LOAN SYNDICATIONS AND TRADING ASSOCIATION v. SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-00652

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 24, 2018 at 8:19 AM DT (3.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Loan Syndications & Trading Association, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by Sidley Austin LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Peter Douglas Keisler
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005 Peter D. Keisler , +1 202 736 8027 +1 202 736 8711 pkeisler@sidley.com
Peter Douglas Keisler
1501 K Street, NW
Washington, DC 20005 Richard Douglas Klingler +1 202 736 8063 rklingler@sidley.com
Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua P. Chadwick +1 202 263 4835 +1 202 736 5615 joshua.p.chadwick@frb.gov
United States Securities and Exchange Commission United States Securities and Exchange Commission, Respondent
Officially listed as "SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Securities and Exchange Commission

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Nicholas Jacob Bronni
100 F Street, NE
Washington, DC 20549-9040 Sarah R. Prins +1 202 551 5159 prinss@sec.gov
No Logo BETTER MARKETS, Inc., Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by BETTER MARKETS, Inc.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen W. Hall +1 202 618 6464 +1 202 618 6465 shall@bettermarkets.com
No Logo Chamber Of Commerce Of The United States Of America, Amicus

Toggle Switch Represented by Wilmer Hale, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Stephen V. Carey +1 202 663 6318 stephen.carey@wilmerhale.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carl J Nichols +1 202 663 6226 +1 202 663 6363 carl.nichols@wilmerhale.com
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None USCA Mandate
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/6/2017, Entered: None Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/22/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Blank 27 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              GENERAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on June 3, 2016. (lcrbw1) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AMICUS BRIEF by BETTER MARKETS, INC.. (td) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AMICUS BRIEF by CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (td) (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by BETTER MARKETS, INC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hall, Stephen) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by BETTER MARKETS, INC. (Hall, Stephen) (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen W. Hall on behalf of BETTER MARKETS, INC. (Hall, Stephen) (Main Document 22 replaced on 5/9/2016) (ztd). (Entered: 05/06/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE of Appearance by Carl J. Nichols on behalf of CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Nichols, Carl) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Amicus Brief by CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Carey, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              LCvR 7.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Carey, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Stephen V. Carey on behalf of CHAMBER OF COMMERCE OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Carey, Stephen) (Entered: 05/05/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD (Portions of the Administrative Record Cited in Motions for Summary Judgment) by LOAN SYNDICATIONS AND TRADING ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Keisler, Peter) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    REPLY to opposition to motion re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LOAN SYNDICATIONS AND TRADING ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Keisler, Peter) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Memorandum in opposition to re 13 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by LOAN SYNDICATIONS AND TRADING ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Keisler, Peter) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Memorandum in opposition to re 12 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chadwick, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION for Summary Judgment by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Chadwick, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Summary Judgment by LOAN SYNDICATIONS AND TRADING ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Keisler, Peter) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              COMPLAINT against BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM, SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by LOAN SYNDICATIONS AND TRADING ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Keisler, Peter) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM. (Chadwick, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  ADMINISTRATIVE RECORD by SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION. (Prins, Sarah) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua P. Chadwick on behalf of BOARD OF GOVERNORS OF THE FEDERAL RESERVE SYSTEM (Chadwick, Joshua) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah R. Prins on behalf of SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION (Prins, Sarah) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Richard D. Klingler on behalf of LOAN SYNDICATIONS AND TRADING ASSOCIATION (Klingler, Richard) (Entered: 04/19/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Unopposed MOTION to Expedite consideration of this action by LOAN SYNDICATIONS AND TRADING ASSOCIATION (Attachments: # 1 Appendix A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Keisler, Peter) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by LOAN SYNDICATIONS AND TRADING ASSOCIATION. (Keisler, Peter) (Entered: 04/13/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Notice to Counsel/Party
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  NOTICE to Counsel/Party (zrdj) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None Case Transferred In - District Transfer
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States Court of Appeals for District of Columbia Circuit. Case Number 14-1240 filed by LOAN SYNDICATIONS AND TRADING ASSOCIATION. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(zrdj) (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 200 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?