DONATO v. EXECUTIVE OFFICE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00632

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 21, 2021 at 11:58 AM DT (3.2 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo ANTHONY DONATO, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DANBURY

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space ANTHONY DONATO
v.
No Logo Bureau of Prisons, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
Space JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN +1 609 989 2190 john.ruymann@usdoj.gov
Space Alexander Daniel Shoaibi +1 202 514 7236 alexander.d.shoaibi@usdoj.gov
Space ANNE B. TAYLOR +1 856 757 5031 anne.taylor@usdoj.gov
No Logo EXECUTIVE OFFICE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, Defendant
Federal Bureau of Investigation Federal Bureau of Investigation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Democracy Forward Foundation

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Robin Frances Thurston +1 202 448 9090 rthurston@democracyforward.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen M. Frye +1 202 353 9895
Space Paul S. Padda +1 202 514 9150 +1 202 305 0955

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kenneth Adebonojo +1 202 514 7157 +1 202 514 8780 kenneth.adebonojo@usdoj.gov
Space CHRISTOPHER D. AMORE +1 973 645 2700 christopher.amore@usdoj.gov
Space Christopher David Belen +1 202 307 2089 +1 202 514 6866 Christopher.D.Belen@usdoj.gov
Space Venetia D. Bell +1 202 353 0022 +1 202 514 8780 venetia.bell@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel Edward Bensing +1 202 305 0693 +1 202 616 8460 daniel.bensing@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Marshall Bernie +1 202 616 8488 +1 202 616 8470 andrew.m.bernie@usdoj.gov
Space Alesia N. Black +1 202 616 3285 +1 202 514 8780 alesia.black@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph Evan Borson +1 202 514 1944 +1 202 616 8187 joseph.borson@usdoj.gov
Space Rachel Ann Bouman +1 202 353 0022 rachel.bouman@usdoj.gov
Space Marina Utgoff Braswell +1 202 514 7226 +1 202 514 8780 Marina.Braswell@usdoj.gov
Space Steven Yale Bressler +1 202 305 0167 +1 202 616 8470 steven.bressler@usdoj.gov
Space Aimee Woodward Brown +1 202 305 0845 +1 202 616 8470 aimee.w.brown@usdoj.gov
Space Stephen J. Buckingham +1 202 514 3330 +1 202 616 8470 stephen.buckingham@usdoj.gov
Space Alan R. Burch +1 202 514 7204 +1 202 514 8780 alan.burch@usdoj.gov
Space Damarr M. Butler +1 202 353 0022 +1 202 514 8780 damarr.butler@usdoj.gov
Space Rhonda Lisa Campbell +1 202 514 9519 +1 202 514 8780 rhonda.campbell@usdoj.gov
Space Andrew Evan Carmichael +1 202 514 3346 +1 202 305 2685 andrew.e.carmichael@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel Robert Castellano +1 202 616 3214 +1 202 514 1009 daniel.castellano@usdoj.gov
Space Jason T. Cohen +1 202 305 0207 +1 202 305 0275 jason.cohen@usdoj.gov
Space Anthony Joseph Coppolino +20 251 447 82dc tony.coppolino@usdoj.gov
Space JOHN T. CRUTCHLOW +1 215 861 8622 john.crutchlow@usdoj.gov
Space Vikas K. Desai +1 202 514 3492 +1 202 616 8470 vikas.desai@usdoj.gov
Space Joseph C Dugan +1 202 514 3259 joseph.dugan@usdoj.gov
Space Deanna L. Durett +1 212 264 9232 deanna.l.durrett@usdoj.gov
Space Brian J. Field +1 202 252 2551 +1 202 234 2806 brian.field@usdoj.gov
Space Rhonda C. Fields +1 202 514 6970 +1 202 514 8780 rhonda.fields@usdoj.gov
Space Tricia Dianne Francis +1 202 616 2257 +1 202 514 8780 tricia.Francis@usdoj.gov
Space Paul Gerald Freeborne +1 202 353 0543 +1 202 616 8460 paul.freeborne@usdoj.gov
Space James J. Gilligan +1 202 514 3358 +1 202 616 8470 james.gilligan@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth Goitein +1 202 514 4470 +1 202 616 8470 elizabeth.goitein@usdoj.gov
Space Lisa Sheri Goldfluss +1 202 514 7198 +1 202 514 8780 Lisa.Goldfluss@usdoj.gov
Space Kieran Gavin Gostin +1 202 353 4556 +1 202 616 8460 kieran.g.gostin@usdoj.gov
Space Jeremiah Goulka +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 jeremiah.goulka@usdoj.gov
Space Heather D. Graham-Oliver +1 202 305 1334 +1 202 514 8180 heather.graham-oliver@usdoj.gov
Space Javier M. Guzman +1 202 616 1761 +1 202 514 8780 javier.guzman2@usdoj.gov
Space Alexander Kenneth Haas +1 202 307 3937 +1 202 616 8470 alexander.haas@usdoj.gov
Space Jonathan Ryan Hammer +1 202 514 7139 +1 202 514 8780 jonathan.hammer@usdoj.gov
Space Kimberly Lynn Herb +1 202 305 8356 +1 202 616 8470 kimberly.l.herb@usdoj.gov
Space Tammy Allison Holloway +1 202 252 2633 +1 202 252 2599 tammy.holloway2@usdoj.gov
Space Pamela D. Huff +1 202 307 0338 +1 202 353 9415 pamela.huff@usdoj.gov
Space John G. Interrante +1 202 514 7220 +1 202 514 8780 john.interrante@usdoj.gov
Space Jennifer Beth Kaplan +1 202 514 3367 +1 202 616 8470 jennifer.b.kaplan@usdoj.gov
Space Sylvia T. Kaser +1 202 514 3416 +1 202 616 8202
Space Diane Kelleher +1 202 514 4775 +22616820 226 616 8202 Diane.Kelleher@usdoj.gov
Space Wynne Patrick Kelly +1 202 305 9343 +1 202 514 8780 wynne.p.kelly@usdoj.gov
Space Jennifer Joy Lee +1 202 252 2569 +1 202 252 2599 jennifer.lee@usdoj.gov
Space John Gregory Lennon +1 202 353 4024 +1 202 514 8780 greg.lennon@usdoj.gov
Space Ori Lev +1 202 514 2395 +1 202 318 7589 ori.lev@usdoj.gov
Space Michelle Lo +1 202 514 5134 +1 202 514 8780 Michelle.Lo2@usdoj.gov
Space Jane M. Lyons +1 202 514 7161 +1 202 514 8780 jane.lyons@usdoj.gov
Space Peter Rolf Maier +1 202 514 7185 +1 202 514 8780 peter.maier2@usdoj.gov
Space Lisa Zeidner Marcus +1 202 514 3336 lisa.marcus@usdoj.gov
Space Gabriel R. Martinez +1 202 514 7139 gabriel.martinez2@usdoj.gov
Space Andrea McBarnette +1 202 514 7153 +1 202 514 8780 andrea.mcbarnette@usdoj.gov
Space Oliver W. McDaniel +1 202 616 0739 +1 202 514 8780 oliver.mcdaniel@usdoj.gov
Space Vesper Mei +1 202 514 4686 +1 202 616 8470 vesper.mei@usdoj.gov
Space Robert Charles Merritt, III +1 202 616 8098 +1 202 616 8460 robert.c.merritt@usdoj.gov
Space Alan Modlinger +1 202 514 4269 alan.modlinger@usdoj.gov
Space Kathleene A. Molen +1 202 616 5458 kathleene.a.molen@usdoj.gov
Space Brenda K. Morris +1 202 514 1439 brenda.morris@usdoj.gov
Space Anjali Motgi +1 202 305 0879 +1 202 616 8470 anjali.motgi@usdoj.gov
Space Steven A. Myers +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8460 steven.a.myers@usdoj.gov
Space William Mark Nebeker +1 202 514 7230 +1 202 514 8780 mark.nebeker@usdoj.gov
Space Sean Ryan O'Neill +1 202 305 2137 sean.o'neill@usdoj.gov
Space Cindy S. Owens +1 202 616 2257 cindy.owens@usdoj.gov
Space Ryan B Parker +1 202 514 4336 +1 202 616 8470 ryan.parker@usdoj.gov
Space Rodney Patton +1 202 305 7919 +1 202 305 2685 rodney.patton@usdoj.gov
Space Benton Gregory Peterson +1 202 514 7238 +1 202 515 8780 benton.peterson@usdoj.gov
Space Peter J. Phipps +1 202 616 8482 +1 202 616 8470 peter.phipps@usdoj.gov
Space Amy Powell +1 202 514 9836 +1 202 616 8202 amy.powell@usdoj.gov
Space Niels Stefan Quist +1 202 616 5478 +1 202 514 1009 niels.quist@usdoj.gov
Space Joshua Thomas Raines +1 202 514 7614 joshua.t.raines@usdoj.gov
Space Scott Risner +1 202 514 2395 +1 202 616 8470 scott.risner@usdoj.gov
Space JACQUELINE CHRISTINE ROMERO +1 215 861 8470 jacqueline.romero@usdoj.gov
Space Carl Ezekiel Ross +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 carl.ross@usdoj.gov
Space JOHN ANDREW RUYMANN +1 609 989 2190 john.ruymann@usdoj.gov
Space Justin Michael Sandberg +1 202 514 5838 +1 202 616 8202 justin.sandberg@usdoj.gov
Space Addy R. Schmitt +1 202 616 0739 +1 202 514 8780 addy.schmitt@usdoj.gov
Space Daniel Schwei +1 202 305 8693 +1 202 616 8470 daniel.s.schwei@usdoj.gov
Space Michelle Jean Seo +1 202 252 2633 +1 202 514 8780 michelle.seo@usdoj.gov
Space Elizabeth J. Shapiro +1 202 514 5302 +1 202 616 8470 Elizabeth.Shapiro@usdoj.gov
Space Adam Christopher Siple +1 202 305 7664 +1 202 616 8460 adam.c.siple@usdoj.gov
Space Caroline A. Smith +1 202 514 8858 caroline.a.smith@usdoj.gov
Space Jeffrey Michael Smith +1 202 514 5751 +1 202 616 8202 jeffrey.smith5@usdoj.gov
Space Peter S. Smith +1 202 514 7065 +1 202 514 8779 peter.smith@usdoj.gov
Space Kevin Matthew Snell +1 202 305 0924 +1 202 616 8470 kevin.snell@usdoj.gov
Space Eric J. Soskin +1 202 353 0533 eric.soskin@usdoj.gov
Space Marcia Kay Sowles +1 202 514 4960 +1 202 616 8470 marcia.sowles@usdoj.gov
Space KAREN DEBORAH STRINGER +1 973 645 2700 karen.stringer@usdoj.gov
Space Judry Laeb Subar +1 202 514 3969 +1 202 616 8470 judry.subar@usdoj.gov
Space Diane M. Sullivan +1 202 514 7205 +1 202 514 8780 diane.sullivan@usdoj.gov
Space Damon William Taaffe +1 202 252 2544 damon.taaffe@usdoj.gov
Space ANNE B. TAYLOR +1 856 757 5031 anne.taylor@usdoj.gov
Space John C. Truong +1 202 307 0406 +1 202 514 8780 john.truong@usdoj.gov
Space Emily Kathryn Tyler +1 202 514 7139 +1 202 514 8780 Emily.Tyler@usdoj.gov
Space John Russell Tyler +1 202 514 2356 +1 202 616 8470 john.tyler@usdoj.gov
Space Susan K. Ullman +1 202 616 0680 +1 202 616 8202 susan.ullman@usdoj.gov
Space Sean Joseph Vanek +1 202 252 6027 +1 202 252 6047 sean.vanek@usdoj.gov
Space Johnny Hillary Walker, III +1 202 252 2575 +1 202 252 2599 johnny.walker@usdoj.gov
Space Carlotta Poter Wells +1 202 514 4522 +1 202 616 8470 carlotta.wells@usdoj.gov
Space Claire M. Whitaker +1 202 514 7137 +1 202 514 8780 claire.whitaker@usdoj.gov
Space Tyler James Wood +1 202 616 2257 tyler.wood@usdoj.gov
Space Michael Andrew Zee +1 202 305 8648 +1 202 616 8470 m.andrew.zee@usdoj.gov
Space Timothy Aaron Ziese +1 202 514 4453 timothy.ziese@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 552
Nature of Suit Prisoner Petition: Civil Rights (Other)
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 5/21/2021, Entered: None Response to Motion
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: None Expedite
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 12/9/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 11/22/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 10/31/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 10/24/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Fox/Neal Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 8/29/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/16/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/3/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/21/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/25/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/7/2019, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for reconsideration
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None order on motion for extension of time to file
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 7/25/2018, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Notice of Supplemental Authority
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/30/2018, Entered: None Proposed Briefing Schedule
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document 29 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            MEMORANDUM AND OPINION granting in part and denying in part 18 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Ketanji Brown Jackson on 04/16/2018. (lckbj1)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/31/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/2/2017, Entered: None Surreply
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 8/2/2017, Entered: None Reply to opposition to Motion
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/14/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/6/2017, Entered: None Memorandum in Opposition to Motion
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/24/2017, Entered: None File Excess Pages
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Fox/Neal Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/3/2017, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/8/2017, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/21/2016, Entered: None Extension of Time to
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/3/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Clarify
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Clarify
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Answer
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Order Directing Prisoner Payment (initial payment)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $121.04 from Prison Account of Anthony Donato and granting 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Signed by Judge Amy Berman Jackson on 03/30/2016. (jf) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                      PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTHONY DONATO (jf) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                          MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTHONY DONATO (jf) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 1 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                              COMPLAINT against BUREAU OF PRISONS, EXECUTIVE OFFICE UNITED STATES ATTORNEYS, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION (Filing fee $ 0.00) filed by ANTHONY DONATO. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet)(jf) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                              LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 28 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?