Shank v. Health Care Service Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Illinois Northern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-03993

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 21, 2019 at 11:02 PM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Mark Shank, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Cooper & Kirk, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Peter A. Patterson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 ppatterson@cooperkirk.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David Henry Thompson +1 202 220 9600 +1 202 220 9601 dthompson@cooperkirk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Kessler Topaz Meltzer & Check, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Zachary P Arbitman +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 zarbitman@ktmc.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward W. Ciolko, PHV +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 eciolko@ktmc.com
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Natalie Lesser +1 610 667 7706 +1 610 667 7056 nlesser@ktmc.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Norman Rifkind

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Norman Rifkind +1 847 372 4747 Norman@rifslaw.com
v.
No Logo Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Illinois(BCBSIL), Defendant
No Logo Health Care Service Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kirkland & Ellis LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Brett M. Kavanaugh +1 202 879 5000 +8795 879 879 5200 bkavanaugh@kirkland.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin R. Martos, II +1 312 862 2000 martin.martos@kirkland.com
No Logo Prime Theraputics LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Reed Smith LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Martin J. Bishop +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 mbishop@reedsmith.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin D Tessier +1 312 207 1000 +1 312 207 6400 ktessier@reedsmith.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1446
Nature of Suit 110 - Contract - Insurance
  Entries (110) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 2/8/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Seal Document
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Settlement
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 2/6/2018, Entered: None Seal Document
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None File Excess Pages
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 1/10/2018, Entered: 1/10/2018 Unknown Document Type
              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Defendant HCSC's Motion to Dismiss Amended Complaint [ECF No. 35] is denied as moot given the preliminary approval of settlement. Defendant HCSC may refile its motion to dismiss if final approval of the settlement is denied.Mailed notice(maf)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                ORDER: Granting Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for award of attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and a class representative service award to the named plaintiff. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/9/2018. Mailed notice. (kp, )
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: 1/9/2018 Unknown Document Type
                  ORDER: Plaintiff's unopposed motion for award of attorneys' fees, reimbursement of expenses, and a class representative service award to the named plaintiff is granted 94 . Enter order. Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/9/2018. Mailed notice. (kp, )
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    AFFIDAVIT by Plaintiff Mark Shank in Support of MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank for attorney fees Unopposed Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and a Class Representative Service Award to the Named Plaintiff 94 Joint Declaration of Natalie Lesser and Pete Patterson (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MEMORANDUM by Mark Shank in support of motion for attorney fees, 94 Memorandum in Support of Unopposed Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and a Class Representative Service Award to the Named Plaintiff (Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 12/22/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 12/22/2017, Entered: 12/22/2017 Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank for attorney fees Unopposed Motion for Award of Attorneys' Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and a Class Representative Service Award to the Named Plaintiff (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesser, Natalie)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for leave to file memorandum exceeding the page limitation 91 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Motion by Natalie Lesser for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages 91 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 12/19/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: 12/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank for leave to file excess pages (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesser, Natalie)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 11/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Unopposed Motion for withdrawal of appearance of Edward W. Ciolko 88 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Motion by Natalie Lesser for presentment of motion to withdraw 88 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/7/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: 11/1/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank to withdraw of Appearance of Edward W. Ciolko (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesser, Natalie)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        ORDER GRANTING PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, CERTIFYING CLASS FOR SETTLEMENT PURPOSES, APPROVING FORM AND MANNER OF CLASS NOTICE, AND SCHEDULING OF A FINAL APPROVAL HEARING Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/26/2017:Mailed notice(wp, ) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Settlement
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Status hearing held on 10/26/2017. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for leave to file excess pages 80 is granted. Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement, certification of the settlement class, approval of form and manner of class notice, and scheduling of a final approval hearing 82 is granted. Final Approval Hearing set for 3/20/2018 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 10/27/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              EXHIBIT by Plaintiff Mark Shank [Replacement Exhibit A] regarding MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank for settlement (Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) 82 (Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Memorandum In Support of Motion by Mark Shank (Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) (Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Natalie Lesser for presentment of motion for settlement, 82 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/26/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank for settlement (Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Index of Exhibits, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit B - KTMC Firm Resume, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit C - Cooper Kirk Firm Resume)(Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Natalie Lesser for presentment of motion for leave to file excess pages, 80 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/26/2017 at 09:00 AM. (Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank for leave to file excess pages to Plaintiff's Memorandum Of Law In Support Of Preliminary Approval Of Class Action Settlement And Certification Of The Settlement Class (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 10/18/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing reset for 10/26/2017 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 10/10/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 9/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing reset for 10/11/2017 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 09/12/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Joint Motion to reschedule status hearing 75 is granted. Status hearing reset for 9/14/2017 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                AGREED NOTICE of Motion by Edward W Ciolko for presentment of motion to continue 75 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 8/17/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank to continue Joint Motion to Reschedule Status Hearing (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 08/14/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 7/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Status hearing set for 8/17/2017 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      STATUS Report JOINT STATUS REPORT by Mark Shank (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                        STIPULATION and Agreed F.R.E. 502(d) and HIPAA-Qualified Protective Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/13/2017:Mailed notice(wp, )
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: 6/13/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Agreed Motion for entry of stipulation and agreed F.R.E. 502(d) and HIPAA-Qualified protective order 69 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Martin R. Martos, II for presentment of motion for protective order 69 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/13/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Martos, Martin) (Entered: 06/08/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 6/8/2017, Entered: 6/8/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation for protective order (Agreed Motion) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Martos, Martin)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                STATUS Report Joint Status Report by Health Care Service Corporation (Martos, Martin) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 4/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  STATUS Report JOINT STATUS REPORT by Mark Shank (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 04/20/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Stipulation and Order Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/29/2017:Mailed notice(wp, )
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 3/29/2017, Entered: 3/29/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Agreed Motion to stipulate and proposed order to further extend stay pending settlement discussions 62 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 3/28/2017, Entered: 3/28/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Peter Pattersons and William Marras motions for leave to appear pro hac vice on behalf of Plaintiff [ECF Nos. 39, 48] are granted nunc pro tunc.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Agreed NOTICE of Motion by Edward W Ciolko for presentment of extension of time 62 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/30/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 03/21/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 3/21/2017, Entered: 3/21/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank for extension of time Agreed Motion to Stipulate and Proposed Order to Further Extend Stay Pending Settlement Discussions (Ciolko, Edward)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/7/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Further Extend Stay Pending Settlement Discussions Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 3/2/2017:Mailed notice(wp, ) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 3/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to further extend stay pending settlement discussions 57 is granted. The case is stayed between the Parties and all current deadlines are suspended until 3/20/2017.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 03/07/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: The Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order now set for 2/23/2017 is reset by the court for 3/2/2017 at 09:30 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Edward W Ciolko for presentment of before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 2/23/2017 at 09:30 AM. (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 2/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Further Extend Stay Pending Settlement Discussions (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 02/17/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: 1/19/2017 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          Enter Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Stay to 2/17/2017 pending settlement discussions Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 1/19/2017:Mailed notice(wp, )
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Stay Pending Settlement Discussions (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: 11/3/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              ORDER Signed by the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 11/3/2016:Mailed notice(wp, )
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Defendant Prime Therapeutics Motion to Dismiss 32 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 11/03/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: 10/18/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Ruling stricken. Plaintiff's Motion to stay 49 is granted with the exception of the ruling on Defendant Prime's pending motion.Mailed notice (wp, )
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    RESPONSE by Prime Theraputics LLCin Opposition to MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank to stay Pending Settlement Discussions 49 (Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Edward W Ciolko for presentment of motion to stay 49 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/25/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: 10/17/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        MOTION by Plaintiff Mark Shank to stay Pending Settlement Discussions (Ciolko, Edward)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/7/2016, Entered: 10/7/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12443527. (Marra, William)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            NOTICE by Prime Theraputics LLC re reply, 46 pursuant to Order entered on September 15, 2016 45 (Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Sealed Legal Document 46 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              SEALED REPLY by Prime Theraputics LLC to MOTION by Defendant Prime Theraputics LLC to seal document 42 Memorandum in Support of its Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint 45 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhbit A & B)(Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 09/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/15/2016, Entered: 9/15/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber: Defendant Prime Therapeutics' motion for leave to file its reply to the motion to dismiss under seal document 42 is granted.Mailed notice (jms, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  REPLY by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation in Support of Motion to Dismiss (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Martos, Martin) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Motion by Caitlin O Young for presentment of motion to seal document 42 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 9/15/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Young, Caitlin) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: 9/12/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Prime Theraputics LLC to seal document (Young, Caitlin)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE by Prime Theraputics LLC re reply 40 (Young, Caitlin) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          REPLY by Defendant Prime Theraputics LLC to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 32 in Support (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Young, Caitlin) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: 8/23/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12281895. (Patterson, Peter)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              RESPONSE by Mark Shankin Opposition to MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint 32 , MOTION by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation to dismiss Amended Complaint 35 (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                MEMORANDUM by Health Care Service Corporation in support of motion to dismiss 35 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Martos, Martin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Martin R. Martos, II for presentment of motion to dismiss 35 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 10/18/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Martos, Martin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation to dismiss Amended Complaint (Martos, Martin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Prime Theraputics LLC re MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint 32 (Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        MEMORANDUM by Prime Theraputics LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 32 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint (Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED complaint by Mark Shank against Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Illinois(BCBSIL), Health Care Service Corporation, Prime Theraputics LLC (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Part 1, # 2 Exhibit A - Part 2, # 3 Exhibit A - Part 3, # 4 Exhibit B, # 5 Exhibit C, # 6 Exhibit D, # 7 Exhibit E, # 8 Exhibit F, # 9 Exhibit G, # 10 Exhibit H, # 11 Exhibit I, # 12 Exhibit J)(Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 06/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Shank by David Henry Thompson (Thompson, David) (Entered: 06/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Motion hearing held on 6/8/2016. Plaintiff to file its amended complaint by 6/21/2016. Defendants' to file their motions to dismiss by 7/22/2016. Plaintiff's response brief to be filed by 8/22/2016. Defendants' reply briefs due 9/12/2016. The court will rule orally on 10/18/2016 at 9:00 a.m. Status hearing stricken. David H. Thompson's Application for leave to appear pro hac vice 25 is granted. Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Martin R. Martos, II for presentment of motion to dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 26 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/8/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Martos, Martin) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    MEMORANDUM by Health Care Service Corporation in support of motion to dismiss, Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 26 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Martos, Martin) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation to dismiss , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Martos, Martin) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-12005024. (Thompson, David) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Shank by Natalie Lesser (Lesser, Natalie) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Dale Tessier for presentment of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 21 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 6/8/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              MEMORANDUM by Prime Theraputics LLC in support of Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim 21 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation by Martin R. Martos, II (Martos, Martin) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:Natalie Lesser's Application to appear pro hac vice 6 is granted. Defendant Prime Therapeutics, Agreed Motion for extension of time to 6/3/2016 in which to file a responsive pleading to the complaint 17 is granted.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Motion by Kevin Dale Tessier for presentment of extension of time 17 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 5/25/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION by Defendant Prime Theraputics LLC for extension of time to File Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint (Agreed) (Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Prime Theraputics LLC by Martin J. Bishop (Bishop, Martin) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Prime Theraputics LLC by Kevin Dale Tessier (Tessier, Kevin) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE entry before the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber:The Agreed Motion for extension of time to 5/26/2016 in which to respond to plaintiff's class action complaint 11 is granted. Status hearing set for 6/16/2016 at 09:00 AM.Mailed notice (wp, ) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Health Care Service Corporation (Kavanaugh, Brian) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Motion by Brian Patrick Kavanaugh for presentment of motion for extension of time to file answer, motion for relief 11 before Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber on 4/28/2016 at 09:30 AM. (Kavanaugh, Brian) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION by Defendant Health Care Service Corporation for extension of time to file answer regarding complaint, 1 Agreed Motion (Kavanaugh, Brian) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Health Care Service Corporation by Brian Patrick Kavanaugh (Kavanaugh, Brian) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Shank as to Prime Theraputics LLC on 4/6/2016, answer due 4/27/2016. (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Shank as to Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Illinois(BCBSIL) on 4/7/2016, answer due 4/28/2016. (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mark Shank as to Health Care Service Corporation on 4/7/2016, answer due 4/28/2016. (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 04/11/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: 4/6/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0752-11795553. (Lesser, Natalie)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Shank by Zachary P Arbitman (Arbitman, Zachary) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Shank by Edward W Ciolko (Ciolko, Edward) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Mark Shank by Norman Rifkind (Rifkind, Norman) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      CIVIL Cover Sheet (Rifkind, Norman) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: 4/4/2016 Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT filed by Mark Shank; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-11788265. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C (Redacted), # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E (Redacted), # 6 Exhibit F (Redacted), # 7 Exhibit G (Redacted))(Rifkind, Norman)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Blue Cross Blue Shield Of Illinois(BCBSIL), Health Care Service Corporation, Prime Theraputics LLC. (lcw, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Harry D. Leinenweber. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Sidney I. Schenkier. (ags, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 122 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?