Town of Marshall Creek, Texas
Bankruptcy Case Texas Eastern Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 06-40072
District Judge Brenda T. Rhoades, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 25, 2017 at 11:57 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, Debtor

Represented by Pronske Goolsby & Kathman, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Gerrit Michael Pronske +1 214 658 6500 +1 214 658 6509

Represented by Shackelford Melton McKinley & Norton LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Rakhee V. Patel +1 214 780 1415 +1 214 780 1401
Office of the United States Trustee Office of the United States Trustee, U.S. Trustee
Officially listed as "US Trustee"
  Entries (80) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/18/2007, Entered: None
Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law and Order Confirming Chapter 9 Plan (RE: related document(s)79 Third Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas ). (slt, ) (Entered: 10/18/2007)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Blank 79 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
    Third Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)68 Second Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
      LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
      Notice of Withdrawal of Document No. 77 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)77 Third Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)68 Second Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
        Third Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)68 Second Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
          Second Amended Chapter 11 Ballot Summary Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) Modified on 10/17/2007 (slt, ). (Entered: 10/16/2007)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
            Agreed Order Granting Debtor's Objection to Claim NO. 6 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (RE: related document(s)54 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 6 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts in the amount of $ 39,911.05 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas ). (slt, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
              Agreed Order Resolving Debtor's Objection to Claim No. 5 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (RE: related document(s)53 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 5 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts in the amount of $ 89,565.37 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas ). (slt, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
                Agreed Order Granting Debtor's Objection to Claim No.4 of Texas Workforce Commission (RE: related document(s)52 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 4 of Texas Workforce Commission in the amount of $ $12,590.00 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas ). (slt, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/16/2007, Entered: None
                  Agreed Order on Motion to Extend Bar Date for Filing Claims (RE: related document(s)39 Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) Modified text on 7/5/2007 (jb). filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts). Proofs of Claims due by 6/21/2007. (slt, ) (Entered: 10/16/2007)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                    Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)69 Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/12/2007, Entered: None
                      Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (RE: related document(s) Hearing Rescheduled (RE: related document(s)39 Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) Modified text on 7/5/2007 (jb). filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, 53 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 5 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts in the amount of $ 89,565.37 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Proposed Order)(Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 54 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 6 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts in the amount of $ 39,911.05 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Proposed Order)(Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2007 at 02:00 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr, )). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 10/12/2007)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/11/2007, Entered: None
                        Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 10/11/2007)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/2/2007, Entered: None
                          Second Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 10/02/2007)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                            Exhibit and Witness List Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                              Chapter 11 Ballots Amended Certified Ballot Summary by Class Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 10/1/2007, Entered: None
                                Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (RE: related document(s)39 Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) Modified text on 7/5/2007 (jb). filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 10/01/2007)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None
                                  Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)32 Certificate of Service Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 30 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 31 Certificate of Notice of Confirmation Hearing and Notice of Time for Filing Acceptances and Rejections to Debtor's Plan of Reorganization Filed By Gerrit M. Pronske Filed by on behalf of Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 30 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/26/2007, Entered: None
                                    Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accouns, The Texas Workforce Commission and The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (RE: related document(s)39 Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) Modified text on 7/5/2007 (jb). filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, 29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 09/26/2007)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/25/2007, Entered: None
                                      Supplemental Objection Filed by Texas Workforce Commission (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 09/25/2007)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/21/2007, Entered: None
                                        Comment in Re: Reply to Debtor's Objection to Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (RE: related document(s)48 Objection Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)39 Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) Modified text on 7/5/2007 (jb). filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 09/21/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/16/2007, Entered: None
                                          Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) Hearing Set (RE: related document(s)53 Objection to Claim Number 5 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts in the amount of $ 89,565.37 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas , 54 Objection to Claim Number 6 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts in the amount of $ 39,911.05 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas. Hearing scheduled for 10/16/2007 at 09:35 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (th, )). Service Date 09/16/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 09/16/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                            Response to Objection to Claim Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (RE: related document(s)54 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 6 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts in the amount of $ 39,911.05 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Proposed Order)(Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                              Response to Objection to Claim Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (RE: related document(s)53 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 5 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts in the amount of $ 89,565.37 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Proposed Order)(Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                Response to Objection to Claim Filed by Texas Workforce Commission (RE: related document(s)52 Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 4 of Texas Workforce Commission in the amount of $ $12,590.00 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 1A# 3 Proposed Order)(Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                  Withdrawal of Claim in the amount of $12,590.00 Claim Number 4 Filed by Texas Workforce Commission (Ritter, Linda) (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/25/2007, Entered: None
                                                    Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)50 Order Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing On (RE: related document(s)39 Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) Modified text on 7/5/2007 (jb). filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Chapter 9 Confirmation hearing 29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). Hearing scheduled for 10/2/2007 at 11:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr, )). Service Date 08/25/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/26/2007)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                      Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 6 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts in the amount of $ 39,911.05 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: 1 Exhibit 12 Proposed Order)(Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                        Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 5 of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts in the amount of $ 89,565.37 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: 1 Exhibit 12 Proposed Order)(Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/24/2007, Entered: None
                                                          Objection to Claim (With Objection Language) Number 4 of Texas Workforce Commission in the amount of $ $12,590.00 Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: 1 Exhibit 12 Exhibit 1A3 Proposed Order)(Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 08/24/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                            Certificate of Notice of Continued Confirmation Hearing Filed By Gerrit M. Pronske Filed by on behalf of Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 30 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                              Order Granting Motion To Continue/Reschedule Hearing On (RE: related document(s)39 Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) Modified text on 7/5/2007 (jb). filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Chapter 9 Confirmation hearing 29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). Hearing scheduled for 10/2/2007 at 11:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2008 (sr, ). (Entered: 08/23/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/22/2007, Entered: None
                                                                Agreed Motion to Continue Hearing (s) Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order) (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 08/22/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/20/2007, Entered: None
                                                                  Objection Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)39 Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) Modified text on 7/5/2007 (jb). filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 08/20/2007)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/16/2007, Entered: None
                                                                    Certificate of Notice of Continued Hearing on Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed By Kay D. Brock Filed by on behalf of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (RE: related document(s)41 Order Granting Texas Comptroller's Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc; (RE: related document(s)40 Request for Expedited Hearing On Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts ). (ms, ), Hearing Set 39 NuncProTunc Motion to Extend Bar Date for Filing Claims Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts Hearing scheduled for 7/10/2007 at 11:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr, )). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 08/16/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/11/2007, Entered: None
                                                                      Certificate of Notice of Continued Confirmation Hearing Filed By Gerrit M. Pronske Filed by on behalf of Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)37 Certificate of Notice (Notice of Continued Confirmation Hearing and Notice of Extended Deadline to Submit Ballots) Filed By Gerrit M. Pronske Filed by on behalf of Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 30 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                        Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)41 Order Granting Texas Comptroller's Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc; (RE: related document(s)40 Request for Expedited Hearing On Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts ). (ms, )). Service Date 07/05/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                          Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) Hearing Set 39 NuncProTunc Motion to Extend Bar Date for Filing Claims Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts Hearing scheduled for 7/10/2007 at 11:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr, )). Service Date 07/05/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 07/06/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 7/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                            Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accouns, The Texas Workforce Commission and The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (RE: related document(s) Hearing Set 39 NuncProTunc Motion to Extend Bar Date for Filing Claims Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts Hearing scheduled for 7/10/2007 at 11:00 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr, )). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 07/05/2007)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                              Certificate of Notice of Hearing Filed By Kay D. Brock Filed by on behalf of Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (RE: related document(s)39 NuncProTunc Motion to Extend Bar Date for Filing Claims Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                Order Granting Texas Comptroller's Motion for Expedited Hearing on Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc; (RE: related document(s)40 Request for Expedited Hearing On Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts ). (ms, ) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                  Request for Expedited Hearing On Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (RE: related document(s)39 NuncProTunc Motion to Extend Bar Date for Filing Claims filed by Creditor Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts). (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                    Motion to Extend Bar Date Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order) (Brock, Kay) Modified text on 7/5/2007 (jb). (Entered: 07/03/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                      Objection Filed by Texas Comptroller of Public Accouns, The Texas Workforce Commission and The Texas Commission on Environmental Quality (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 06/27/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/13/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                        Certificate of Notice (Notice of Continued Confirmation Hearing and Notice of Extended Deadline to Submit Ballots) Filed By Gerrit M. Pronske Filed by on behalf of Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 30 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 06/13/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/8/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                          Chapter 11 Ballots (Chapter 9 Certified Ballot Summary) Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 06/08/2007)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                            Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 30 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/30/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                              United States of America's Objection to Confirmation of Debtor's Chapter 9 First Amended Plan of Reorganization Filed by IRS (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Miller, Glen) Modified on 5/31/2007 (slt, ). (Entered: 05/30/2007)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/29/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Kay D. Brock) Filed by Texas Workforce Commission (Brock, Kay) (Entered: 05/29/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/10/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Certificate of Service Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 30 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 31 Certificate of Notice of Confirmation Hearing and Notice of Time for Filing Acceptances and Rejections to Debtor's Plan of Reorganization Filed By Gerrit M. Pronske Filed by on behalf of Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 30 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 05/10/2007)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                    Certificate of Notice of Confirmation Hearing and Notice of Time for Filing Acceptances and Rejections to Debtor's Plan of Reorganization Filed By Gerrit M. Pronske Filed by on behalf of Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)29 Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas, 30 Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                      Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/9/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                        Amended Chapter 9 Plan Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)22 Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 05/09/2007)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/5/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                          Exhibit and/or Witness List Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 04/05/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/3/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                            Objection to Disclosure Statement Filed by Trinity River Authority of Texas (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). (bl, ) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/7/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                              Certificate of Service Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)24 Order and Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). Hearing scheduled for 4/10/2007 at 10:30 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr, )). (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)24 Order and Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). Hearing scheduled for 4/10/2007 at 10:30 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr, )). Service Date 03/01/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                  Order and Notice of Hearing (RE: related document(s)23 Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) filed by Debtor Town of Marshall Creek, Texas). Hearing scheduled for 4/10/2007 at 10:30 AM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2008 (sr, ). (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/23/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 02/23/2007)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/1/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 02/01/2007)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/21/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)20 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Plan of Reorganization (RE: related document(s)19 Motion to Extend Time To File Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas ). Chapter 11 Plan due by 2/1/2007. (ms, )). Service Date 01/21/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/21/2007)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/19/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Plan of Reorganization (RE: related document(s)19 Motion to Extend Time To File Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas ). Chapter 11 Plan due by 2/1/2007. (ms, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 4/15/2008 (ms, ). (Entered: 01/19/2007)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            Motion to Extend Time To File Plan of Reorganization Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)8 Administrative Order Regarding Claim Filing Deadlines, Deadline for Filing Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization and Notice by Publication (lc, )). (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Plan) (Pronske, Gerrit) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/22/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)17 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Chapter 9 Plan (RE: related document(s)16 Motion to Extend Time To File Chapter 9 Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas ). (ms, )). Service Date 12/22/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Chapter 9 Plan (RE: related document(s)16 Motion to Extend Time To File Chapter 9 Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas ). (ms, ) (Entered: 12/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/18/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Motion to Extend Time To File Chapter 9 Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order) (Patel, Rakhee) (Entered: 12/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)14 Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Plan of Reorganization; (RE: related document(s)13 Motion to Extend Time To to File Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas ). Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/18/2006. (ms, )). Service Date 06/21/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/22/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                      Order Granting Motion to Extend Time to File Plan of Reorganization; (RE: related document(s)13 Motion to Extend Time To to File Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas ). Chapter 11 Plan due by 12/18/2006. (ms, ) (Entered: 06/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/16/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                        Motion to Extend Time To to File Plan and Disclosure Statement Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Attachments: 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend Time) (Patel, Rahkee) (Entered: 06/16/2006)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/11/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                          Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: Kent Ries) Filed by First State Bank of Stratford (Ries, Kent) (Entered: 05/11/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                            Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)8 Administrative Order Regarding Claim Filing Deadlines, Deadline for Filing Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization and Notice by Publication (lc, )). Service Date 04/21/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                              Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)7 Order for Relief (ms, )). Service Date 04/21/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/21/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                Certificate of Service Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (RE: related document(s)7 Order for Relief (ms, ), 8 Administrative Order Regarding Claim Filing Deadlines, Deadline for Filing Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization and Notice by Publication (lc, )). (Patel, Rahkee) (Entered: 04/21/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                  Administrative Order Regarding Claim Filing Deadlines, Deadline for Filing Chapter 9 Plan of Reorganization and Notice by Publication (lc, ) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                    Order for Relief (ms, ) (Entered: 04/19/2006)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance by (Attorney: G. Hobart Miller) Filed by IRS (Miller, Glen) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/9/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                        List of 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Patel, Rahkee) (Entered: 03/09/2006)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/4/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                          Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s) Status Hearing Set 1 Chapter 9 Voluntary Petition and Notice to Individual Consumer Debtors Status Hearing scheduled for 3/21/2006 at 02:00 PM at Plano Bankruptcy Courtroom. (sr, )). Service Date 03/04/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/04/2006)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/19/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                            Certificate Of Mailing (RE: related document(s)2 Notice of Missing Documents to Individual Debtor; Schedule of Assets and Liabilities, and Statement of Financial Affairs. (ms, )). Service Date 02/19/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 02/20/2006)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/17/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                              Notice of Missing Documents to Individual Debtor; Schedule of Assets and Liabilities, and Statement of Financial Affairs. (ms, ) (Entered: 02/17/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/23/2006, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                                                Chapter 9 Voluntary Petition and Notice to Individual Consumer Debtors. WITHOUT Schedules. Fee Amount $1039.Filed by Town of Marshall Creek, Texas (Pronske, Gerrit) Modified on 1/24/2006 (ms, ). (Entered: 01/23/2006)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 86 times.

                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?