Chateau v. American Government et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-02183

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 24, 2016 at 11:05 PM ST (4.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Marie Chateau, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Marie Chateau

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Marie Chateau +1 561 542 9585
v.
No Logo American Government, Defendant
Obama, Barack Hussein Obama, Barack Hussein, Defendant
Officially listed as "Barack Obama"
United States of America President, United States of America, January 20, 2009 - January 20, 2017
Bernanke, Ben Shalom Bernanke, Ben Shalom, Defendant
Officially listed as "Ben Bernanke"
No Logo Brian Moynihan, Defendant
No Logo Chase Bank & Bank of America, Defendant
No Logo Chealsea Clinton, Defendant
No Logo Deicha Crim, Defendant
No Logo George Bush, Defendant
Clinton, Hillary Rodham Clinton, Hillary Rodham, Defendant
Officially listed as "Hillary Clinton"
No Logo Jame Dimon, Defendant
No Logo John Dasise, Defendant
No Logo Malia Obama, Defendant
Bloomberg, Michael Rubens Bloomberg, Michael Rubens, Defendant
Officially listed as "Michael Bloomberg"
No Logo Michelle Obama, Defendant
No Logo Ralph Madelo, Defendant
No Logo Robert Mueller, Defendant
No Logo Sabra Shulman, Defendant
No Logo USA FBI in New York, Defendant
No Logo Wagner University, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 440 - Civil Rights: Other
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
COMPLAINT against American Government, Ben Bernanke, Michael Bloomberg, George Bush, Chase Bank & Bank of America, Chealsea Clinton, Hillary Clinton, Deicha Crim, John Dasise, Jame Dimon, Ralph Madelo, Brian Moynihan, Robert Mueller, Barack Obama, Malia Obama, Michelle Obama, Sabra Shulman, USA FBI in New York, Wagner University. Document filed by Marie Chateau.(rdz) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
    REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Marie Chateau.(rdz) (Entered: 03/29/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 102 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?