Inspired Interiors, Inc. et al v. Awtry et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-03622

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 11, 2017 at 1:07 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Emily Mackie, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stahl Cowen Crowley, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan Mae Mathias +1 312 882 5458 +1 872 228 8192 megan@loppmathiaslaw.com
No Logo Inspired Interiors, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stahl Cowen Crowley, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Megan Mae Mathias +1 312 882 5458 +1 872 228 8192 megan@loppmathiaslaw.com
v.
Coldwell Banker Corporation Coldwell Banker Corporation, Defendant
Officially listed as "Coldwell Banker"
No Logo Coldwell Banker Residential Real Estate, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Marnie J Beilin , Defendant
No Logo Marnie J Beilin, Defendant
No Logo Mason Awtry, Defendant
No Logo Rolam Equities, LLC, Defendant
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
MAILED Copyright Request Letter to plaintiff's counsel, Megan Mae Mathias (cc, ) (Entered: 03/28/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
    CIVIL Cover Sheet (Mathias, Megan) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None Complaint
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 66 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?