USA v. Berkman et al
Criminal Case Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:13-cr-00273-SRN-JJK

Tags
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jacqueline Marie Blaesi-Freed +1 202 353 2809 +1 202 514 8742 jacqueline.m.blaesi-freed@usdoj.gov
Space ROGER JOSEPH GURAL +1 202 616 0219 +1 202 514 8742 roger.gural@usdoj.gov
Space Linda Ilene Marks +1 202 307 0060 +1 202 514 8742 linda.marks@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Alon Berkman, Defendant
Office DMN
Filed 11/13/2013
County Hennepin
Terminated
Reopened
Other Court Case None
Count 1
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 371.F
Offense Level 4
18371 CONSPIRACY TO VIOLATE THE FEDERAL FOOD, DRUG, AND COSMETIC ACT
Count 2
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 331A.F
Offense Level 4
21331(a) 333(a)(2), and 353(b)(1) and 182 INTRODUCTION OF MISBRANDED DRUGS INTO INTERSTATE COMMERCE
Count 24
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1349.F
Offense Level 4
181349 CONSPIRACY TO COMMIT MAIL FRAUD AND WIRE FRAUD
Count 25-46
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1341.F
Offense Level 4
181341 AND 2 AIDING AND ABETTING MAIL FRAUD
Count 3-23
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 331A.F
Offense Level 4
21331(a), 333(a)(2), and 353(b)(1); and 182 INTRODUCTION OF MISBRANDED DRUGS INTO INTERSTATE COMMERCE
Count 47-60
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1343.F
Offense Level 4
181343 AND 2 AIDING AND ABETTING WIRE FRAUD
Count 61-72
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(a)(1), 841(b)(1)(E); 182 and 21 Code of Federal Regulations, Section 1306.04 UNLAWFUL DISTRIBUTION AND DISPENSING OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES
Count 73-83
Citation Section 21 U.S.C. § 841A=CD.F
Offense Level 4
21841(h)(1), (h)(4), (b)(1)(E), and 182 AIDED AND ABETTED UNLAWFUL DISTRIBUTION AND DISPENSING OF CONTROLLED SUBSTANCES
Count 84
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1956-4999.F
Offense Level 4
181956(h) CONSPIRACY TO LAUNDER MONEY
Defendant Custody Status
  Entries (388) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 512 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS as to Moran Oz (2), Babubhai Patel (3), Elias Karkalas (8), and Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9). 1. Defendant Moran Oz's ("Oz") Objections to the Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. [474]], Defendant Elias Karkalas' ("Karkalas") Objections to the Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. [475]], and Defendant Prabhakara Rao Tumpati's ("Tumpati") Objection to the Report and Recommendation [Doc. No. [473]] are OVERRULED. 2. The Report and Recommendation issued by Magistrate Judge Keyes on February 1, 2016 [Doc. Nos. [462], [463], [464], [465]] is ADOPTED in its entirety. 3. Defendant Oz's Motion to Dismiss Certain Counts for Failure to State an Offense [Doc. No. [377]] is DENIED. 4. Defendant Oz's Motion to Dismiss Certain Counts as Duplicative [Doc. No. [376]] is DENIED AS MOOT. 5. Defendant Patel's Motion to Join [Doc. No. [417]] is DENIED. 6. Defendant Karkalas' Motion to Dismiss Certain Counts for Failure to State an Offense [Doc. No. [340]], Motion to Dismiss Certain Counts as Void for Vagueness [Doc. No. [339]], and Motion to Dismiss Certain Counts for Violating Due Process Rights [Doc. No. [353]] are DENIED. 7. Defendant Tumpati's Motion to Dismiss Certain Counts as Void for Vagueness [Doc. No. [379]] and Motion to Dismiss [Doc. No. [380]] are DENIED. 8. The Government's Motion to Dismiss Counts 6172 [Doc. No. [395]] is GRANTED IN PART as follows: a. Counts 61-72 of the Indictment [Doc. No. [5]] are DISMISSED except that paragraphs 1 through 6 of Counts 61-72 are not dismissed so far as they are incorporated into other Counts that remain in the Indictment. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/28/2016. (BJS) Modified text on 3/29/2016 (JDF). Modified on 3/29/2016 (MKG).
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 511 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: 3/28/2016 Affidavit in Support of Motion
    AFFIDAVIT in Support by Moran Oz re [509] MOTION to Take Deposition (Friedberg, Joseph)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 510 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Memorandum in Support of Motion
      MEMORANDUM in Support by Moran Oz re [509] MOTION to Take Deposition (Friedberg, Joseph)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 509 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: 3/25/2016 Motion to Take Deposition
        MOTION to Take Deposition by Moran Oz. (Attachments: # (1) DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//WILL BE RE-FILED//Affidavit of Joseph S. Friedberg) (Friedberg, Joseph) Modified text on 3/28/2016 (JDF).
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 508 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Response in Opposition
          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [503] MOTION for Continuance of Trial (Gural, Roger)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 507 Filed: 3/22/2016, Entered: 3/22/2016 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Moran Oz recommends [364] MOTION to Suppress Electronic Surveillance, [500] MOTION to Produce Le Roux Plea Agreement be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 4/5/2016 Responses to Objections to R&R due by 4/19/2016. Order on R&R Issue Date 5/19/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 3/22/16. (AKL)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 506 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
              TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea Hearing held on March 1, 2016, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson as to Onochie Aghaegbuna. (45 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 4/11/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/21/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/20/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 505 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: 3/21/2016 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript as to Onochie Aghaegbuna. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (HAS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Response in Opposition
                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz re [500] MOTION to Produce Le Roux Plea Agreement (Marks, Linda)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 503 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Motion for Continuance
                    MOTION for Continuance of Trial by Moran Oz as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Richman, Robert)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 502 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: 3/18/2016 Response in Opposition
                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz re [364] MOTION to Suppress Electronic Surveillance (Supplemental) (Gural, Roger)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 501 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                        MEMORANDUM in Support by Moran Oz re [364] MOTION to Suppress Electronic Surveillance (Richman, Robert)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 500 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Motion to Produce
                          MOTION to Produce Le Roux Plea Agreement by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 499 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: 3/14/2016 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - USA
                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for USA. (Slaughter, Allen)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Order Adopting Report and RecommendationsCourt Filing
                              ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS THAT: 1. Defendant Tumpati's Objections to Report and Recommendation's Denial of Motion for Severance [Doc. No. [472]] are OVERRULED. 2. The Report and Recommendation issued by Magistrate Judge Keyes on February 1, 2016 [Doc. No. [461]] is ADOPTED. 3. Defendant Tumpati's Motion for Severance [Doc. No. [361]] is DENIED. 4. Defendant Elias Karkalas's Motion for Severance [Doc. No. [337]] and Motion to Suppress Statements Made by Defendant [Doc. No. [352]] are DENIED. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 3/9/2016. (JAM) Modified text on 3/10/2016 (MKG).
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 03/02/2016 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes as to Moran Oz. (96 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1225). Redaction Request due 3/30/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/11/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/7/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (LAS)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 496 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: 3/9/2016 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                  NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript as to Moran Oz. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (LAS)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 494 Filed: 3/2/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Motion Hearing as to Moran Oz held on 3/2/2016 re [364] MOTION to Suppress Electronic Surveillance. Exhibits retained by the Court. R&R to be issued. Dispositive Motions 364 require additional briefing. Defendant Additional Briefing due 3/14/2016. Government Additional Briefing due/Taken Under Advisement date 3/21/2016. R&R Issue Date 4/20/2016. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (AKL)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 493 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/3/2016 Change of Plea Hearing and Plea EnteredCourt Filing
                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Change of Plea Hearing as to Onochie Aghaegbuna held on 3/1/2016. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (JAM)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Sealed Document +
                                        Redacted Version of Document Number 489. (LEG) Document QC'd by leg. Modified text on 3/9/2016 (LEG).
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 490 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Release Status Report to the Court
                                          Release Status Report to the Court as to Onochie Aghaegbuna. (PJP)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Sealed Legal Document 489 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 3/1/2016 Sealed Document +
                                            Sealed Document. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1, # (2) Exhibit 2, # (3) Exhibit 3)(LEG) Modified text on 3/1/2016 (LEG). Document QC'd by leg. Modified text on 3/9/2016 (LEG).
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 487 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Response in Opposition
                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [464] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Elias Karkalas re [353] MOTION to Dismiss for Raley Due Process Violation, [340] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State an Offense, [395] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-72, [339] MOTION to (Attachments: # (1) Gov't Doc. No. 396, # (2) Gov't Doc. No. 399, # (3) Gov't Doc. No. 400, # (4) LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gural, Roger)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Response in Opposition
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz re [462] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Moran Oz re [395] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-72, [377] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-83, [376] MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts (Attachments: # (1) Gov't Doc. No. 400, # (2) Gov't Doc. No. 442, # (3) LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gural, Roger)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 485 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Response in Opposition
                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [465] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [380] MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment, [379] MOTION to Dismiss Counts as Constitutionally Void for Vagueness (Attachments: # (1) Gov't Doc. No. 399, # (2) Gov't Doc. No. 400, # (3) LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gural, Roger)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 484 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: 2/29/2016 Response in Opposition
                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [461] REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [361] MOTION to Sever Defendant re: [472] Objection to Report and Recommendation by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. LR 7.1 is included in the document. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix US Response to Motion to Sever)(Blaesi-Freed, Jacqueline) Modified text and link on 3/3/2016 (JDF).
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 482 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                      OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re:[464] by Elias Karkalas Re-filing of Objections originally filed on 2/15/2016, but with Corrected Caption (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 481 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: 2/24/2016 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER denying [479] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 2/24/16. (AKL)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 480 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016 Response in Opposition
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [479] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release To Allow Temporary Return of Passport for the Purpose of Renewal (Attachments: # (1) February 23, 2016 Email)(Marks, Linda)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 479 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: 2/23/2016, Terminated: 2/24/2016 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                            MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release To Allow Temporary Return of Passport for the Purpose of Renewal by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 477 Filed: 2/22/2016, Entered: 2/22/2016 Order Re: Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision to District JudgeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER Overruling [455] APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge as to Moran Oz (2). Magistrate Judge Keyes' Order dated January 15, 2016 [Doc. No. 450] is AFFIRMED. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 02/22/2016. (SMD)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 475 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//WILL BE RE-FILED//OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re:[464] by Elias Karkalas (Gerdts, Daniel) Modified text on 3/1/2016 (JDF).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 474 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                  OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re:[462] by Moran Oz (Richman, Robert)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 473 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                    OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re:[465] by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati DISMISS INDICTMENT AND DISMISS COUNTS AS VOID FOR VAGUENESS (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 472 Filed: 2/15/2016, Entered: 2/15/2016 Objection to Report and Recommendations
                                                                      OBJECTION TO REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re:[461] by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati MOTION FOR SEVERENCE OF DEFENDANTS (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 470 Filed: 2/11/2016, Entered: 2/11/2016 Order Re: Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision to District JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER overruling [440] APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge as to Moran Oz (2). Order on the Motions is Affirmed [424]. (Written Opinion). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/11/2016. (ADC)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 466 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: 2/3/2016 Order on Motion to Seal DocumentCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER granting [457] Motion to Seal Document as to Moran Oz (2). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 02/02/2016. (SMD)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 465 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                            REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati recommends [380] MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment be DENIED, [379] MOTION to Dismiss Counts as Constitutionally Void for Vagueness be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2016 Responses to Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2016. Order on R&R Issue Date 3/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 2/1/16. (AKL)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 464 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                              REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Elias Karkalas recommends [353] MOTION to Dismiss for Raley Due Process Violation be DENIED, [340] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State an Offense be DENIED, [395] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-72 be GRANTED, [339] MOTION to Dismiss as Void for Vagueness be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2016 Responses to Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2016. Order on R&R Issue Date 3/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 2/1/16. (AKL)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 463 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Babubhai Patel recommends [395] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-72 be GRANTED, [417] MOTION for Joinder Motion to Join Certain Motions of Co-Defendants be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2016 Responses to Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2016. Order on R&R Issue Date 3/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 2/1/16. (AKL)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 462 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/2/2016 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                  REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Moran Oz recommends [395] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-72 be GRANTED, [377] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-83 be DENIED, [376] MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts be DENIED AS MOOT. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2016 Responses to Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2016. Order on R&R Issue Date 3/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 2/1/16. (AKL)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 461 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016, Terminated: 3/9/2016 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                    REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati recommends [361] MOTION to Sever Defendant be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/15/2016 Responses to Objections to R&R due by 2/29/2016. Order on R&R Issue Date 3/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 2/1/16. (AKL) Modified on 2/2/2016 (AKL).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 460 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                      REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas recommends [352] MOTION to Suppress Statements of Defendant, [337] MOTION to Sever Defendant be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/15/2016 Responses to Objections to R&R due by 2/29/2016. Order on R&R Issue Date 3/30/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 2/1/16. (AKL) Modified on 2/2/2016 (AKL).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 459 Filed: 2/1/2016, Entered: 2/1/2016 Report and RecommendationCourt Filing
                                                                                        REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION as to Elias Karkalas recommends [350] MOTION to Suppress Search and Seizure Evidence be DENIED. Objections to R&R due by 2/16/2016 Responses to Objections to R&R due by 3/1/2016. Order on R&R Issue Date 3/31/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Becky R. Thorson on 2/1/16. (AKL) Modified on 2/2/2016 (AKL).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 457 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016, Terminated: 2/3/2016 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                          MOTION to Seal Document Memorandum in Support of Appeal/Objections to District Court by USA as to Moran Oz. (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 455 Filed: 1/29/2016, Entered: 1/29/2016, Terminated: 2/22/2016 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision to District JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                            APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge by USA as to Moran Oz re [450] Scheduling Order, [451] Order (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Gural, Roger)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 453 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: 1/26/2016 Restricted TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                              RESTRICTED CORRECTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT [423] Motions Hearing held on 12/8/15 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (21 pages). Court Reporter:Jeanne Anderson (E-mail: Jeanne_Anderson@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1221). (AKL) Modified text on 1/27/2016 (MKG).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 452 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Reply to ResponseCourt Filing
                                                                                                REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Moran Oz re [440] APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge by Moran Oz re [424] Order on Motion to Retain Rough Notes,, Order on Motion for Disclosure,, Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Moti (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 451 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                  SEALED MEMORANDUM Explaining Reasons for the Court's January 15, 2016 Order as to Moran Oz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 1/15/16. cc: All Counsel(MKG)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 450 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: 1/15/2016 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ORDER as to Moran Oz re: Motion Hearing set for 3/2/2016 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 1/15/16. (MKG)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 449 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: 1/14/2016 Response in OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz re [440] APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge by Moran Oz re [424] Order on Motion to Retain Rough Notes, Order on Motion for Disclosure, Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Moti (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A, # (2) Exhibit(s) B, # (3) Exhibit(s) C)(Gural, Roger) LR 72.2(c)(1) Certificate of Compliance is attached. Modified text on 1/15/2016 (JDF).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 448 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Change of Plea Hearing held on December 7, 2015, before Judge Susan Richard Nelson as to Jonathan Wall. (39 pages). Court Reporter: Heather Schuetz (E-mail: Heather_Schuetz@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1223). Redaction Request due 1/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/8/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/7/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (HAS)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 447 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: 1/8/2016 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                          NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript as to Jonathan Wall. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (HAS)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 445 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 12/31/2015 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [353] MOTION to Dismiss for Raley Due Process Violation (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Attachment)(Blaesi-Freed, Jacqueline)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 444 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 12/31/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [350] MOTION to Suppress Search and Seizure Evidence and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Suppress (Doc. 420) (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 443 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 12/31/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [352] MOTION to Suppress Statements of Defendant and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Suppress Statements (Doc.437) (Attachments: # (1) Jan 4, 2013, Voicemail Transcript, # (2) Memorandum of Interview, Feb. 20, 2013)(Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 442 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 12/31/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz re [377] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-83 and Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 436) (Attachments: # (1) 57 FR 23301, # (2) Order, U.S. v. Garwood, Oct. 6, 2010)(Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 441 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 12/31/2015 Memorandum in Support of MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM in Support by Moran Oz re [440] APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge by Moran Oz re [424] Order on Motion to Retain Rough Notes,, Order on Motion for Disclosure,, Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials,,,, Order on Motion to Strike,, Order on Moti (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 440 Filed: 12/31/2015, Entered: 12/31/2015, Terminated: 2/11/2016 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision to District JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge by Moran Oz re [424] Order on Motion to Retain Rough Notes, Order on Motion for Disclosure, Order on Motion for Release of Brady Materials, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Bill of Particulars, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Seal Document, (Richman, Robert) Modified text on 1/5/2016 (JDF).
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 438 Filed: 12/24/2015, Entered: 12/24/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Waiver of Appearance at Motion Hearing(refiled Doc.414) by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Elias Karkalas re [353] MOTION to Dismiss for Raley Due Process Violation, [352] MOTION to Suppress Statements of Defendant (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 436 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by Moran Oz re [377] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-83 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Letter from DEA Associate Counsel)(Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 435 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015 Order on Motion to TravelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [428] Motion to Travel as to Jonathan Wall (4). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 12/22/15. (SMD)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [431] Motion for Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Submission as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/21/15. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 432 Filed: 12/22/2015, Entered: 12/22/2015 Letter to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                  LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Babubhai Patel (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 431 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015, Terminated: 12/22/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Extension of Time to File (UNOPPOSED) POST-HEARING SUBMISSION by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 430 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to FileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [429] Motion for Extension of Time to File to File Post-Hearing Submission as to Moran Oz (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/21/15. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 429 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015, Terminated: 12/21/2015 Motion for Extension of Time to File
                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Extension of Time to File Post-Hearing Submission (Unopposed) by USA as to Moran Oz. (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 428 Filed: 12/21/2015, Entered: 12/21/2015, Terminated: 12/22/2015 Motion to Travel
                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Travel (Unopposed) by Jonathan Wall. (Ellis, Deborah) Modified text on 12/22/2015 (JDF).
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 427 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Order on Motion to CompelCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [354] Motion to Compel; granting [355] Motion for Disclosure; moot [356] Motion for Disclosure; denying [357] Motion for Disclosure; granting [358] Motion for Discovery; granting [359] Motion for Joinder; granting [360] Motion to Retain Rough Notes; granting [362] Motion for Disclosure; and granting [403] Motion to Seal Document as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/17/15. (MKG)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 426 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Order on Motion for DisclosureCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [335] Motion for Disclosure; granting [336] Motion for Discovery; denying [338] Motion to Produce; granting [341] Motion to Preserve; moot [342] Motion to Suppress; and granting [403] Motion to Seal Document as to Elias Karkalas (8). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/17/15. (MKG)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 425 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Order on Motion for DisclosureCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER Moot [343] Motion for Disclosure; granting [344] Motion to Retain Rough Notes; moot [345] Motion for Disclosure; granting [346] Motion for Disclosure; moot [347] Motion for Compliance as to Babubhai Patel (3); granting [348] Motion for Disclosure; granting [349] Motion to Compel; denying [351] Motion for Disclosure; granting [403] Motion to Seal Documents; and granting [417] Motion for Joinder as to Babubhai Patel (3). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/17/15. (MKG)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 424 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Order on Motion to Retain Rough NotesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [366] Motion to Retain Rough Notes; granting [367] Motion for Disclosure; granting [368] Motion for Release of Brady Materials; denying [369] Motion for Disclosure; denying [372] Motion to Strike; denying [373] Motion for Bill of Particulars; denying [378] Motion for Pretrial Scheduling Order; and granting [403] Motion to Seal Document as to Moran Oz (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/17/15. (MKG)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 423 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Restricted TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - SEE CORRECTED TRANSCRIPT [453] RESTRICTED TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 12/8/15 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (21 pages). Court Reporter:Jeanne Anderson (E-mail: Jeanne_Anderson@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1221). (LEG) Modified text on 1/27/2016 (MKG).
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 422 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Criminal Motions Hearing held on 12/08/2015 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (115 pages). Court Reporter: Jeanne Anderson (E-mail: Jeanne_Anderson@mnd.uscourts.gov / Telephone: 651-848-1221). Redaction Request due 1/7/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/16/2016. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (JMA) Modified on 1/26/2016 (AKL).
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 421 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: 12/17/2015 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (JMA)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 420 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: 12/15/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Support by Elias Karkalas re [350] MOTION to Suppress Search and Seizure Evidence (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 419 Filed: 12/11/2015, Entered: 12/14/2015 Exhibit
                                                                                                                                                            EXHIBIT LIST as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 12/23/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 417 Filed: 12/10/2015, Entered: 12/10/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Joinder Motion to Join Certain Motions of Co-Defendants by Babubhai Patel. (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 418 Filed: 12/8/2015, Entered: 12/11/2015 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Motion Hearing as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati held on 12/8/2015: Non-Dispositive Motions 335, 336, 338, 341, 342, 343, 344, 345, 346, 347, 348, 349, 351, 354, 355, 356, 357, 358, 359, 360, 362, 366, 367, 368, 369, 370, 371, 373, 378, 403 taken under advisement 12/8/2015. Order to be issued; Dispositive Motions 337, 339, 340, 350, 352, 353, 361, 365, 372, 376, 377, 379, 380, 395 require additional briefing. Defendant Additional Briefing due 12/22/2015. Government Additional Briefing due/Taken Under Advisement date 12/31/2015. R&R Issue Date 2/1/2016. Government is to serve and file (under seal) a letter to defendants regarding disclosure of Brady material by December 22, 2015. Hearing on motion to suppress electronic surveillance evidence by defendant Oz (2) (Doc. No. 364) continued to a date to be determined. Government to submit brief on motion to produce witness to testify at the hearing (Doc. No. 370) by December 22, 2015. Defendant Oz's response due December 31, 2015. (LPH)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 416 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/9/2015 Plea Agreement
                                                                                                                                                                  PLEA AGREEMENT as to Jonathan Wall. (JDF) Document QC'd by JGK on 12/23/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 415 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 Change of Plea Hearing and Plea EnteredCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Change of Plea Hearing as to Jonathan Wall held on 12/7/2015. Plea entered by Jonathan Wall (4) Guilty as to Count 1. Presentence Investigation and Report requested. Defendant continued on bond under the existing conditions of release. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 414 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER OF APPEARANCE FOR MOTION HEARING by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (Schneck, Paul) Modified text on 12/7/2015 (MKG).
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 413 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: 12/7/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Waiver of Appearance by Babubhai Patel re [348] MOTION for Disclosure Early Disclosure of Post Conspiracy Statements of Co-Defendants, [344] MOTION to Retain Rough Notes , [347] MOTION for Compliance for Early Compliance with the Jencks Act, [349] MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Evidence Favorable to the Defendant, [345] MOTION for Disclosure Early Disclosure of the Identity of Government Trial Witnesses, [346] MOTION to Require Early Notice of Rule 404(b) Evidence, [351] MOTION for Disclosure the Identity of Confidential Sources and Informants, [343] MOTION for Disclosure of Wire Taps and Other Recorded or Otherwise Memorialized Statements of Defendant (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 412 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Intent to Call Defendant at Motions Hearing by Elias Karkalas (Brink, John)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 411 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: 12/3/2015 Release Status Report to the Court
                                                                                                                                                                            Release Status Report to the Court as to Jonathan Wall. (CLL)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 409 Filed: 11/30/2015, Entered: 12/1/2015 Order For Appearance of Defendant and Transportation expensesCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [408] REQUEST FOR APPEARANCE OF DEFENDANT AND FOR TRANSPORTATION EXPENSES PURSUANT TO 18:4285 as to Elias Karkalas (8). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/30/15. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 408 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015, Terminated: 11/30/2015 Request for Travel Authorization
                                                                                                                                                                                REQUEST FOR TRAVEL AUTHORIZATION by Elias Karkalas. (Brink, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 407 Filed: 11/25/2015, Entered: 11/25/2015, Terminated: 11/25/2015 Request for Travel Authorization
                                                                                                                                                                                  DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR - WILL REFILE. REQUEST FOR TRAVEL AUTHORIZATION by Elias Karkalas. (Brink, John) Modified on 11/25/2015 (KNK).
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 406 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Moran Oz re [376] MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 405 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 ~Notice (other)
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Intent to Call Witnesses by USA as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 403 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 ~Motion to Seal Document
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Seal Document 401, 402 by USA as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 400 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [380] MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment, [340] MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State an Offense, [377] MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-83 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A, # (2) Exhibit(s) B, # (3) Exhibit(s) C)(Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 399 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [380] MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment, [339] MOTION to Dismiss as Void for Vagueness, [379] MOTION to Dismiss Counts as Constitutionally Void for Vagueness (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 398 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz re [373] MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 397 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz re [372] MOTION to Strike Prejudicial Surplusage from Indictment (Attachments: # (1) Unpublished Report)(Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 396 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [353] MOTION to Dismiss for Raley Due Process Violation (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 395 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-72 by USA as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas. (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 394 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [352] MOTION to Suppress Statements of Defendant (Attachments: # (1) Att. 1, # (2) Att. 2, # (3) Att. 3, # (4) Att. 4, # (5) Att. 5, # (6) Att. 6, # (7) Att. 7, # (8) Att. 8, # (9) Att. 9)(Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 393 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Moran Oz re [368] MOTION for Release of Brady Materials , [366] MOTION to Retain Rough Notes , [378] MOTION for Pretrial Discovery Order , [367] MOTION for Disclosure of 404 Evidence (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 392 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [337] MOTION to Sever Defendant , [361] MOTION to Sever Defendant (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 391 Filed: 11/23/2015, Entered: 11/23/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Moran Oz re [365] MOTION to Suppress Statements, Admissions and Answers (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 390 Filed: 11/22/2015, Entered: 11/22/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [350] MOTION to Suppress Search and Seizure Evidence (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 389 Filed: 11/22/2015, Entered: 11/22/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [341] MOTION to Preserve Rough Notes, [336] MOTION for Discovery , [335] MOTION for Disclosure of Codefendant Statements and for a Pretrial Hearing to Determine Admissibility, [342] MOTION to Suppress Electronic Surveillance Evidence (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 388 Filed: 11/22/2015, Entered: 11/22/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Babubhai Patel re [348] MOTION for Disclosure Early Disclosure of Post Conspiracy Statements of Co-Defendants, [344] MOTION to Retain Rough Notes , [347] MOTION for Compliance for Early Compliance with the Jencks Act, [349] MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Evidence Favorable to the Defendant, [345] MOTION for Disclosure Early Disclosure of the Identity of Government Trial Witnesses, [346] MOTION to Require Early Notice of Rule 404(b) Evidence, [351] MOTION for Disclosure the Identity of Confidential Sources and Informants, [343] MOTION for Disclosure of Wire Taps and Other Recorded or Otherwise Memorialized Statements of Defendant (Attachments: # (1) Jan. 22, 2015 Letter to Counsel)(Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 387 Filed: 11/22/2015, Entered: 11/22/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [360] MOTION to Retain Rough Notes and Evidence by Government Agents, [355] MOTION for Disclosure of 404 Evidence, [356] MOTION for Disclosure (Early) of Jencks Act Material, [354] MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Evidence Favorable to the Defendant, [362] MOTION for Disclosure Post Conspiracy Statements of Codefendants, [358] MOTION for Discovery (Attachments: # (1) Jan. 22, 2015 Letter to Counsel)(Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 386 Filed: 11/19/2015, Entered: 11/19/2015 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for US AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting [385] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Jacqueline Blaesi-Freed for USA. Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/19/2015. (JLW)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 385 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: 11/18/2015, Terminated: 11/19/2015 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney Jacqueline Blaesi-Freed by USA as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 384 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/6/2015 Order on Motion for ContinuanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER that Defendant Jonathan Wall's motion to extend motion cut-off date (Doc. No. [383]) is GRANTED. Defendant Wall shall file motions in this case by November 20, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/5/15. (LEG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 383 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: 11/5/2015, Terminated: 11/5/2015 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Amended MOTION for Continuance of Motion Cut-Off Date by Jonathan Wall. (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service) (Odom, Wendell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 11/4/2015, Entered: 11/4/2015, Terminated: 11/5/2015 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//WILL BE RE-FILED//MOTION for Continuance of Motion Cut-Off Date by Jonathan Wall. Certificate of Service attached to filing. (Odom, Wendell) Modified text on 11/5/2015 (JDF). Modified text on 11/5/2015 (JDF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 381 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                DECLARATION Discovery and Outline of Pretrial Motions by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [360] MOTION to Retain Rough Notes and Evidence by Government Agents, [359] MOTION for Joinder Motion to Dismiss and other Motions of Codefendants, [380] MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment, [355] MOTION for Disclosure of 404 Evidence, [356] MOTION for Disclosure (Early) of Jencks Act Material, [354] MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Evidence Favorable to the Defendant, [362] MOTION for Disclosure Post Conspiracy Statements of Codefendants, [379] MOTION to Dismiss Counts as Constitutionally Void for Vagueness, [361] MOTION to Sever Defendant , [357] MOTION for Disclosure and Make Informant Available for Interview, [358] MOTION for Discovery (Schneck, Paul) Modified text on 11/4/2015 (JDF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 380 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 3/28/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 3/28/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss Counts as Constitutionally Void for Vagueness by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 378 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Pretrial Discovery Order by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 3/28/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Counts 61-83 by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 376 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 3/28/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitous Counts by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 375 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM in Support by Moran Oz re [369] MOTION for Disclosure of Government Informants (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Moran Oz re [373] MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 373 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Bill of Particulars
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 372 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion to Strike
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Strike Prejudicial Surplusage from Indictment by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 371 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Produce Government Informant Paul Calder Le Roux and His Attorney at Trial by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 370 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 1/15/2016 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Produce Government Informant Paul Calder Le Roux for Motion Hearing by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 369 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Disclosure of Government Informants by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 368 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Release of Brady Materials
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Release of Brady Materials by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 367 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Disclosure of 404 Evidence by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 366 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion to Retain Rough Notes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Retain Rough Notes by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 365 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Suppress Statements, Admissions and Answers by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 364 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Suppress Electronic Surveillance by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 363 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Declaration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RULE 12.1 NOTICE AND SUMMARY OF PRETRIAL MOTIONS by Moran Oz (Richman, Robert) Modified text on 11/4/2015 (JDF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Disclosure Post Conspiracy Statements of Codefendants by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 3/9/2016 Motion to Sever Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Sever Defendant by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 360 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion to Retain Rough Notes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Retain Rough Notes and Evidence by Government Agents by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Joinder Motion to Dismiss and other Motions of Codefendants by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 358 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Discovery by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 357 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Disclosure and Make Informant Available for Interview by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 356 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Disclosure (Early) of Jencks Act Material by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 355 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Disclosure of 404 Evidence by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 354 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Evidence Favorable to the Defendant by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 353 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 3/28/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Dismiss for Raley Due Process Violation by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 352 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 3/9/2016 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Suppress Statements of Defendant by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 351 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Disclosure the Identity of Confidential Sources and Informants by Babubhai Patel. (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 350 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Suppress Search and Seizure Evidence by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 349 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion to Compel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Compel Disclosure of Evidence Favorable to the Defendant by Babubhai Patel. (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 348 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Disclosure Early Disclosure of Post Conspiracy Statements of Co-Defendants by Babubhai Patel. (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 347 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Compliance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Compliance for Early Compliance with the Jencks Act by Babubhai Patel. (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 346 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion to Require
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Require Early Notice of Rule 404(b) Evidence by Babubhai Patel. (Toder, Brian) Modified event and text on 11/4/2015 (MKG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 345 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Disclosure Early Disclosure of the Identity of Government Trial Witnesses by Babubhai Patel. (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 344 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion to Retain Rough Notes
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Retain Rough Notes by Babubhai Patel. (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 343 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Disclosure of Wire Taps and Other Recorded or Otherwise Memorialized Statements of Defendant by Babubhai Patel. (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 342 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion to Suppress
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Suppress Electronic Surveillance Evidence by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 341 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion to Preserve
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Preserve Rough Notes by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 3/28/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State an Offense by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 339 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 3/28/2016 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Dismiss as Void for Vagueness by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 338 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion to Produce
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Produce Informants by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 337 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 3/9/2016 Motion to Sever Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Sever Defendant by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 336 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Discovery by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 335 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015, Terminated: 12/17/2015 Motion for Disclosure
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Disclosure of Codefendant Statements and for a Pretrial Hearing to Determine Admissibility by Elias Karkalas. (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 334 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: 11/3/2015 Request for Discovery
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REQUEST FOR DISCOVERY and Other Pretrial Demands as to Elias Karkalas (Gerdts, Daniel)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 333 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Order - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Oral ORDER in case as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna ruling on modifications to the schedule for filing and responding to motions by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 10/08/2015. See minutes at [332] for specifics. (las)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: 10/9/2015 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Status Conference as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna held on 10/8/2015. The Court ordered modifications to the schedule for filing and responding to motion. These minutes constitute an order of the Court. Text only order needed. (Court Reporter Jeanne Anderson) (las)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 331 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Letter to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Babubhai Patel (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 330 Filed: 10/7/2015, Entered: 10/7/2015 Letter to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Regarding Status Conference Agenda by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 329 Filed: 10/6/2015, Entered: 10/6/2015 Letter to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Concerning Status Conference by Moran Oz (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 326 Filed: 10/5/2015, Entered: 10/5/2015 Letter to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Re: Status Conference Agenda by USA as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 325 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: 9/30/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [324] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Moran Oz (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/30/15. (kt)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 324 Filed: 9/29/2015, Entered: 9/29/2015, Terminated: 9/30/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Third MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 323 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: 9/22/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [322] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Elias Karkalas (8). The Court's bench warrant issued September 11, 2015 (Doc. 318), is withdrawn. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/22/15. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 322 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: 9/21/2015, Terminated: 9/22/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by USA as to Elias Karkalas. (DOCUMENT FILED IN ERROR//Attachments: # (1) Draft Order) (Marks, Linda) Modified text on 9/22/2015 (JDF).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 321 Filed: 9/18/2015, Entered: 9/18/2015 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 9/14/2015 as to Elias Karkalas. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 9/30/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 320 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: 9/15/2015 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna: Status Conference set for 10/8/2015 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/15/15. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 319 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: Telephone Conference as to Elias Karkalas held on 9/11/2015 (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 318 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Warrant IssuedCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Bench Warrant Issued as to Elias Karkalas by Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (MKG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 317 Filed: 9/11/2015, Entered: 9/11/2015 Order on Petition re: Pretrial ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [316] Petition re: Violation of Pretrial Release as to Elias Karkalas (8). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 09/11/2015. Clerk to issue warrant. (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 315 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: 9/9/2015 Telephone ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Telephone Conference as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna held on 9/9/2015. Motions are due to be filed on or before October 30, 2015. The motion hearing is scheduled for December 8, 2015. A trial date in June 2016 was discussed. The Court later set a date certain for trial of June 6, 2016. (Court Reporter Kristine Mousseau) (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 314 Filed: 8/18/2015, Entered: 8/18/2015 Notice of Hearing.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice of Rescheduling Teleconference: The teleconference will be held on September 9, 2015 at 2:00 pm central time. Dial-in information will be provided before the call. (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 313 Filed: 7/30/2015, Entered: 7/30/2015 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice of Re-Setting Hearing as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna: Telephone Conference now set for 8/14/2015 at 11:00 AM before Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Note change in time. (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 312 Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: 7/24/2015 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice of Setting Telephone Conference as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna: Telephone Conference set for 8/14/2015 at 02:00 PM central time with Judge Susan Richard Nelson and Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Instructions to join the Telephone Conference were sent via email on July 24. (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 311 Filed: 7/16/2015, Entered: 7/16/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [309] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Moran Oz (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/16/15. (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 310 Filed: 7/14/2015, Entered: 7/14/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz re [309] Second MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 309 Filed: 7/9/2015, Entered: 7/9/2015, Terminated: 7/16/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Second MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 308 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Returned Search/Seizure Warrant Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Search Warrant Returned Executed on 3/16/2015 as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 6/26/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 307 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Returned Search/Seizure Warrant Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Search Warrant Returned Executed on 3/16/2015 as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 6/26/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 306 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Returned Search/Seizure Warrant Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Search Warrant Returned Executed on 3/16/2015 as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 6/26/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 305 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Returned Search/Seizure Warrant Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Search Warrant Returned Executed on 3/16/2015 as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 6/26/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 304 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Returned Search/Seizure Warrant Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Search Warrant Returned Executed on 4/27/2015 as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 6/26/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 303 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Returned Search/Seizure Warrant Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Search Warrant Returned Executed on 3/16/2015 as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 6/26/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 302 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Returned Search/Seizure Warrant Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Search Warrant Returned Executed on 3/16/2015 as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 6/26/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 301 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Returned Search/Seizure Warrant Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Search Warrant Returned Executed on 3/16/2015 as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 6/26/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 300 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Returned Search/Seizure Warrant Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Search Warrant Returned Executed on 3/16/2015 as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (AKL) Modified filed date on 6/22/2015 (AKL). Document QC'd by JGK on 6/26/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 299 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: 6/22/2015 Returned Search/Seizure Warrant Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Search Warrant Returned Executed on 3/16/2015 as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (AKL) Modified filed date on 6/22/2015 (AKL). Document QC'd by JGK on 6/26/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 298 Filed: 6/4/2015, Entered: 6/4/2015 Order on Motion for ContinuanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [297] Motion for Continuance as to Onochie Aghaegbuna (10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 6/4/15. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 297 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015, Terminated: 6/4/2015 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Continuance of Motion Filing Deadline by Onochie Aghaegbuna. (Becker, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 6/2/2015, Entered: 6/2/2015 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. Motions shall be filed on or before October 30, 2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 6/2/15. (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 295 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: 5/26/2015 Order on Motion for ContinuanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [293] Motion for Continuance as to Moran Oz (2), Babubhai Patel (3), Jonathan Wall (4), Elias Karkalas (8), Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9). Motions due by 11/1/2015, Motion Hearing set for 12/8/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 5/26/15. (AKL) Modified text on 5/27/2015 (MKG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 294 Filed: 5/22/2015, Entered: 5/22/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by USA as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [293] MOTION for Continuance of Motions Schedule (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 293 Filed: 5/19/2015, Entered: 5/19/2015, Terminated: 5/26/2015 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Continuance of Motions Schedule by Moran Oz as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 292 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: 4/21/2015 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER granting [291] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Theresa M Bevilacqua withdrawn from case as to Omer Bezalel (7). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 4/21/15. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 291 Filed: 4/21/2015, Entered: 4/21/2015, Terminated: 4/21/2015 Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Theresa M. Bevilacqua by Omer Bezalel. (Bevilacqua, Theresa)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 290 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: 4/14/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [287] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Onochie Aghaegbuna (10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 4/14/15. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 289 Filed: 4/10/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Onochie Aghaegbuna re [287] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release and Request for a Hearing (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 288 Filed: 4/9/2015, Entered: 4/10/2015 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [286] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Douglas B Altman withdrawn from case as to Omer Bezalel (7). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 4/9/15. (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 287 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015, Terminated: 4/14/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release and Request for a Hearing by Onochie Aghaegbuna. (Olson, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 286 Filed: 4/8/2015, Entered: 4/8/2015, Terminated: 4/9/2015 Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Douglas Altman by Omer Bezalel. (Altman, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 285 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous ReliefCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting [284] Motion for Order Requiring Apple, Inc. to Assist in the Execution of a Search Warrant Issued by this Court as to Alon Berkman (1), Moran Oz (2), Babubhai Patel (3), Jonathan Wall (4), Shai Reuven (5), Lachlan Scott McConnell (6), Omer Bezalel (7), Elias Karkalas (8), Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9), Onochie Aghaegbuna (10), Eyad Mahrouq (11). Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 4/3/15. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/29/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 284 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015, Terminated: 4/6/2015 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            APPLICATION for ORDER REQUIRING APPLE, INC. TO ASSIST IN THE EXECUTION OF A SEARCH WARRANT ISSUED BY THIS COURT by USA as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/29/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Application for Search/Seizure WarrantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application by Plaintiff USA for Search Warrant for APPLE I-PHONE 5 & SIM CARD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/12/15. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/13/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 282 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Application for Search/Seizure WarrantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application by Plaintiff USA for Search Warrant for SAMSUNG GT-19300 CELLULAR TELEPHONE & "ORANGE" SIM CARD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/12/15. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/15/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 281 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Application for Search/Seizure WarrantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Application by Plaintiff USA for Search Warrant for BLACKBERRY BOLD CELLULAR TELEPHONE & SIM CARD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/12/15. (MKG) Modified text on 4/6/2015 (MKG). Modified text on 4/8/2015 (MKG). Document QC'd by JGK on 4/15/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 280 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Application for Search/Seizure WarrantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Application by Plaintiff USA for Search Warrant for IBM THINKPAD COMPUTER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/12/15. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/15/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 279 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Application for Search/Seizure WarrantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Application by Plaintiff USA for Search Warrant for APPLE IPAD COMPUTER 16 GB. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/12/15. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/16/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 278 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Application for Search/Seizure WarrantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Application by Plaintiff USA for Search Warrant for ADATA SD HC 16 GB MEMORY CARD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/12/15. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/16/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 277 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Application for Search/Seizure WarrantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Application by Plaintiff USA for Search Warrant for TELEPHONE SIM CARD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/12/15. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/16/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 276 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Application for Search/Seizure WarrantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Application by Plaintiff USA for Search Warrant for TELEPHONE MICRO USIM CARD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/12/15. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/16/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 275 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Application for Search/Seizure WarrantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Application by Plaintiff USA for Search Warrant for WD MY PASSPORT HARD DRIVE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/12/15. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/16/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 274 Filed: 4/6/2015, Entered: 4/6/2015 Application for Search/Seizure WarrantCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Application by Plaintiff USA for Search Warrant for SEALIFE DC1400 DIGITAL/HD CAMERA. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 3/12/15. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 4/16/2015 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: 4/3/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER denying [267] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Elias Karkalas (8). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 3/16/15. (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Judgment (Clerk's Office)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    JUDGMENT as to Omer Bezalel.. (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 271 Filed: 3/25/2015, Entered: 3/25/2015 Order on Motion for Forfeiture of BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [269] Motion for Forfeiture of Bond as to Omer Bezalel (7). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 3/24/15. (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 270 Filed: 3/24/2015, Entered: 3/24/2015 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by Omer Bezalel re [269] MOTION for Forfeiture of Bond and Entry of Judgment (Altman, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 269 Filed: 3/16/2015, Entered: 3/16/2015, Terminated: 3/25/2015 Motion for Forfeiture of Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Forfeiture of Bond and Entry of Judgment by USA as to Omer Bezalel. (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 268 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: 3/13/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [267] Fourth MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 267 Filed: 3/10/2015, Entered: 3/10/2015, Terminated: 4/3/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Fourth MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Elias Karkalas. (Brink, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 263 Filed: 2/24/2015, Entered: 2/24/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER granting [262] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Moran Oz (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 2/24/15. (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 262 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: 2/20/2015, Terminated: 2/24/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release re Recharging GPS Monitor by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 261 Filed: 2/11/2015, Entered: 2/11/2015 Passport Receipt/Surrender
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Receipt for Return of Passports by Attorney William J. Mauzy as to Eyad Mahrouq - Passport Number 4011 issued by the United States of America and Passport Number 4117 issued by Jordan. (las) Document QC'd on 2/18/2015 (las).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 260 Filed: 2/10/2015, Entered: 2/10/2015 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [258] Motion to Dismiss as to Eyad Mahrouq (11). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 2/10/15. (MKG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 259 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        SECOND ORDER granting in part and denying in part [254] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Onochie Aghaegbuna (10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 2/9/15. (AKL) Modified on 2/10/2015 (AKL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 258 Filed: 2/9/2015, Entered: 2/9/2015, Terminated: 2/10/2015 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Unopposed by USA as to Eyad Mahrouq. (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 257 Filed: 2/6/2015, Entered: 2/6/2015 Letter re: withdrawal of document
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Letter re: withdrawal of document re [253] MOTION for Continuance of Motions and Hearing Dates from John C. Brink by Elias Karkalas (Brink, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 256 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Support by Onochie Aghaegbuna re [254] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Olson, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 255 Filed: 2/3/2015, Entered: 2/3/2015 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Onochie Aghaegbuna re [254] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 254 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 1/30/2015, Terminated: 2/9/2015 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Onochie Aghaegbuna. (Olson, Douglas)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 253 Filed: 1/30/2015, Entered: 1/30/2015, Terminated: 2/6/2015 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Continuance of Motions and Hearing Dates by Elias Karkalas. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Declaration of Discovery Attorney) (Brink, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 252 Filed: 1/13/2015, Entered: 1/14/2015 Order on Motion for ContinuanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [251] Motion for Continuance as to Moran Oz (2), Babubhai Patel (3), Jonathan Wall (4), Omer Bezalel (7), Elias Karkalas (8), Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9), Onochie Aghaegbuna (10), Eyad Mahrouq (11). Motions due by 6/2/2015, Motion Hearing set for 8/12/2015 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 1/13/15. (AKL) Modified text on 1/15/2015 (MKG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015, Terminated: 1/13/2015 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Continuance of Motions Schedule by Moran Oz as to Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Omer Bezalel, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Declaration of Coordinating Discovery Attorney) (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 250 Filed: 1/9/2015, Entered: 1/9/2015 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. (LEG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 249 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            DIGITAL AUDIO RECORDING TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on September 9, 2014 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes as to Omer Bezalel. (28 pages) Transcriber: Carla Bebault (E-mail: Carla_Bebault@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1220). Redaction Request due 1/29/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/9/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/8/2015. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (CRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 248 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: 1/8/2015 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript as to Omer Bezalel. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (CRB)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 247 Filed: 12/18/2014, Entered: 12/18/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Document. (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 246 Filed: 12/11/2014, Entered: 12/15/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Document. (LEG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 245 Filed: 12/10/2014, Entered: 12/11/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    CJA 20 as to Omer Bezalel: Appointment of Attorney Douglas B. Altman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/5/2014. (ALM) Modified text on 12/12/2014 (ALM).DOCUMENT QC'D ON 12/12/14 LGL Modified on 12/12/2014 (LGL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 244 Filed: 12/5/2014, Entered: 12/5/2014 Order Appointing AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL as to Omer Bezalel. Theresa M Bevilacqua for Omer Bezalel appointed as second chair. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/2/14. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 12/19/2014 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 243 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: 12/4/2014 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER FOR APPOINTMENT OF SUBSTITUTE COUNSEL: The Court directs that Douglas Altman, a member of the CJA Conflicts Panel, be appointed as substitute counsel to continue the representation of the defendant before this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 12/3/14. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Certificate of Service on Proposed Order by Omer Bezalel re [241] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Appointment of Substitute Counsel by Mark D. Larsen . (Larsen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 241 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: 12/1/2014, Terminated: 12/3/2014 Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney and for Appointment of Substitute Counsel by Mark D. Larsen by Omer Bezalel. (Larsen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 240 Filed: 11/26/2014, Entered: 11/26/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Onochie Aghaegbuna. (Becker, James)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 239 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Order Modifying Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Order Modifying Conditions of Release and Bond as to Onochie Aghaegbuna the Order Setting Conditions of Release and Appearance Bond are modified to change the type of bond required from $25,000 secured bond to $25,000 unsecured bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/17/14. (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 238 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Order on Motion to Withdraw as AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ONLY ORDER - granting [231] Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. P Chinedu Nwaneri withdrawn from case as to Onochie Aghaegbuna (10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/17/14. (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 237 Filed: 11/17/2014, Entered: 11/18/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Motion Hearing as to Onochie Aghaegbuna held on 11/17/2014; Defendants Attorneys Motion to Withdraw as Counsel (Doc. No. 231), is GRANTED as stated on the record. The Federal Defenders Office is appointed to represent Defendant. The matter is referred to the Federal Defender for attorney appointment; Text only order needed.(Tape #11/17/14 (10:43 - 11:15)) (JDF)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/14/2014 Order on Motion to Exclude Time/Speedy TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [234] Motion to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Babubhai Patel (3), Onochie Aghaegbuna (10). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 11/13/14. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 235 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014 Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE to Motion by Babubhai Patel re [234] MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act (Toder, Brian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 234 Filed: 11/13/2014, Entered: 11/13/2014, Terminated: 11/13/2014 Motion to Exclude Time/Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by USA as to Babubhai Patel, Onochie Aghaegbuna. (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 233 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Certificate Of Service.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Certificate of Service by Onochie Aghaegbuna re [231] MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Onochie Aghaegbuna (10) by P. Chinedu Nwaneri, [232] Notice of Withdrawal from Case . (Nwaneri, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 232 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014 Notice of Withdrawal from Case
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF HEARING on MOTION TO WITH FROM CASE as to Onochie Aghaegbuna (Nwaneri, P) Modified text on 11/4/2014 (MKG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 231 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: 11/3/2014, Terminated: 11/17/2014 Motion for Withdrawal as Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Onochie Aghaegbuna (10) by P. Chinedu Nwaneri by Onochie Aghaegbuna. (Nwaneri, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 230 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: 10/30/2014 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting [221] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Elias Karkalas (8) (See Order for Full Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 10/29/14. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 229 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 09/17/2014 before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes as to Elias Karkalas. (19 pages) Transcriber: Lori Simpson (E-mail: Lori_Simpson@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5104). Redaction Request due 11/14/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/24/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/22/2015. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (LAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 228 Filed: 10/24/2014, Entered: 10/24/2014 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript as to Elias Karkalas. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (LAS)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 225 Filed: 10/22/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [221] Third MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Legal Document 224 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sealed Document. (LEG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 223 Filed: 10/21/2014, Entered: 10/22/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Document. (LEG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 222 Filed: 10/16/2014, Entered: 10/17/2014 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER OF DETENTION as to Babubhai Patel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 10/15/14. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 221 Filed: 10/15/2014, Entered: 10/15/2014, Terminated: 10/30/2014 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Third MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Elias Karkalas. (Brink, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 220 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER granted in part and denied in part [214] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Moran Oz (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 10/6/14. (MKG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 219 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/7/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Motion Hearing as to Moran Oz held on 10/6/2014. MOTION [147] to Modify Conditions of Release GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Order to be Issued. (Court Reporter: Ron Moen) (MKG) Modified text on 10/8/2014 (MKG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: 10/6/2014 Order on Motion to Exclude Time/Speedy TrialCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting [217] Motion to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Alon Berkman (1), Moran Oz (2), Babubhai Patel (3), Jonathan Wall (4), Shai Reuven (5), Lachlan Scott McConnell (6), Omer Bezalel (7), Elias Karkalas (8), Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9), Onochie Aghaegbuna (10), Eyad Mahrouq (11). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 10/6/14. (AKL) Modified on 10/9/2014 (AKL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 217 Filed: 10/5/2014, Entered: 10/5/2014, Terminated: 10/6/2014 Motion to Exclude Time/Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by Moran Oz as to Moran Oz, Jonathan Wall, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Eyad Mahrouq. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 10/3/2014, Entered: 10/3/2014 Response in OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz re [214] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release and Notice of Hearing on October 6, 2014 at 1:00 PM Before Magistrate Judge Keyes (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s))(Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 215 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: 10/1/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF HEARING on [214] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Moran Oz: Motion Hearing set for 10/6/2014 01:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 214 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014, Terminated: 10/6/2014 Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release and Notice of Hearing on October 6, 2014 at 1:00 PM Before Magistrate Judge Keyes by Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 Scheduling ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Scheduling Conference as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq held on 9/29/2014. Counsel present; Order to be issued. (Court Reporter Ron Moen) (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 213 Filed: 9/22/2014, Entered: 9/30/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  CJA 20 as to Babubhai Patel: Appointment of Attorney Brian Toder. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/18/14. (LEG)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 10/7/14 LGL Modified on 10/7/2014 (LGL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 227 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appearance Bond Entered as to Onochie Aghaegbuna in amount of $25,000 Secured Bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/18/14. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 12/19/2014 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 226 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 10/23/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Onochie Aghaegbuna. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/18/14. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 12/19/2014 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Arraignment as to Onochie Aghaegbuna (10) Count 1,5,24,28,49,84 held on 9/19/2014. Counsel Present; Not Guilty Plea Entered. A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL TAKE PLACE SEPTEMBER 29, 2014, 9:30 A.M., CTRM 6A STP, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JEFFREY J. KEYES. Counsel to be notified of dates by separate order. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 210 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Arraignment as to Babubhai Patel (3) Count 1,2,3-23,24,25-46,47-60,61-72,73-83,84 held on 9/19/2014. Counsel Present; Not Guilty Plea Entered. A SCHEDULING CONFERENCE WILL TAKE PLACE SEPTEMBER 29, 2014, 9:30 A.M., CTRM 6A STP, BEFORE MAGISTRATE JUDGE JEFFREY J. KEYES. Counsel to be notified of dates after the scheduling conference by separate order. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 209 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/23/2014 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Detention Hearing as to Onochie Aghaegbuna held on 9/19/2014. Bond [Sucured] set in the amount of $25,000 with conditions, see Order Setting Conditions of Release. Defendant also arraigned see separate minutes. (LEG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 208 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 9/16/2014 as to Babubhai Patel. (LEG)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 9/23/14 LGL Modified on 9/23/2014 (LGL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 207 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/22/2014 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Detention Hearing as to Babubhai Patel held on 9/19/2014. Deft Ordered Detained - Govt to submit proposed order. Defendant to be detained at FCI-Milan, Michigan. Defendant also arraigned - see separate minutes. (LEG) Modified text on 9/23/2014 (LEG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Memorandum in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MEMORANDUM in Support by Onochie Aghaegbuna re [202] MOTION for Bond (Attachments: # (1) LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Nwaneri, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT in Support by Onochie Aghaegbuna re [202] MOTION for Bond Affidavit of Dr. Francis Oramalu (Nwaneri, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 204 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      AFFIDAVIT in Support by Onochie Aghaegbuna re [202] MOTION for Bond Affidavit of Apham Nnaji (Nwaneri, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 203 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014 Affidavit in Support of Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        AFFIDAVIT in Support by Onochie Aghaegbuna re [202] MOTION for Bond Affidavit of P. Chinedu Nwaneri, Esq. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) A)(Nwaneri, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 202 Filed: 9/19/2014, Entered: 9/19/2014, Terminated: 9/22/2014 Motion for Bond
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION for Bond by Onochie Aghaegbuna. (Nwaneri, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 199 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Appearance Bond Entered as to Elias Karkalas in amount of $25,000 rpr. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/17/14. (KNK) Modified text on 9/18/2014 (LEG). Document QC'd by JGK on 9/25/2014 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 198 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Elias Karkalas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/17/14. (KNK) Document QC'd by JGK on 9/25/2014 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Blank 197 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Order - Text OnlyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Oral ORDER in case as to Elias Karkalas ruling on motion: Defendants Second Motion to Modify Conditions of Release (Doc. No. 176), is GRANTED, as stated on the record. An Order setting conditions of release will be filed separately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/17/14. (KNK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Motion Hearing as to Elias Karkalas held on 9/17/2014 re [176] Second MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release filed by Elias Karkalas. (KNK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 195 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Babubhai Patel. (Roe, Katherian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Onochie Aghaegbuna - Detention/Arraignment Hearing set for 9/19/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/16/14. (KNK) Modified text on 10/6/2014 (MKG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 200 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Initial Appearance as to Onochie Aghaegbuna held on 9/16/2014; Counsel retained; Govt moves for/and temporary detention Ordered; ( Arraignment and Detention Hearing set for 9/19/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes.) (KNK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION as to Babubhai Patel: Arraignment/Detention Hearing set for 9/19/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/16/14. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/17/2014 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Initial Appearance as to Babubhai Patel held on 9/16/2014; counsel appointed. Gov't moves for and temporary detention is ordered. (Arraignment/Detention Hearing set for 9/19/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes) (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 9/16/2014, Entered: 9/16/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Onochie Aghaegbuna. (Nwaneri, P)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Defendant Information Sheet and/or Signature Page
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Unredacted Document - Power of Attorney with attached State of Minnesota Bail Bond as to Omer Bezalel. (MKG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 9/11/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER TO APPEAR as to Elias Karkalas. Defendant will be required to appear for Hearing set for 9/17/2014 11:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/11/14. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 189 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appearance Bond Entered as to Omer Bezalel in amount of $85,000 secured bond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/9/14. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 10/9/2014 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/12/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Omer Bezalel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/9/14. (MKG) Document QC'd by JGK on 10/9/2014 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 185 Filed: 9/9/2014, Entered: 9/10/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Motion Hearing as to Omer Bezalel held on 9/9/2014 re [175] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release. Motion GRANTED. Order Setting Conditions of Release issued; and Appearance Bond and acknowledgment of conditions of release executed by the defendant. Order to be issued. (MKG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: 9/5/2014 Order on Motion for ContinuanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER ON MOTIONS SCHEDULING AND NOTICE OF STATUS CONFERENCE - granting [172] Motion to Vacate, granting [177] Motion for Continuance and the alternative motion to dismiss the indictment is DENIED as to Moran Oz (2), Jonathan Wall (4), Omer Bezalel (7), Elias Karkalas (8), Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9) Eyad Mahrouq (11). Status Conference set for 9/29/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/4/14. (AKL) Modified text on 9/8/2014 (MKG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: 9/4/2014 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER/NOTICE OF HEARING re [175] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Omer Bezalel: Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 9/4/14. (AKL) Modified on 9/5/2014 (AKL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Moran Oz, Jonathan Wall, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [172] Joint MOTION to Vacate Pretrial Schedule and Convene Status Conference or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Indictment (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 9/2/2014, Entered: 9/2/2014 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [176] Second MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 9/1/2014, Entered: 9/1/2014 Reply to Response
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Omer Bezalel re [175] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release Reply to Dkt. No. 178 (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Letter from Rabbi Feller)(Larsen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Omer Bezalel re [175] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit(s) Transcript of July 17, 2014, detention hearing (Redacted))(Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: 8/29/2014, Terminated: 9/5/2014 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Continuance and Extension of Time to File Motions and for HearingThereon (Unopposed) by Eyad Mahrouq. (Orr, Cynthia)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014, Terminated: 9/17/2014 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Second MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Elias Karkalas. (Brink, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: 8/28/2014, Terminated: 9/9/2014 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Omer Bezalel. (Larsen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014 Affidavit
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AFFIDAVIT/WAIVER OF CONFLICT OF INTEREST vby Jonathan Wall re Waiver of Conflict of Interest by Moran Oz (Richman, Robert) Modified text on 8/28/2014 (LEG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 8/26/2014, Entered: 8/26/2014, Terminated: 9/5/2014 Motion to Vacate
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION to Vacate Pretrial Schedule and Convene Status Conference or, in the Alternative, to Dismiss Indictment by Moran Oz, Jonathan Wall, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Larsen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 8/20/2014, Entered: 8/20/2014 Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 5(c) (3) Documents Received from the Southern District of Florida as to Onochie Aghaegbuna; defendant arrested, appeared and detained 8/7/14. (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 8/26/2014 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 8/19/2014, Entered: 8/19/2014 Order on Motion for ContinuanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER CONTINUING MOTIONS DATE AND EXCLUDING TIME as to Alon Berkman (1), Moran Oz (2), Babubhai Patel (3), Jonathan Wall (4), Shai Reuven (5), Lachlan Scott McConnell (6), Omer Bezalel (7), Elias Karkalas (8), Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9), Onochie Aghaegbuna (10), Eyad Mahrouq (11) - GRANTING [165] Motion for Continuance and GRANTING [169] Motion to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Jonathan Wall (4). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 8/19/14. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: 8/15/2014, Terminated: 8/19/2014 Motion to Exclude Time/Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by Jonathan Wall. (Odom, Wendell)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 168 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TEXT ONLY ENTRY - ORDER denying without prejudice [146] Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Elias Karkalas (8). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 8/14/14. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Motion HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Motion Hearing as to Elias Karkalas held on 8/14/2014. Text only order to be issued.(Court Reporter Carla Bebault) (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 166 Filed: 8/14/2014, Entered: 8/14/2014 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice for US AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting [164] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney Roger J. Gural as to Alon Berkman (1), Moran Oz (2), Babubhai Patel (3), Jonathan Wall (4), Shai Reuven (5), Lachlan Scott McConnell (6), Omer Bezalel (7), Elias Karkalas (8), Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9), Onochie Aghaegbuna (10), Eyad Mahrouq (11). Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 8/14/13. (AKL) Modified text on 8/15/2014 (LEG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014, Terminated: 8/19/2014 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude Time and to Continue Motion Hearing and Trial Dates by Jonathan Wall. (Odom, Wendell) Modified text on 8/14/2014 (LEG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: 8/13/2014, Terminated: 8/14/2014 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of U.S. Government Attorney
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for U.S. Government Attorney by USA as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (Gural, Roger)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Response in Opposition
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [146] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 7/09/2014 before Judge Susan Richard Nelson as to Elias Karkalas. (36 pages) Court Reporter: Ron Moen (E-mail: Ron_Moen@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (651) 848-1222). Redaction Request due 9/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/10/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (RJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 8/12/2014, Entered: 8/12/2014 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript as to Elias Karkalas. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (RJM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Waiver-Other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      WAIVER of Conflict of Interest as to Moran Oz (AKL) Document QC'd by JGK on 8/26/2014 (JGK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Order on Motion to RevokeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: denying [153] Motion to Revoke as to Moran Oz (2); denying [154] Motion to Disqualify Counsel. The Court accepted the defendant's waiver of a conflict of interest and directs Mr. Richman toadvise Mr. Wall's new counsel to file his waiver within the next few days. (Court Reporter Heather Schuetz) (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 157 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE of Rescheduling of Hearing as to Elias Karkalas. Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2014 reset for 8/14/2014 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (JEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Blank 156 Filed: 8/11/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE OF HEARING on [146] MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release as to Elias Karkalas: Motion Hearing set for 8/15/2014 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. (JEP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 8/10/2014, Entered: 8/10/2014 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM in Opposition by Moran Oz re [153] MOTION to Revoke Release Order (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/11/2014 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 8/5/2014 as to Onochie Aghaegbuna. (AKL)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 8/19/14 LGL Modified on 8/19/2014 (LGL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014, Terminated: 8/11/2014 Motion to Disqualify Counsel
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Disqualify Counsel by USA as to Moran Oz. (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014, Terminated: 8/11/2014 Motion to Revoke
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Revoke Release Order by USA as to Moran Oz. (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 152 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: 8/8/2014 Sealed Document +
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Document.(las)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Moran Oz. (Richman, Robert)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 150 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014 Notice of Hearing.Court Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice of Setting Hearing as to Moran Oz: Hearing on [144] Government's Motion to Stay Release Order set for 8/11/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014, Terminated: 8/14/2014 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Elias Karkalas. (Brink, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: 8/6/2014 Order on Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER granting [144] Motion to Stay as to Moran Oz (2). Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 08/06/2014. (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: 8/6/2014, Terminated: 8/6/2014 Motion to StayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Emergency MOTION to Stay of Magistrate Judge's Release Order by USA as to Moran Oz. (Attachments: # (1) Transcript of Detention Hearing, # (2) Waiver of Detention) (Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014 Defendant Information Sheet and/or Signature Page
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Unredacted Power of Attorney with (Attachment: # (1) State of Minnesota Bail Bond Form) as to Moran OZ. (Filed in sealed red folder) (KNK) Modified on 8/12/2014 (KNK).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appearance Bond Entered as to Moran Oz in the amount of $200,000.00 secured by Goldberg Bonding. Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 8/5/14. (KNK)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 8/19/14 LGL Modified on 8/19/2014 (LGL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/7/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Moran Oz - Signed by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel on 8/5/14. (KNK) Modified on 8/7/2014 (KNK).DOCUMENT QC'D ON 8/19/14 LGL Modified on 8/19/2014 (LGL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/6/2014 Bond HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel: Bond Hearing as to Moran Oz held on 8/5/2014. Defendant released on $200,000 surety bond. (KMM)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Blank 142 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014 Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac ViceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TEXT ONLY ENTRY: ORDER granting [141] Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Wendell A Odom, Jr for Jonathan Wall as to Jonathan Wall (4) Approved by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 8/5/2014. (MAP)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/5/2014, Entered: 8/5/2014, Terminated: 8/5/2014 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Wendell Odom, Jr.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0864-4081283 by Jonathan Wall. (Ellis, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 140 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 Notice to AttorneyCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE TO ATTORNEY as to Moran Oz** a hearing on bond conditions is scheduled for August 5, 2014 at 3:30 p.m. in courtroom 9W before U.S. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (TMA)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 8/4/2014, Entered: 8/4/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REDACTED Version of previously filed TRANSCRIPT [130] Detention Hearing held on 7/17/2014 before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau as to Moran Oz, Omer Bezalel. (50 pages) Transcriber: Staci Heichert (E-mail: Staci_Heichert@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5105). (SAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Moran Oz. (Friedberg, Joseph)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 8/1/2014 Order on Motion for ContinuanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER granting [135] Motion for Continuance as to Elias Karkalas (8). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/31/14. (MKG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Statement of Facts in Support of Exclusion of Time/Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of Exclusion of Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by Elias Karkalas re [135] MOTION for Continuance of Motions Schedule Dates (Brink, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014, Terminated: 7/31/2014 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Continuance of Motions Schedule Dates by Elias Karkalas. (Brink, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Statement of Redaction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF REDACTION as to Omer Bezalel, re [130] Transcript. (Larsen, Mark) Modified text on 8/1/2014 (LEG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Notice of Intent to Request Redaction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Intent to Request Redaction as to Omer Bezalel re [130] Transcript. (Larsen, Mark) Modified text on 8/1/2014 (LEG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 7/31/2014, Entered: 7/31/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Jonathan Wall. (Ellis, Deborah)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Order on Motion forJoinderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER CONTINUING MOTIONS DATE AND EXCLUDING TIME as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. Granting [123] Motion for Joinder and granting [124] Motion to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Omer Bezalel. See Order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/30/14. (LEG)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 TranscriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TRANSCRIPT of Detention Hearing held on 7/17/2014 before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau as to Moran Oz, Omer Bezalel. (50 pages) Transcriber: Staci Heichert (E-mail: Staci_Heichert@mnd.uscourts.gov. Telephone: (612) 664-5105). Redaction Request due 8/20/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/2/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/28/2014. For information on redaction procedures, please review Local Rule 5.5. (SAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Notice of Filing of Official Transcript
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing of Official Transcript as to Moran Oz, Omer Bezalel. This filing has 1 transcript(s) associated with it. (SAH)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: 7/30/2014 Statement of Facts in Support of Exclusion of Time/Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of Exclusion of Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by Omer Bezalel re [123] MOTION for Joinder to Defendant Prabhakara Roa Tumpati's Motion to Continue Dates for Filing Motions and Date of Motion Hearing, [124] MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act (SUPPLEMENTAL) (Larsen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Certificate of Service on Proposed Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Certificate of Service on Proposed Order by Omer Bezalel re [123] MOTION for Joinder to Defendant Prabhakara Roa Tumpati's Motion to Continue Dates for Filing Motions and Date of Motion Hearing, [124] MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act . (Larsen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 Statement of Facts in Support of Exclusion of Time/Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of Exclusion of Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by Omer Bezalel re [124] MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act (Larsen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014, Terminated: 7/30/2014 Motion to Exclude Time/Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by Omer Bezalel. (Larsen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/29/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014, Terminated: 7/30/2014 ~Motion for Joinder
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Joinder to Defendant Prabhakara Roa Tumpati's Motion to Continue Dates for Filing Motions and Date of Motion Hearing by Omer Bezalel. (Larsen, Mark)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 7/23/2014, Entered: 7/29/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                CJA 20 as to Omer Bezalel: Appointment of Attorney Mark D. Larsen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/14/2014. (las)DOCUMENT QC'D ON 8/13/14 LGL Modified on 8/13/2014 (LGL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Second Amended Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 7/11/2014 as to Omer Bezalel. (AKL) Modified on 7/23/2014 (AKL).DOCUMENT QC'D ON 8/13/14 LGL Modified on 8/13/2014 (LGL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/22/2014 Warrant Returned Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Amended Bench Warrant Returned Executed on 7/11/2014 as to Moran Oz. (AKL) Modified on 7/23/2014 (AKL).DOCUMENT QC'D ON 8/13/14 LGL Modified on 8/13/2014 (LGL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 7/18/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Order on Motion for ContinuanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq - Granting [105] Motion for Continuance and granting [106] Motion to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (9). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 7/18/2014. See order for further details. (las) Modified text on 7/18/2014 (las).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Arraignment OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ARRAIGNMENT ORDER as to Moran Oz & Omer Bezalel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/17/2014. (las)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Detention Hearing as to Omer Bezalel held on 7/17/2014. Deft in custody of USM pending arrangement of release conditions and counsel instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Keyes' chambers regarding scheduling time for deft to sign bond papers. Deft also arraigned. See separate minutes. (las)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/18/2014 Detention HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Detention Hearing as to Moran Oz held on 7/17/2014. Deft in custody of USM pending arrangement of release conditions and counsel instructed to contact Magistrate Judge Keyes' chambers regarding scheduling time for deft to sign bond papers. Deft also arraigned. See separate minutes. (las)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Arraignment as to Moran Oz (2) Count 1,2,3-23,24,25-46,47-60,61-72,73-83 held on 7/17/2014. Counsel Present. Not Guilty Plea Entered. Disclosure due by 7/23/2014. Motions due by 8/1/2014. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Voir Dire due One Week Before Trial. Trial Date to be Determined before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: 7/17/2014 ArraignmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Arraignment as to Omer Bezalel (7) Count 1,5,8-23,24,31-46,52-60,66-72,77-83 held on 7/17/2014. Counsel present. Not Guilty Plea Entered. Disclosure due by 7/23/2014. Motions due by 8/1/2014. Motion Hearing set for 8/25/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A (STP) before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes. Voir Dire due One week before trial. Trial Date to be Determined before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 7/16/2014, Entered: 7/16/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Omer Bezalel. (Roe, Katherian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER OF PRELIMINARY DETENTION as to Omer Bezalel: Detention/Arraignment Hearing set for 7/17/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/14/14. (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/15/2014 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Initial Appearance as to Omer Bezalel held on 7/14/2014. Counsel to be appt'd. Gov't moved for and temporary detention is ordered. (Detention/Arraignment Hearing set for 7/17/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau) (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014 Order of DetentionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER OF PRELIMINARY DETENTION as to Moran Oz - Detention/Arraignment Hearing set for 7/17/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Signed by Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau on 7/14/14. (KNK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/14/2014, Entered: 7/14/2014 Initial AppearanceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau: Initial Appearance as to Moran Oz held on 7/14/2014; Joe Friedberg retained; Govt moves for/and temporary detention ordered; ( Arraignment and Detention Hearing set for 7/17/2014 09:30 AM in Courtroom 3C (STP) before Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau.) (KNK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/13/2014, Entered: 7/13/2014 Statement of Facts in Support of Exclusion of Time/Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            STATEMENT OF FACTS in Support of Exclusion of Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati re [106] MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/13/2014, Entered: 7/13/2014, Terminated: 7/18/2014 Motion to Exclude Time/Speedy Trial
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION to Exclude Time Under the Speedy Trial Act by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 7/13/2014, Entered: 7/13/2014, Terminated: 7/18/2014 Motion for Continuance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Continuance of Dates to File Motions and of Motion Hearing by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/13/2014, Entered: 7/13/2014 Letter to Magistrate Judge
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE Regarding Motion to Continue Motion Filing Dates and Date of Motion Hearing by Prabhakara Rao Tumpati (Schneck, Paul)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 BondCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Appearance Bond Entered as to Elias Karkalas in amount of $25,000 rpr. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/9/14. (LEG) Doc. QC'd on 7/23/2014 (LPH).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/10/2014 Order Setting Conditions of ReleaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Elias Karkalas. Signed by Judge Susan Richard Nelson on 7/9/14. (LEG) Doc. QC'd on 7/23/2014 (LPH).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: 7/9/2014 Order Re: Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision to District JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Susan Richard Nelson: granting [95] ORDER RE: APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge as to Elias Karkalas (8). (Court Reporter Ron Moen) (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 7/3/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 Response in OppositionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition by USA as to Elias Karkalas re [95] APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DECISION to District Judge (Attachments: # (1) Certificate of Service, # (2) Exhibit(s) Ex. 1, # (3) Exhibit(s) Ex. 2, # (4) Exhibit(s) Ex. 3, # (5) Exhibit(s) Ex. 4)(Marks, Linda)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 7/2/2014, Entered: 7/3/2014 CJA 20 AppointmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CJA 20 as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati: Appointment of Attorney Paul D. Schneck. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes on 6/30/14. (LEG) DOCUMENT QC'D ON 7/3/14 LGLModified on 7/3/2014 (LGL).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution - Defendant
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE/SUBSTITUTION for Prabhakara Rao Tumpati. (Roe, Katherian)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Attorney Appointment HearingCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jeffrey J. Keyes: Attorney Appointment Hearing as to Prabhakara Rao Tumpati held on 6/27/2014. Federal Defender's Office is appointed as counsel. No Order to be issued. (Court Reporter Ron Moen) (AKL)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 96 Filed: 6/27/2014, Entered: 6/27/2014 Notice of Hearing on MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY: NOTICE OF HEARING on [95] APPEAL/OBJECTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE DETENTION DECISION as to Elias Karkalas:Hearing set for 7/9/2014 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7B (STP) before Judge Susan Richard Nelson. (SMD)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 6/25/2014, Entered: 6/25/2014, Terminated: 7/9/2014 Appeal/Objection of Magistrate Judge Decision to District JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    APPEAL/OBJECTIONS of the Magistrate Judge Decision to the District Judge - Motion for Release from Custody Motion for Review of Magistrate Judge's Detention Order by Elias Karkalas. (Brink, John) Modified event and text on 6/27/2014 (MKG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank  Notice of Docketing Correction
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION: the NEF for document number 32 was regenerated as it did not have a legible signature. The document was rescanned and attached as to Eyad Mahrouq. (KNK) Modified text on 4/15/2014 (LEG).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Blank  Oral Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORAL ORDER by Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel sealing case as to Alon Berkman, Moran Oz, Babubhai Patel, Jonathan Wall, Shai Reuven, Lachlan Scott McConnell, Omer Michael Bezalel, Elias Karkalas, Prabhakara Rao Tumpati, Onochie Aghaegbuna, Eyad Mahrouq. (KNK)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 422 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?