David De Csepel, et al v. Republic of Hungary, et al
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 16-7042

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated June 13, 2017 at 11:09 PM DT (4.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3380 - TORTS PERSONAL PROPERTY-Other
  Entries (35) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207908008 Filed: 3/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORAL ARGUMENT HELD before Judges Henderson, Tatel and Randolph. [16-7042]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207904054 Filed: 2/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    PER CURIAM ORDER [1662166] filed allocating oral argument time as follows: Appellants - 10 Minutes, Appellees - 10 Minutes. One counsel per side to argue; directing party to file Form 72 notice of arguing attorney by 02/27/2017 [16-7042]- INCORRECT PDF WAS ATTACHED----[Edited 02/21/2017 by MCM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207899017 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      APPELLEE FINAL BRIEF [1659345] filed by David L. De Csepel, Angela Maria Herzog and Julia Alice Herzog [Service Date: 02/03/2017 ] Length of Brief: 13,789. [16-7042] (Hays, Michael)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207898286 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1658927] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary to Appellant/Petitioner final reply brief [1658925-2] [Service Date:02/02/2017 ] [16-7042] (Andre, Sarah)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207898283 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          APPELLANT FINAL REPLY BRIEF [1658925] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 02/02/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6,937 WORDS. [16-7042] (Andre, Sarah)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207898275 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            SEPARATE STATUTORY ADDENDUM [1658922] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary to Appellant/Petitioner final brief [1658915-2] [Service Date:02/02/2017 ] [16-7042] (Andre, Sarah)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207898268 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPELLANT FINAL BRIEF [1658915] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 02/02/2017 ] Length of Brief: 13,967 words. [16-7042] (Andre, Sarah)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207895073 Filed: 1/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                JOINT APPENDIX [1657173] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary. [Volumes: 4] [Service Date: 01/24/2017 ] [16-7042] (Andre, Sarah)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207892651 Filed: 1/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  APPELLANT REPLY BRIEF [1655918] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 01/13/2017 ] Length of Brief: 6,935 Words. [16-7042] (Andre, Sarah)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Blank 01207891006 Filed: 1/10/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    CLERK'S ORDER [1654952] filed scheduling oral argument on Monday, 03/06/2017. [16-7042]
                      LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207883059 Filed: 12/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      APPELLEE BRIEF [1650648] filed by David L. De Csepel, Angela Maria Herzog and Julia Alice Herzog [Service Date: 12/12/2016 ] Length of Brief: 13,774 words. [16-7042] (Hays, Michael)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207869111 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        APPELLANT BRIEF [1643294] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 10/27/2016 ] Length of Brief: 13,965 Words. [16-7042] (Andre, Sarah)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Blank 01207864579 Filed: 10/13/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CLERK'S ORDER [1640835] filed granting appellants' unopposed motion to amend the briefing schedule [1640347-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 10/28/2016. APPELLEE Brief due on 12/12/2016. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 01/13/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 01/24/2017. Final Briefs due 02/03/2017. [16-7042]
                            LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207863626 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            UNOPPOSED MOTION [1640347] filed to extend time to file brief to 01/13/2017. filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary Pages: 1-10. [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207860023 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              PER CURIAM ORDER [1638443] denying motion to exceed word limits [1633678-2]; setting the following briefing schedule: APPELLANTS' BRIEF (not to exceed 14,000 words) due 10/28/2016. APPELLEES' BRIEF (not to exceed 14,000 words) due 12/12/2016. APPELLANTS' REPLY BRIEF (not to exceed 7,000 words) due 01/06/2017. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 01/17/2017. FINAL BRIEFS due 01/27/2017. Before Judges: Brown, Griffith and Pillard. [16-7042]
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 01207851692 Filed: 9/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                CLERK'S ORDER [1633933] filed suspending Clerk order [1622794-3] [16-7042]
                                  LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207851199 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  UNOPPOSED MOTION [1633678] filed to exceed brief filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary Pages: 1-10. [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207831117 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
                                    CLERK'S ORDER [1622794] filed granting joint motion to amend briefing schedule [1622724-2], setting revised briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 09/12/2016. APPELLEE Brief due on 10/27/2016. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 11/21/2016. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 12/01/2016. APPELLANT Final Brief due 12/12/2016. APPELLEE Final Brief due on 12/12/2016. APPELLANT Final Reply Brief due 12/12/2016 [16-7042]
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207831013 Filed: 7/1/2016, Entered: None
                                      JOINT MOTION [1622724] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary to extend time to file brief (Response to Motion served by mail due on 07/14/2016) [Service Date: 07/01/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207827907 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None
                                        CLERK'S ORDER [1620984] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 08/01/2016. APPELLEE Brief due on 08/31/2016. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 09/14/2016. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 09/21/2016. Final Briefs due 10/05/2016. [16-7042]
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207817861 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                          PER CURIAM ORDER [1615257] filed denying Hungary's motion to assign case to prior panel [1613125-2]. Before Judges: Tatel, Williams and Sentelle. [16-7042]
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207817288 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None
                                            RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION [1614958] filed by David L. De Csepel, Angela Maria Herzog and Julia Alice Herzog to motion to assign case to prior panel [1613125-2] [Service Date: 05/25/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-7042] (Hays, Michael)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207813961 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                              CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1613130] filed by David L. De Csepel, Angela Maria Herzog and Julia Alice Herzog [Service Date: 05/12/2016 ] [16-7042] (Hays, Michael)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207813949 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1613126] submitted by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 05/12/2016 ] [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207813946 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                  MOTION [1613125] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary to assign prior panel (Response to Motion served by mail due on 05/26/2016) [Service Date: 05/12/2016 by CM/ECF NDA] Pages: 1-10. [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207813943 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                    TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1613124] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 05/12/2016 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207813937 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                      STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1613122] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 05/12/2016 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207813934 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                        STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1613121] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 05/12/2016 ] [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207813931 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                          DOCKETING STATEMENT [1613120] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 05/12/2016 ] [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207813928 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                            CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1613119] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary [Service Date: 05/12/2016 ] [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207811987 Filed: 5/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                              ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1612033] filed by Michael S. Shuster and co-counsel Michael D. Hays Sheron Korpus Alycia Regan Benenati Alyssa T. Saunders on behalf of Appellees David L. De Csepel, Angela Maria Herzog and Julia Alice Herzog. [16-7042] (Hays, Michael)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207809821 Filed: 4/28/2016, Entered: None
                                                                ENTRY OF APPEARANCE [1610876] filed by Thaddeus J. Stauber, Sarah E. Andre, and Emily C. Harlan on behalf of Appellants Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary. [16-7042] (Harlan, Emily)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207805055 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  CLERK'S ORDER [1608285] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/12/2016. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/12/2016. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/12/2016. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/12/2016. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/12/2016. APPELLANT notice of appearance due 05/12/2016. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/12/2016. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/12/2016. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 05/27/2016. Directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/12/2016. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/12/2016. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/12/2016. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 05/27/2016 [16-7042]
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207805038 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE [1608279] received from the Clerk of the U.S. District Court granting motion to stay. [16-7042]
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 01207805035 Filed: 4/12/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEAL [1608277] filed by Budapest University of Technology and Economics, Hungarian National Gallery, Museum of Applied Arts, Museum of Fine Arts and Republic of Hungary seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:10-cv-01261-ESH-AK. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 16-7042. [16-7042]
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                        Statistics

                                                                        This case has been viewed 238 times.

                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                        Space
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                         
                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                        Need Password Help?