Adams v. Fanning
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-03868

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 3, 2019 at 1:51 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Thomas Adams, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas J. DeBacco +1 419 734 1528 +1 866 596 1073 debaccolaw@gmail.com
Space Kristopher K. Hill +1 419 734 1528 +1 866 596 1073 krishill7@gmail.com
Space Patrick L. Mancinetti, II +1 419 734 1528 +1 888 596 1073 patrickmancinetti@gmail.com

Represented by Abney Law Office, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Paul Stewart Abney +1 502 498 8585 stewart@abneylegal.com

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Michael T. Gallagher , +1 713 222 8080 +1 713 222 0066 shawnaf@gld-law.com

Represented by Fifth Floor

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Jeremiah W. Reece +1 402 459 4108 +1 502 459 4277 jeremiah@amkylaw.com

Represented by Napoli Bern Ripka Shkolnik LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Marissa Christina Langhoff +1 949 234 6032 +1 949 429 0892 MLanghoff@napolibern.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Jessica You Lee +1 949 234 6032 +1 949 429 0892 jlee@napolibern.com
, , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , , Hunter Jay Shkolnik +1 212 267 3700 +1 212 587 0031 hunter@napolibern.com

Represented by Shinbaum & Campbell

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, Richard D. Shinbaum +1 334 269 4440

Represented by Thomas Adams

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Thomas Adams
v.
No Logo Department of Army Agency, Defendant

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov
No Logo Eric Fanning, Defendant

Represented by att.net Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Benjamin R. Carlisle +1 202 514 9771 +1 202 514 8865 benjamin.carlisle@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Reuben S Schifman +1 202 305 4224 +1 202 305 0506 reuben.schifman@usdoj.gov

Represented by Judge Advocate General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , Holly Kathleen Shaver Bryant +1 703 693 0357 +1 703 806 0840 holly.k.bryant4.civ@mail.mil

Represented by Northern District of Ohio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , Erin Brizius +1 216 622 3670 +1 216 522 4982 erin.e.brizius2@usdoj.gov

Represented by U.S. Attorney's Office-NH

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, David Christopher Nelson +1 860 947 1101 +1 860 760 7979 David.C.Nelson@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Attorney's Office

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, AUSA USAILN.ECFAUSA@usdoj.gov

Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , , , , , Julia A. Berman +1 202 616 8480 +1 202 307 0442 julia.berman@usdoj.gov
, , , , , Alan David Greenberg +1 303 844 1366 +1 303 844 1350 alan.greenberg@usdoj.gov

Represented by US ATTY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
, , , , , , , Hilary W Frooman +1 217 492 4450 hilary.frooman@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 445 - Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: In furtherance of the Court's Minute entry of 6/1/16 11 requiring payment of the filing fee for this action by 6/17/16, no filing fee having been paid, and Plaintiff Thomas Adams' Letter to the Clerk of Court dated 6/15/16 12 requesting withdrawal of this action, this action is dismissed. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    LETTER from Tom R. Adams dated 06/17/2016. (nsf, ) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiff's letter dated May 25, 2016 [10 ] inquiring as to whether he may present evidence at the status hearing previously scheduled for June 14, 2016. Plaintiff is reminded, consistent with this Court's Order from May 23, 2016 denying his application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs and denying his motion for attorney representation 9, that he must pay the required filing fee for this action. The Court hereby extends the date by which the required filing fee must be paid until June 17, 2016. Failure to comply with this deadline will result in summary dismissal of the instant matter. Status set for June 14, 2016 is stricken. No status shall be set until Plaintiff pays the required filing fee and the complaint has been served on all the defendants. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        LETTER from Thomas R. Adams dated 5/25/16. (Exhibits) (kp, ) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ORDER: Plaintiff Thomas Adams ("Adams") filed an application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs 3 and a motion for attorney representation 4 on March 30, 2016. Subsequently, he filed the same documents on May 9, 2016. See 7, 8 . For the following reasons, Adams' application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs 8 and his motion for attorney representation 7 are denied. Thus, the March 30, 2016 application to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs 3 and the March 30, 2016 motion for attorney representation 4 are denied as moot. Signed by the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras on 5/23/2016. Mailed notice(vcf, ) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            APPLICATION by Plaintiff Thomas Adams to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs (Exhibits) (sr, ) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION by Plaintiff Thomas Adams for attorney representation (sr, ) (Entered: 05/10/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Charles P. Kocoras: Status hearing set for 6/14/2016 at 09:30 AM. At the initial hearing, parties to report the possibility of settlement. Lead counsel for each party is required to attend the initial hearing. Failure to appear at any scheduled court hearing may result in the dismissal of claims for want of prosecution. Pursuant to Local Rule 5.3(a)(1), service of motions and notice of motions must be accomplished no later than 4:00 p.m. of the third business day preceding the date of presentment. This includes delivering a hard copy of the motion and notice of motion to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B no later than 4:00 p.m. the day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the matter from the Court's motion call. The Court requires hard copies of all documents be submitted to Courtroom Deputy, Vettina Franklin at room 1744B the same day of filing. Failure to comply may result in the striking of the document from the record. The Court directs counsel's attention to its Motion Schedule and Case Management Procedures located at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Plaintiff is directed to advise all other parties of the Court's action herein. Mailed notice (vcf, ) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  NOTICE of Correction 1 (sr, ) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Attorney Representation
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION by Plaintiff Thomas Adams for attorney representation (sr, ) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          APPLICATION by Plaintiff Thomas Adams to proceed in District Court without prepaying fees or costs (Exhibits) (sr, ) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CIVIL Cover Sheet (sr, ) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              RECEIVED Complaint and 1 copy by Thomas Adams (Exhibits) (sr, ) (Main Document 1 replaced on 3/31/2016) (sr, ). (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 13 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?