USA v. Jones
Federal Court Proceeding Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:16-mj-01005
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 8, 2017 at 11:28 AM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark A Jones, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by Denner Pellegrino, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Jeffrey A. Denner +1 617 227 2800 +1 617 973 1562 jad@dennerlaw.com
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ELECTRONIC NOTICE OF HEARING as to Mark A Jones: Initial Appearance in District set for 3/24/2016 @ 10:30 AM in Courtroom 23 before Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 7 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
    Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Mark A Jones (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
      Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Order to Unseal Case as to Mark A Jones. See Motion to Seal and Unseal #2. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        Arrest Warrant Issued by Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell as to Mark A Jones. (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Sealed Legal Document 4 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
          SEALED COMPLAINT as to Mark A Jones (1). (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Keith Brown)(Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
            Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 2 Motion to Seal Case as to Mark A Jones (1) (Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
              MOTION to Seal and Unseal Upon Arrest as to Mark A Jones. (Russo, Noreen) (Russo, Noreen). (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment as to Mark A Jones; Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. (Abaid, Kimberly) (Entered: 03/14/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 110 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?