Yudina v. Kriss
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00932
Magistrate Judge Eileen S. Willett, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 13, 2019 at 12:51 AM EDT (2.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Sater, Felix H., Plaintiff
Officially listed as "Felix Sater"

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaburg & Wilk, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Michael Benjamin Dvoren +1 602 248 1000 +1 602 248 0522 mbd@jaburgwilk.com
an individual Aaron K. Haar +1 602 248 1025 akh@jaburgwilk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria Crimi Speth +1 602 248 1000 +1 602 248 0522 mcs@jaburgwilk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moses & Singer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Robert S. Wolf +1 212 554 7800 +1 212 554 7700 rwolf@mosessinger.com
No Logo Larissa Yudina, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaburg & Wilk, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Michael Benjamin Dvoren +1 602 248 1000 +1 602 248 0522 mbd@jaburgwilk.com
an individual Aaron K. Haar +1 602 248 1025 akh@jaburgwilk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria Crimi Speth +1 602 248 1000 +1 602 248 0522 mcs@jaburgwilk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moses & Singer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Robert S. Wolf +1 212 554 7800 +1 212 554 7700 rwolf@mosessinger.com
No Logo OST Group, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Jaburg & Wilk, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a foreign entity Michael Benjamin Dvoren +1 602 248 1000 +1 602 248 0522 mbd@jaburgwilk.com
a foreign entity Aaron K. Haar +1 602 248 1025 akh@jaburgwilk.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Maria Crimi Speth +1 602 248 1000 +1 602 248 0522 mcs@jaburgwilk.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Moses & Singer LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a foreign entity Robert S. Wolf +1 212 554 7800 +1 212 554 7700 rwolf@mosessinger.com
v.
No Logo East River Partners LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kercsmar Feltus PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a foreign corporation Gregory Blain Collins +1 480 421 1001 +1 480 421 1002 gbc@kflawaz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & Ball

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a foreign corporation Adam Corey Sherman +1 513 723 4680 +1 513 852 8468 acsherman@vorys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simon & Partners LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
a foreign corporation Jamie E. Shapiro +1 212 332 8904 eshapiro@simonlawyers.com
a foreign corporation Bradley Drew Simon +1 212 332 8900 +1 212 332 8909 bradsimon@simonlawyers.com
No Logo Jody Kriss, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kercsmar Feltus PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Gregory Blain Collins +1 480 421 1001 +1 480 421 1002 gbc@kflawaz.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Rosenberg & Ball

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Adam Corey Sherman +1 513 723 4680 +1 513 852 8468 acsherman@vorys.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Simon & Partners LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
an individual Jamie E. Shapiro +1 212 332 8904 eshapiro@simonlawyers.com
an individual Bradley Drew Simon +1 212 332 8900 +1 212 332 8909 bradsimon@simonlawyers.com
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1114
Nature of Suit 840 - Property Rights: Trademark
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER approving the 67 Stipulation and dismissing this action in its entirety, with prejudice, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 3/12/2018. (LFIG) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 1/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER that Plaintiffs file a Stipulation to Dismiss by March 9, 2018. If a Stipulation to Dismiss has not been filed, the parties shall file a Status Report to the Court on that date. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/29/2018. (LFIG) (Entered: 01/30/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        STATUS REPORT by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Wolf, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER that Plaintiffs file a Status Report by Friday, 1/26/2018. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/16/2018. (LFIG) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER granting the 62 Application to Withdraw as Counsel of Record and attorneys Maria Crimi Speth, Michael B. Dvoren, and Aaron K. Haar of Jaburg & Wilk, P.C. are relieved of any further representation of Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants in this case. The Clerk of the Court is kindly instructed to terminate Maria Crimi Speth, Michael B. Dvoren, and Aaron K. Haar of Jaburg & Wilk, P.C. as counsel of record and remove their names from the electronic certificate of mailing. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 12/13/2017. (LFIG) (Entered: 12/13/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Felix Sater and OST Group (Without Client Consent) by OST Group, Felix Sater. (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER granting the third 60 Joint Motion for Extension of Time and the deadline for the parties to file stipulated proposed discovery deadlines or a Notice of Settlement is extended to December 11, 2017. Counsel shall TAKE NOTICE that no further continuances of this deadline shall be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/16/2017.(LFIG) (Entered: 10/16/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Joint MOTION for Extension of Time Extend Deadlines to Provide Proposed Discovery Deadlines by OST Group, Felix Sater. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Speth, Maria) (Entered: 10/11/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 9/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER granting 58 Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Provide Proposed Discovery Deadlines: The deadline for the parties to file stipulated proposed discovery deadlines or a Notice of Settlement is extended to October 11, 2017. See order for additional details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/14/2017.(LMR) (Entered: 09/14/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Extend Date by Which Parties Must Submit Proposed Discovery Deadlines to Court from Sept. 11, 2017 to October 11, 2017 In Light of Serious Settlement Negotiations by East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss. (Shapiro, Jamie) (Entered: 09/13/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting the 56 Motion for Extension of Time and the deadline for the parties to file stipulated proposed discovery deadlines is extended to September 11, 2017. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/11/2017.(LFIG) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Joint MOTION for Extension of Time (Joint Motion to Extend Deadline to Provide Proposed Discovery Deadlines) by East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss. (Collins, Gregory) (Entered: 08/11/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER granting the 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate Maria Crimi Speth, Michael B. Dvoren, and Aaron K. Haar of Jaburg & Wilk, P.C. and Robert S. Wolf of Moses & Singer LLP as counsel of record for Plaintiff Larissa Yudina only. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED vacating the Order at Doc. 40 . Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/8/2017.(LFIG) (Entered: 08/09/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE re: of Filing In Camera Report by Counsel Regarding Larissa Yudina Deposition by OST Group, Felix Sater . (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Diane J Humetewa: Motion Hearing held on 8/1/2017 as to the 49 Motion to Set Scheduling Conference and to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion deadlines. The Court directs the parties to meet and confer and within 10 days submit to the Court stipulated proposed dates. Argument heard as to the 43 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney for Plaintiff Larissa Yudina. The Court will take the matter under advisement pending the filing of a notice by Plaintiff Yudina's counsel as set forth on the record. The Court directs Mr. J. Evan Shapiro to file an Application for Admission to Practice Pro Hac Vice. APPEARANCES: Maria Speth and Michael Dvoren for Plaintiffs. Bradley Simon, Gregory Collins and J. Evan Shapiro for Defendants. (Court Reporter Linda Schroeder.) Hearing held 1:30 PM to 1:59 PM. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) (Entered: 08/02/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER: On the Court's own motion, IT IS ORDERED setting a Telephonic Motion Hearing for 8/1/2017 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa re: Doc. 43 and Doc. 49 . Counsel will receive dial-in instructions for the teleconference separately via electronic mail prior to the hearing. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/27/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RESPONSE to Motion re: 49 MOTION for Scheduling Conference filed by OST Group, Felix Sater. (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 07/14/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE re: Regarding Readiness of the Parties for Final Pretrial Conference by OST Group, Felix Sater . (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 07/10/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 6/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        *MOTION to Set Scheduling Conference and to Extend Discovery and Dispositive Motion Deadlines by East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss. (Collins, Gregory) *Modified to correct event; attorney noticed on 7/3/2017 (SLQ). (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          *REPLY to Response to Motion re: 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Larissa Yudina (With Client Consent) filed by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Speth, Maria) *Modified to reflect all filers on 6/19/2017 (KAS). (Entered: 06/16/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            *DECLARATION re: 46 Response in Opposition to Motion to 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Larissa Yudina (With Client Consent)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re: 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Larissa Yudina (With Client Consent) filed by East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss. (Simon, Bradley) (Entered: 06/09/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE re: Of Intent to Oppose Application to Withdraw by East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss re: 43 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Larissa Yudina (With Client Consent) . (Collins, Gregory) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 6/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  AMENDED ORDER granting Plaintiff Larissa Yudina's 41 Rule 41(a)(2) Motion to Dismiss her Claim for Declaratory Relief. ORDERED that Plaintiff Larissa Yudina shall be dismissed immediately as a Plaintiff in this action. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Larissa Yudina's single claim for declaratory judgment against Defendants shall be immediately dismissed. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/5/2017. (LFIG) (Entered: 06/05/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 6/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney for Larissa Yudina (With Client Consent) by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Speth, Maria) (Entered: 06/02/2017)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      AMENDED by Doc. 44 ORDER granting Plaintiff Larissa Yudina's 41 Rule 41(a)(2) Motion to Dismiss her Claim for Declaratory Relief. ORDERED that Plaintiff Larissa Yudina shall be dismissed immediately as a Plaintiff in this action. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that the single claim against Plaintiff Larissa Yudina for declaratory judgment also shall be dismissed immediately. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 5/31/2017.(LFIG) Modified on 6/5/2017 (LFIG). (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 5/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        MOTION to Dismiss Counts/Claims : All of Yudina's claims as a Plaintiff by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Speth, Maria) (Entered: 05/12/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER that Plaintiffs' 36 Motion for Protective Order re: Depositions of Larissa Yudina and OST Group is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Plaintiffs and Defendants shall each pay 50% of the cost of air fare and lodging for Plaintiff Yudina and Mr. Yudin to fly from Moscow, Russia to New York City for their depositions. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/21/2017.(LFIG) (Entered: 02/21/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE to Motion re: 36 MOTION for Protective Order re: Depositions of Larissa Yudina and OST Group filed by East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-B)(Collins, Gregory) (Entered: 02/09/2017)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            ORDER: Given Plaintiffs' pending Motion for Protective Order re: Depositions of Larissa Yudina and OST Group (Doc. 36 ), and the Order scheduling briefing thereon (Doc. 35 ), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED STRIKING the "Corrected Notice of Deposition of Larissa Yudina" (Doc. 36 at 9-10) and the "Corrected Notice of Deposition of OST Group, Pursuant to Rule 30(B)(6) [sic]" (Doc. 36 at 11-18). ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/7/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/07/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Motion (Doc. 34 ) is GRANTED and the fact discovery deadline is extended to and including February 28, 2017. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 2/3/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                *MOTION for Protective Order re: Depositions of Larissa Yudina and OST Group by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Speth, Maria) *Modified on 2/7/2017 to reflect this document is STRICKEN in part as to pages 9-18, per Doc. 38. (LFIG) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER: Having reviewed the 33 Joint Summary of Discovery Dispute, regarding where Plaintiffs' depositions should be conducted, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that within seven (7) days from the entry of this Order, if the parties cannot agree that the depositions of plaintiffs Larissa Yudina and OST Group ("OST") shall be conducted in Manhasset, New York, where OST "'maintains a presence[,]'" (Id. at 4:2), and after service of the notices of deposition, the parties may file whatever motions they deem necessary to protect their respective interests as to where these depositions should be conducted. Any such motion shall not exceed five (5) pages; responses, also not to exceed five (5) pages, shall be filed and served seven (7) days after filing and service of any motion. No replies will be allowed. ORDERED by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 1/26/2017. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (LFIG) (Entered: 01/26/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Joint Motion and Stipulation to Extend Fact Discovery Deadline) by East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Collins, Gregory) (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 1/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      *NOTICE re:JOINT SUMMARY OF DISCOVERY DISPUTE PER PARAGRAPH 6 OF RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER (DKT # 26) by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Speth, Maria) *Modified to correct event type on 1/25/2017 (KGM). (Entered: 01/25/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 31 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Robert S Wolf on behalf of OST Group, Felix Sater, and Larissa Yudina. (BAS) (Entered: 01/19/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 29 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Bradley D Simon on behalf of East River Partners LLC and Jody Kriss. (BAS) (Entered: 01/12/2017)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                NOTICE re: Service of Defendants' Initial Disclosures by East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss . (Sherman, Adam) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  NOTICE re: Service of Initial Disclosure Statement by OST Group, Felix Sater . (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 1/31/2017. Dispositive motions due by 6/30/2017. ORDERED vacating the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for September 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/6/2016. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting by OST Group, Felix Sater. (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 09/01/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        ORDER pursuant to General Order 09-08 granting 23 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice. Per the Court's Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual, applicant has five (5) days in which to register as a user of the Electronic Filing System. Registration to be accomplished via the court's website at www.azd.uscourts.gov. Counsel is advised that they are limited to two (2) additional e-mail addresses in their District of Arizona User Account. (BAS) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 8/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to attorney Adam C Sherman on behalf of East River Partners LLC and Jody Kriss. (BAS) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            *Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information Notice to the Court Re No Changes to the Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent or trademark re: 9 Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information and 20 Minute Order by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina . (Dvoren, Michael) *Modified to correct event and add document linkage on 8/16/2016 (ATD). (Entered: 08/15/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              ORDER that Plaintiffs/Counter-Defendants Larissa Yudina, Felix Sater, and OST Group file the appropriate form(s) pursuant to Doc. 20 , within 7 days of the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 8/8/2016. (LFIG) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading 18 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header (REW) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER setting a Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for September 9, 2016 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/13/2016. (See Order for details.) (LFIG) (Entered: 07/13/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Plaintiffs/Counterdefendants ANSWER to 14 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim by Larissa Yudina.(Dvoren, Michael) (Entered: 07/12/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Benjamin Dvoren on behalf of OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Dvoren, Michael) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss. (Collins, Gregory) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, (Doc. 14 ) has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document.If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form.If there are no changes to the information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event:Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information.(LFIG) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Jury Demand (and for Declaratory Relief and Counterclaims for Violation of 15 U.S.C 1125(d) and 8131), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2)(Collins, Gregory) (Entered: 06/24/2016)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            SERVICE EXECUTED filed by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina: Proof of Service re: Summons, Complaint for Declaratory Relief, Corporate Disclosure Statement, Consent to Exercise of Jurisdiction upon East River Partners, LLC on June 6, 2016. (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/26/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. ORDERED that Plaintiffs serve a copy of this Order upon Defendants and file a notice of service. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 4/26/2016. (LFIG) (Entered: 04/26/2016)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/21/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Diane J. Humetewa. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-16-932-PHX-DJH. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/20/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                                  Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) (Entered: 04/21/2016)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/6/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                      Summons Issued as to East River Partners LLC, Jody Kriss. (Attachments: # 1 Summons)(HLA). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. (Entered: 04/06/2016)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Blank 7 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Submitted by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                          Blank 6 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Submitted by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (Speth, Maria) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (KMG) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                              Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-12817040. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Eileen S Willett. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-16-00932-PHX-ESW. Magistrate Election form attached. (Attachments: # 1 Magistrate Consent Form)(KMG) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Submitted by OST Group, Felix Sater, Larissa Yudina. (submitted by Maria Crimi Speth) (KMG) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement by OST Group. (submitted by Maria Crimi Speth) (KMG) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/4/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-12817040 filed by Larissa Yudina, Felix Sater, OST Group. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet)(submitted by Maria Crimi Speth)(KMG) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Remark: Pro hac motion granted for Jamie Evan Shapiro on behalf of defendants Jody Kriss and East River Partners LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX181034 as to Robert S Wolf. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX180800 as to Bradley D Simon. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        PRO HAC VICE FEE PAID. $ 35, receipt number PHX175751 as to Adam C Sherman. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 195 times.

                                                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                           
                                                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                                                          Need Password Help?