USA v. Wilmington Trust Corporation et al

Criminal Case Delaware District Court, Case No. 1:15-cr-00023
District Judge Richard G. Andrews, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Richard G. Andrews
Last Updated October 6, 2022 at 9:13 AM EDT (2.6 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Wilmington Trust Corporation, Defendant (1)

Represented by Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Christopher J. Gunther +1 212 735 2000
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Robert Scott Saunders +1 302 651 3000 +1 888 329 4135 rob.saunders@skadden.com
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Lori W. Will +1 302 651 3119 lori.will@skadden.com

Represented by Williams & Connolly, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Margaret A. Keeley +1 202 434 5137 +1 202 434 5029 mkeeley@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Tobin J Romero +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 tromero@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Barry S. Simon +1 202 434 5000 +1 202 434 5029 bsimon@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. +1 202 434 5800 +1 202 434 5029 bsullivan@wc.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, Designation: Retained Lance A Wade +1 202 434 5755 +1 202 434 5029 lwade@wc.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Attributes
Timeline
  Entries (67) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 993 Filed: 10/6/2022, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 992 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 991 Filed: 8/30/2021, Entered: None Letter
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 990 Filed: 8/27/2021, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 976 Filed: 7/13/2021, Entered: None Order
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 950 Filed: 3/3/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 944 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Notice - Other
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 196 Filed: 5/17/2016, Entered: None
EXHIBIT re 181 MOTION to Dismiss for a Bill of Particulars for Counts 17 Through 19 - Certification under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2) - by David Gibson as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 194 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
Joinder To Other Defendants' Motions 166 , 168 , 172 , 176 , 179 , 187 by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2))(Moffitt, Jay) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 193 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
Joinder to 168 Robert Harra's Motion to Dismiss by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Nau, Helen) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 192 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
Joinder to 179 WTC's motion for a Bill of Particulars by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Nau, Helen) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 191 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
Joinder to 187 WTC's motion for grand jury material by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Nau, Helen) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 190 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
Joinder to 166 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 5, 11-16 for Failure to Allege Essential Elements, 172 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2 Through 16 and Portions of Count I for Failure to State an Offense , 176 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 Through 16 as Unconstitutionally Vague by Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Nau, Helen) Modified on 5/17/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 188 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 187 MOTION for Disclosure of Certain Grand Jury Materials and MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment if any Grand Jurors were Biased as a Matter of Law (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-G)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 187 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
MOTION for Disclosure of Certain Grand Jury Materials and, MOTION to Dismiss the Indictment if any Grand Jurors were Biased as a Matter of Law by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 186 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 181 MOTION to Dismiss for a Bill of Particulars for Counts 17 Through 19 (Lafferty, William) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss for a Bill of Particulars for Counts 17 Through 19 by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lafferty, William) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 179 MOTION for Bill of Particulars (Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
MOTION for Bill of Particulars by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification Under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2))(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 175 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 17 Through 19 For Failure To State An Offense (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 176 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 Through 16 as Unconstitutionally Vague (Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1 Through 16 as Unconstitutionally Vague by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 175 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 17 Through 19 For Failure To State An Offense by David Gibson as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 174 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
MOTION for Joinder of Certain Motions filed by Co-Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation and to Supplement Co-Defendant Wilmington Trust Corporation's Motion for a Bill of Particulars by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Certification Under Local Rule 5(d)(2), # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Mette, Luke) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 172 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2 Through 16 and Portions of Count I for Failure to State an Offense (Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 2 Through 16 and Portions of Count I for Failure to State an Offense by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 168 MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitious Counts (Mette, Luke) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 170 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 169 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 7 Through 10 for Failure to State an Offense (Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 7 Through 10 for Failure to State an Offense by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Multiplicitious Counts by Robert V.A. Harra as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Mette, Luke) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 166 MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 5, 11-16 for Failure to Allege Essential Elements (Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Dismiss Counts 1, 2, 5, 11-16 for Failure to Allege Essential Elements by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 5/11/2016, Entered: None
REPLY TO RESPONSE to Motion by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 154 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-15, # 2 Appendix A)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 05/11/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Sealed Legal Document 163 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None
SEALED EXHIBIT re 162 Sealed Letter by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (ksr, ) (Entered: 05/09/2016)
LREF
Sealed Legal Document 162 Filed: 5/4/2016, Entered: None
Sealed Letter by USA. (ksr, ) Modified on 5/9/2016 (ksr, ). (Entered: 05/09/2016)
LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 5/3/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE of Change of Address by William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 05/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 4/29/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 154 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 04/29/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None
Letter to The Honorable Richard G. Andrews from Kenneth M. Breen regarding Status of pending discovery motions by individual defendants in response to oral order on 4/12/16. (Guberman, Phara) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 4/15/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER granting 157 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1), David Gibson (2), Robert V.A. Harra (3), William B. North (4), Kevyn N. Rakowski (5). The Government shall file its response to 154 Motion to Compel by April 29, 2016 and Defendant shall file any reply brief by May 11, 2016. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 4/15/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 04/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 154 MOTION to Compel by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 155 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Support by Wilmington Trust Corporation re 154 MOTION to Compel (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-15)(Will, Lori) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
MOTION to Compel by Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Certification Under Local Criminal Rule 5(d)(2))(Will, Lori) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER re 151 Motion for Joint MOTION Scheduling Order as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1), David Gibson (2), Robert V.A. Harra (3), William B. North (4), Kevyn N. Rakowski (5). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/14/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 3/15/2016, Entered: None
Disclosure Statement pursuant to Rule 12.4 by Wilmington Trust Corporation (Will, Lori) (Entered: 03/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 3/9/2016, Entered: None
Joint MOTION Scheduling Order by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 03/09/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 3/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 149 Motion for Protective Order as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1), David Gibson (2), Robert V.A. Harra (3), William B. North (4), Kevyn N. Rakowski (5). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 3/4/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 03/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 3/3/2016, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 03/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 2/25/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation: A Pretrial Conference is set for 1/4/2017 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Jury Selection is set to begin on 1/17/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Jury Trial is set for 1/23/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews (see Order for further details). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/24/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 02/25/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 2/5/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO CONTINUE in the Interests of Justice in order to file pretrial motions as to Wilmington Trust Corporation. Time excluded from 2/5/2016 until 3/7/2016. Pretrial Motions due by 3/7/2016. Signed by Judge Christopher J. Burke on 2/5/2016. (dlk) (Entered: 02/10/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 2/8/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on 02-05-16 before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Leonard A. Dibbs. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/29/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/10/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/9/2016. (lad) (Entered: 02/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
PROTECTIVE ORDER re 138 Motion for Protective Order as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1), David Gibson (2), Robert V.A. Harra (3), William B. North (4), Kevyn N. Rakowski (5). Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 2/4/2016. (ksr, ) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None
Certificate of Good Standing as to Christopher J. Gunther. (cna) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 2/4/2016, Entered: None
STATUS REPORT (JOINT REGARDING SCHEDULING) by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 02/04/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 2/3/2016, Entered: None
Consent MOTION for Protective Order by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 02/03/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 134 Filed: 1/15/2016, Entered: None
REPLY BRIEF/MEMORANDUM by David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 97 MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant To Brady v. Maryland, 110 MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant to Rule 16 (Moffitt, Jay) (Entered: 01/15/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation Granting 121 Joint MOTION to Schedule Status Conference. A Status Conference is set for 2/5/2016 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 6A before Judge Richard G. Andrews. Time is excluded from 1/14/2016 until 2/5/2016, in the Interests of Justice. Signed by Judge Richard G. Andrews on 1/14/2016. (ksr, ) Modified on 1/22/2016 (rwc). (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
Certificate of Good Standing as to Lance A. Wade. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
Certificate of Good Standing as to Tobin J. Romero. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
Certificate of Good Standing as to Margaret A. Keeley. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
Certificate of Good Standing as to Barry S. Simon. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
Certificate of Good Standing as to Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr. (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/14/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Brendan V. Sullivan, Jr., Barry S. Simon, Margaret A. Keeley, Tobin J. Romero, Lance A. Wade appearing for Wilmington Trust Corporation (ksr, ) (Entered: 01/14/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
Joint MOTION to Schedule Status Conference by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation. (Kravetz, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 1/13/2016, Entered: None
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Robert Scott Saunders appearing for Wilmington Trust Corporation and Notice of Appearance for Christopher J. Gunther and Lori W. Will (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing for Christopher J. Gunther)(Saunders, Robert) (Entered: 01/13/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/8/2016, Entered: None
BRIEF/MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, Wilmington Trust Corporation re 97 MOTION to Compel Discovery Pursuant To Brady v. Maryland, 110 MOTION to Compel Pursuant to Rule 16 (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wolf, Lesley) (Entered: 01/08/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
REDACTED VERSION of 112 Second Superseding Indictment by USA as to Wilmington Trust Corporation, David Gibson, Robert V.A. Harra, William B. North, Kevyn N. Rakowski. (kjk) (kjk). (Entered: 01/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 1/6/2016, Entered: None
SECOND SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT with a Notice of Forfeiture as to Wilmington Trust Corporation (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7-10, 11-16, David Gibson (2) count(s) 1s, 2s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s-10s, 11s-16s, 17s-19s, Robert V.A. Harra (3) count(s) 1s, 2s, 4s, 5s, 6s, 7s-10s, 11s-16s, William B. North (4) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss-10ss, 11ss-16ss, Kevyn N. Rakowski (5) count(s) 1ss, 2ss, 4ss, 5ss, 6ss, 7ss-10ss, 11ss-16ss. ( Original SEALED - to be maintained in the Clerk's Office ). (kjk) (Entered: 01/07/2016)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 251 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?