Andrew Chartier v. M. Richard Epps P.C.
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit, Case No. 16-1179

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 30, 2017 at 8:45 AM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF by Appellees Green Tree Servicing, LLC and M. Richard Epps P.C. in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: RESPONSE. Method of Filing Paper Copies: hand delivery. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 05/16/2016. [999823865] [16-1179] Brian Moffet
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
    APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Robert E. Draim for M. Richard Epps P.C..[999823365] [16-1179] Robert Draim
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
      BRIEF by Appellant Andrew Chartier in electronic and paper format. Type of Brief: OPENING. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date Paper Copies Mailed, Dispatched, or Delivered to Court: 04/13/2016. [999794179] [16-1179] Sergei Lemberg
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
        FULL ELECTRONIC APPENDIX and full paper appendix by Appellant Andrew Chartier. Method of Filing Paper Copies: courier. Date paper copies mailed dispatched or delivered to court: 04/13/2016. [999794178] [16-1179] Sergei Lemberg
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
          ORDER filed [999782118] granting Motion to file separate brief (Local Rule 28(d)) [12]. Separate brief due on 05/16/2016 by Green Tree Servicing, LLC and M. Richard Epps P.C. Copies to all parties. [16-1179] (TW)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None
            RESPONSE/ANSWER by Andrew Chartier to Motion to file separate brief (Local Rule 28(d)) [12]. [16-1179] Sergei Lemberg
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
              ORDER filed [999774961] extending filing time for opening brief and appendix until 4/12/2016, updating/ resuming briefing order deadlines. Opening brief and appendix due 04/12/2016. Response brief due 05/16/2016. Copies to all parties.. [16-1179] (JSN)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
                APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Sergei Lemberg for Andrew Chartier.[999774386] [16-1179] Sergei Lemberg
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/14/2016, Entered: None
                  DOCKETING FORMS FOLLOW-UP NOTICE ISSUED to Attorney Sergei Lemberg for Appellant Andrew Chartier re: filing of appearance form (Loc.R. 46(g)). Appearance form due on 03/17/2016. [16-1179] (JSN)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
                    NOTICE ISSUED to Sergei Lemberg for Andrew Chartier requesting response to Motion to file separate brief (Local Rule 28(d)) [12]Response due: 03/24/2016.[999772886]. [16-1179] (TW)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/11/2016, Entered: None
                      CONSENT/STIPULATION by Appellees Green Tree Servicing, LLC and M. Richard Epps P.C. to file separate briefs (Local Rule 28(d)) [12] [16-1179] David Hudgins
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/10/2016, Entered: None
                        DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellant Andrew Chartier. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999772171] [16-1179] Sergei Lemberg
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None
                          Initial mediation conference scheduled. [16-1179] (LP)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
                            DOCKETING STATEMENT by Appellant Andrew Chartier. [16-1179] Sergei Lemberg
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None
                              APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Zachary S. Schultz for Green Tree Servicing, LLC.[999762102] [16-1179] Zachary Schultz
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                                DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee Green Tree Servicing, LLC. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? Yes [999761632] [16-1179] Brian Moffet
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2016, Entered: None
                                  APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by Brian L. Moffet for Green Tree Servicing, LLC.[999761624] [16-1179] Brian Moffet
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                                    DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATE AFFILIATIONS (Local Rule 26.1) by Appellee M. Richard Epps P.C.. Was any question on Disclosure Form answered yes? No [999760077] [16-1179] David Hudgins
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/23/2016, Entered: None
                                      APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL (Local Rule 46(c)) by David D. Hudgins for M. Richard Epps P.C..[999760076] [16-1179] David Hudgins
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                        BRIEFING ORDER filed. Opening Brief and Appendix due 03/30/2016. Response Brief due 05/02/2016. Mailed to: Zachary Schultz. [16-1179] (JSN)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                          DOCKETING NOTICE issued Re: [1] case docketed Initial forms due within 14 days. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-01071-JFM. Mailed to: Zachary Schultz. [16-1179] (JSN)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/19/2016, Entered: None
                                            Case docketed. Originating case number: 1:14-cv-01071-JFM. Case manager: JeffNeal. [16-1179] (JSN)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 386 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?