CRENSHAW v. CAPITAL COMMUNITY SERVICES LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit District Of Columbia District Court, Case No. 1:14-cv-00725
District Judge John D. Bates, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated December 25, 2016 at 8:45 AM ST (4.5 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo DORTHEA L. CRENSHAW, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by houston

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David E. Haynes +1 202 682 5800 +1 202 408 8852 dhaynes@cochranfirm.com
v.
No Logo CAPITAL COMMUNITY SERVICES LLC, Defendant
No Logo CARROLL PARKS, Defendant
No Logo GEORGE CHOPIVSKY, Defendant
District of Columbia District of Columbia, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by District of Columbia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jane Drummey +1 202 727 2658 jane.drummey@dc.gov
United States of America United States of America, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by Office Of The United States Attorney, Eastern District Of Virginia

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Mercedeh Momeni +1 202 305 4851 +1 202 514 8780 mercedeh.momeni@usdoj.gov
LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Beverly Maria Russell +1 202 307 0492 +1 202 514 8780 beverly.russell@usdoj.gov
Citation Section 31 U.S.C. § 3729
Nature of Suit 375 - Other Statutes: False Claims Act
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/13/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
ORDER TO UNSEAL CASE. The Complaint shall be unsealed and served upon the defendants by the relator. All other contents of the Court's file up until this date shall remain under seal and shall not be made public or served upon the defendants, except for this Order and the notices from the United States and the District of Columbia of their elections to decline intervention, which the relator shall serve upon the defendants only after service of the complaint. The seal shall be lifted as to all other matters occurring in this action after the date of this Order. (SEE THE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS). Signed by Judge John D. Bates on 04/13/2016. (jth) (Main Document 16 replaced on 4/13/2016 to correct the spelling of Plaintiff's name in the caption) (jth). (Entered: 04/13/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
    NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION by DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA (ztd) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/11/2016, Entered: None
      NOTICE OF ELECTION TO DECLINE INTERVENTION by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (ztd) (Entered: 04/12/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Blank 1 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None
        COMPLAINT against CARROLL PARKS, CAPITAL COMMUNITY SERVICES LLC, GEORGE CHOPIVSKY ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 4616063461) with Jury Demand filed by CARROLL PARKS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ztd, ) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
        LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 288 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?