rebecca L Dircks +1 312 212 4936 rdircks@beneschlaw.com

Represented by Locke Lord Bissell & Liddell, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua Michael Fliegel +1 312 443 0214 joshua.fliegel@lockelord.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas Ivan Matyas +1 312 201 2000 tom.matyas@lockelord.com
Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (42) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS held on 4/5/16 before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman. Court Reporter Contact Information: TRACEY D. McCULLOUGH, 312-435-5570, Tracey_mccullough@ilnd.uscourts.gov. IMPORTANT: The transcript may be viewed at the court's public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through the Court Reporter/Transcriber or PACER. For further information on the redaction process, see the Court's web site at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov under Quick Links select Policy Regarding the Availability of Transcripts of Court Proceedings. Redaction Request due 11/28/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/5/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/1/2017. (Mccullough, Tracey) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REMAND with certified copy of order dated 7/19/2016 and letter to Circuit Court of Cook County via email. (lf, ) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM Opinion and Order Signed by the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 7/19/2016:Mailed notice(rth, ) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Plaintiff's motion for remand is granted 21 and this case is remanded forthwith to the Circuit Court of Cook County. Ingredion's motion to dismiss 5 and Belt Railway's motion for judgment on the pleadings 20 are accordingly stricken as moot. Enter Memorandum Opinion and Order. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 07/19/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Motion hearing held on 6/28/2016. Oral argument held on defendants' motions to dismiss 5 20 and plaintiff's motion to remand 21 . Said motions are taken under advisement. Additional dates, as necessary will be set forth in the ruling.Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: With respect to the oral argument set for 6/28/2016, each side will be permitted ten minutes for argument with the defendants presenting first. The defendants may allocate their time between themselves as they see fit. Both sides will be permitted to provide brief rebuttal arguments. The parties are encouraged to focus their arguments on the procedural validity of the attempted removal and on the existence of subject matter jurisdiction. Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUPPLEMENT to response in opposition to motion, 27 Notice of Supplemental Factual Development (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - June 7 Order)(Perry, Rodney) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE by The Belt Railway Company of Chicagoin Support of MOTION by Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction MOTION by Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago for judgment on the pleadings 20 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Unpublished Authorities)(Matyas, Thomas) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY by Ingredion Incorporated to memorandum in support of motion 6 , Response 25 (Attachments: # 1 Appendix of Authority that is only published on electronic databases)(Perry, Rodney) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY by Coulas Viking Partners to memorandum in opposition to motion 28 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Authorities)(McIlwee, John) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REPLY by Coulas Viking Partners to response in opposition to motion, 27 And In Further Support of Viking Partners' Motion to Remand (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Unpublished Authorities)(McIlwee, John) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 32 Filed: 6/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SEALED DOCUMENT by Defendant Ingredion Incorporated (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2-5, # 3 Exhibit 6 (part 1 of 14), # 4 Exhibit 6 (part 2 of 14), # 5 Exhibit 6 (part 3 of 14), # 6 Exhibit 6 (part 4 of 14), # 7 Exhibit 6 (part 5 of 14), # 8 Exhibit 6 (part 6 of 14), # 9 Exhibit 6 (part 7 of 14), # 10 Exhibit 6 (part 8 of 14), # 11 Exhibit 6 (part 9 of 14), # 12 Exhibit 6 (part 10 of 14), # 13 Exhibit 6 (part 11 of 14), # 14 Exhibit 6 (part 12 of 14), # 15 Exhibit 6 (part 13 of 14), # 16 Exhibit 6 (part 14 of 14), # 17 Exhibit 7-9)(Cole, Donald) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman: Defendant Ingredion Inc.'s motion to seal Exhibit B to Response to Motion to Remand 29 is granted. No appearance required on 6/1/2016. Mailed notice (rth, ) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Motion by Rodney Perry for presentment of motion to seal document 29 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 6/1/2016 at 08:45 AM. (Perry, Rodney) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION by Defendant Ingredion Incorporated to seal document Exhibit B to Response to Motion to Remand (Perry, Rodney) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM by The Belt Railway Company of Chicago in Opposition to motion to remand 21 (Matyas, Thomas) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE by Ingredion Incorporatedin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners to remand 21 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Appendix Cited cases available only electronically)(Perry, Rodney) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by The Belt Railway Company of Chicago (Matyas, Thomas) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
RESPONSE by Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McIlwee, John) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CORRECTED Consent to Removal by The Belt Railway Company of Chicago (Matyas, Thomas) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Consent to Removal by The Belt Railway Company of Chicago (Fliegel, Joshua) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM by Coulas Viking Partners in support of motion to remand 21 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3 - Part 1 of 3, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Part 2 of 3, # 5 Exhibit 3 - Part 3 of 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8)(McIlwee, John) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION by Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners to remand (McIlwee, John) (Entered: 04/22/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION by Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction , MOTION by Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago for judgment on the pleadings (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Dircks, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Ingredion Incorporated (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 04/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago by Thomas Ivan Matyas (Matyas, Thomas) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago by Joshua Michael Fliegel (Fliegel, Joshua) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant The Belt Railway Company of Chicago by Rebecca L Dircks (Dircks, Rebecca) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners by John Conlaeth McIlwee (McIlwee, John) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners by John Michael Touhy (Touhy, John) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST for Clerk of Court to refund filing fee in the amount of 400.00, receipt no. 0752-11754655, (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/30/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Coulas Viking Partners by Joseph Nevi Hosteny, III (Hosteny, Joseph) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Appear Pro Hac Vice
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MAILED Notice of Removal letter to counsel of record. (sj, ) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Motion by Rodney Perry for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 5 before Honorable Sharon Johnson Coleman on 4/5/2016 at 08:45 AM. (Perry, Rodney) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MEMORANDUM by Ingredion Incorporated in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 5 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Perry, Rodney) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ingredion Incorporated by Rodney Perry (Perry, Rodney) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Ingredion Incorporated by Donald Alexander Cole (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CIVIL Cover Sheet (Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Blank 1 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, case number (13-ch-28409) filed by Ingredion Incorporated 2d Amended Compl (Ex A); State Court Record (Ex B); Motion to Intervene (Ex C); Order Granting Intervention (Ex D); Notice of Filing (Ex E) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B(1)(a-b), # 3 Exhibit B(1)(c), # 4 Exhibit B(1)(d), # 5 Exhibit B(1)(e-f), # 6 Exhibit B(1)(f)(a), # 7 Exhibit B(1)(f)(b), # 8 Exhibit B(1)(g), # 9 Exhibit B(1)(h)(part 1), # 10 Exhibit B(1)(h)(part 2), # 11 Exhibit B(1)(i), # 12 Exhibit B(2)-(8), # 13 Exhibit C, # 14 Exhibit D, # 15 Exhibit E)(Cole, Donald) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 67 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?