USA v. Rudra Sabaratnam, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 15-56463

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 13, 2017 at 3:19 PM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 2870 - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/4/2016, Entered: None
Filed Appellant Rudra Sabaratnam response to order to show cause. Served on 12/31/2015. [9815913] (JFF) [Entered: 01/05/2016 03:16 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/18/2015, Entered: None
    Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellant’s motion to reinstate this appeal is denied without prejudice to renewal within 21 days, accompanied by a response to this court’s September 24, 2015 order to show cause. The Clerk shall send a copy of the September 24, 2015 order to show cause to appellant along with this order. This appeal remains closed. (Pro Se) [9798675] (WL) [Entered: 12/18/2015 01:07 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) notice of appearance of Marion E.M. Erickson for Appellee USA. Date of service: 11/17/2015. [9758677] [15-56463] (Erickson, Marion) [Entered: 11/17/2015 12:14 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/16/2015, Entered: None
        Filed Appellant Rudra Sabaratnam motion to reinstate case after FRAP 42-1 dismissal. Deficiencies: None. Served on 11/09/2015. [9756535] (JFF) [Entered: 11/16/2015 11:18 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None
          Filed order (Deputy Clerk: CKP) Motion to dismiss case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1). Pursuant to Circuit Rule 42-1, this appeal is dismissed for failure to respond to order. This order served on the district court shall constitute the mandate of this court. [9741202] (CKP) [Entered: 11/02/2015 01:00 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/24/2015, Entered: None
            Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: MF): It appears that the district court’s order challenged in this appeal may not have disposed of the action as to all claims and all parties. Within 21 days after the date of this order, appellant shall move for voluntary dismissal of this appeal or show cause why it should not be dismissed for lack of jurisdiction. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(b); Chacon v. Babcock, 640 F.2d 221 (9th Cir. 1981). If appellant elects to show cause, a response may be filed within 10 days after service of the memorandum. If appellant does not comply with this order, the Clerk shall dismiss this appeal pursuant to Ninth Circuit Rule 42-1. Briefing is suspended pending further order of the court. [9694845] (CKP) [Entered: 09/24/2015 11:13 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None
              DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF APPELLANT IN PRO SE AND COUNSEL FOR APPELLEE. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 10/21/2015. Transcript due 01/19/2016. Appellant Rudra Sabaratnam opening brief due 02/29/2016. Appellee United States of America answering brief due 03/30/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9694098] (BG) [Entered: 09/23/2015 03:14 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 493 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?