ANGELL et al v. SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Federal Court Proceeding United States Court of Federal Claims, Case No. 1:14-vv-00914

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 20, 2016 at 11:24 AM EST (5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo ANNA ANGELL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Sadaka Associates Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
on behalf of D.A. MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
No Logo MICHAEL ANGELL, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices Of Sadaka Associates Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
and MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED MARK T. SADAKA +1 201 266 5670 +1 201 266 5671 mark@sadakafirm.com
v.
United States Department of Health and Human Services United States Department of Health and Human Services, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Darryl R. Wishard +1 202 616 4357 +1 202 616 4310 darryl.wishard@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 300
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (31) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF FILING Updated Photographs of D.A. by ANNA ANGELL, MICHAEL ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/19/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/18/2016, Entered: None
    STATUS REPORT , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Wishard, Darryl) (Entered: 05/18/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
      STATUS REPORT , filed by ANNA ANGELL, MICHAEL ANGELL. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
        STATUS REPORT , filed by ANNA ANGELL, MICHAEL ANGELL. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 04/04/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None
          STATEMENT of Completion by ANNA ANGELL, MICHAEL ANGELL. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/24/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
            MEDICAL RECORDS [Exhibit(s) #14] filed by ANNA ANGELL, MICHAEL ANGELL. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 03/11/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 2/18/2016, Entered: None
              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file a status report by 4/4/2016. Respondent shall file a status report within 28 days thereafter. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 02/18/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 2/17/2016, Entered: None
                STATUS REPORT , filed by ANNA ANGELL, MICHAEL ANGELL. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/17/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
                  SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file a status report by 2/17/2016. Respondent shall file a status report within 28 days thereafter. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/14/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/7/2015, Entered: None
                    NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits H - M by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H, # 2 Exhibit I, # 3 Exhibit J, # 4 Exhibit K, # 5 Exhibit L, # 6 Exhibit M)(Wishard, Darryl) (Entered: 12/07/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/3/2015, Entered: None
                      NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits F - G by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G)(Wishard, Darryl) (Entered: 12/03/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/14/2015, Entered: None
                        STATUS REPORT and Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Wishard, Darryl) (Entered: 10/14/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/10/2015, Entered: None
                          STATUS REPORT and Request for Enlargement of Time, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Wishard, Darryl) (Entered: 08/10/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None
                            NOTICE of Intent to File on Compact Disc pursuant to Vaccine General Order #13 filed by ANNA ANGELL, MICHAEL ANGELL.Compact Disc due by 8/3/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/8/2015, Entered: None
                              Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until July 29, 2015 to file an expert report , filed by ANNA ANGELL, MICHAEL ANGELL.Response due by 7/27/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 07/08/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                NOTICE OF INTENT to Remain in the Program by Petitioner. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/27/2015, Entered: None
                                  ORDER: the statutory 240-day time period for the special master's issuance of a decision in this case has expired. Petitioners may submit a notice continuing or withdrawing the petition and such notice shall be filed within 30 days. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 05/27/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None
                                    Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time until 7/8/2015 to File Petitioner's Expert Report , filed by All Plaintiffs.Response due by 5/26/2015. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/3/2015, Entered: None
                                      STATUS REPORT , filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Wishard, Darryl) (Entered: 03/03/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                                        STATUS REPORT , filed by All Plaintiffs. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/25/2015, Entered: None
                                          NOTICE OF FILING 9-11.6 Petitioner's Affidavits by. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 9, # 2 Exhibit 10, # 3 Exhibit 11.1, # 4 Exhibit 11.2, # 5 Exhibit 11.3, # 6 Exhibit 11.4, # 7 Exhibit 11.5, # 8 Exhibit 11.6)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 02/25/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                            STATEMENT of Completion by. (Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None
                                              SCHEDULING ORDER: Petitioners shall file a Statement of Completion by 1/8/2015. They shall file a status report, affidavits, and updated medical records by 2/25/2015. Within 14 days thereafter, Respondent shall file a status report. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (mb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 01/08/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/7/2015, Entered: None
                                                NOTICE OF FILING Exhibits A-E and Initial Exhibits List by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Wishard, Darryl) (Entered: 01/07/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/15/2014, Entered: None
                                                  Respondent's Report, filed by SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES. (Wishard, Darryl) (Entered: 12/15/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/10/2014, Entered: None
                                                    MEDICAL RECORDS. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Sadaka, Mark) (Entered: 10/10/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Darryl R. Wishard for SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES .. (Wishard, Darryl) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 10/1/2014, Entered: None
                                                        INITIAL ORDERRespondents Report due by 12/29/2014. Signed by Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (dlb) Copy to parties. (Entered: 10/01/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                          NOTICE of Assignment to Special Master Lisa Hamilton-Fieldman. (tjk) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                            NOTICE of Designation of Electronic Case. (jb) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/29/2014, Entered: None
                                                              PETITION against SECRETARY OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES (Filing fee $400, Receipt number 077632) [Vaccination date: 10/4/2011], filed by MICHAEL ANGELL, ANNA ANGELL. Respondents Report due by 12/29/2014. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jb) (Entered: 09/29/2014)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                Statistics

                                                                This case has been viewed 152 times.

                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                Space
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                 
                                                                PlainSite
                                                                Sign Up
                                                                Need Password Help?