BOPP et al v. OAKLAND VENTURES, LLC et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit Florida Southern District Court, Case No. 9:16-cv-80424
District Judge William J. Zloch, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 17, 2021 at 10:29 AM ST (1.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo MARGARET BOPP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S. Lubliner +1 561 227 9344 +1 561 909 2114 rlubliner@greenstein-law.com
No Logo MARY BOPP, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by SUITE 800

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Richard S. Lubliner +1 561 227 9344 +1 561 909 2114 rlubliner@greenstein-law.com
v.
No Logo ALL SEASONS EQUINE VETERINARY PRACTICE LLC, Defendant
No Logo COURTNEY DE HECHAVARRIA, Defendant
No Logo DARRAGH KENNY, Defendant
No Logo EMILY DEAN, Defendant
No Logo OAKLAND VENTURES, LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (52) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 2/17/2021, Entered: None Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 2/2/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 1/29/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 7/2/2020, Entered: None Scheduling Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 136 Filed: 3/19/2020, Entered: None Continue
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 3/5/2020, Entered: None Appear
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 127 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 2/14/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 2/12/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 1/13/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 1/11/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 113 Filed: 1/6/2020, Entered: None Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 9/26/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time of Discovery Cutoff Deadline
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 5/28/2019, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 91 Filed: 5/15/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 5/7/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/15/2019, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 5/26/2017, Entered: None Compel
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 4/14/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Set Aside
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None extension of time
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Set Aside
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 4/12/2017, Entered: None Order Dismissing Case
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/31/2017, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP re 11 Notice (Other) (Lubliner, Richard) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP. EMILY DEAN served on 3/30/2016, answer due 4/20/2016. (Lubliner, Richard) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2016, Entered: None
                                                                      SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP. ALL SEASONS EQUINE VETERINARY PRACTICE LLC served on 3/30/2016, answer due 4/20/2016. (Lubliner, Richard) (Entered: 04/05/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/1/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        Clerks Notice to Filer re 14 Acknowledgment of Service, 13 Acknowledgment of Service. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see 15 and 16 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (asl) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                          SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP. DARRAGH KENNY served on 3/31/2016, answer due 4/21/2016. See 14 for image (asl) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on 1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP. OAKLAND VENTURES, LLC served on 3/31/2016, answer due 4/21/2016. See 13 for image (asl) (Entered: 04/01/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to 8 Summons Issued Darragh Kenny filed by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP. (Lubliner, Richard) Modified to re-docket, see 16 on 4/1/2016 (asl). (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to 8 Summons Issued Oakland Ventures, LLC filed by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP. (Lubliner, Richard) Modified to re-docket, see 15 on 4/1/2016 (asl). (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP re 11 Notice (Other) Exhibit A, Exhibit B and Exhibit C (Lubliner, Richard) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                    NOTICE by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP re 1 Complaint, (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C) (Lubliner, Richard) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/31/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP re 1 Complaint, (Lubliner, Richard) (Entered: 03/31/2016)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                        ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to 8 Summons Issued COURTNEY DE HECHAVARRIA filed by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP. (Lubliner, Richard) (Entered: 03/25/2016)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                          Summons Issued as to ALL SEASONS EQUINE VETERINARY PRACTICE LLC, COURTNEY DE HECHAVARRIA, EMILY DEAN, DARRAGH KENNY, OAKLAND VENTURES, LLC. (asl) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/21/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                            NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Oakland Ventures, LLC, Darragh Kenny, Courtney De Hechavarria, All Seasons Equine Veterinary Practice, LLC, and Emily Dean by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP (Lubliner, Richard) (Entered: 03/21/2016)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/18/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                              NOTICE by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Lubliner, Richard) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (pes) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                  Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pes) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                    Clerks Notice pursuant to 28 USC 636(c). Parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the attached form. (pes) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None Court Filing
                                                                                                      Judge Assignment to Judge William J. Zloch (pes) (Entered: 03/18/2016)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/17/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against ALL SEASONS EQUINE VETERINARY PRACTICE LLC, COURTNEY DE HECHAVARRIA, EMILY DEAN, DARRAGH KENNY, OAKLAND VENTURES, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-8576208, filed by MARGARET BOPP, MARY BOPP d/b/a ROSEMONT, LLC.(Lubliner, Richard) (Entered: 03/17/2016)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                          Statistics

                                                                                                          This case has been viewed 534 times.

                                                                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                          Space
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                           
                                                                                                          PlainSite
                                                                                                          Sign Up
                                                                                                          Need Password Help?