Davidson v. Account Control Technology, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-14158
Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 31, 2016 at 7:59 PM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Karen Davidson, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kimmel & Silverman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig Thor Kimmel +1 215 540 8888 +1 215 540 8817 kimmel@creditlaw.com
v.
No Logo Account Control Technology Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Karen Davidson (Kimmel, Craig) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
    Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell: ELECTRONIC SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered. The Court having been advised on February 18, 2016 that the above-entitled action has been settled; IT IS ORDERED that this action is hereby dismissed without costs and without prejudice to the right of any party, upon good cause shown, to reopen the action within sixty (60) days if settlement is not consummated.(Russo, Noreen) (Entered: 02/19/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE of Settlement by Karen Davidson (Kimmel, Craig) (Entered: 02/18/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
        Summons Issued as to Account Control Technology, Inc.. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Franklin, Yvonne) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
          NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. (Halley, Taylor) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/17/2015, Entered: None
            COMPLAINT against Account Control Technology, Inc. Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-5893443 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Karen Davidson. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Category Form, # 3 Summons Packet)(Kimmel, Craig) (Entered: 12/17/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 98 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?