LNV Corporation v. Denise Subramaniam
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Ninth Circuit, Case No. 15-35963

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2017 at 2:31 PM ST (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 4220 - Real Property: Foreclosure
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 8 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SFI): The court has received appellant’s March 31, 2016 filing. Within 14 days after the filing date of this order, appellee may file a response. Appellant’s optional reply is due 5 days after service of the response. The response is limited to 20 pages, and the reply is limited to 10 pages. See Fed. R. App. P. 27(d)(2). All other pending motions will be addressed by separate order. Briefing remains suspended. [9923268] (OC) [Entered: 03/31/2016 03:03 PM]
    LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None
    Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam Correspondence: FYI Letter to clerk about a Washington County Court motion with enclosure of the motion. Date of service: 06/29/2016 [10034032] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 06/29/2016 03:04 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None
      Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam Correspondence: Request pursuant to FRCP Rule 5.1(a)(1) & 28 USC Sec. 2403 to certify to U.S. & Oregon Attorney Generals a constitutional challenge to Acts of Congress & Oregon foreclosure laws w/ Notice of Constitutional Questions enclosed w/ notice of urgency. Date of service: 06/24/2016 [10028687] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 06/24/2016 12:45 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 26 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
        Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam motion for reconsideration of dispositive Judge Order of 05/17/2016. Date of service: 05/31/2016. [9997479] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 05/31/2016 09:29 PM]
          LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
          Filed order (STEPHEN REINHARDT and MARY H. MURGUIA) The motion to proceed in forma pauperis is granted. The Clerk shall amend the docket to reflect this status. Appellee’s motion to withdraw the March 24, 2016 motion to dismiss is granted. The March 31, 2016 “emergency petition for writ of mandamus” is construed as a motion for injunctive relief pending appeal. The motion and the April 13, 2016 supplemental motion are denied. The May 2, 2016 “urgent motion for injunction pending appeal” is denied. See Winter v. Nat. Res. Def. Council, Inc., 555 U.S. 7, 20 (2008). The April 13, 2016 motions for leave to become amicus curiae are denied. The April 14, 2016 motion to strike the amicus briefs and motions for leave to become amicus curiae is granted. The April 19, 2016 “motion for ADA accommodation,” which requests appointment of a “disability liaison” to communicate with opposing counsel, is denied. To the extent appellant requests that JoAnn Breitling be added to the court’s service list for this appeal, the request is denied. Information about receiving notification for cases of interest as a Public Interested Person is available at: http://www.ca9.uscourts.gov/cmecf/faqs/reg/#reg-public-int-person. In light of appellant’s April 19, 2016 filing, the court sua sponte grants an extension of time to file the opening brief and the optional reply brief. The opening brief is due July 15, 2016; the answering brief is due August 15, 2016; and the optional reply brief is due within 30 days after service of the answering brief. Because appellant is proceeding without counsel, the excerpts of record requirement is waived. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.2. Appellee’s supplemental excerpts of record are limited to the district court docket sheet, the notice of appeal, the judgment or order appealed from, and any specific portions of the record cited in appellee’s brief. See 9th Cir. R. 30-1.7. [9979295] (WL) [Entered: 05/17/2016 09:52 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
            Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam reply to response (). Date of service: 05/05/2016. [9965147] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 05/05/2016 07:55 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None
              Filed (ECF) Appellee LNV Corporation response opposing motion ([20] Motion (ECF Filing), [20] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for injunction pending appeal). Date of service: 05/04/2016. [9963796] [15-35963] (Richards, Gabrielle) [Entered: 05/04/2016 10:26 AM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
                Filed clerk order (Deputy Clerk: SFI): The court has received appellant’s urgent motion for injunction pending appeal, seeking relief by May 5, 2016. A response may be filed by May 4, 2016. All other pending motions will be addressed by separate order. [9962741] (ME) [Entered: 05/03/2016 02:28 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/2/2016, Entered: None
                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam Urgent Motion for injunction pending appeal. Date of service: 05/02/2016. [9961537] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 05/02/2016 09:51 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 19 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None
                    Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam reply to response (). Date of service: 04/26/2016. [9953677] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 04/26/2016 01:49 PM]
                      LREF
                      Blank 18 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None
                      Filed (ECF) Appellee LNV Corporation response opposing motion ([17] Motion (ECF Filing), [17] Motion (ECF Filing) motion for miscellaneous relief (to be used only if no other relief applies)). Date of service: 04/21/2016. [9948420] [15-35963] (Richards, Gabrielle) [Entered: 04/21/2016 12:37 PM]
                        LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/19/2016, Entered: None
                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam Motion for miscellaneous relief [Motion for ADA Accommodation by authorizing disability liaison]. Date of service: 04/19/2016. [9945780] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 04/19/2016 02:57 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/18/2016, Entered: None
                          Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam reply to response to Court order dated. Date of service: 04/18/2016. [9944557] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 04/18/2016 10:09 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Blank 14 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                            Filed (ECF) Appellee LNV Corporation Correspondence: LNV Corporation objects to the Supplement to Clarification of Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by Appellant Denise Subramaniam. Neither the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure nor the Ninth Circuit Rules contemplate such briefing.. Date of service: 04/14/2016 [9940786] [15-35963] (Richards, Gabrielle) [Entered: 04/14/2016 04:33 PM]
                              LREF
                              Blank 13 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                              Filed (ECF) Appellee LNV Corporation Motion to strike whole of Amicus Brief and Declaration of Kelly Randle and Fred Mitchell in Support of Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus and the Amicus Brief and Declaration of Rebekah Gentry-Youngblood in Support of Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Date of service: 04/14/2016. [9940565] [15-35963] (Richards, Gabrielle) [Entered: 04/14/2016 03:30 PM]
                                LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                                Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Amicus Brief and Declaration of Rebekah Gentry-Youngblood. Date of service: 04/13/2016. [9939311] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 04/13/2016 09:23 PM]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                                  Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam Supplemental Motion for miscellaneous relief [petition for writ of mandamus]. Date of service: 04/13/2016. [9939310] [15-35963] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect content of filing. 04/14/2016 by TYL] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 04/13/2016 08:58 PM]
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                                    Submitted (ECF) Amicus brief for review and filed Motion to become amicus curiae. Submitted by Amicus Brief and Declaration of Kelly Randle and Fred Mitchell in Support of Emergency Petition for Writ of Mandamus. Date of service: 04/13/2016. [9939309] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 04/13/2016 08:53 PM]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None
                                      Filed (ECF) Appellee LNV Corporation response to motion (petition for writ of mandamus). Date of service: 04/13/2016. [9937669] [15-35963] --[COURT UPDATE: Updated docket text to reflect correct ECF filing type. 04/13/2016 by TYL] (Richards, Gabrielle) [Entered: 04/13/2016 09:50 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                        Filed (ECF) Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam EMERGENCY Motion for miscellaneous relief [EMERGENCY PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS CIRCUIT RULE 27-5 or alternatively Emergency Writ of Mandamus under Rule 27-3]. Date of service: 03/31/2016. [9922316] [15-35963] (Subramaniam, Denise) [Entered: 03/31/2016 08:57 AM]
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/30/2016, Entered: None
                                        Filed (ECF) Appellee LNV Corporation Correspondence: LNV Corporation filed a motion to dismiss on the good-faith belief that Appellant failed to file an opening brief by the deadline set by the Court. LNV was unaware that the briefing schedule had been stayed and now wishes to withdraw the motion.. Date of service: 03/30/2016 [9921364] [15-35963] (Richards, Gabrielle) [Entered: 03/30/2016 01:17 PM]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 5 Filed: 3/29/2016, Entered: None
                                          Filed order (Appellate Commissioner): Appellant’s March 24, 2016 letter is construed as a motion for leave to file documents contained in a flash drive as a motion. So construed, the motion is denied. If appellant wishes to file a motion, the motion and any exhibits must be filed in paper or electronically. If appellant encounters difficulty in filing electronically, appellant may seek assistance through the resources available on the court’s website at www.ca9.uscourts.gov/cmecf/feedback/. Briefing remains suspended pending the court’s review of the motion to proceed in forma pauperis. See 9th Cir. R. 27-11. (MOATT) [9918954] (OC) [Entered: 03/29/2016 09:27 AM]
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None
                                            Filed Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam letter to EMERGENCY motion clerk attached a flash drive. Deficiencies: noproof of service [9915583] (JFF) [Entered: 03/25/2016 10:26 AM]
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/24/2016, Entered: None
                                              Filed (ECF) Appellee LNV Corporation Motion to dismiss case for failure to prosecute (Cir. Rule 42-1). Date of service: 03/24/2016. [9913773] [15-35963] (Richards, Gabrielle) [Entered: 03/24/2016 09:54 AM]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                Filed Appellant Ms. Denise Subramaniam motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis. Deficiencies: None. Served on 12/03/2015. [9793727] (RT) [Entered: 12/15/2015 03:26 PM]
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/15/2015, Entered: None
                                                  DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 01/04/2016. Transcript due 02/02/2016. Appellant Denise Subramaniam opening brief due 03/14/2016. Appellee LNV Corporation answering brief due 04/14/2016. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 14 days after service of the answering brief. [9793705] (RT) [Entered: 12/15/2015 03:21 PM]
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 755 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?