USA v. Van Leeuwaarde et al
Criminal Case South Carolina District Court, Case No. 2:15-cr-00236
District Judge Richard M. Gergel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 13, 2017 at 1:13 AM EDT (4.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde, Defendant (1)

Toggle Switch Represented by FEDERAL DEFENDERS OF THE MD GA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Public Defender or Community Defender Appointment Alicia Vachira Penn +1 843 727 4148 alicia_penn@fd.org

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (33) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde: Bar Meeting set for 4/25/2016 10:00 AM cancelled and rescheduled to: Bar Meeting set for 4/25/2016 02:00 PM in Charleston Courtroom #1, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. *PLEASE NOTE: TIME CHANGE ONLY(erav, ) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
    SCHEDULING NOTICE as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde: Bar Meeting set for 4/25/2016 10:00 AM in Charleston Courtroom #3, J. Waties Waring Judicial Center, 83 Meeting St, Charleston before Honorable Richard M Gergel. (erav, ) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant: granting 49 Motion for Modification of Bond as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde (1); Bond Hearing as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde held on 9/17/2015. AUSA Eric Klumb appears for USA. AFPD Alicia Penn present with defendant. Court vacates the condition of electronic monitoring. Court Reporter Heather Hillman CS. (obri, ) Modified to add docket text on 9/18/2015 (hhil, ). (Entered: 09/17/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
        NOTICE OF HEARING as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde Bond Hearing set for Thursday 9/17/2015 01:30 PM in Charleston Courtroom #5, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant. (obri, ) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None
          Second MOTION for Bond modification by Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel (Attachments: # 1 Supporting Documents Doctor Letter)(Penn, Alicia) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
            ORDER granting 44 Motion for Discovery to prevent destruction of evidence as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/17/15.(hhil, ) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/17/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
              ORDER granting 43 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde (1). Condition of home detention is removed. Defendant is now to be placed on a curfew to be determined by USPO in lieu of home detention, and is allowed to travel to Atlanta for business purposes with the prior permission of USPO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 6/16/15.(hhil, ) (Entered: 06/17/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                MOTION for Discovery prevent destruction of evidence by Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Penn, Alicia) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/12/2015, Entered: None
                  First MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release by Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel(Penn, Alicia) (Entered: 06/12/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                    MOTION to Compel Defendant's Witness List by USA as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. No proposed order(Klumb, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                      MOTION to Compel Juror Voir Dire by USA as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. No proposed order(Klumb, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                        MOTION for Disclosure of Expert Witness(es) by USA as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. No proposed order(Klumb, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                          DEMAND for Disclosure of Witness in Support of Alibi Defense as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde (Klumb, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None
                            MOTION for Discovery by USA as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. No proposed order(Klumb, Eric) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/18/2015, Entered: None
                              WAIVER of Appearance by Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde (Penn, Alicia) (Entered: 05/18/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/4/2015, Entered: None
                                Rule 5c3 Documents Received as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Letter)(erav, ) (Entered: 05/04/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                  MOTION for Discovery Inspection and Inventory by Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. No proposed order(Penn, Alicia) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                    EDWARDS NOTICE by Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde (Penn, Alicia) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                      MOTION for Leave to File Additional Motions by Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. No proposed order(Penn, Alicia) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/1/2015, Entered: None
                                        MOTION for Disclosure of Intent to Use Evidence of Other Crimes by Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. No proposed order(Penn, Alicia) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          Case Reassigned as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde to Judge Honorable Richard M Gergel. Judge Unassigned - CRI no longer assigned to the case. (cwil, ) (Entered: 05/01/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None
                                            REDACTED INDICTMENT as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. (hhil, ) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                              ORDER GOVERNING DISCOVERY as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 4/29/15.(hhil, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None
                                                Not Guilty PLEA ENTERED as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde (hhil, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                  TEXT ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. Entered at the direction of Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker on 4/29/15.(hhil, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/29/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker: Arraignment as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde (1) Count 1,2,3 held on 4/29/2015. AUSA Eric Klumb appears for USA. The Court appoints AFPD Alicia Penn for defendant. Defendant enters a Not Guilty Plea. The Court adopts the bond and conditions set by the Middle District of Alabama. Case unsealed by the Middle District of Alabama as to this defendant only. Court Reporter Gil O'Brien, CourtSmart. (hhil, ) (Entered: 04/29/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                      NOTICE OF HEARING as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. Arraignment set for 4/29/2015 09:45 AM in Charleston Courtroom #6, U. S. Court House, 85 Broad St, Charleston before Magistrate Judge Mary Gordon Baker. (hhil, ) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                        ORDER Setting Conditions of Release from the Middle District of Alabama. Signed by US Magistrate Judge Charles S. Coody on 4/22/15.(hhil, ) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                          UNSECURED Bond Entered as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde in amount of $ 25,000.00. From the Middle District of Alabama. (hhil, ) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                            CJA 23 Financial Affidavit (Restricted Access) by Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde from Middle District of Alabama. (hhil, ) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/24/2015, Entered: None
                                                              Rule 5c3 Documents Received as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde (hhil, ) (Entered: 04/24/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/23/2015, Entered: None
                                                                Arrest of Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde in Middle District of Alabama. Clerk notified by: MDA. (obri, ) (Entered: 04/23/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/15/2015, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                  ORDER FOR ISSUANCE OF ARREST WARRANT as to Bennito Roel Van Leeuwaarde. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bristow Marchant on 4/15/15.(hhil, ) (Entered: 04/15/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                    Statistics

                                                                    This case has been viewed 239 times.

                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                    Space
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                     
                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                    Need Password Help?