Reginald Jones v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1308

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 4, 2017 at 6:39 PM EST (4.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

Nature of Suit 3371 - TORTS-Truth in Lending
  Entries (16) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/16/2016, Entered: None
Amended DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999856456] [16-1308] Justin Fine
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
    FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Reginald Jones. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 06/15/2016. [999853377] [16-1308] Jon Pels
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Blank 14 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None
      BRIEF by Appellant Reginald Jones in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 06/15/2016. [999853372] [16-1308] Jon Pels
        LREF
        Blank 13 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None
        Mediation conference data modified. [16-1308] (LP)
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None
          ORDER filed [999807485] updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 06/14/2016. Response brief due 07/19/2016 Copies to all parties.. [16-1308] (TF)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Blank 11 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None
            Initial mediation conference scheduled. [16-1308] (LP)
              LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Jon D. Pels for Reginald Jones.[999801915] [16-1308] Jon Pels
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Reginald Jones. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999801912] [16-1308] Jon Pels
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/22/2016, Entered: None
                  DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Reginald Jones. [16-1308] Jon Pels
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None
                    DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Attorney Jon D. Pels for Appellant Reginald Jones re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 04/25/2016 from Jon D. Pels, filing of disclosure form (Loc.R. 26.1), filing of docketing statement (Loc.R. 3(b)) Docketing statement due from Reginald Jones on 04/25/2016.. [16-1308] (TF)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                      DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999783235] [16-1308] Justin Fine
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                        APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Justin E. Fine for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..[999783225] [16-1308] Justin Fine
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/28/2016, Entered: None
                          APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Russell J. Pope for Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..[999783224] [16-1308] Justin Fine
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None
                            BRIEFING ORDER filed.. Opening Brief and Appendix due 05/02/2016. Response Brief due 06/06/2016 [16-1308] (TF)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None
                              DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 8:16-cv-00233-RWT.. [16-1308] (TF)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/23/2016, Entered: None
                                Case docketed. Originating case number: 8:16-cv-00233-RWT. Case manager: TFischer. [16-1308] (TF)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                  Statistics

                                  This case has been viewed 101 times.

                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                  Space
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                   
                                  PlainSite
                                  Sign Up
                                  Need Password Help?