Lennon Image Technologies, LLC v. Sephora USA, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00411
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 27, 2017 at 6:26 PM ST (4.6 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Lennon Image Technologies LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Niknaz Bukovcan +1 214 466 1278 +1 214 635 1831 niky.bukovcan@bjciplaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Buether Joe & Carpenter Llc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eric William Buether +1 214 969 6926 +1 214 635 1827 eric.buether@bjciplaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher Michael Joe +1 214 466 1272 +1 214 635 1828 Chris.Joe@bjciplaw.com
v.
No Logo Sephora Usa, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1338
Nature of Suit 830 - Property Rights: Patent
  Entries (41) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/23/2017, Entered: None Dismiss
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 2/6/2017, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Stay
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/20/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/19/2016, Entered: None Claim Construction Chart/Prehearing Statement
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/16/2016, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 12/7/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/2/2016, Entered: None Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/1/2016, Entered: None Miscellaneous Relief
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 8/1/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 08/01/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 07/28/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael David Ricketts on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Ricketts, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER granting 22 Motion for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/22/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/22/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Discovery Disclosure by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC Plaintiff's Notice of Service of Initial Disclosures to Defendant (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE by Sephora USA, Inc. OF SERVICE OF INITIAL AND ADDITIONAL DISCLOSURES (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 07/21/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Protective Order by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 07/20/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          DOCKET CONTROL ORDER. Mediation Completion due by 4/17/2017. Jury Selection set for 10/2/2017 09:00AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Claim Construction/Markman Hearing set for 3/20/2017 01:30 PM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Pretrial Conference set for 9/4/2017 09:00 AM before Judge Rodney Gilstrap. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/15/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/15/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 07/15/16. (mll, ) (Entered: 07/15/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Discovery Order re 10 Order, Set Hearings by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Joint MOTION for Entry of Agreed Docket Control Order re 10 Order, Set Hearings by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 07/14/2016)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 7/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediator Hon. Jeff Kaplan (Ret.) of JAMS, 8401 North Central Expressway, Suite 610, Dallas, Texas 75225, telephone number 214-891-4523 and fax number 214-720-6010, is hereby appointed as mediator. Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 7/6/2016. (ch, ) (Entered: 07/06/2016)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 7/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Hon. Jeff Kaplan (Ret.), filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 07/05/2016)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric Hugh Findlay on behalf of Sephora USA, Inc. (Findlay, Eric) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Roger Brian Craft on behalf of Sephora USA, Inc. (Craft, Roger) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Sephora USA, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton Inc., Corporate Parent LVMH Moet Hennessy Louis Vuitton SE for Sephora USA, Inc.. (McFarlane, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Sephora USA, Inc.. (McFarlane, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Defendant Sephora USA, Inc.'s ANSWER to 1 Complaint, for Patent Infringement by Sephora USA, Inc..(McFarlane, Robert) (Entered: 06/17/2016)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER, ( Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2016 01:30 PM in Ctrm 106 (Marshall) before Judge Rodney Gilstrap.) Signed by Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 6/3/16. (mrm, ) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Sephora USA, Inc..( McFarlane, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                    NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Niknaz Bukovcan on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Bukovcan, Niknaz) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Russell C Petersen on behalf of Sephora USA, Inc. (Petersen, Russell) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                        NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eric William Buether on behalf of Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Buether, Eric) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Robert A McFarlane on behalf of Sephora USA, Inc. (McFarlane, Robert) (Entered: 05/12/2016)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                            Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 mailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/25/2016, Entered: None
                                                                              SUMMONS Issued as to Sephora USA, Inc.. (ch, ) (Entered: 04/25/2016)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC (Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Blank 1 Filed: 4/14/2016, Entered: None
                                                                                  COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Sephora USA, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0540-5703959.), filed by Lennon Image Technologies, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit 1 - 6,624,843 Patent, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Sephora Chart (Apps), # 4 Exhibit 3 - Sephora Chart (Website))(Joe, Christopher) (Entered: 04/14/2016)
                                                                                  LREF

                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                  This case has been viewed 77 times.

                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                  Space
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                   
                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                  Need Password Help?