District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Ohio Southern District Court Court of Appeals for the Sixth Circuit United States Supreme Court

A. Philip Randolph Institute et al v. Husted
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Southern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00303

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated September 6, 2019 at 9:40 AM EDT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo A. Philip Randolph Institute, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel P Tokaji +1 310 266 0402 +1 614 688 0842 dtokaji@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard Burt Saphire +1 937 229 2820 +1 937 229 2469 saphire@udayton.edu

Toggle Switch Represented by ACLU of Ohio

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Freda J Levenson +1 216 472 2220 +1 513 472 2210 flevenson@acluohio.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Bell +1 212 485 6023 +1 212 633 2015 cbell@demos.org
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Theodore N Cox

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Frederick Moke +1 937 725 7561 +1 937 382 7077 paul.moke@gmail.com
No Logo Larry Harmon, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
No Logo Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Daniel P Tokaji +1 310 266 0402 +1 614 688 0842 dtokaji@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Dēmos

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Naila S. Awan +1 212 485 6065 +1 212 633 2015 nawan@demos.org
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Cameron Bell +1 212 485 6023 +1 212 633 2015 cbell@demos.org
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stuart C. Naifeh +1 212 485 6055 +1 212 633 2015 snaifeh@demos.org
v.
No Logo Jon Husted, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office of the Ohio Attorney General

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jordan S. Berman +1 614 466 2872 +1 614 728 7592 jordan.berman@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Heather L. Buchanan +1 614 466 2872 +1 614 728 7592 heather.buchanan@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kevin C. Hulick +1 614 466 2872 +1 614 728 7592 kevin.hulick@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven T Voigt +1 614 466 2872 +1 614 728 7592 steven.voigt@ohioattorneygeneral.gov
No Logo Judicial Watch, Inc., Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Judicial Watch, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
PRO HAC VICE, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Chris Fedeli +1 202 646 5172 +1 202 646 5199 cfedeli@judicialwatch.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Langdon Law LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David R. Langdon +1 513 733 1038 +1 513 577 7383 dlangdon@langdonlaw.com
No Logo Ohio Democratic Party, Amicus
No Logo Public Interest Legal Foundation, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Thomas W. Kidd Jr. LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas W Kidd, Jr. +1 513 733 3080 +1 513 577 7383 tkidd@thomaskiddlaw.com
United States of America United States of America, Interested Party

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 400

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew J. Horwitz +1 513 684 6823 +1 513 684 6385 Matthew.Horwitz@usdoj.gov
  Entries (146) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 9/6/2019, Entered: None Appeal Remark
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 9/3/2019, Entered: None USCA Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Notice of Substitution of Counsel
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 11/1/2018, Entered: None USCA Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 10/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Judgment - Clerk
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document 140 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                              LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Brief
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Brief
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 10/1/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to File
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Leave to File Document
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document 133 Filed: 9/27/2018, Entered: None Response to Motion
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 9/12/2018, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 8/3/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to Vacate
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Vacate
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 6/18/2018, Entered: None USCA Information Copy
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None U.S. Supreme Court: Petition for Writ of Certiorari Denied
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Stay
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to File Document Under Seal
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 5/23/2017, Entered: None File Document Under Seal
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 5/22/2017, Entered: None Exclude
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 4/24/2017, Entered: None Order
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 4/18/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 4/13/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 105 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 4/5/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 4/4/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 2/13/2017, Entered: None U.S. Supreme Court: Petition for Writ of Certiorari Issued
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 1/4/2017, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 11/18/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 11/5/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 10/20/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Withdraw
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Reply (non motion)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER granting in part and denying in part 83 Motion to Strike. Plaintiffs filed a Reply in Support of their Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order. Defendant has moved to strike that reply, or in the alternative, to be permitted to file a reply. Plaintiffs' Reply will not be stricken and Defendant shall have until 5 p.m. October 18, 2016 to file a reply. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 10/18/2016. (smr) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Strike
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Response (non motion)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Brief
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/14/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              ORDER of USCA as to 68 Notice of Appeal: Appellant's motion to expedite the issuance of the mandate is GRANTED. Note: No Mandate details noted. (er) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                MANDATE of USCA as to 68 Notice of Appeal: No costs taxed. (er) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  USCA OPINION AND JUDGMENT as to 68 Notice of Appeal: The Sixth Circuit Reverses the District Court's judgment and Remands the matter for further proceedings consistent with this opinion. Note: Mandate to issue. (er) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 6/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 67 Clerk's Judgment, 66 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, Order on Motion for TRO by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0648-5558561. Appeal Record due by 7/14/2016. (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Jon Husted against A. Philip Randolph Institute. Signed by the Clerk of Court on 6/29/16. (lvw) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER denying 39 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 9 Motion for TRO. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 6/29/16. (lvw) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and Order by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Secretary of State Directive 2015-09) (Voigt, Steven) (Entered: 06/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 6/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER - The Exhibits to Document 63, and any reference thereto, are hereby STRICKEN as irrelevant. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 6/27/16. (lvw) (Entered: 06/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF re 62 Notice (Other), by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila) Modified on 6/27/2016 (lvw). (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE by Defendant Jon Husted The Secretary's Position Statement Regarding the Procedural Posture of this Litigation (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A Briefing Schedule, Obergefell v. Kasich, # 2 Exhibit B Briefing Schedule, Henry v. Wymyslo, # 3 Exhibit C Scheduling Order & Entry, NAACP v. Husted) (Voigt, Steven) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF of Amicus Curiae by Amicus Judicial Watch, Inc. (mas) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF of Amicus Curiae by Amicus Public Interest Legal Foundation. (mas) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 50 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief; granting 54 Motion for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/20/2016. (mas) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 6/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER granting 55 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chris Fedeli. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/20/2016. (mas) (Entered: 06/20/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to Motion re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction filed by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                            BRIEF by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Voigt, Steven) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Chris Fedeli (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5541010) by Amicus Judicial Watch, Inc.. Responses due by 7/11/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Langdon, David) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Leave to File an Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of Defendant by Amicus Judicial Watch, Inc.. Responses due by 7/11/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae of Judicial Watch, # 2 Exhibit Exhibits to Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae Judicial Watch) (Langdon, David) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 6/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge George C. Smith: Telephone Conference held on 6/15/2016. All parties were in attendance. (lvw) (Entered: 06/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    BRIEF re 38 Brief, by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Response to Plaintiffs' Statement of Purportedly Undisputed Material Facts by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief by Amicus Public Interest Legal Foundation. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Amicus Brief, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit) (Kidd, Thomas) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K) (Voigt, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            ANSWER to 37 Amended Complaint filed by Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 43 Plaintiffs' Motion to File Document Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/26/2016. (sln) (Entered: 05/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to File Document Under Seal by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 6/20/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order) (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction Declaration of Cameron Bell (Unsealed) by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T) (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    STIPULATION Joint Proposed Stipulation of Facts and Stipulations af Authenticity, Admissibility, and Preserved Objections by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless re 39 MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction Statement of Undisputed Material Facts (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Summary Judgment and Permanent Injunction by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Larry Harmon, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 6/10/2016 Responses due by 6/17/2016 (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andre Washington, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Angaletta Pickett, # 3 Affidavit Declaration of Delores Freeman, # 4 Affidavit Declaration of Elizabeth Bonham, # 5 Affidavit Declaration of KaRon Waites, # 6 Affidavit Declaration of Larry Harmon, # 7 Affidavit Declaration of Chad McCullough, # 8 Affidavit Declaration of Lisa Keil, # 9 Text of Proposed Order) (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF by Defendant Jon Husted. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A 12/9/1994 Cancellation of Voter Reg., # 2 Exhibit B Declaration of Matthew Damschroder, # 3 Exhibit C Declaration of Pat Wolfe, # 4 Exhibit D 11/10/14 Settlement Agree., # 5 Exhibit E Geographic Rates 1948-2015, # 6 Exhibit F USPS Infor., # 7 Exhibit G 5/2009 Brunner Directive, # 8 Exhibit H Graph, # 9 Exhibit I National Voter Registration Act 1993, # 10 Exhibit J PEW Article, # 11 Exhibit K OH Election Summit 2008-2009, # 12 Exhibit L Declaration of Karla Herron, # 13 Exhibit M Transcript 3/21/16 ALM, # 14 Exhibit N - Part 1Report of Committee on Rules 1993, # 15 Exhibit N - Part 2 H927412/12/01, # 16 Exhibit O /reoirt ib Oribken 1995-1996, # 17 Exhibit P Implementation 1993, # 18 Exhibit Q Voter Registration Appl., # 19 Exhibit R FAQ's (Voigt, Steven) Modified on 6/21/2016 (lvw)to name exhibits. (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint against Jon Husted, filed by A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless, Larry Harmon. (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Modify Briefing Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/13/2016. (sln) Modified on 5/14/2016 (lvw). (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 5/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                JOINT STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/13/2016. (sln) Modified on 5/14/2016 (lvw). (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Protective Order by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION to Modify Briefing Schedule by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. (Awan, Naila) Modified ECF event on 5/13/2016 (sln). (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/2/2016. (sln) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        STIPULATION [Proposed] Joint Stipulation and Protective Order by Defendant Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER granting 29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cameron Bell. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 5/2/2016. (mas) (Entered: 05/02/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION Renewal of Pro Hac Motion for Cameron Bell re 14 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 5/23/2016 (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Hearing: Settlement Conference set for 5/3/2016 01:30 PM in Chambers, Room 301, before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                ANSWER to 1 Complaint, filed by Jon Husted. (Voigt, Steven) (Entered: 04/28/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/28/2016 01:30 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln) (Entered: 04/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Transcript of Proceedings of end of Settlement Conference held on April 14, 2016, before Judge Magistrate-Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. Court Reporter/Transcriber Georgina L. Wells, Telephone number 614-719-3225. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. NOTICE RE: REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within 5 business days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Redaction, of the party's intent to redact personal data identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. The policy is located on our website at www.ohsd.uscourts.gov (Forms - Electronic Availability of Transcripts). Please read this policy carefully. For a complete copy of a transcript, please contact the Court Reporter or the Clerk's Office. Redaction Request due 5/17/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/27/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/25/2016. (Wells, Gina) (jr). (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER granting 23 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel P. Tokaji. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/26/2016. (mas) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Daniel P. Tokaji (Filing fee $ 200, receipt number 0648-5472482) by Plaintiffs A. Philip Randolph Institute, Northeast Ohio Coalition for the Homeless. Responses due by 5/19/2016 (Awan, Naila) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER memorializing the 4/14/16 Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 4/15/16. (sem) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C. Hulick for Defendant Jon Husted (Hulick, Kevin) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Response (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Response (non motion)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/8/2016, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Appear - Pro Hac Vice
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Temporary Restraining Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/7/2016, Entered: None Waiver of Service Executed
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Summons Issued
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      This case has been viewed 136 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                       
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Need Password Help?