Torres v. Florida Department of Corrections et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 0:16-cv-60657

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated August 17, 2018 at 12:28 PM DT (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Carlos Torres, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Blackwater River Correctional Facility

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Carlos Torres
v.
No Logo Florida Department of Corrections, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing 2241 US Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Julie Jones, Secretary Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
No Logo Office of the Florida Attorney General, Defendant
Officially listed as "The Attorney General of the State of Florida"

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing 2241 US Attorney

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe

Toggle Switch Represented by Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Order (- NEW - PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Order Adopting Report and Recommendations
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/25/2017, Entered: None Report and Recommendations
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Order of Instructions to Pro Se Litigant
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Appoint Counsel
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                            Clerks Notice of Magistrate Judge Assignment to Magistrate Judge Patrick A. White. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2003-19 for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (bb) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                              Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro (bb) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                                APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00 NOT PAID. IFP Filed, filed by Carlos Torres.(bb) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?